Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 354 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2519 Week
» 2519 Month
» 69381 Year
» 1734757 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

106


BR BR (Parcels) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
50359   10/08/1956 53C Hull Springhead (New) 10/08/1956
50360   23/10/1956 53C Hull Springhead (New) 23/10/1956
50361   02/11/1956 53C Hull Springhead (New) 02/11/1956
50362 55945 19/11/1956 53C Hull Springhead (New) 19/11/1956 13/09/1987
50363   03/12/1956 53C Hull Springhead (New) 03/12/1956
50364   20/12/1956 53C Hull Springhead (New) 20/12/1956
50365   01/01/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 01/01/1957
50366   12/01/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 12/01/1957
50367   23/01/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 23/01/1957
50368   29/01/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 29/01/1957
50369   01/02/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 01/02/1957
50370   04/02/1957 53C Hull Springhead (New) 04/02/1957