Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 22 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 840 Week
» 17791 Month
» 170744 Year
» 1836120 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BR Standard Riddles "Std 3MT Tank" Class 2-6-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
04/04/1952 To Service 82000   NEW 84E Tyseley  
18/04/1952 To Service 82001   NEW 84E Tyseley  
19/04/1952 Reallocation 82000 84E Tyseley 84E Tyseley  
19/04/1952 Reallocation 82001 84E Tyseley 84E Tyseley  
28/04/1952 To Service 82002   NEW 84E Tyseley  
02/05/1952 To Service 82003   NEW 84E Tyseley  
14/05/1952 To Service 82004   NEW 84E Tyseley  
16/05/1952 To Service 82005   NEW 84E Tyseley  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 82002 84E Tyseley 84E Tyseley  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 82003 84E Tyseley 84E Tyseley  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 82004 84E Tyseley 84E Tyseley  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 82005 84E Tyseley 84E Tyseley  
27/05/1952 To Service 82006   NEW 84E Tyseley  
30/05/1952 To Service 82007   NEW 84E Tyseley  
05/06/1952 To Service 82008   NEW 84E Tyseley  
13/06/1952 To Service 82009   NEW 84E Tyseley  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 82001 84E Tyseley 84E Tyseley  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 82002 84E Tyseley 84E Tyseley  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 82003 84E Tyseley 84E Tyseley  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 82006 84E Tyseley 84E Tyseley  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 82007 84E Tyseley 84E Tyseley  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 82008 84E Tyseley 84E Tyseley  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 82009 84E Tyseley 84E Tyseley  
25/06/1952 To Service 82010   NEW 72A Exmouth Junction  
01/07/1952 To Service 82011   NEW 72A Exmouth Junction  
04/07/1952 To Service 82012   NEW 72A Exmouth Junction  
09/07/1952 To Service 82013   NEW 72A Exmouth Junction  
01/08/1952 To Service 82014   NEW 71A Eastleigh  
08/08/1952 To Service 82017   NEW 72A Exmouth Junction  
13/08/1952 To Service 82015   NEW 71A Eastleigh  
21/08/1952 To Service 82016   NEW 71A Eastleigh  
08/09/1952 To Service 82018   NEW 72A Exmouth Junction  
26/09/1952 To Service 82019   NEW 72A Exmouth Junction  
07/10/1952 Reallocation 82014 71A Eastleigh 71A Eastleigh  
07/10/1952 Reallocation 82015 71A Eastleigh 71A Eastleigh  
07/10/1952 Reallocation 82016 71A Eastleigh 71A Eastleigh  
14/02/1953 Reallocation 82012 72A Exmouth Junction 71A Eastleigh  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 82001 84E Tyseley 84E Tyseley  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 82002 84E Tyseley 84E Tyseley  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 82003 84E Tyseley 84E Tyseley  
26/05/1953 Reallocation 82014 71A Eastleigh 71A Eastleigh  
08/08/1953 Reallocation 82000 84E Tyseley 88C Barry  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 82000 88C Barry 88F Treherbert  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 82001 84E Tyseley 88C Barry  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 82002 84E Tyseley 88C Barry  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 82003 84E Tyseley 88C Barry  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 82004 84E Tyseley 88C Barry  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 82005 84E Tyseley 88C Barry  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 82006 84E Tyseley 88C Barry  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 82007 84E Tyseley 88C Barry  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 82008 84E Tyseley 88C Barry  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 82009 84E Tyseley 88C Barry  
