Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 111 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3624 Week
» 23917 Month
» 201821 Year
» 1867197 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BR Standard Riddles "Std 4MT Tank" Class 2-6-4T


Class BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
BR4/3 80000 26/09/1952 67C
67A
67B
67A
67A
W
Ayr
Corkerhill
Hurlford
Corkerhill
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
26/09/1952
01/11/1952
21/10/1961
27/01/1962
27/06/1964
31/12/1966
31/12/1966
BR4/3 80001 14/10/1952 66A
68D
66A
W
Polmadie
Beattock
Polmadie
Withdrawn
14/10/1952
16/06/1962
30/05/1964
17/07/1966
17/07/1966
BR4/3 80002 17/10/1952 66B
66A
68D
66A
W
Motherwell
Polmadie
Beattock
Polmadie
Withdrawn
17/10/1952
29/11/1952
16/06/1962
30/05/1964
01/03/1967
01/03/1967
BR4/3 80003 24/10/1952 66B
66A
64A
W
Motherwell
Polmadie
St Margarets
Withdrawn
24/10/1952
29/11/1952
14/07/1962
06/03/1965
06/03/1965
BR4/3 80004 04/11/1952 61A
68D
65A
65D
67A
W
Kittybrewster
Beattock
Eastfield
Dawsholm
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
04/11/1952
01/07/1961
19/01/1963
26/09/1964
31/10/1964
01/05/1967
01/05/1967
BR4/3 80005 13/11/1952 61A
67A
67C
66F
66A
W
Kittybrewster
Corkerhill
Ayr
Beattock
Polmadie
Withdrawn
13/11/1952
01/08/1959
31/10/1964
27/03/1965
04/12/1965
09/08/1966
09/08/1966
BR4/3 80006 24/11/1952 66A
68D
66A
64A
W
Polmadie
Beattock
Polmadie
St Margarets
Withdrawn
24/11/1952
01/07/1961
26/08/1961
16/06/1962
02/09/1966
02/09/1966
BR4/3 80007 08/12/1952 66A
64A
66A
W
Polmadie
St Margarets
Polmadie
Withdrawn
08/12/1952
16/06/1962
04/12/1965
17/07/1966
17/07/1966
BR4/3 80008 15/12/1952 67A
W
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
15/12/1952
13/07/1964
13/07/1964
BR4/3 80009 30/12/1952 67A
W
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
30/12/1952
24/09/1964
24/09/1964
BR4/3 80010 10/07/1951 75F
75A
75E
75F
75A
W
Tunbridge Wells West
Brighton
Three Bridges
Tunbridge Wells West
Brighton
Withdrawn
10/07/1951
17/11/1956
11/03/1959
30/01/1963
16/09/1963
14/06/1964
14/06/1964
BR4/3 80011 21/07/1951 75F
75A
75E
75F
75A
75B
70D
70F
70C
70F
W
Tunbridge Wells West
Brighton
Three Bridges
Tunbridge Wells West
Brighton
Redhill
Eastleigh
Bournemouth
Guildford
Bournemouth
Withdrawn
21/07/1951
17/11/1956
11/03/1959
30/01/1963
16/09/1963
22/06/1964
08/06/1965
25/10/1965
10/01/1966
07/02/1966
09/07/1967
09/07/1967
BR4/3 80012 17/08/1951 75F
75A
75E
75D
70B
70D
70A
W
Tunbridge Wells West
Brighton
Three Bridges
Stewarts Lane
Feltham
Eastleigh
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
17/08/1951
22/03/1958
11/03/1959
30/01/1963
24/06/1963
20/11/1964
25/10/1965
19/03/1967
19/03/1967
BR4/3 80013 28/08/1951 75F
75A
70F
W
Tunbridge Wells West
Brighton
Bournemouth
Withdrawn
28/08/1951
11/03/1959
22/06/1964
19/09/1966
19/09/1966
BR4/3 80014 05/09/1951 75F
75A
70D
W
Tunbridge Wells West
Brighton
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
05/09/1951
16/09/1963
22/06/1964
02/05/1965
02/05/1965
BR4/3 80015 14/09/1951 75F
75A
75F
71A
70A
W
Tunbridge Wells West
Brighton
Tunbridge Wells West
Eastleigh
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
14/09/1951
15/06/1956
17/11/1956
16/09/1963
25/10/1965
09/07/1967
09/07/1967
BR4/3 80016 20/09/1951 75F
75A
75F
75A
70D
W
Tunbridge Wells West
Brighton
Tunbridge Wells West
Brighton
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
20/09/1951
19/03/1952
17/11/1956
16/09/1963
22/06/1964
09/07/1967
09/07/1967
BR4/3 80017 08/10/1951 75F
75A
75G
75F
75A
75F
75A
70D
W
Tunbridge Wells West
Brighton
Eastbourne
Tunbridge Wells West
Brighton
Tunbridge Wells West
Brighton
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
08/10/1951
21/01/1952
19/03/1952
07/10/1952
15/06/1956
17/11/1956
16/09/1963
22/06/1964
13/09/1964
13/09/1964
BR4/3 80018 13/10/1951 75F
75A
75G
75B
75F
75A
75F
75A
70B
70D
W
Tunbridge Wells West
Brighton
Eastbourne
