Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 259 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5174 Week
» 16411 Month
» 249331 Year
» 1914707 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BR Standard Riddles "Std 4MT Tank" Class 2-6-4T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
10/07/1951 To Service 80010   NEW 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
21/07/1951 To Service 80011   NEW 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
17/08/1951 To Service 80012   NEW 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
28/08/1951 To Service 80013   NEW 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
05/09/1951 To Service 80014   NEW 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
14/09/1951 To Service 80015   NEW 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
20/09/1951 To Service 80016   NEW 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
08/10/1951 To Service 80017   NEW 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
13/10/1951 To Service 80018   NEW 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
20/11/1951 To Service 80022   NEW 61A Kittybrewster  
07/12/1951 To Service 80024   NEW 67A Corkerhill  
13/12/1951 To Service 80025   NEW 67A Corkerhill  
20/12/1951 To Service 80026   NEW 66A Polmadie  
04/01/1952 To Service 80027   NEW 61A Kittybrewster  
21/01/1952 Reallocation 80017 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75A Brighton  
21/01/1952 Reallocation 80018 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75A Brighton  
21/01/1952 Reallocation 80019     75A Brighton  
02/02/1952 To Service 80031   NEW 75A Brighton  
05/02/1952 To Service 80030   NEW 67C Ayr  
04/03/1952 To Service 80032   NEW 75A Brighton  
11/03/1952 Reallocation 80030 67C Ayr 67A Corkerhill  
18/03/1952 To Service 80033   NEW 75A Brighton  
19/03/1952 Reallocation 80016 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75A Brighton  
19/03/1952 Reallocation 80017 75A Brighton 75G Eastbourne  
19/03/1952 Reallocation 80018 75A Brighton 75G Eastbourne  
01/04/1952 To Service 80034   NEW 5A Crewe North  
05/04/1952 Reallocation 80034     5A Crewe North  
15/05/1952 To Service 80035   NEW 1C Watford  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 80035     1C Watford  
23/05/1952 To Service 80036   NEW 1C Watford  
24/05/1952 Reallocation 80036     1C Watford  
24/05/1952 To Service 80037   NEW 1C Watford  
31/05/1952 Reallocation 80034 5A Crewe North 1C Watford  
07/06/1952 To Service 80038   NEW 1C Watford  
18/06/1952 To Service 80039   NEW 1E Bletchley  
27/06/1952 To Service 80040   NEW 1E Bletchley  
30/06/1952 Reallocation 80019 75A Brighton 75G Eastbourne  
05/07/1952 To Service 80041   NEW 1E Bletchley  
15/07/1952 To Service 80042   NEW 1E Bletchley  
24/07/1952 To Service 80043   NEW 1E Bletchley  
13/08/1952 Reallocation 80019 75G Eastbourne 75G Eastbourne  
21/08/1952 To Service 80044   NEW 17A Derby  
04/09/1952 To Service 80045   NEW 15D Bedford  
17/09/1952 To Service 80046   NEW 15D Bedford  
26/09/1952 To Service 80000   NEW 67C Ayr  
30/09/1952 To Service 80047   NEW 15D Bedford  
07/10/1952 Reallocation 80017 75G Eastbourne 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
07/10/1952 Reallocation 80018 75G Eastbourne 75B Redhill  
07/10/1952 Reallocation 80019 75G Eastbourne 75B Redhill  
13/10/1952 To Service 80048   NEW 14B Kentish Town  
14/10/1952 To Service 80001   NEW 66A Polmadie  
17/10/1952 To Service 80002   NEW 66B Motherwell  
24/10/1952 To Service 80003   NEW 66B Motherwell  
24/10/1952 To Service 80049   NEW 26A Newton Heath  
01/11/1952 Reallocation 80000 67C Ayr 67A Corkerhill  
04/11/1952 To Service 80004   NEW 61A Kittybrewster  
06/11/1952 To Service 80050   NEW 26A Newton Heath  
08/11/1952 Reallocation 80049 26A Newton Heath 26A Newton Heath  
13/11/1952 To Service 80005   NEW 61A Kittybrewster  
21/11/1952 To Service 80051   NEW 26A Newton Heath  
24/11/1952 To Service 80006   NEW 66A Polmadie  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 80002 66B Motherwell 66A Polmadie  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 80003 66B Motherwell 66A Polmadie  
05/12/1952 To Service 80052   NEW 26A Newton Heath  
08/12/1952 To Service 80007   NEW 66A Polmadie  
15/12/1952 To Service 80008   NEW 67A Corkerhill  
20/12/1952 Reallocation 80044 17A Derby 15D Bedford  
22/12/1952 To Service 80053   NEW 26A Newton Heath  
30/12/1952 To Service 80009   NEW 67A Corkerhill  
24/01/1953 Reallocation 80047 15D Bedford 14B Kentish Town  
14/02/1953 Reallocation 80018 75B Redhill 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
14/02/1953 Reallocation 80019 75B Redhill 75A Brighton  
03/03/1953 To Service 80059   NEW 14B Kentish Town  
19/03/1953 To Service 80060   NEW 15D Bedford  
08/04/1953 To Service 80061   NEW 15D Bedford  
29/04/1953 To Service 80062   NEW 14B Kentish Town  
19/05/1953 To Service 80063   NEW 21A Saltley  
09/06/1953 To Service 80064   NEW 1C Watford  
25/06/1953 To Service 80065   NEW 1C Watford  
15/07/1953 To Service 80066   NEW 1C Watford  
04/08/1953 To Service 80067   NEW 1C Watford  
21/08/1953 To Service 80068   NEW 1C Watford  
30/09/1953 To Service 80069   NEW 33A Plaistow  
09/10/1953 To Service 80070   NEW 33A Plaistow  
21/10/1953 To Service 80071   NEW 33A Plaistow  
03/11/1953 To Service 80072   NEW 33A Plaistow  
13/11/1953 To Service 80073   NEW 33A Plaistow  
27/11/1953 To Service 80074   NEW 33A Plaistow  
10/12/1953 To Service 80075   NEW 33A Plaistow  
23/12/1953 To Service 80076   NEW 33A Plaistow  
02/01/1954 Reallocation 80039 1E Bletchley 9A Longsight  
12/01/1954 To Service 80077   NEW 33A Plaistow  
23/01/1954 Reallocation 80069 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
23/01/1954 Reallocation 80070 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
23/01/1954 Reallocation 80071 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
23/01/1954 Reallocation 80072 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