29/09/1954 To Service 82020   NEW 72A Exmouth Junction  
06/10/1954 To Service 82021   NEW 72A Exmouth Junction  
09/10/1954 Reallocation 82020 72A Exmouth Junction 2B Nuneaton  
09/10/1954 Reallocation 82021 72A Exmouth Junction 2B Nuneaton  
15/10/1954 To Service 82022   NEW 72A Exmouth Junction  
22/10/1954 To Service 82023   NEW 72A Exmouth Junction  
29/10/1954 To Service 82024   NEW 72A Exmouth Junction  
05/11/1954 To Service 82025   NEW 72A Exmouth Junction  
12/11/1954 To Service 82026   NEW 51H Kirkby Stephen  
23/11/1954 To Service 82027   NEW 51H Kirkby Stephen  
02/12/1954 To Service 82028   NEW 51A Darlington  
13/12/1954 To Service 82029   NEW 51A Darlington  
21/12/1954 To Service 82030   NEW 88C Barry  
30/12/1954 To Service 82031   NEW 88C Barry  
01/01/1955 To Service 82032   NEW 88C Barry  
13/01/1955 To Service 82033   NEW 83A Newton Abbot  
28/01/1955 To Service 82034   NEW 83A Newton Abbot  
29/01/1955 Reallocation 82031 88C Barry 83D Laira  
03/03/1955 To Service 82035   NEW 88C Barry  
26/03/1955 Reallocation 82031 83D Laira 83A Newton Abbot  
01/04/1955 To Service 82036   NEW 88C Barry  
20/04/1955 To Service 82037   NEW 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)  
23/04/1955 Reallocation 82004 88C Barry 83A Newton Abbot  
23/04/1955 Reallocation 82009 88C Barry 83A Newton Abbot  
04/05/1955 To Service 82038   NEW 83A Newton Abbot  
10/05/1955 To Service 82039   NEW 88C Barry  
19/05/1955 To Service 82040   NEW 88C Barry  
21/05/1955 Reallocation 82030 88C Barry 84G Shrewsbury  
21/05/1955 Reallocation 82031 83A Newton Abbot 84G Shrewsbury  
17/06/1955 To Service 82041   NEW 88C Barry  
20/06/1955 To Service 82042   NEW 88C Barry  
27/06/1955 To Service 82043   NEW 88C Barry  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 82001 88C Barry 83A Newton Abbot  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 82002 88C Barry 83A Newton Abbot  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 82005 88C Barry 83A Newton Abbot  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 82006 88C Barry 83A Newton Abbot  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 82007 88C Barry 88F Treherbert  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 82032 88C Barry 83A Newton Abbot  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 82037 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 88C Barry  
12/08/1955 To Service 82044   NEW 88C Barry  
10/09/1955 Reallocation 82008 88C Barry 85D Kidderminster  
08/10/1955 Reallocation 82038 83A Newton Abbot 84G Shrewsbury  
03/12/1955 Reallocation 82000 88F Treherbert 84G Shrewsbury  
03/12/1955 Reallocation 82007 88F Treherbert 84G Shrewsbury  
03/12/1955 Reallocation 82038 84G Shrewsbury 85A Worcester  
31/12/1955 Reallocation 82030 84G Shrewsbury 85A Worcester  
16/06/1956 Reallocation 82037 88C Barry 88E Abercynon  
14/07/1956 Reallocation 82037 88E Abercynon 88C Barry  
11/08/1956 Reallocation 82004 83A Newton Abbot 84H Wellington  
11/08/1956 Reallocation 82006 83A Newton Abbot 84H Wellington  
08/09/1956 Reallocation 82005 83A Newton Abbot 88F Treherbert  
08/09/1956 Reallocation 82009 83A Newton Abbot 84H Wellington  
08/09/1956 Reallocation 82034 83A Newton Abbot 84H Wellington  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 82001 83A Newton Abbot 88F Treherbert  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 82002 83A Newton Abbot 88F Treherbert  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 82032 83A Newton Abbot 88F Treherbert  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 82033 83A Newton Abbot 88F Treherbert  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 82034 84H Wellington 88F Treherbert  