Redhill
Tunbridge Wells West
Brighton
Tunbridge Wells West
Brighton
Feltham
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
13/10/1951
21/01/1952
19/03/1952
07/10/1952
14/02/1953
15/06/1956
17/11/1956
16/09/1963
22/06/1964
20/11/1964
11/04/1965
11/04/1965
BR4/3 80019 20/10/1951 75A
75G
75G
75B
75A
75F
75A
75B
70F
W
Brighton
Eastbourne
Eastbourne
Redhill
Brighton
Tunbridge Wells West
Brighton
Redhill
Bournemouth
Withdrawn
21/01/1952
30/06/1952
13/08/1952
07/10/1952
14/02/1953
17/11/1956
16/09/1963
22/06/1964
08/06/1965
19/03/1967
19/03/1967
BR4/3 80020 27/10/1951 67D
67A
W
Ardrossan
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
01/07/1961
29/07/1961
26/06/1965
26/06/1965
BR4/3 80021 10/11/1951 67D
67A
W
Ardrossan
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
01/07/1961
29/07/1961
13/07/1964
13/07/1964
BR4/3 80022 20/11/1951 61A
64A
W
Kittybrewster
St Margarets
Withdrawn
20/11/1951
16/06/1962
26/06/1965
26/06/1965
BR4/3 80023 27/11/1951 68C
67E
W
Stranraer
Dumfries
Withdrawn
16/06/1962
16/03/1963
02/10/1965
02/10/1965
BR4/3 80024 07/12/1951 67A
W
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
07/12/1951
24/08/1966
24/08/1966
BR4/3 80025 13/12/1951 67A
W
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
13/12/1951
24/08/1966
24/08/1966
BR4/3 80026 20/12/1951 66A
64A
W
Polmadie
St Margarets
Withdrawn
20/12/1951
08/09/1962
02/09/1966
02/09/1966
BR4/3 80027 04/01/1952 61A
65A
66A
W
Kittybrewster
Eastfield
Polmadie
Withdrawn
04/01/1952
19/01/1963
26/12/1964
29/11/1966
29/11/1966
BR4/3 80028 11/01/1952 67D
67B
67F
63A
W
Ardrossan
Hurlford
Stranraer
Perth South
Withdrawn
01/07/1961
14/07/1962
06/07/1963
30/11/1963
26/09/1966
26/09/1966
BR4/3 80029 22/01/1952 67D
67B
W
Ardrossan
Hurlford
Withdrawn
01/07/1961
14/07/1962
16/12/1965
16/12/1965
BR4/3 80030 05/02/1952 67C
67A
67A
67D
67A
W
Ayr
Corkerhill
Corkerhill
Ardrossan
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
05/02/1952
22/03/1952
19/04/1952
25/10/1958
14/02/1959
08/06/1964
08/06/1964
BR4/3 80031 02/02/1952 75A
75B
W
Brighton
Redhill
Withdrawn
02/02/1952
06/01/1964
20/09/1964
20/09/1964
BR4/3 80032 04/03/1952 75A
75B
70F
W
Brighton
Redhill
Bournemouth
Withdrawn
04/03/1952
06/01/1964
08/06/1965
29/01/1967
29/01/1967
BR4/3 80033 18/03/1952 75A
75B
70B
W
Brighton
Redhill
Feltham
Withdrawn
18/03/1952
06/01/1964
08/06/1965
02/10/1966
02/10/1966
BR4/3 80034 05/04/1952 5A
1C
73F
73A
75A
75B
70B
W
Crewe North
Watford
Ashford
Stewarts Lane
Brighton
Redhill
Feltham
Withdrawn
05/04/1952
14/06/1952
31/12/1959
28/05/1962
19/08/1963
06/01/1964
08/06/1965
02/01/1966
02/01/1966
BR4/3 80035 17/05/1952 1C
73F
72A
83E
83D
83E
W
Watford
Ashford
Exmouth Junction
Yeovil Town
Exmouth Junction
Yeovil Town
Withdrawn
17/05/1952
31/12/1959
28/05/1962
12/10/1964
10/01/1965
21/02/1965
21/04/1965
21/04/1965
BR4/3 80036 24/05/1952 1C
73F
72A
W
Watford
Ashford
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
24/05/1952
31/12/1959
28/05/1962
09/11/1964
06/11/1964
BR4/3 80037 24/05/1952 1C
73F
73J
72A
72A
82F
83D
83G
W
Watford
Ashford
Tonbridge
Exmouth Junction
Exmouth Junction
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Exmouth Junction
Templecombe (S&D)
Withdrawn
24/05/1952
31/12/1959
26/05/1961
28/05/1962
02/07/1962
10/01/1965
07/03/1965
13/06/1965
07/03/1966
07/03/1966
BR4/3 80038 07/06/1952 1C
73F
73J
72A
72C
83D
W
Watford
Ashford
Tonbridge
Exmouth Junction
Yeovil Town
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
07/06/1952
31/12/1959
26/05/1961
02/07/1962
27/07/1963
28/09/1963
07/09/1964
07/09/1964
BR4/3 80039 18/06/1952 1E
9A
1E
73F
73J
72A
82F
83D
83E
83G
W
Bletchley
Longsight
Bletchley
Ashford
Tonbridge
Exmouth Junction
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Exmouth Junction
Yeovil Town
Templecombe (S&D)
Withdrawn
18/06/1952
02/01/1954
26/02/1955
31/12/1959
26/05/1961
02/07/1962
10/01/1965
07/03/1965
16/05/1965
11/07/1965
21/01/1966
