Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 99 Today
» 1070 Yesterday
» 99 Week
» 99 Month
» 66961 Year
» 1732337 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

185


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
59449 12/12/1958 30A Stratford (New) 12/12/1958
59450 15/01/1959 30A Stratford (New) 15/01/1959
59451 09/01/1959 30A Stratford (New) 09/01/1959
59452 09/01/1959 30A Stratford (New) 09/01/1959
59453 06/01/1959 30A Stratford (New) 06/01/1959
59454 30/01/1959 30A Stratford (New) 30/01/1959
59455 28/01/1959 30A Stratford (New) 28/01/1959
59456 03/02/1959 30A Stratford (New) 03/02/1959
59457 05/03/1959 30A Stratford (New) 05/03/1959
59458 13/02/1959 30A Stratford (New) 13/02/1959
59459 18/02/1959 30A Stratford (New) 18/02/1959
59460 26/02/1959 30A Stratford (New) 26/02/1959
59461 12/03/1959 30A Stratford (New) 12/03/1959
59462 12/05/1959 30A Stratford (New) 12/05/1959
59463 12/05/1959 30A Stratford (New) 12/05/1959
59464 12/05/1959 30A Stratford (New) 12/05/1959
59465 14/04/1959 30A Stratford (New) 14/04/1959
59466 14/04/1959 30A Stratford (New) 14/04/1959
59467 07/05/1959 30A Stratford (New) 07/05/1959
59468