03/11/1956 Reallocation 82020 2B Nuneaton 6E Wrexham Rhosddu  
03/11/1956 Reallocation 82021 2B Nuneaton 6E Wrexham Rhosddu  
07/09/1957 Reallocation 82008 85D Kidderminster 85A Worcester  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 82008 85A Worcester 85D Kidderminster  
25/01/1958 Reallocation 82008 85D Kidderminster 85A Worcester  
08/02/1958 Reallocation 82026 51H Kirkby Stephen 51A Darlington  
08/02/1958 Reallocation 82027 51H Kirkby Stephen 51C West Hartlepool  
08/02/1958 Reallocation 82029 51A Darlington 51C West Hartlepool  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 82001 88F Treherbert 82A Bristol Bath Road  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 82003 88C Barry 82A Bristol Bath Road  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 82032 88F Treherbert 88A Radyr  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 82033 88F Treherbert 88A Radyr  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 82034 88F Treherbert 88A Radyr  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 82036 88C Barry 88A Radyr  
19/04/1958 Reallocation 82037 88C Barry 88A Radyr  
17/05/1958 Reallocation 82002 88F Treherbert 82A Bristol Bath Road  
17/05/1958 Reallocation 82032 88A Radyr 82A Bristol Bath Road  
17/05/1958 Reallocation 82033 88A Radyr 82A Bristol Bath Road  
17/05/1958 Reallocation 82034 88A Radyr 82A Bristol Bath Road  
17/05/1958 Reallocation 82035 88C Barry 82A Bristol Bath Road  
17/05/1958 Reallocation 82036 88A Radyr 82A Bristol Bath Road  
17/05/1958 Reallocation 82037 88A Radyr 82A Bristol Bath Road  
17/05/1958 Reallocation 82039 88C Barry 82A Bristol Bath Road  
12/06/1958 Reallocation 82007 84G Shrewsbury 84H Wellington  
12/06/1958 Reallocation 82037 82A Bristol Bath Road 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)  
12/06/1958 Reallocation 82040 88C Barry 82A Bristol Bath Road  
12/06/1958 Reallocation 82041 88C Barry 82A Bristol Bath Road  
12/06/1958 Reallocation 82043 88C Barry 82A Bristol Bath Road  
12/06/1958 Reallocation 82044 88C Barry 82A Bristol Bath Road  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 82005 88F Treherbert 82A Bristol Bath Road  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 82007 84H Wellington 84D Leamington  
09/08/1958 Reallocation 82001 82A Bristol Bath Road 6E Chester West  
09/08/1958 Reallocation 82002 82A Bristol Bath Road 6E Chester West  
09/08/1958 Reallocation 82003 82A Bristol Bath Road 6E Chester West  
09/08/1958 Reallocation 82005 82A Bristol Bath Road 6E Chester West  
09/08/1958 Reallocation 82007 84D Leamington 84K Wrexham Rhosddu  
09/08/1958 Reallocation 82032 82A Bristol Bath Road 6E Chester West  
09/08/1958 Reallocation 82034 82A Bristol Bath Road 6E Chester West  
09/08/1958 Reallocation 82036 82A Bristol Bath Road 6E Chester West  
09/08/1958 Reallocation 82042 88C Barry 82A Bristol Bath Road  
06/09/1958 Reallocation 82007 84K Wrexham Rhosddu 85A Worcester  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 82007 85A Worcester 82A Bristol Bath Road  
11/10/1958 Reallocation 82026 51A Darlington 50E Scarborough  
11/10/1958 Reallocation 82027 51C West Hartlepool 50F Malton  
11/10/1958 Reallocation 82028 51A Darlington 50E Scarborough  
11/10/1958 Reallocation 82029 51C West Hartlepool 50F Malton  
24/01/1959 Reallocation 82000 84G Shrewsbury 84K Wrexham Rhosddu  
24/01/1959 Reallocation 82031 84G Shrewsbury 84K Wrexham Rhosddu  
24/01/1959 Reallocation 82037 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 84K Wrexham Rhosddu  
