Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 54 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 5529 Week
» 5529 Month
» 72391 Year
» 1737767 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

185


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To
12/12/1958 To Service 59449   NEW 30A Stratford
06/01/1959 To Service 59453   NEW 30A Stratford
09/01/1959 To Service 59451   NEW 30A Stratford
09/01/1959 To Service 59452   NEW 30A Stratford
15/01/1959 To Service 59450   NEW 30A Stratford
28/01/1959 To Service 59455   NEW 30A Stratford
30/01/1959 To Service 59454   NEW 30A Stratford
03/02/1959 To Service 59456   NEW 30A Stratford
13/02/1959 To Service 59458   NEW 30A Stratford
18/02/1959 To Service 59459   NEW 30A Stratford
26/02/1959 To Service 59460   NEW 30A Stratford
05/03/1959 To Service 59457   NEW 30A Stratford
12/03/1959 To Service 59461   NEW 30A Stratford
14/04/1959 To Service 59465   NEW 30A Stratford
14/04/1959 To Service 59466   NEW 30A Stratford
07/05/1959 To Service 59467   NEW 30A Stratford
12/05/1959 To Service 59462   NEW 30A Stratford
12/05/1959 To Service 59463   NEW 30A Stratford
12/05/1959 To Service 59464   NEW 30A Stratford