Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 914 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 3079 Week
» 3079 Month
» 69941 Year
» 1735317 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

188


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
79470 17/08/1957 91W
W
To Western Region / GWR (New)
Withdrawn
17/08/1957
24/07/1981
24/07/1981
79471 18/05/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 18/05/1957
79472 18/05/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 18/05/1957
79473 25/05/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 25/05/1957
79474
79475 03/09/1956 64A St Margarets (New) 03/09/1956
79476 17/09/1956 64A St Margarets (New) 17/09/1956
79477 01/10/1956 64A St Margarets (New) 01/10/1956
79478 15/10/1956 64A St Margarets (New) 15/10/1956
79479 30/10/1956 64A St Margarets (New) 30/10/1956
79480 12/11/1956 64A St Margarets (New) 12/11/1956
79481 26/11/1956 64A St Margarets (New) 26/11/1956
79482 18/12/1956 64A St Margarets (New) 18/12/1956