24/01/1959 Reallocation 82039 82A Bristol Bath Road 82G Templecombe (S&D)  
21/03/1959 Reallocation 82041 82A Bristol Bath Road 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)  
18/04/1959 Reallocation 82030 85A Worcester 82A Bristol Bath Road  
16/05/1959 Reallocation 82030 82A Bristol Bath Road 85A Worcester  
13/06/1959 Reallocation 82004 84H Wellington 84G Shrewsbury  
13/06/1959 Reallocation 82009 84H Wellington 84G Shrewsbury  
13/06/1959 Reallocation 82030 85A Worcester 85D Kidderminster  
11/07/1959 Reallocation 82030 85D Kidderminster 85A Worcester  
05/09/1959 Reallocation 82004 84G Shrewsbury 84H Wellington  
05/09/1959 Reallocation 82009 84G Shrewsbury 84H Wellington  
03/10/1959 Reallocation 82038 85A Worcester 84H Wellington  
31/10/1959 Reallocation 82004 84H Wellington 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)  
31/10/1959 Reallocation 82030 85A Worcester 84H Wellington  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 82006 84H Wellington 82A Bristol Bath Road  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 82009 84H Wellington 82A Bristol Bath Road  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 82020 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 84G Shrewsbury  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 82021 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 84G Shrewsbury  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 82030 84H Wellington 82A Bristol Bath Road  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 82031 84K Wrexham Rhosddu 89C Machynlleth  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 82037 84K Wrexham Rhosddu 82A Bristol Bath Road  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 82038 84H Wellington 82A Bristol Bath Road  
27/02/1960 Reallocation 82000 84K Wrexham Rhosddu 89C Machynlleth  
26/03/1960 Reallocation 82020 84G Shrewsbury 89C Machynlleth  
26/03/1960 Reallocation 82021 84G Shrewsbury 89C Machynlleth  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 82001 6E Chester West 6A Chester (MR)  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 82002 6E Chester West 6A Chester (MR)  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 82003 6E Chester West 6A Chester (MR)  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 82005 6E Chester West 6A Chester (MR)  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 82032 6E Chester West 6A Chester (MR)  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 82034 6E Chester West 6A Chester (MR)  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 82036 6E Chester West 6A Chester (MR)  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 82027 50F Malton 50E Scarborough  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 82029 50F Malton 50E Scarborough  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 82006 82A Bristol Bath Road 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 82007 82A Bristol Bath Road 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 82009 82A Bristol Bath Road 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 82030 82A Bristol Bath Road 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 82033 82A Bristol Bath Road 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 82035 82A Bristol Bath Road 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 82037 82A Bristol Bath Road 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 82038 82A Bristol Bath Road 82B St Philips Marsh  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 82039 82G Templecombe (S&D) 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 82040 82A Bristol Bath Road 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 82044 82A Bristol Bath Road 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
