Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 807 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18610 Week
» 71626 Month
» 191153 Year
» 3218006 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
BR Standard Riddles "Std 4MT" Class 2-6-0
Class |
BR |
Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Modification |
Modification Date |
Std 4MT |
76009
|
26/02/1953 |
09/07/1967 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
13/08/1960 |
Std 4MT |
76011
|
23/03/1953 |
09/07/1967 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
25/06/1960 |