Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 14 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 14 Week
» 7626 Month
» 74488 Year
» 1739864 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

106


BR BR (Parcels) Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
50359 10/08/1956 Hull Springhead 64.62
50360 23/10/1956 Hull Springhead 64.41
50361 02/11/1956 Hull Springhead 64.39
50362 55945 19/11/1956 Hull Springhead 13/09/1987 Cambridge 30.83 64.34
50363 03/12/1956 Hull Springhead 64.30
50364 20/12/1956 Hull Springhead 64.25
50365 01/01/1957 Hull Springhead 64.22
50366 12/01/1957 Hull Springhead 64.19
50367 23/01/1957 Hull Springhead 64.16
50368 29/01/1957 Hull Springhead 64.15
50369 01/02/1957 Hull Springhead 64.14
50370 04/02/1957 Hull Springhead 64.13