Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 885 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 3050 Week
» 3050 Month
» 69912 Year
» 1735288 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

187


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
59098 14/01/1961 Leith Central 60.17
59099
79440 01/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 63.80
79441 08/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 63.78
79442 20/04/1957 St Margarets 63.91
79443 20/04/1957 St Margarets 63.91
79444 20/04/1957 St Margarets 63.91
79445 20/04/1957 St Margarets 63.91
79446 20/04/1957 St Margarets 63.91
79447 20/04/1957 St Margarets 63.91