08/10/1960 Reallocation 82009 82E Bristol Barrow Road 82B St Philips Marsh  
08/10/1960 Reallocation 82042 82A Bristol Bath Road 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
08/10/1960 Reallocation 82043 82A Bristol Bath Road 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
31/12/1960 Reallocation 82033 82E Bristol Barrow Road 89C Machynlleth  
25/02/1961 Reallocation 82006 82E Bristol Barrow Road 89C Machynlleth  
25/02/1961 Reallocation 82007 82E Bristol Barrow Road 82B St Philips Marsh  
25/02/1961 Reallocation 82009 82B St Philips Marsh 89C Machynlleth  
23/04/1961 Reallocation 82001 6A Chester (MR) 82G Templecombe (S&D)  
23/04/1961 Reallocation 82002 6A Chester (MR) 82G Templecombe (S&D)  
23/04/1961 Reallocation 82003 6A Chester (MR) 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
23/04/1961 Reallocation 82005 6A Chester (MR) 89A Shrewsbury  
23/04/1961 Reallocation 82032 6A Chester (MR) 89A Shrewsbury  
23/04/1961 Reallocation 82034 6A Chester (MR) 89C Machynlleth  
23/04/1961 Reallocation 82036 6A Chester (MR) 89C Machynlleth  
15/07/1961 Reallocation 82005 89A Shrewsbury 89C Machynlleth  
15/07/1961 Reallocation 82008 85A Worcester 89C Machynlleth  
12/08/1961 Reallocation 82032 89A Shrewsbury 89C Machynlleth  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 82028 50E Scarborough 50F Malton  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 82029 50E Scarborough 50F Malton  
07/10/1961 Reallocation 82008 89C Machynlleth 87H Neyland  
07/10/1961 Reallocation 82042 82E Bristol Barrow Road 87H Neyland  
07/10/1961 Reallocation 82044 82E Bristol Barrow Road 87H Neyland  
04/11/1961 Reallocation 82002 82G Templecombe (S&D) 89A Shrewsbury  
04/11/1961 Reallocation 82008 87H Neyland 83B Taunton  
04/11/1961 Reallocation 82030 82E Bristol Barrow Road 83B Taunton  
04/11/1961 Reallocation 82042 87H Neyland 83B Taunton  
04/11/1961 Reallocation 82044 87H Neyland 83B Taunton  
02/12/1961 Reallocation 82005 89C Machynlleth 89C Machynlleth  
02/12/1961 Reallocation 82032 89C Machynlleth 89A Shrewsbury  
02/12/1961 Reallocation 82036 89C Machynlleth 89A Shrewsbury  
24/02/1962 Reallocation 82003 82E Bristol Barrow Road 82B St Philips Marsh  
24/02/1962 Reallocation 82035 82E Bristol Barrow Road 82B St Philips Marsh  
24/02/1962 Reallocation 82037 82E Bristol Barrow Road 82B St Philips Marsh  
24/02/1962 Reallocation 82039 82E Bristol Barrow Road 82B St Philips Marsh  
24/02/1962 Reallocation 82040 82E Bristol Barrow Road 82B St Philips Marsh  
24/02/1962 Reallocation 82043 82E Bristol Barrow Road 82B St Philips Marsh  
24/03/1962 Reallocation 82003 82B St Philips Marsh 87G Carmarthen  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 82003 87G Carmarthen 89C Machynlleth  
14/07/1962 Reallocation 82036 89A Shrewsbury 82B St Philips Marsh  
08/09/1962 Reallocation 82001 82G Templecombe (S&D) 86C Hereford  
24/09/1962 Reallocation 82010 72A Exmouth Junction 71A Eastleigh  
24/09/1962 Reallocation 82011 72A Exmouth Junction 71A Eastleigh  
24/09/1962 Reallocation 82013 72A Exmouth Junction 71A Eastleigh  
24/09/1962 Reallocation 82017 72A Exmouth Junction 71A Eastleigh  
24/09/1962 Reallocation 82018 72A Exmouth Junction 71A Eastleigh  
24/09/1962 Reallocation 82019 72A Exmouth Junction 71A Eastleigh  
24/09/1962 Reallocation 82022 72A Exmouth Junction 71A Eastleigh  
24/09/1962 Reallocation 82023 72A Exmouth Junction 71A Eastleigh  
24/09/1962 Reallocation 82024 72A Exmouth Junction 71A Eastleigh  
24/09/1962 Reallocation 82025 72A Exmouth Junction 71A Eastleigh  
06/10/1962 Reallocation 82002 89A Shrewsbury 86C Hereford  
03/11/1962 Reallocation 82007 82B St Philips Marsh 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