23/01/1954 Reallocation 80073 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
02/02/1954 To Service 80078   NEW 33A Plaistow  
05/03/1954 To Service 80079   NEW 33A Plaistow  
18/03/1954 To Service 80080   NEW 33A Plaistow  
31/03/1954 To Service 80081   NEW 1E Bletchley  
15/04/1954 To Service 80082   NEW 1E Bletchley  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 80079 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
03/05/1954 To Service 80083   NEW 1E Bletchley  
14/05/1954 To Service 80084   NEW 1E Bletchley  
19/05/1954 To Service 80117   NEW 50G Whitby  
22/05/1954 Reallocation 80080 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
28/05/1954 To Service 80085   NEW 1E Bletchley  
14/06/1954 To Service 80086   NEW 26D Bury  
29/06/1954 To Service 80087   NEW 26D Bury  
14/07/1954 To Service 80088   NEW 26D Bury  
03/08/1954 To Service 80089   NEW 26D Bury  
12/08/1954 To Service 80090   NEW 26D Bury  
10/09/1954 To Service 80091   NEW 14B Kentish Town  
24/09/1954 To Service 80092   NEW 14B Kentish Town  
11/10/1954 To Service 80093   NEW 15D Bedford  
22/10/1954 To Service 80106   NEW 61A Kittybrewster  
25/10/1954 To Service 80094   NEW 14B Kentish Town  
29/10/1954 To Service 80107   NEW 61A Kittybrewster  
05/11/1954 To Service 80108   NEW 61A Kittybrewster  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 80063 21A Saltley 14B Kentish Town  
13/11/1954 To Service 80095   NEW 14C St Albans  
18/11/1954 To Service 80109   NEW 61A Kittybrewster  
18/11/1954 To Service 80110   NEW 61A Kittybrewster  
23/11/1954 To Service 80096   NEW 33A Plaistow  
26/11/1954 To Service 80111   NEW 66A Polmadie  
03/12/1954 To Service 80112   NEW 66A Polmadie  
09/12/1954 To Service 80097   NEW 33A Plaistow  
14/12/1954 To Service 80113   NEW 66A Polmadie  
22/12/1954 To Service 80098   NEW 33A Plaistow  
23/12/1954 To Service 80055   NEW 66A Polmadie  
25/12/1954 Reallocation 80054     66A Polmadie  
29/12/1954 To Service 80114   NEW 66A Polmadie  
30/12/1954 To Service 80056   NEW 66A Polmadie  
31/12/1954 To Service 80057   NEW 66A Polmadie  
31/12/1954 To Service 80115   NEW 66A Polmadie  
08/01/1955 Reallocation 80044 15D Bedford 15D Bury  
08/01/1955 To Service 80058   NEW 66A Polmadie  
17/01/1955 To Service 80099   NEW 33A Plaistow  
29/01/1955 Reallocation 80045 15D Bedford 14B Kentish Town  
29/01/1955 Reallocation 80046 15D Bedford 26D Bury  
29/01/1955 Reallocation 80060 15D Bedford 26D Bury  
29/01/1955 Reallocation 80061 15D Bedford 26D Bury  
29/01/1955 Reallocation 80083 1E Bletchley 2A Rugby  
29/01/1955 Reallocation 80085 1E Bletchley 2A Rugby  
29/01/1955 Reallocation 80093 15D Bedford 26D Bury  
31/01/1955 To Service 80100   NEW 33A Plaistow  
07/02/1955 To Service 80101   NEW 33A Plaistow  
26/02/1955 Reallocation 80039 9A Longsight 1E Bletchley  
26/02/1955 Reallocation 80083 2A Rugby 1E Bletchley  
26/02/1955 Reallocation 80085 2A Rugby 1E Bletchley  
01/03/1955 To Service 80102   NEW 33A Plaistow  
16/03/1955 To Service 80103   NEW 33A Plaistow  
31/03/1955 To Service 80104   NEW 33A Plaistow  
19/04/1955 To Service 80105   NEW 33A Plaistow  
04/05/1955 To Service 80116   NEW 50A York (North)  
15/06/1955 To Service 80118   NEW 50G Whitby  
18/06/1955 Reallocation 80116 50A York (North) 50G Whitby  
21/06/1955 To Service 80119   NEW 50G Whitby  
06/07/1955 To Service 80120   NEW 50G Whitby  
22/07/1955 To Service 80121   NEW 61A Kittybrewster  
08/08/1955 To Service 80122   NEW 61A Kittybrewster  
09/09/1955 To Service 80123   NEW 62B Dundee Tay Bridge  
22/09/1955 To Service 80124   NEW 62B Dundee Tay Bridge  
06/10/1955 To Service 80125   NEW 63B Stirling  
20/10/1955 To Service 80126   NEW 63A Perth South  
07/11/1955 To Service 80127   NEW 67A Corkerhill  
23/11/1955 To Service 80128   NEW 67A Corkerhill  
26/11/1955 Reallocation 80121 61A Kittybrewster 61C Keith  
26/11/1955 Reallocation 80122 61A Kittybrewster 61C Keith  
09/12/1955 To Service 80129   NEW 66A Polmadie  
22/12/1955 To Service 80130   NEW 66A Polmadie  
11/02/1956 Reallocation 80044 15D Bedford 15D Newton Heath  
18/02/1956 Reallocation 80116 50G Whitby 50E Scarborough  
18/02/1956 Reallocation 80119 50G Whitby 50E Scarborough  
25/02/1956 Reallocation 80046 26D Bury 26A Newton Heath  
25/02/1956 Reallocation 80060 26D Bury 26A Newton Heath  
25/02/1956 Reallocation 80061 26D Bury 26A Newton Heath  
25/02/1956 Reallocation 80093 26D Bury 26A Newton Heath  
02/03/1956 To Service 80131   NEW 33A Plaistow  
15/03/1956 To Service 80132   NEW 33A Plaistow  
28/03/1956 To Service 80133   NEW 33A Plaistow  
20/04/1956 To Service 80134   NEW 33A Plaistow  
30/04/1956 To Service 80135   NEW 33A Plaistow  
11/05/1956 To Service 80136   NEW 33A Plaistow  
25/05/1956 Reallocation 80116 50E Scarborough 50G Whitby  
25/05/1956 Reallocation 80119 50E Scarborough 50G Whitby  
28/05/1956 To Service 80137   NEW 34E Neasden  
12/06/1956 To Service 80138   NEW 34E Neasden  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 80015 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75A Brighton  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 80017 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75A Brighton  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 80018 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75A Brighton  
26/06/1956 To Service 80139   NEW 34E Neasden  
10/07/1956 To Service 80140   NEW 34E Neasden  
25/07/1956 To Service 80141   NEW 34E Neasden  
09/08/1956 To Service 80142   NEW 34E Neasden  
11/08/1956 Reallocation 80086 26D Bury 25A Wakefield  
10/09/1956 To Service 80143   NEW 34E Neasden  
15/09/1956 Reallocation 80048 14B Kentish Town 6A Chester (MR)  
15/09/1956 Reallocation 80049 26A Newton Heath 6A Chester (MR)  
15/09/1956 Reallocation 80050 26A Newton Heath 6A Chester (MR)  
15/09/1956 Reallocation 80052 26A Newton Heath 6A Chester (MR)  
15/09/1956 Reallocation 80059 14B Kentish Town 6A Chester (MR)  