21/01/1966
BR4/3 80040 27/06/1952 1E
6A
73F
73J
72A
W
Bletchley
Chester (MR)
Ashford
Tonbridge
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
27/06/1952
10/08/1957
31/12/1959
26/05/1961
02/07/1962
06/05/1964
06/05/1964
BR4/3 80041 05/07/1952 1E
73F
73J
72A
83G
W
Bletchley
Ashford
Tonbridge
Exmouth Junction
Templecombe (S&D)
Withdrawn
05/07/1952
31/12/1959
26/05/1961
02/07/1962
13/06/1965
07/03/1966
07/03/1966
BR4/3 80042 15/07/1952 1E
73F
73J
72A
W
Bletchley
Ashford
Tonbridge
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
15/07/1952
31/12/1959
26/05/1961
02/07/1962
06/02/1965
06/02/1965
BR4/3 80043 24/07/1952 1E
73H
73F
73F
73J
72A
83G
W
Bletchley
Dover Marine
Ashford
Ashford
Tonbridge
Exmouth Junction
Templecombe (S&D)
Withdrawn
24/07/1952
31/12/1959
09/02/1960
05/04/1960
26/05/1961
02/07/1962
12/10/1964
07/03/1966
07/03/1966
BR4/3 80044 21/08/1952 17A
15D
15D
26D
26A
67A
W
Derby
Bedford
Bedford
Bury
Newton Heath
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
21/08/1952
27/12/1952
03/01/1953
29/01/1955
25/02/1956
09/04/1960
14/11/1964
14/11/1964
BR4/3 80045 04/09/1952 15D
14B
6A
67A
66F
66A
W
Bedford
Kentish Town
Chester (MR)
Corkerhill
Beattock
Polmadie
Withdrawn
04/09/1952
29/01/1955
06/10/1956
07/05/1960
27/03/1965
04/12/1965
01/05/1967
01/05/1967
BR4/3 80046 17/09/1952 15D
26D
26A
24E
67A
W
Bedford
Bury
Newton Heath
Blackpool Central
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
17/09/1952
29/01/1955
25/02/1956
30/11/1957
07/05/1960
01/05/1967
01/05/1967
BR4/3 80047 30/09/1952 15D
14B
6A
67A
W
Bedford
Kentish Town
Chester (MR)
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
30/09/1952
24/01/1953
06/10/1956
12/03/1960
24/08/1966
24/08/1966
BR4/3 80048 13/10/1952 14B
6A
6D
W
Kentish Town
Chester (MR)
Shrewsbury
Withdrawn
13/10/1952
06/10/1956
19/09/1964
17/07/1965
17/07/1965
BR4/3 80049 24/10/1952 26A
26A
6A
67A
W
Newton Heath
Newton Heath
Chester (MR)
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
24/10/1952
29/11/1952
06/10/1956
07/05/1960
08/06/1964
08/06/1964
BR4/3 80050 06/11/1952 26A
6A
67A
W
Newton Heath
Chester (MR)
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
06/11/1952
06/10/1956
07/05/1960
21/11/1964
21/11/1964
BR4/3 80051 21/11/1952 26A
6A
67A
W
Newton Heath
Chester (MR)
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
21/11/1952
06/10/1956
07/05/1960
17/08/1966
17/08/1966
BR4/3 80052 05/12/1952 26A
6A
67A
W
Newton Heath
Chester (MR)
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
05/12/1952
06/10/1956
09/04/1960
07/07/1964
07/07/1964
BR4/3 80053 22/12/1952 26A
6A
67A
W
Newton Heath
Chester (MR)
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
22/12/1952
06/10/1956
07/05/1960
07/07/1964
07/07/1964
BR4/3 80054 04/12/1954 66A
64A
66D
W
Polmadie
St Margarets
Greenock Ladyburn
Withdrawn
25/12/1954
08/09/1962
04/12/1965
29/06/1966
29/06/1966
BR4/3 80055 23/12/1954 66A
64A
W
Polmadie
St Margarets
Withdrawn
23/12/1954
08/09/1962
02/09/1966
02/09/1966
BR4/3 80056 30/12/1954 66A
65A
W
Polmadie
Eastfield
Withdrawn
30/12/1954
19/01/1963
10/10/1964
10/10/1964
BR4/3 80057 31/12/1954 66A
65A
66A
W
Polmadie
Eastfield
Polmadie
Withdrawn
31/12/1954
19/01/1963
27/02/1965
31/12/1966
31/12/1966
BR4/3 80058 08/01/1955 66A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
08/01/1955
17/07/1966
17/07/1966
BR4/3 80059 03/03/1953 14B
6A
6H
14D
73H
73F
73F
73J
72A
83G
82E
82F
W
Kentish Town
Chester (MR)
Bangor
Neasden
Dover Marine
Ashford
Ashford
Tonbridge
Exmouth Junction
Templecombe (S&D)
Bristol Barrow Road
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Withdrawn
03/03/1953
06/10/1956
17/05/1958
04/10/1958
31/12/1959
09/02/1960
05/04/1960
26/05/1961
02/07/1962
12/10/1964
13/06/1965
11/07/1965
18/11/1965
18/11/1965
BR4/3 80060 19/03/1953 15D
26D
26A
63B
64A
66D
66A
W
Bedford
Bury
Newton Heath
Stirling
St Margarets
Greenock Ladyburn
Polmadie
Withdrawn
19/03/1953
29/01/1955