03/11/1962 Reallocation 82035 82B St Philips Marsh 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
03/11/1962 Reallocation 82036 82B St Philips Marsh 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
03/11/1962 Reallocation 82037 82B St Philips Marsh 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
03/11/1962 Reallocation 82038 82B St Philips Marsh 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
03/11/1962 Reallocation 82039 82B St Philips Marsh 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
03/11/1962 Reallocation 82040 82B St Philips Marsh 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
03/11/1962 Reallocation 82043 82B St Philips Marsh 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
08/12/1962 Reallocation 82026 50E Scarborough 56F Low Moor  
17/12/1962 Reallocation 82012 71A Eastleigh 70A Nine Elms  
17/12/1962 Reallocation 82014 71A Eastleigh 70A Nine Elms  
17/12/1962 Reallocation 82015 71A Eastleigh 70C Guildford  
17/12/1962 Reallocation 82016 71A Eastleigh 70C Guildford  
22/12/1962 Reallocation 82027 50E Scarborough 50F Malton  
01/04/1963 Reallocation 82015 70C Guildford 70A Nine Elms  
01/04/1963 Reallocation 82016 70C Guildford 70A Nine Elms  
06/04/1963 Reallocation 82026 56F Low Moor 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)  
20/04/1963 Reallocation 82027 50F Malton 50A York (North)  
20/04/1963 Reallocation 82028 50F Malton 50A York (North)  
20/04/1963 Reallocation 82029 50F Malton 50A York (North)  
04/05/1963 Reallocation 82001 86C Hereford 72A Exmouth Junction  
04/05/1963 Reallocation 82002 86C Hereford 72A Exmouth Junction  
14/09/1963 Reallocation 82026 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 70C Guildford  
14/09/1963 Reallocation 82027 50A York (North) 70C Guildford  
14/09/1963 Reallocation 82028 50A York (North) 70C Guildford  
14/09/1963 Reallocation 82029 50A York (North) 70C Guildford  
02/11/1963 Reallocation 82040 82E Bristol Barrow Road 83D Exmouth Junction  
28/12/1963 Reallocation 82001 72A Exmouth Junction 83B Taunton  
28/12/1963 Reallocation 82035 82E Bristol Barrow Road 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 82026 70C Guildford 70F Bournemouth  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 82027 70C Guildford 70F Bournemouth  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 82028 70C Guildford 70F Bournemouth  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 82029 70C Guildford 70F Bournemouth  
07/02/1964 Condemned 82002 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
07/02/1964 Condemned 82008 83B Taunton   COND  
07/02/1964 Condemned 82043 82E Bristol Barrow Road   COND  
13/04/1964 Reallocation 82035 82E Bristol Barrow Road 83D Exmouth Junction  
13/04/1964 Reallocation 82039 82E Bristol Barrow Road 83D Exmouth Junction  
31/05/1964 Condemned 82012 70A Nine Elms   COND  
31/05/1964 Condemned 82014 70A Nine Elms   COND  
14/06/1964 Condemned 82013 71A Eastleigh   COND  
20/06/1964 Reallocation 82021 89C Machynlleth 6H Bangor  
20/06/1964 Reallocation 82031 89C Machynlleth 6H Bangor  
20/06/1964 Reallocation 82033 89C Machynlleth 6H Bangor  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 82001 83B Taunton 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 82030 83B Taunton 83D Exmouth Junction  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 82042 83B Taunton 83D Exmouth Junction  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 82044 83B Taunton 83D Exmouth Junction  
25/06/1964 Condemned 82007 82E Bristol Barrow Road   COND  
27/06/1964 Reallocation 82021 6H Bangor 6F Machynlleth  
27/06/1964 Reallocation 82032 89A Shrewsbury 6H Bangor  