25/09/1956 To Service 80144   NEW 34E Neasden  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 80045 14B Kentish Town 6A Chester (MR)  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 80047 14B Kentish Town 6A Chester (MR)  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 80051 26A Newton Heath 6A Chester (MR)  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 80053 26A Newton Heath 6A Chester (MR)  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 80062 14B Kentish Town 6A Chester (MR)  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 80063 14B Kentish Town 6A Chester (MR)  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 80086 25A Wakefield 6A Chester (MR)  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 80087 26D Bury 6H Bangor  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 80088 26D Bury 6H Bangor  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 80089 26D Bury 6H Bangor  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 80090 26D Bury 6H Bangor  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 80091 14B Kentish Town 6H Bangor  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 80092 14B Kentish Town 6H Bangor  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 80094 14B Kentish Town 6H Bangor  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 80095 14C St Albans 6H Bangor  
16/10/1956 To Service 80145   NEW 75A Brighton  
30/10/1956 To Service 80146   NEW 75A Brighton  
15/11/1956 To Service 80147   NEW 75A Brighton  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 80010 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75A Brighton  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 80011 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75A Brighton  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 80015 75A Brighton 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 80016 75A Brighton 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 80017 75A Brighton 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 80018 75A Brighton 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 80019 75A Brighton 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
29/11/1956 To Service 80148   NEW 75A Brighton  
13/12/1956 To Service 80149   NEW 75A Brighton  
15/12/1956 Reallocation 80074 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
15/12/1956 Reallocation 80075 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
15/12/1956 Reallocation 80076 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
15/12/1956 Reallocation 80077 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
15/12/1956 Reallocation 80078 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
28/12/1956 To Service 80150   NEW 75A Brighton  
29/12/1956 Reallocation 80092 6H Bangor 1A Willesden  
18/01/1957 To Service 80151   NEW 75A Brighton  
26/01/1957 Reallocation 80092 1A Willesden 6H Bangor  
06/02/1957 To Service 80152   NEW 75A Brighton  
23/02/1957 Reallocation 80063 6A Chester (MR) 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
23/02/1957 Reallocation 80086 6A Chester (MR) 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
25/02/1957 To Service 80153   NEW 75A Brighton  
26/03/1957 To Service 80154   NEW 75A Brighton  
11/05/1957 Reallocation 80106 61A Kittybrewster 66A Polmadie  
11/05/1957 Reallocation 80107 61A Kittybrewster 66A Polmadie  
11/05/1957 Reallocation 80108 61A Kittybrewster 66A Polmadie  
11/05/1957 Reallocation 80109 61A Kittybrewster 66A Polmadie  
11/05/1957 Reallocation 80111 66A Polmadie 61A Kittybrewster  
11/05/1957 Reallocation 80112 66A Polmadie 61A Kittybrewster  
11/05/1957 Reallocation 80114 66A Polmadie 61A Kittybrewster  
11/05/1957 Reallocation 80115 66A Polmadie 61A Kittybrewster  
06/07/1957 Reallocation 80110 61A Kittybrewster 66A Polmadie  
06/07/1957 Reallocation 80113 66A Polmadie 61A Kittybrewster  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 80040 1E Bletchley 6A Chester (MR)  
27/11/1957 Reallocation 80044 15D Bedford 26A Newton Heath  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 80046 26A Newton Heath 24E Blackpool Central  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 80091 6H Bangor 6A Chester (MR)  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 80092 6H Bangor 6A Chester (MR)  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 80093 26A Newton Heath 24E Blackpool Central  
22/02/1958 Reallocation 80062 6A Chester (MR) 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
22/02/1958 Reallocation 80086 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 6A Chester (MR)  
22/03/1958 Reallocation 80012 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75A Brighton  
17/05/1958 Reallocation 80059 6A Chester (MR) 6H Bangor  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 80116 50G Whitby 50B Neville Hill  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 80117 50G Whitby 50B Neville Hill  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 80118 50G Whitby 50B Neville Hill  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 80119 50G Whitby 50B Neville Hill  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 80120 50G Whitby 50B Neville Hill  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 80059 6H Bangor 6H Neasden  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 80083 1E Bletchley 14D Neasden  
06/10/1958 Reallocation 80030 67A Corkerhill 67D Ardrossan  
08/11/1958 Reallocation 80059 6H Bangor 14D Neasden  
13/12/1958 Reallocation 80090 6H Bangor 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
02/02/1959 Reallocation 80030 67D Ardrossan 67A Corkerhill  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 80010 75A Brighton 75E Three Bridges  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 80011 75A Brighton 75E Three Bridges  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 80012 75A Brighton 75E Three Bridges  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 80013 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75A Brighton  