25/02/1956
12/03/1960
22/08/1964
22/08/1964
25/12/1965
07/02/1966
07/02/1966
BR4/3 80061 08/04/1953 15D
26D
26A
65J
67E
66A
W
Bedford
Bury
Newton Heath
Fort William
Dumfries
Polmadie
Withdrawn
08/04/1953
29/01/1955
25/02/1956
09/04/1960
22/08/1964
31/07/1965
31/12/1966
31/12/1966
BR4/3 80062 29/04/1953 14B
6A
6C
63B
66D
65J
W
Kentish Town
Chester (MR)
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Stirling
Greenock Ladyburn
Stirling
Withdrawn
29/04/1953
06/10/1956
22/02/1958
12/03/1960
22/08/1964
22/08/1964
12/10/1964
12/10/1964
BR4/3 80063 19/05/1953 21A
14B
6A
6C
63B
67A
W
Saltley
Kentish Town
Chester (MR)
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Stirling
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
19/05/1953
06/11/1954
06/10/1956
23/02/1957
12/03/1960
22/08/1964
24/08/1966
24/08/1966
BR4/3 80064 09/06/1953 1C
73H
73F
73F
73J
72A
82E
W
Watford
Dover Marine
Ashford
Ashford
Tonbridge
Exmouth Junction
Bristol Barrow Road
Withdrawn
09/06/1953
31/12/1959
09/02/1960
05/04/1960
26/05/1961
02/07/1962
13/06/1965
25/08/1965
25/08/1965
BR4/3 80065 25/06/1953 1C
73H
73F
73F
73J
71A
W
Watford
Dover Marine
Ashford
Ashford
Tonbridge
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
25/06/1953
31/12/1959
09/02/1960
05/04/1960
26/05/1961
02/07/1962
04/09/1966
04/09/1966
BR4/3 80066 15/07/1953 1C
73A
73F
73F
73J
71A
W
Watford
Stewarts Lane
Ashford
Ashford
Tonbridge
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
15/07/1953
31/12/1959
09/02/1960
05/04/1960
26/05/1961
02/07/1962
13/06/1965
13/06/1965
BR4/3 80067 04/08/1953 1C
73A
83G
W
Watford
Stewarts Lane
Templecombe (S&D)
Withdrawn
04/08/1953
31/12/1959
12/10/1964
03/06/1965
03/06/1965
BR4/3 80068 21/08/1953 1C
73A
75A
75B
70B
W
Watford
Stewarts Lane
Brighton
Redhill
Feltham
Withdrawn
21/08/1953
31/12/1959
16/09/1963
06/01/1964
08/06/1965
02/10/1966
02/10/1966
BR4/3 80069 30/09/1953 33A
33B
87D
70A
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Swansea East Dock
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
30/09/1953
23/01/1954
15/07/1962
09/08/1964
23/01/1966
23/01/1966
BR4/3 80070 09/10/1953 33A
33B
81A
89A
89B
89A
70D
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Old Oak Common
Shrewsbury
Croes Newydd
Shrewsbury
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
09/10/1953
23/01/1954
15/07/1962
15/12/1962
23/02/1963
09/03/1963
01/05/1965
20/06/1965
20/06/1965
BR4/3 80071 21/10/1953 33A
33B
30A
31B
56B
66E
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Stratford
March
Ardsley
Carstairs
Withdrawn
21/10/1953
23/01/1954
21/07/1962
15/09/1962
08/12/1962
02/11/1963
30/07/1964
30/07/1964
BR4/3 80072 03/11/1953 33A
33B
87D
2L
6D
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Swansea East Dock
Leamington
Shrewsbury
Withdrawn
03/11/1953
23/01/1954
15/07/1962
08/09/1963
19/06/1965
24/07/1965
24/07/1965
BR4/3 80073 13/11/1953 33A
33B
30A
31B
56B
66E
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Stratford
March
Ardsley
Carstairs
Withdrawn
13/11/1953
23/01/1954
21/07/1962
15/09/1962
08/12/1962
02/11/1963
30/07/1964
30/07/1964
BR4/3 80074 27/11/1953 33A
33B
30A
31B
56B
66E
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Stratford
March
Ardsley
Carstairs
Withdrawn
27/11/1953
15/12/1956
21/07/1962
15/09/1962
08/12/1962
02/11/1963
30/07/1964
30/07/1964
BR4/3 80075 10/12/1953 33A
33B
30A
31B
56B
66E
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Stratford
March
Ardsley
Carstairs
Withdrawn
10/12/1953
15/12/1956
21/07/1962
15/09/1962
08/12/1962
30/11/1963
30/07/1964
30/07/1964
BR4/3 80076 23/12/1953 33A
33B
30A
31B
56B
67E
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Stratford
March
Ardsley
Dumfries
Withdrawn
23/12/1953
15/12/1956
21/07/1962
15/09/1962
08/12/1962
02/11/1963
30/07/1964
30/07/1964
BR4/3 80077 12/01/1954 33A
33B
30A
31B
56B
67D
67A
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Stratford
March
Ardsley
