Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 71 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 5546 Week
» 5546 Month
» 72408 Year
» 1737784 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

185


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
59449 12/12/1958 Stratford 62.27
59450 15/01/1959 Stratford 62.18
59451 09/01/1959 Stratford 62.20
59452 09/01/1959 Stratford 62.20
59453 06/01/1959 Stratford 62.21
59454 30/01/1959 Stratford 62.14
59455 28/01/1959 Stratford 62.15
59456 03/02/1959 Stratford 62.13
59457 05/03/1959 Stratford 62.05
59458 13/02/1959 Stratford 62.10
59459 18/02/1959 Stratford 62.09
59460 26/02/1959 Stratford 62.07
59461 12/03/1959 Stratford 62.03
59462 12/05/1959 Stratford 61.86
59463 12/05/1959 Stratford 61.86
59464 12/05/1959 Stratford 61.86
59465 14/04/1959 Stratford 61.94
59466 14/04/1959 Stratford 61.94
59467 07/05/1959 Stratford 61.87
59468