11/04/1959 Reallocation 80109 66A Polmadie 66C Hamilton (West)  
01/08/1959 Reallocation 80005 61A Kittybrewster 67A Corkerhill  
26/09/1959 Reallocation 80109 66C Hamilton (West) 66A Polmadie  
17/10/1959 Reallocation 80094 6H Bangor 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
17/10/1959 Reallocation 80095 6H Bangor 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 80081 1E Bletchley 1A Willesden  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 80084 1E Bletchley 1A Willesden  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 80096 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 80097 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 80098 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 80099 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 80100 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 80101 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 80102 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 80103 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 80104 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 80105 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 80131 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 80132 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 80133 33A Plaistow 33C Shoeburyness  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 80134 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 80135 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 80136 33A Plaistow 33B Tilbury  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80034 1C Watford 73F Ashford  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80035 1C Watford 73F Ashford  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80036 1C Watford 73F Ashford  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80037 1C Watford 73F Ashford  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80038 1C Watford 73F Ashford  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80039 1E Bletchley 73F Ashford  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80040 6A Chester (MR) 73F Ashford  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80041 1E Bletchley 73F Ashford  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80042 1E Bletchley 73F Ashford  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80043 1E Bletchley 73H Dover Marine  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80059 14D Neasden 73H Dover Marine  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80064 1C Watford 73H Dover Marine  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80065 1C Watford 73H Dover Marine  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80066 1C Watford 73A Stewarts Lane  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80067 1C Watford 73A Stewarts Lane  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80068 1C Watford 73A Stewarts Lane  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80081 1A Willesden 73A Stewarts Lane  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80082 1E Bletchley 73B Bricklayers Arms  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80083 14D Neasden 73B Bricklayers Arms  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80084 1A Willesden 73B Bricklayers Arms  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80085 1E Bletchley 73B Bricklayers Arms  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80087 6H Bangor 75E Three Bridges  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80088 6H Bangor 75E Three Bridges  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80089 6H Bangor 75E Three Bridges  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80094 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 75E Three Bridges  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80095 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80137 34E Neasden 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80138 34E Neasden 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80139 34E Neasden 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80140 34E Neasden 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80141 34E Neasden 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80142 34E Neasden 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80143 34E Neasden 75A Brighton  
31/12/1959 Reallocation 80144 34E Neasden 75A Brighton  
31/01/1960 Reallocation 80087 75E Three Bridges 73F Ashford  
04/02/1960 Reallocation 80046 24E Blackpool Central 67A Corkerhill  
09/02/1960 Reallocation 80043 73H Dover Marine 73F Ashford  
09/02/1960 Reallocation 80059 73H Dover Marine 73F Ashford  
09/02/1960 Reallocation 80064 73H Dover Marine 73F Ashford  
09/02/1960 Reallocation 80065 73H Dover Marine 73F Ashford  
09/02/1960 Reallocation 80066 73A Stewarts Lane 73F Ashford  
13/02/1960 Reallocation 80090 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 62B Dundee Tay Bridge  
29/02/1960 Reallocation 80060 26A Newton Heath 63B Stirling  
11/03/1960 Reallocation 80047 6A Chester (MR) 67A Corkerhill  
12/03/1960 Reallocation 80062 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 63B Stirling  
12/03/1960 Reallocation 80063 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 63B Stirling  
14/03/1960 Reallocation 80044 26A Newton Heath 67A Corkerhill  
05/04/1960 Reallocation 80043 73F Ashford 73F Ashford  
05/04/1960 Reallocation 80059 73F Ashford 73F Ashford  
05/04/1960 Reallocation 80064 73F Ashford 73F Ashford  
05/04/1960 Reallocation 80065 73F Ashford 73F Ashford  
05/04/1960 Reallocation 80066 73F Ashford 73F Ashford  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 80052 6A Chester (MR) 67A Corkerhill  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 80061 26A Newton Heath 65J Fort William  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 80092 6A Chester (MR) 63A Perth South  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 80093 24E Blackpool Central 63A Perth South  