Ardrossan
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
12/01/1954
15/12/1956
21/07/1962
15/09/1962
08/12/1962
02/11/1963
25/07/1964
12/10/1964
12/10/1964
BR4/3 80078 02/02/1954 33A
33B
30A
89A
89B
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Stratford
Shrewsbury
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
02/02/1954
15/12/1956
23/06/1962
15/07/1962
23/02/1963
24/07/1965
24/07/1965
BR4/3 80079 05/03/1954 33A
33B
30A
89B
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Stratford
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
05/03/1954
24/04/1954
23/06/1962
15/07/1962
24/07/1965
24/07/1965
BR4/3 80080 18/03/1954 33A
33B
89B
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
18/03/1954
22/05/1954
15/07/1962
24/07/1965
24/07/1965
BR4/3 80081 31/03/1954 1E
1A
73A
71G
71B
W
Bletchley
Willesden
Stewarts Lane
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Bournemouth
Withdrawn
31/03/1954
07/11/1959
31/12/1959
22/07/1963
19/08/1963
08/06/1965
08/06/1965
BR4/3 80082 15/04/1954 1E
73B
71A
W
Bletchley
Bricklayers Arms
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
15/04/1954
31/12/1959
02/07/1962
04/09/1966
04/09/1966
BR4/3 80083 03/05/1954 1E
2A
1E
14D
73B
71A
W
Bletchley
Rugby
Bletchley
Neasden
Bricklayers Arms
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
03/05/1954
29/01/1955
26/02/1955
04/10/1958
31/12/1959
02/07/1962
07/08/1966
07/08/1966
BR4/3 80084 14/05/1954 1E
1A
73B
75D
75A
75B
W
Bletchley
Willesden
Bricklayers Arms
Stewarts Lane
Brighton
Redhill
Withdrawn
14/05/1954
07/11/1959
31/12/1959
02/07/1962
16/09/1963
06/01/1964
13/06/1965
13/06/1965
BR4/3 80085 28/05/1954 1E
2A
1E
73B
73F
73J
75D
75A
75B
70B
70A
W
Bletchley
Rugby
Bletchley
Bricklayers Arms
Ashford
Tonbridge
Stewarts Lane
Brighton
Redhill
Feltham
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
28/05/1954
29/01/1955
26/02/1955
31/12/1959
10/02/1961
26/05/1961
02/07/1962
16/09/1963
06/01/1964
08/06/1965
17/10/1966
09/07/1967
09/07/1967
BR4/3 80086 14/06/1954 26D
25A
6A
6C
6A
64C
66E
66A
W
Bury
Wakefield
Chester (MR)
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Chester (MR)
Dalry Road
Carstairs
Polmadie
Withdrawn
14/06/1954
11/08/1956
06/10/1956
23/02/1957
22/02/1958
07/05/1960
22/10/1960
19/11/1960
01/05/1967
01/05/1967
BR4/3 80087 29/06/1954 26D
6H
75E
73F
75E
71A
70C
70D
W
Bury
Bangor
Three Bridges
Ashford
Three Bridges
Eastleigh
Guildford
Basingstoke
Withdrawn
29/06/1954
06/10/1956
31/12/1959
31/01/1960
26/05/1961
17/12/1962
01/04/1963
16/09/1963
14/06/1964
14/06/1964
BR4/3 80088 14/07/1954 26D
6H
75E
75F
75A
75B
W
Bury
Bangor
Three Bridges
Tunbridge Wells West
Brighton
Redhill
Withdrawn
14/07/1954
06/10/1956
31/12/1959
30/01/1963
16/09/1963
06/01/1964
13/06/1965
13/06/1965
BR4/3 80089 03/08/1954 26D
6H
75E
75D
75A
75B
70B
70A
W
Bury
Bangor
Three Bridges
Stewarts Lane
Brighton
Redhill
Feltham
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
03/08/1954
06/10/1956
31/12/1959
30/01/1963
16/09/1963
06/01/1964
08/06/1965
20/12/1965
02/10/1966
02/10/1966
BR4/3 80090 12/08/1954 26D
6H
6C
62B
W
Bury
Bangor
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
12/08/1954
06/10/1956
13/12/1958
13/02/1960
27/03/1965
27/03/1965
BR4/3 80091 10/09/1954 14B
6H
6A
62B
65B
67B
66F
W
Kentish Town
Bangor
Chester (MR)
Dundee Tay Bridge
St Rollox (Balornock)
Hurlford
Beattock
Withdrawn
10/09/1954
06/10/1956
30/11/1957
07/05/1960
24/09/1960
19/05/1962
30/04/1966
29/11/1966
29/11/1966
BR4/3 80092 24/09/1954 14B
6H
1A
6H
6A
63A
W
Kentish Town
Bangor
Willesden
Bangor
Chester (MR)
Perth South
Withdrawn
24/09/1954
06/10/1956
29/12/1956
26/01/1957
30/11/1957
09/04/1960
26/09/1966
26/09/1966
BR4/3 80093 11/10/1954 15D
26D
26A
24E
63A
W
Bedford
Bury
Newton Heath
Blackpool Central
Perth South
Withdrawn
11/10/1954
29/01/1955
25/02/1956
30/11/1957
09/04/1960
26/09/1966
26/09/1966
BR4/3 80094 25/10/1954 14B
6H
6C
75E
75D
75A
75B