09/08/1964 Condemned 82025 71A Eastleigh   COND  
30/08/1964 Condemned 82011 71A Eastleigh   COND  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 82026 70F Bournemouth 70A Nine Elms  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 82027 70F Bournemouth 70A Nine Elms  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 82028 70F Bournemouth 70A Nine Elms  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 82029 70F Bournemouth 70A Nine Elms  
12/10/1964 Reallocation 82035 83D Exmouth Junction 83E Yeovil Town  
06/12/1964 Condemned 82015 70A Nine Elms   COND  
03/04/1965 Reallocation 82000 89C Machynlleth 9H Patricroft  
03/04/1965 Reallocation 82003 89C Machynlleth 9H Patricroft  
03/04/1965 Reallocation 82009 89C Machynlleth 9H Patricroft  
03/04/1965 Reallocation 82031 6H Bangor 9H Patricroft  
03/04/1965 Reallocation 82034 89C Machynlleth 9H Patricroft  
24/04/1965 Condemned 82010 71A Eastleigh   COND  
25/04/1965 Condemned 82016 70A Nine Elms   COND  
25/04/1965 Condemned 82017 71A Eastleigh   COND  
01/05/1965 Reallocation 82005 89C Machynlleth 70A Nine Elms  
01/05/1965 Reallocation 82006 89C Machynlleth 70A Nine Elms  
01/05/1965 Reallocation 82020 89C Machynlleth 70A Nine Elms  
01/05/1965 Reallocation 82021 6F Machynlleth 70A Nine Elms  
01/05/1965 Condemned 82032 6H Bangor   COND  
01/05/1965 Reallocation 82033 6H Bangor 70A Nine Elms  
13/06/1965 Reallocation 82030 83D Exmouth Junction 85B Gloucester Horton Road  
13/06/1965 Reallocation 82039 83D Exmouth Junction 85B Gloucester Horton Road  
13/06/1965 Reallocation 82040 83D Exmouth Junction 85B Gloucester Horton Road  
13/06/1965 Reallocation 82042 83D Exmouth Junction 85B Gloucester Horton Road  
13/06/1965 Reallocation 82044 83D Exmouth Junction 85B Gloucester Horton Road  
02/07/1965 Condemned 82039 85B Gloucester Horton Road   COND  
02/07/1965 Condemned 82040 85B Gloucester Horton Road   COND  
21/07/1965 Condemned 82036 82E Bristol Barrow Road   COND  
06/08/1965 Condemned 82035 83E Yeovil Town   COND  
06/08/1965 Condemned 82038 82E Bristol Barrow Road   COND  
06/08/1965 Condemned 82042 85B Gloucester Horton Road   COND  
25/08/1965 Condemned 82037 82E Bristol Barrow Road   COND  
19/09/1965 Condemned 82005 70A Nine Elms   COND  
19/09/1965 Condemned 82020 70A Nine Elms   COND  
19/09/1965 Condemned 82033 70A Nine Elms   COND  
20/09/1965 Reallocation 82044 98W   82F Bath Green Park (S&D)  
01/10/1965 Condemned 82004 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)   COND  
17/10/1965 Condemned 82021 70A Nine Elms   COND  
17/10/1965 Condemned 82022 71A Eastleigh   COND  
18/11/1965 Condemned 82044 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)   COND  
22/11/1965 Reallocation 82030 98W   82F Bath Green Park (S&D)  
31/12/1965 Condemned 82001 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 82030 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)   COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 82041 98W     COND  
09/01/1966 Condemned 82027 70A Nine Elms   COND  
30/01/1966 Condemned 82024 71A Eastleigh   COND  
26/06/1966 Condemned 82026 70A Nine Elms   COND  
10/07/1966 Condemned 82018 71A Eastleigh   COND  
04/09/1966 Condemned 82028 70A Nine Elms   COND  
18/09/1966 Condemned 82006 70A Nine Elms   COND  
02/10/1966 Condemned 82023 71A Eastleigh   COND  
05/11/1966 Condemned 82009 9H Patricroft   COND  
10/12/1966 Condemned 82000 9H Patricroft   COND  
10/12/1966 Condemned 82003 9H Patricroft   COND  
10/12/1966 Condemned 82031 9H Patricroft   COND  
10/12/1966 Condemned 82034 9H Patricroft   COND  
09/07/1967 Condemned 82019 71A Eastleigh   COND  
09/07/1967 Condemned 82029 70A Nine Elms   COND