11/04/1960 Reallocation 80050 6A Chester (MR) 67A Corkerhill  
22/04/1960 Reallocation 80048 6A Chester (MR) 67A Corkerhill  
05/05/1960 Reallocation 80049 6A Chester (MR) 67A Corkerhill  
07/05/1960 Reallocation 80045 6A Chester (MR) 67A Corkerhill  
07/05/1960 Reallocation 80051 6A Chester (MR) 67A Corkerhill  
07/05/1960 Reallocation 80053 6A Chester (MR) 67A Corkerhill  
07/05/1960 Reallocation 80086 6A Chester (MR) 64C Dalry Road  
07/05/1960 Reallocation 80091 6A Chester (MR) 62B Dundee Tay Bridge  
02/07/1960 Reallocation 80113 61A Kittybrewster 61C Keith  
24/09/1960 Reallocation 80091 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 65B St Rollox (Balornock)  
22/10/1960 Reallocation 80086 64C Dalry Road 66E Carstairs  
22/10/1960 Reallocation 80114 61A Kittybrewster 61C Keith  
22/10/1960 Reallocation 80115 61A Kittybrewster 61C Keith  
19/11/1960 Reallocation 80086 66E Carstairs 66A Polmadie  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 80085 73B Bricklayers Arms 73F Ashford  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 80138 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75A Brighton  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 80037 73F Ashford 73J Tonbridge  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 80038 73F Ashford 73J Tonbridge  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 80039 73F Ashford 73J Tonbridge  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 80040 73F Ashford 73J Tonbridge  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 80041 73F Ashford 73J Tonbridge  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 80042 73F Ashford 73J Tonbridge  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 80043 73F Ashford 73J Tonbridge  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 80059 73F Ashford 73J Tonbridge  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 80064 73F Ashford 73J Tonbridge  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 80065 73F Ashford 73J Tonbridge  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 80066 73F Ashford 73J Tonbridge  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 80085 73F Ashford 73J Tonbridge  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 80087 73F Ashford 75E Three Bridges  
01/07/1961 Reallocation 80004 61A Kittybrewster 68D Beattock  
01/07/1961 Reallocation 80006 66A Polmadie 68D Beattock  
01/07/1961 Reallocation 80020     67D Ardrossan  
01/07/1961 Reallocation 80021     67D Ardrossan  
01/07/1961 Reallocation 80028     67D Ardrossan  
01/07/1961 Reallocation 80029     67D Ardrossan  
01/07/1961 Reallocation 80111 61A Kittybrewster 67A Corkerhill  
01/07/1961 Reallocation 80111 67A Corkerhill 67B Hurlford  
01/07/1961 Reallocation 80112 67A Corkerhill 67B Hurlford  
01/07/1961 Reallocation 80112 61A Kittybrewster 67A Corkerhill  
01/07/1961 Reallocation 80113 61C Keith 64G Hawick  
01/07/1961 Reallocation 80114 61C Keith 64G Hawick  
01/07/1961 Reallocation 80115 61C Keith 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill  
01/07/1961 Reallocation 80121 61C Keith 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill  
01/07/1961 Reallocation 80122 61C Keith 64C Dalry Road  
29/07/1961 Reallocation 80020 67D Ardrossan 67A Corkerhill  
29/07/1961 Reallocation 80021 67D Ardrossan 67A Corkerhill  
29/07/1961 Reallocation 80121 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 66A Polmadie  
26/08/1961 Reallocation 80006 68D Beattock 66A Polmadie  
26/08/1961 Reallocation 80115 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 66A Polmadie  
21/10/1961 Reallocation 80000 67A Corkerhill 67B Hurlford  
21/10/1961 Reallocation 80128 67A Corkerhill 67B Hurlford  
27/01/1962 Reallocation 80000 67B Hurlford 67A Corkerhill  
27/01/1962 Reallocation 80128 67B Hurlford 67A Corkerhill  
24/03/1962 Reallocation 80114 64G Hawick 64A St Margarets  
19/05/1962 Reallocation 80091 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 67B Hurlford  
28/05/1962 Reallocation 80034 73F Ashford 73A Stewarts Lane  
28/05/1962 Reallocation 80035 73F Ashford 72A Exmouth Junction  
28/05/1962 Reallocation 80036 73F Ashford 72A Exmouth Junction  
28/05/1962 Reallocation 80037 73J Tonbridge 72A Exmouth Junction  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 80001 66A Polmadie 68D Beattock  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 80002 66A Polmadie 68D Beattock  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 80006 66A Polmadie 64A St Margarets  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 80007 66A Polmadie 64A St Margarets  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 80022 61A Kittybrewster 64A St Margarets  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 80023     68C Stranraer  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 80122 64C Dalry Road 64A St Margarets  
23/06/1962 Reallocation 80078 33B Tilbury 30A Stratford  
23/06/1962 Reallocation 80079 33B Tilbury 30A Stratford  
23/06/1962 Reallocation 80097 33B Tilbury 30A Stratford  
23/06/1962 Reallocation 80099 33B Tilbury 30A Stratford  
23/06/1962 Reallocation 80100 33B Tilbury 30A Stratford  
23/06/1962 Reallocation 80101 33B Tilbury 30A Stratford  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 80037 72A Exmouth Junction 72A Exmouth Junction  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 80038 73J Tonbridge 72A Exmouth Junction  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 80039 73J Tonbridge 72A Exmouth Junction  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 80040 73J Tonbridge 72A Exmouth Junction  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 80041 73J Tonbridge 72A Exmouth Junction  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 80042 73J Tonbridge 72A Exmouth Junction  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 80043 73J Tonbridge 72A Exmouth Junction  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 80059 73J Tonbridge 72A Exmouth Junction  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 80064 73J Tonbridge 72A Exmouth Junction  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 80065 73J Tonbridge 71A Eastleigh  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 80066 73J Tonbridge 71A Eastleigh  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 80082 73B Bricklayers Arms 71A Eastleigh  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 80083 73B Bricklayers Arms 71A Eastleigh  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 80084 73B Bricklayers Arms 75D Stewarts Lane  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 80085 73J Tonbridge 75D Stewarts Lane  