70B
W
Kentish Town
Bangor
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Three Bridges
Stewarts Lane
Brighton
Redhill
Feltham
Withdrawn
25/10/1954
06/10/1956
17/10/1959
31/12/1959
30/01/1963
16/09/1963
06/01/1964
08/06/1965
31/07/1966
31/07/1966
BR4/3 80095 13/11/1954 14C
6H
6C
75F
71A
70C
70B
70A
W
St Albans
Bangor
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Tunbridge Wells West
Eastleigh
Guildford
Feltham
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
13/11/1954
06/10/1956
17/10/1959
31/12/1959
17/12/1962
01/04/1963
16/09/1963
20/11/1964
02/10/1966
02/10/1966
BR4/3 80096 23/11/1954 33A
33B
89A
89B
89C
6C
70F
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Shrewsbury
Croes Newydd
Machynlleth
Croes Newydd
Bournemouth
Withdrawn
23/11/1954
07/11/1959
15/07/1962
17/11/1962
09/03/1963
14/09/1963
01/05/1965
26/12/1965
26/12/1965
BR4/3 80097 09/12/1954 33A
33B
30A
87D
89D
6F
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Stratford
Swansea East Dock
Oswestry
Machynlleth
Withdrawn
09/12/1954
07/11/1959
23/06/1962
15/07/1962
14/07/1963
27/06/1964
24/07/1965
24/07/1965
BR4/3 80098 22/12/1954 33A
33B
81A
89A
89B
89C
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Old Oak Common
Shrewsbury
Croes Newydd
Machynlleth
Withdrawn
22/12/1954
07/11/1959
15/07/1962
08/09/1962
17/11/1962
09/03/1963
24/07/1965
24/07/1965
BR4/3 80099 17/01/1955 33A
33B
30A
87D
89C
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Stratford
Swansea East Dock
Machynlleth
Withdrawn
17/01/1955
07/11/1959
23/06/1962
15/07/1962
14/07/1963
08/05/1965
08/05/1965
BR4/3 80100 31/01/1955 33A
33B
30A
89A
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Stratford
Shrewsbury
Withdrawn
31/01/1955
07/11/1959
23/06/1962
15/07/1962
24/07/1965
24/07/1965
BR4/3 80101 07/02/1955 33A
33B
30A
89A
89C
89B
89C
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Stratford
Shrewsbury
Machynlleth
Croes Newydd
Machynlleth
Withdrawn
07/02/1955
07/11/1959
23/06/1962
15/07/1962
08/09/1962
23/02/1963
09/03/1963
17/07/1965
17/07/1965
BR4/3 80102 01/03/1955 33A
33B
81A
89A
6H
6D
70D
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Old Oak Common
Shrewsbury
Bangor
Shrewsbury
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/03/1955
07/11/1959
15/07/1962
15/12/1962
27/06/1964
19/09/1964
01/05/1965
05/12/1965
05/12/1965
BR4/3 80103 16/03/1955 33A
33B
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Withdrawn
16/03/1955
07/11/1959
29/08/1962
29/08/1962
BR4/3 80104 31/03/1955 33A
33B
81A
89B
89C
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Old Oak Common
Croes Newydd
Machynlleth
Withdrawn
31/03/1955
07/11/1959
15/07/1962
15/12/1962
09/03/1963
24/07/1965
24/07/1965
BR4/3 80105 19/04/1955 33A
33B
89C
89A
89C
89B
89C
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Machynlleth
Shrewsbury
Machynlleth
Croes Newydd
Machynlleth
Withdrawn
19/04/1955
07/11/1959
15/07/1962
08/09/1962
06/10/1962
23/02/1963
09/03/1963
24/07/1965
24/07/1965
BR4/3 80106 22/10/1954 61A
66A
W
Kittybrewster
Polmadie
Withdrawn
22/10/1954
11/05/1957
12/10/1964
12/10/1964
BR4/3 80107 29/10/1954 61A
66A
W
Kittybrewster
Polmadie
Withdrawn
29/10/1954
11/05/1957
14/09/1964
14/09/1964
BR4/3 80108 05/11/1954 61A
66A
W
Kittybrewster
Polmadie
Withdrawn
05/11/1954
11/05/1957
08/05/1965
08/05/1965
BR4/3 80109 18/11/1954 61A
66A
66C
66A
W
Kittybrewster
Polmadie
Hamilton (West)
Polmadie
Withdrawn
18/11/1954
11/05/1957
11/04/1959
26/09/1959
13/11/1965
13/11/1965
BR4/3 80110 18/11/1954 61A
66A
66E
66A
W
Kittybrewster
Polmadie
Carstairs
Polmadie
Withdrawn
18/11/1954
06/07/1957
05/10/1963
30/05/1964
08/05/1965
08/05/1965
BR4/3 80111 26/11/1954 66A
61A
67A
67B
66F
W
Polmadie
Kittybrewster
Corkerhill
Hurlford
Beattock
Withdrawn
26/11/1954
11/05/1957
01/07/1961
01/07/1961
30/04/1966
29/11/1966
29/11/1966
BR4/3 80112 03/12/1954 66A
61A
67A
67B
67A
W
Polmadie
Kittybrewster
Corkerhill
Hurlford
