Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 924 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 3089 Week
» 3089 Month
» 69951 Year
» 1735327 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

179


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To
19/12/1959 To Service 59679   NEW 61A Kittybrewster
19/12/1959 To Service 59680   NEW 61A Kittybrewster
26/12/1959 To Service 59681   NEW 61A Kittybrewster
26/12/1959 To Service 59682   NEW 61A Kittybrewster
02/01/1960 To Service 59683   NEW 61A Kittybrewster
02/01/1960 To Service 59684   NEW 61A Kittybrewster
09/01/1960 To Service 59685   NEW 61A Kittybrewster
30/12/1968 Condemned 59270       COND
30/12/1968 Condemned 59271       COND
30/12/1968 Condemned 59579       COND
30/12/1968 Condemned 59584       COND
30/12/1968 Condemned 59585       COND
31/03/1985 Condemned 59293       COND
28/07/1985 Condemned 59256       COND
10/09/1987 Condemned 59285       COND
10/09/1987 Condemned 59682 61A Kittybrewster   COND
29/09/1987 Condemned 59268       COND
29/09/1987 Condemned 59580       COND
29/09/1987 Condemned 59681 61A Kittybrewster   COND
18/01/1988 Condemned 59264       COND