14/07/1962 Reallocation 80003 66A Polmadie 64A St Margarets  
14/07/1962 Reallocation 80028 67D Ardrossan 67B Hurlford  
14/07/1962 Reallocation 80029 67D Ardrossan 67B Hurlford  
15/07/1962 Reallocation 80069 33B Tilbury 87D Swansea East Dock  
15/07/1962 Reallocation 80070 33B Tilbury 81A Old Oak Common  
15/07/1962 Reallocation 80072 33B Tilbury 87D Swansea East Dock  
15/07/1962 Reallocation 80078 30A Stratford 89A Shrewsbury  
15/07/1962 Reallocation 80079 30A Stratford 89B Croes Newydd  
15/07/1962 Reallocation 80080 33B Tilbury 89B Croes Newydd  
15/07/1962 Reallocation 80096 33B Tilbury 89A Shrewsbury  
15/07/1962 Reallocation 80097 30A Stratford 87D Swansea East Dock  
15/07/1962 Reallocation 80098 33B Tilbury 81A Old Oak Common  
15/07/1962 Reallocation 80099 30A Stratford 87D Swansea East Dock  
15/07/1962 Reallocation 80100 30A Stratford 89A Shrewsbury  
15/07/1962 Reallocation 80101 30A Stratford 89A Shrewsbury  
15/07/1962 Reallocation 80102 33B Tilbury 81A Old Oak Common  
15/07/1962 Reallocation 80104 33B Tilbury 81A Old Oak Common  
15/07/1962 Reallocation 80105 33B Tilbury 89C Machynlleth  
15/07/1962 Reallocation 80131 33B Tilbury 81A Old Oak Common  
15/07/1962 Reallocation 80132 33B Tilbury 81A Old Oak Common  
15/07/1962 Reallocation 80133 33C Shoeburyness 87D Swansea East Dock  
15/07/1962 Reallocation 80134 33B Tilbury 87D Swansea East Dock  
15/07/1962 Reallocation 80135 33B Tilbury 89A Shrewsbury  
15/07/1962 Reallocation 80136 33B Tilbury 89A Shrewsbury  
21/07/1962 Reallocation 80071 33B Tilbury 30A Stratford  
21/07/1962 Reallocation 80073 33B Tilbury 30A Stratford  
21/07/1962 Reallocation 80074 33B Tilbury 30A Stratford  
21/07/1962 Reallocation 80075 33B Tilbury 30A Stratford  
21/07/1962 Reallocation 80076 33B Tilbury 30A Stratford  
21/07/1962 Reallocation 80077 33B Tilbury 30A Stratford  
13/08/1962 Reallocation 80054 66A Polmadie 64A St Margarets  
13/08/1962 Reallocation 80055 66A Polmadie 64A St Margarets  
29/08/1962 Condemned 80103 33B Tilbury   COND  
08/09/1962 Reallocation 80026 66A Polmadie 64A St Margarets  
08/09/1962 Reallocation 80098 81A Old Oak Common 89A Shrewsbury  
08/09/1962 Reallocation 80101 89A Shrewsbury 89C Machynlleth  
08/09/1962 Reallocation 80105 89C Machynlleth 89A Shrewsbury  
08/09/1962 Reallocation 80131 81A Old Oak Common 89A Shrewsbury  
15/09/1962 Reallocation 80071 30A Stratford 31B March  
15/09/1962 Reallocation 80073 30A Stratford 31B March  
15/09/1962 Reallocation 80074 30A Stratford 31B March  
15/09/1962 Reallocation 80075 30A Stratford 31B March  
15/09/1962 Reallocation 80076 30A Stratford 31B March  
15/09/1962 Reallocation 80077 30A Stratford 31B March  
06/10/1962 Reallocation 80105 89A Shrewsbury 89C Machynlleth  
17/11/1962 Reallocation 80096 89A Shrewsbury 89B Croes Newydd  
17/11/1962 Reallocation 80098 89A Shrewsbury 89B Croes Newydd  
08/12/1962 Reallocation 80071 31B March 56B Ardsley  
08/12/1962 Reallocation 80073 31B March 56B Ardsley  
08/12/1962 Reallocation 80074 31B March 56B Ardsley  
08/12/1962 Reallocation 80075 31B March 56B Ardsley  
08/12/1962 Reallocation 80076 31B March 56B Ardsley  
08/12/1962 Reallocation 80077 31B March 56B Ardsley  
15/12/1962 Reallocation 80070 81A Old Oak Common 89A Shrewsbury  
15/12/1962 Reallocation 80102 81A Old Oak Common 89A Shrewsbury  
15/12/1962 Reallocation 80104 81A Old Oak Common 89B Croes Newydd  
15/12/1962 Reallocation 80132 81A Old Oak Common 89A Shrewsbury  
17/12/1962 Reallocation 80087 75E Three Bridges 71A Eastleigh  
17/12/1962 Reallocation 80095 75F Tunbridge Wells West 71A Eastleigh  
17/12/1962 Reallocation 80137 75F Tunbridge Wells West 71A Eastleigh  
29/12/1962 Reallocation 80057 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
19/01/1963 Reallocation 80004 68D Beattock 65A Eastfield  
19/01/1963 Reallocation 80027 61A Kittybrewster 65A Eastfield  
19/01/1963 Reallocation 80056 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
30/01/1963 Reallocation 80010 75E Three Bridges 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
30/01/1963 Reallocation 80011 75E Three Bridges 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
30/01/1963 Reallocation 80012 75E Three Bridges 75D Stewarts Lane  
30/01/1963 Reallocation 80088 75E Three Bridges 75F Tunbridge Wells West  
30/01/1963 Reallocation 80089 75E Three Bridges 75D Stewarts Lane  
30/01/1963 Reallocation 80094 75E Three Bridges 75D Stewarts Lane  
09/02/1963 Reallocation 80131 89A Shrewsbury 89D Oswestry  
09/02/1963 Reallocation 80132 89A Shrewsbury 89D Oswestry  
09/02/1963 Reallocation 80135 89A Shrewsbury 89D Oswestry  
09/02/1963 Reallocation 80136 89A Shrewsbury 89D Oswestry  
23/02/1963 Reallocation 80070 89A Shrewsbury 89B Croes Newydd  
23/02/1963 Reallocation 80078 89A Shrewsbury 89B Croes Newydd  
23/02/1963 Reallocation 80101 89C Machynlleth 89B Croes Newydd  
23/02/1963 Reallocation 80105 89C Machynlleth 89B Croes Newydd  
09/03/1963 Reallocation 80070 89B Croes Newydd 89A Shrewsbury  
09/03/1963 Reallocation 80096 89B Croes Newydd 89C Machynlleth  
09/03/1963 Reallocation 80098 89B Croes Newydd 89C Machynlleth  
09/03/1963 Reallocation 80101 89B Croes Newydd 89C Machynlleth  
09/03/1963 Reallocation 80104 89B Croes Newydd 89C Machynlleth  
09/03/1963 Reallocation 80105 89B Croes Newydd 89C Machynlleth  
16/03/1963 Reallocation 80023 68C Stranraer 67E Dumfries  