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
03/12/1954
11/05/1957
01/07/1961
01/07/1961
25/07/1964
24/08/1966
24/08/1966
BR4/3 80113 14/12/1954 66A
61A
61C
64G
64A
W
Polmadie
Kittybrewster
Keith
Hawick
St Margarets
Withdrawn
14/12/1954
06/07/1957
02/07/1960
01/07/1961
29/01/1966
02/09/1966
02/09/1966
BR4/3 80114 29/12/1954 66A
61A
61C
64G
64A
W
Polmadie
Kittybrewster
Keith
Hawick
St Margarets
Withdrawn
29/12/1954
11/05/1957
22/10/1960
01/07/1961
24/03/1962
31/12/1966
31/12/1966
BR4/3 80115 31/12/1954 66A
61A
61C
61B
66A
67D
66A
W
Polmadie
Kittybrewster
Keith
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Polmadie
Ardrossan
Polmadie
Withdrawn
31/12/1954
11/05/1957
22/10/1960
01/07/1961
26/08/1961
25/01/1964
25/07/1964
12/10/1964
12/10/1964
BR4/3 80116 04/05/1955 50A
50G
50E
50G
50B
55A
67E
66E
66A
W
York (North)
Whitby
Scarborough
Whitby
Neville Hill
Holbeck (MR)
Dumfries
Carstairs
Polmadie
Withdrawn
04/05/1955
18/06/1955
18/02/1956
25/05/1956
14/06/1958
22/06/1963
02/11/1963
30/11/1963
30/05/1964
01/05/1967
01/05/1967
BR4/3 80117 19/05/1954 50G
50B
67E
66F
66A
W
Whitby
Neville Hill
Dumfries
Beattock
Polmadie
Withdrawn
19/05/1954
14/06/1958
02/11/1963
04/12/1965
04/12/1965
03/03/1966
03/03/1966
BR4/3 80118 15/06/1955 50G
50B
66E
66A
W
Whitby
Neville Hill
Carstairs
Polmadie
Withdrawn
15/06/1955
14/06/1958
02/11/1963
30/05/1964
29/11/1966
29/11/1966
BR4/3 80119 21/06/1955 50G
50E
50G
50B
66E
67E
W
Whitby
Scarborough
Whitby
Neville Hill
Carstairs
Dumfries
Withdrawn
21/06/1955
18/02/1956
25/05/1956
14/06/1958
02/11/1963
30/11/1963
29/05/1965
29/05/1965
BR4/3 80120 06/07/1955 50G
50B
66E
66A
W
Whitby
Neville Hill
Carstairs
Polmadie
Withdrawn
06/07/1955
14/06/1958
02/11/1963
30/05/1964
01/05/1967
01/05/1967
BR4/3 80121 22/07/1955 61A
61C
61B
66A
W
Kittybrewster
Keith
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Polmadie
Withdrawn
22/07/1955
26/11/1955
01/07/1961
29/07/1961
02/06/1966
02/06/1966
BR4/3 80122 08/08/1955 61A
61C
64C
64A
66D
W
Kittybrewster
Keith
Dalry Road
St Margarets
Greenock Ladyburn
Withdrawn
08/08/1955
26/11/1955
01/07/1961
16/06/1962
04/12/1965
31/12/1966
31/12/1966
BR4/3 80123 09/09/1955 62B
66A
W
Dundee Tay Bridge
Polmadie
Withdrawn
09/09/1955
24/04/1965
17/08/1966
17/08/1966
BR4/3 80124 22/09/1955 62B
64A
W
Dundee Tay Bridge
St Margarets
Withdrawn
22/09/1955
29/01/1966
09/12/1966
09/12/1966
BR4/3 80125 06/10/1955 63B

10D
W
Stirling

Lostock Hall (Re-instd)
Withdrawn
06/10/1955
07/07/1964
09/1964
10/10/1964
10/10/1964
BR4/3 80126 20/10/1955 63A
W
Perth South
Withdrawn
20/10/1955
19/11/1966
19/11/1966
BR4/3 80127 07/11/1955 67A
W
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
07/11/1955
30/07/1964
30/07/1964
BR4/3 80128 23/11/1955 67A
67B
67A
W
Corkerhill
Hurlford
Corkerhill
Withdrawn
23/11/1955
21/10/1961
27/01/1962
04/04/1967
04/04/1967
BR4/3 80129 09/12/1955 66A

10D
W
Polmadie

Lostock Hall (Re-instd)
Withdrawn
09/12/1955
07/07/1964
08/1964
10/10/1964
10/10/1964
BR4/3 80130 22/12/1955 66A
W
Polmadie
Withdrawn
22/12/1955
17/08/1966
17/08/1966
BR4/3 80131 02/03/1956 33A
33B
81A
89A
89D
6H
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Old Oak Common
Shrewsbury
Oswestry
Bangor
Withdrawn
02/03/1956
07/11/1959
15/07/1962
08/09/1962
09/02/1963
23/01/1965
08/05/1965
08/05/1965
BR4/3 80132 15/03/1956 33A
33B
81A
89A
89D
6H
70D
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Old Oak Common
Shrewsbury
Oswestry
Bangor
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
15/03/1956
07/11/1959
15/07/1962
15/12/1962
09/02/1963
23/01/1965
01/05/1965
09/01/1966
09/01/1966
BR4/3 80133 28/03/1956 33A
33C
87D
87A
87E
70B
70A
W
Plaistow
Shoeburyness
Swansea East Dock
Neath (Court Sart)
Landore
Feltham
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
28/03/1956
07/11/1959
15/07/1962
06/04/1963
22/06/1964
09/08/1964
20/11/1964
09/07/1967
09/07/1967
BR4/3 80134 20/04/1956 33A
33B
87D
87F
70B
70F
