Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 69 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3487 Week
» 28321 Month
» 62653 Year
» 1728029 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

187


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
59098 14/01/1961 64H Leith Central (New) 14/01/1961
59099
79440 01/06/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 01/06/1957
79441 08/06/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 08/06/1957
79442 20/04/1957 64A St Margarets (New) 20/04/1957
79443 20/04/1957 64A St Margarets (New) 20/04/1957
79444 20/04/1957 64A St Margarets (New) 20/04/1957
79445 20/04/1957 64A St Margarets (New) 20/04/1957
79446 20/04/1957 64A St Margarets (New) 20/04/1957
79447 20/04/1957 64A St Margarets (New) 20/04/1957