Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 590 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 590 Week
» 8202 Month
» 75064 Year
» 1740440 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

188


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To
03/09/1956 To Service 79475   NEW 64A St Margarets
17/09/1956 To Service 79476   NEW 64A St Margarets
01/10/1956 To Service 79477   NEW 64A St Margarets
15/10/1956 To Service 79478   NEW 64A St Margarets
30/10/1956 To Service 79479   NEW 64A St Margarets
12/11/1956 To Service 79480   NEW 64A St Margarets
26/11/1956 To Service 79481   NEW 64A St Margarets
18/12/1956 To Service 79482   NEW 64A St Margarets
24/07/1981 Condemned 79470 91W To Western Region / GWR   COND