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Swansea East Dock
Llanelly
Feltham
Bournemouth
Withdrawn
20/04/1956
07/11/1959
15/07/1962
13/04/1964
09/08/1964
14/09/1964
09/07/1967
09/07/1967
BR4/3 80135 30/04/1956 33A
33B
89A
89D
6D
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Shrewsbury
Oswestry
Shrewsbury
Withdrawn
30/04/1956
07/11/1959
15/07/1962
09/02/1963
19/09/1964
24/07/1965
24/07/1965
BR4/3 80136 11/05/1956 33A
33B
89A
89D
6F
6D
W
Plaistow
Tilbury
Shrewsbury
Oswestry
Machynlleth
Shrewsbury
Withdrawn
11/05/1956
07/11/1959
15/07/1962
09/02/1963
27/06/1964
19/09/1964
24/07/1965
24/07/1965
BR4/3 80137 28/05/1956 34E
75F
71A
70C
70B
70A
W
Neasden
Tunbridge Wells West
Eastleigh
Guildford
Feltham
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
28/05/1956
31/12/1959
17/12/1962
01/04/1963
16/09/1963
20/11/1964
31/10/1965
31/10/1965
BR4/3 80138 12/06/1956 34E
75F
75A
75B
70F
W
Neasden
Tunbridge Wells West
Brighton
Redhill
Bournemouth
Withdrawn
12/06/1956
31/12/1959
18/03/1961
06/01/1964
15/03/1965
02/10/1966
02/10/1966
BR4/3 80139 26/06/1956 34E
75F
75A
75B
70D
W
Neasden
Tunbridge Wells West
Brighton
Redhill
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
26/06/1956
31/12/1959
16/09/1963
06/01/1964
15/03/1965
09/07/1967
09/07/1967
BR4/3 80140 10/07/1956 34E
75F
75A
75B
70B
70A
W
Neasden
Tunbridge Wells West
Brighton
Redhill
Feltham
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
10/07/1956
31/12/1959
16/09/1963
06/01/1964
08/06/1965
17/10/1966
09/07/1967
09/07/1967
BR4/3 80141 25/07/1956 34E
75F
75A
75B
70B
70A
W
Neasden
Tunbridge Wells West
Brighton
Redhill
Feltham
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
25/07/1956
31/12/1959
16/09/1963
06/01/1964
08/06/1965
20/12/1965
09/01/1966
09/01/1966
BR4/3 80142 09/08/1956 34E
75F
75A
75B
70E
70D
W
Neasden
Tunbridge Wells West
Brighton
Redhill
Salisbury
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
09/08/1956
31/12/1959
16/09/1963
06/01/1964
08/06/1965
07/02/1966
03/03/1966
03/03/1966
BR4/3 80143 10/09/1956 34E
75A
70B
70A
W
Neasden
Brighton
Feltham
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
10/09/1956
31/12/1959
22/07/1963
20/11/1964
09/07/1967
09/07/1967
BR4/3 80144 25/09/1956 34E
75A
75B
70E
70D
70A
W
Neasden
Brighton
Redhill
Salisbury
Eastleigh
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
25/09/1956
31/12/1959
06/01/1964
08/06/1965
20/12/1965
07/02/1966
15/05/1966
15/05/1966
BR4/3 80145 16/10/1956 75A
75B
70E
70A
W
Brighton
Redhill
Salisbury
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
16/10/1956
06/01/1964
08/06/1965
07/02/1966
25/06/1967
25/06/1967
BR4/3 80146 30/10/1956 75A
71A
70F
W
Brighton
Eastleigh
Bournemouth
Withdrawn
30/10/1956
16/09/1963
06/01/1964
09/07/1967
09/07/1967
BR4/3 80147 15/11/1956 75A
71G
71B
W
Brighton
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Bournemouth
Withdrawn
15/11/1956
22/07/1963
19/08/1963
13/06/1965
13/06/1965
BR4/3 80148 29/11/1956 75A
70B
W
Brighton
Feltham
Withdrawn
29/11/1956
24/06/1963
14/06/1964
14/06/1964
BR4/3 80149 13/12/1956 75A
75B
W
Brighton
Redhill
Withdrawn
13/12/1956
06/01/1964
07/03/1965
07/03/1965
BR4/3 80150 28/12/1956 75A
71A
W
Brighton
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
28/12/1956
16/09/1963
17/10/1965
17/10/1965
BR4/3 80151 18/01/1957 75A
75B
70E
70D
W
Brighton
Redhill
Salisbury
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
18/01/1957
06/01/1964
08/06/1965
17/10/1966
07/05/1967
07/05/1967
BR4/3 80152 06/02/1957 75A
75B
70E
70D
W
Brighton
Redhill
Salisbury
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
06/02/1957
06/01/1964
08/06/1965
17/10/1966
09/07/1967
09/07/1967
BR4/3 80153 25/02/1957 75A
75B
W
Brighton
Redhill
Withdrawn
25/02/1957
06/01/1964
07/03/1965
07/03/1965
BR4/3 80154 26/03/1957 75A
70B
70A
W
Brighton
Feltham
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
26/03/1957
22/07/1963
20/11/1964
02/04/1967
02/04/1967