Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 68 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3486 Week
» 28320 Month
» 62652 Year
» 1728028 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

179


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
59255      
59256 W Withdrawn 28/07/1985 28/07/1985
59257
59258
59259
59260
59261
59262
59263
59264 18/01/1988
59265
59266
59267
59268 29/09/1987
59269
59270 W Withdrawn 30/12/1968 30/12/1968
59271 W Withdrawn 30/12/1968 30/12/1968
59272
59273
59274
59275
59276
59277
59278
59279
59280
59281
59282 CF Cardiff Canton 03/05/1981
59283
59284
59285 10/09/1987
59286
59287
59288
59289
59290
59291
59292
59293 W Withdrawn 31/03/1985 31/03/1985
59294
59295
59296
59297
59298
59299
59300
59301
59579 W Withdrawn 30/12/1968 30/12/1968
59580 29/09/1987
59581
59582
59583
59584 W Withdrawn 30/12/1968 30/12/1968
59585 W Withdrawn 30/12/1968 30/12/1968
59586
59587
59588
59679 19/12/1959 61A Kittybrewster (New) 19/12/1959
59680 19/12/1959 61A Kittybrewster (New) 19/12/1959
59681 26/12/1959 61A Kittybrewster (New) 26/12/1959 29/09/1987
59682 26/12/1959 61A Kittybrewster (New) 26/12/1959 10/09/1987
59683 02/01/1960 61A Kittybrewster (New) 02/01/1960
59684 02/01/1960 61A Kittybrewster (New) 02/01/1960
59685 09/01/1960 61A Kittybrewster (New) 09/01/1960