01/04/1963 Reallocation 80087 71A Eastleigh 70C Guildford  
01/04/1963 Reallocation 80095 71A Eastleigh 70C Guildford  
01/04/1963 Reallocation 80137 71A Eastleigh 70C Guildford  
06/04/1963 Reallocation 80133 87D Swansea East Dock 87A Neath (Court Sart)  
22/06/1963 Reallocation 80116 50B Neville Hill 55A Holbeck (MR)  
24/06/1963 Reallocation 80012 75D Stewarts Lane 70B Feltham  
24/06/1963 Reallocation 80148 75A Brighton 70B Feltham  
06/07/1963 Reallocation 80028 67B Hurlford 67F Stranraer  
14/07/1963 Reallocation 80097 87D Swansea East Dock 89D Oswestry  
14/07/1963 Reallocation 80099 87D Swansea East Dock 89C Machynlleth  
22/07/1963 Reallocation 80081 73A Stewarts Lane 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
22/07/1963 Reallocation 80143 75A Brighton 70B Feltham  
22/07/1963 Reallocation 80147 75A Brighton 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
22/07/1963 Reallocation 80154 75A Brighton 70B Feltham  
27/07/1963 Reallocation 80038 72A Exmouth Junction 72C Yeovil Town  
19/08/1963 Reallocation 80034 73A Stewarts Lane 75A Brighton  
19/08/1963 Reallocation 80081 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 71B Bournemouth  
19/08/1963 Reallocation 80147 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 71B Bournemouth  
08/09/1963 Reallocation 80072 87D Swansea East Dock 2L Leamington  
14/09/1963 Reallocation 80096 89C Machynlleth 6C Croes Newydd  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 80010 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75A Brighton  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 80011 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75A Brighton  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 80014 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75A Brighton  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 80015 75F Tunbridge Wells West 71A Eastleigh  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 80016 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75A Brighton  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 80017 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75A Brighton  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 80018 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75A Brighton  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 80019 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75A Brighton  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 80068 73A Stewarts Lane 75A Brighton  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 80084 75D Stewarts Lane 75A Brighton  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 80085 75D Stewarts Lane 75A Brighton  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 80087 70C Guildford 70D Basingstoke  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 80088 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75A Brighton  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 80089 75D Stewarts Lane 75A Brighton  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 80094 75D Stewarts Lane 75A Brighton  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 80095 70C Guildford 70B Feltham  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 80137 70C Guildford 70B Feltham  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 80139 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75A Brighton  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 80140 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75A Brighton  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 80141 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75A Brighton  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 80142 75F Tunbridge Wells West 75A Brighton  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 80146 75A Brighton 71A Eastleigh  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 80150 75A Brighton 71A Eastleigh  
28/09/1963 Reallocation 80038 72C Yeovil Town 83D Exmouth Junction  
05/10/1963 Reallocation 80110 66A Polmadie 66E Carstairs  
02/11/1963 Reallocation 80071 56B Ardsley 66E Carstairs  
02/11/1963 Reallocation 80073 56B Ardsley 66E Carstairs  
02/11/1963 Reallocation 80074 56B Ardsley 66E Carstairs  
02/11/1963 Reallocation 80076 56B Ardsley 67E Dumfries  
02/11/1963 Reallocation 80077 56B Ardsley 67D Ardrossan  
02/11/1963 Reallocation 80116 55A Holbeck (MR) 67E Dumfries  
02/11/1963 Reallocation 80117 50B Neville Hill 67E Dumfries  
02/11/1963 Reallocation 80118 50B Neville Hill 66E Carstairs  
02/11/1963 Reallocation 80119 50B Neville Hill 66E Carstairs  
02/11/1963 Reallocation 80120 50B Neville Hill 66E Carstairs  
30/11/1963 Reallocation 80028 67F Stranraer 63A Perth South  
30/11/1963 Reallocation 80075 56B Ardsley 66E Carstairs  
30/11/1963 Reallocation 80116 67E Dumfries 66E Carstairs  
30/11/1963 Reallocation 80119 66E Carstairs 67E Dumfries  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 80031 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 80032 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 80033 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 80034 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 80068 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 80084 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 80085 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 80088 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 80089 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 80094 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 80138 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 80139 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 80140 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 80141 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 80142 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 80144 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 80145 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 80146 71A Eastleigh 70F Bournemouth  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 80149 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 80151 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 80152 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 80153 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
