Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 863 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 3028 Week
» 3028 Month
» 69890 Year
» 1735266 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

106


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To
10/08/1956 To Service 50359   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
23/10/1956 To Service 50360   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
02/11/1956 To Service 50361   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
19/11/1956 To Service 50362   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
03/12/1956 To Service 50363   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
20/12/1956 To Service 50364   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
01/01/1957 To Service 50365   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
12/01/1957 To Service 50366   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
23/01/1957 To Service 50367   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
29/01/1957 To Service 50368   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
01/02/1957 To Service 50369   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
04/02/1957 To Service 50370   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
13/09/1987 Condemned 55945 53C Hull Springhead   COND