25/01/1964 Reallocation 80115 66A Polmadie 67D Ardrossan  
13/04/1964 Reallocation 80134 87D Swansea East Dock 87F Llanelly  
06/05/1964 Condemned 80040 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
30/05/1964 Reallocation 80001 68D Beattock 66A Polmadie  
30/05/1964 Reallocation 80002 68D Beattock 66A Polmadie  
30/05/1964 Reallocation 80110 66E Carstairs 66A Polmadie  
30/05/1964 Reallocation 80116 66E Carstairs 66A Polmadie  
30/05/1964 Reallocation 80118 66E Carstairs 66A Polmadie  
30/05/1964 Reallocation 80120 66E Carstairs 66A Polmadie  
08/06/1964 Condemned 80030 67A Corkerhill   COND  
08/06/1964 Condemned 80049 67A Corkerhill   COND  
14/06/1964 Condemned 80010 75A Brighton   COND  
14/06/1964 Condemned 80087 70D Basingstoke   COND  
14/06/1964 Condemned 80148 70B Feltham   COND  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 80011 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 80013 75A Brighton 70F Bournemouth  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 80014 75A Brighton 70D Eastleigh  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 80016 75A Brighton 70D Eastleigh  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 80017 75A Brighton 70D Eastleigh  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 80018 75A Brighton 70B Feltham  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 80019 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
22/06/1964 Reallocation 80133 87A Neath (Court Sart) 87E Landore  
27/06/1964 Reallocation 80000 67A Corkerhill 67A Corkerhill  
27/06/1964 Reallocation 80097 89D Oswestry 6F Machynlleth  
27/06/1964 Reallocation 80102 89A Shrewsbury 6H Bangor  
27/06/1964 Reallocation 80136 89D Oswestry 6F Machynlleth  
07/07/1964 Condemned 80052 67A Corkerhill   COND  
07/07/1964 Condemned 80053 67A Corkerhill   COND  
13/07/1964 Condemned 80008 67A Corkerhill   COND  
13/07/1964 Condemned 80021 67A Corkerhill   COND  
18/07/1964 Reallocation 80048 98W   6H Bangor  
25/07/1964 Reallocation 80077 67D Ardrossan 67A Corkerhill  
25/07/1964 Reallocation 80112 67B Hurlford 67A Corkerhill  
25/07/1964 Reallocation 80115 67D Ardrossan 66A Polmadie  
30/07/1964 Condemned 80071 66E Carstairs   COND  
30/07/1964 Condemned 80073 66E Carstairs   COND  
30/07/1964 Condemned 80074 66E Carstairs   COND  
30/07/1964 Condemned 80075 66E Carstairs   COND  
30/07/1964 Condemned 80076 67E Dumfries   COND  
30/07/1964 Condemned 80127 67A Corkerhill   COND  
31/07/1964 Reallocation 80060 63B Stirling 64A St Margarets  
08/1964 Reallocation 80129 98W   10D Lostock Hall  
03/08/1964 Reallocation 80060 64A St Margarets 66D Greenock Ladyburn  
09/08/1964 Reallocation 80069 87D Swansea East Dock 70A Nine Elms  
09/08/1964 Reallocation 80133 87E Landore 70B Feltham  
09/08/1964 Reallocation 80134 87F Llanelly 70B Feltham  
22/08/1964 Reallocation 80061 65J Fort William 67E Dumfries  
22/08/1964 Reallocation 80062 63B Stirling 66D Greenock Ladyburn  
22/08/1964 Reallocation 80062 66D Greenock Ladyburn 65J Stirling  
22/08/1964 Reallocation 80063 63B Stirling 67A Corkerhill  
09/1964 Reallocation 80125 98W   10D Lostock Hall  
07/09/1964 Condemned 80038 83D Exmouth Junction   COND  
13/09/1964 Condemned 80017 70D Eastleigh   COND  
14/09/1964 Condemned 80107 66A Polmadie   COND  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 80134 70B Feltham 70F Bournemouth  
19/09/1964 Reallocation 80048 6H Bangor 6D Shrewsbury  
19/09/1964 Reallocation 80102 6H Bangor 6D Shrewsbury  
19/09/1964 Reallocation 80135 89D Oswestry 6D Shrewsbury  
19/09/1964 Reallocation 80136 6F Machynlleth 6D Shrewsbury  
20/09/1964 Condemned 80031 75B Redhill   COND  
24/09/1964 Condemned 80009 67A Corkerhill   COND  
26/09/1964 Reallocation 80004 65A Eastfield 65D Dawsholm  
10/10/1964 Condemned 80056 65A Eastfield   COND  
10/10/1964 Condemned 80125 10D Lostock Hall   COND  
10/10/1964 Condemned 80129 10D Lostock Hall   COND  
12/10/1964 Reallocation 80035 72A Exmouth Junction 83E Yeovil Town  
12/10/1964 Reallocation 80043 72A Exmouth Junction 83G Templecombe (S&D)  
12/10/1964 Reallocation 80059 72A Exmouth Junction 83G Templecombe (S&D)  
12/10/1964 Condemned 80062 65J Stirling   COND  
12/10/1964 Reallocation 80067 73A Stewarts Lane 83G Templecombe (S&D)  
12/10/1964 Condemned 80077 67A Corkerhill   COND  
12/10/1964 Condemned 80106 66A Polmadie   COND  
12/10/1964 Condemned 80115 66A Polmadie   COND  
31/10/1964 Reallocation 80004 65D Dawsholm 67A Corkerhill  
31/10/1964 Reallocation 80005 67A Corkerhill 67C Ayr  
06/11/1964 Condemned 80036 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
14/11/1964 Condemned 80044 67A Corkerhill   COND  
20/11/1964 Reallocation 80012 70B Feltham 70D Eastleigh  
20/11/1964 Reallocation 80018 70B Feltham 70D Eastleigh  
20/11/1964 Reallocation 80095 70B Feltham 70A Nine Elms  
20/11/1964 Reallocation 80133 70B Feltham 70A Nine Elms  
20/11/1964 Reallocation 80137 70B Feltham 70A Nine Elms  
20/11/1964 Reallocation 80143 70B Feltham 70A Nine Elms  
20/11/1964 Reallocation 80154 70B Feltham 70A Nine Elms  
21/11/1964 Condemned 80050 67A Corkerhill   COND  
26/12/1964 Reallocation 80027 65A Eastfield 66A Polmadie  
10/01/1965 Reallocation 80035 83E Yeovil Town 83D Exmouth Junction  
10/01/1965 Reallocation 80037 72A Exmouth Junction 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)  
10/01/1965 Reallocation 80039 72A Exmouth Junction 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)  
23/01/1965 Reallocation 80131 89D Oswestry 6H Bangor  
23/01/1965 Reallocation 80132 89D Oswestry 6H Bangor  
06/02/1965 Condemned 80042 72A Exmouth Junction   COND  
18/02/1965 Reallocation 80057 65A Eastfield 66A Polmadie  
21/02/1965 Reallocation 80035 83D Exmouth Junction 83E Yeovil Town  
06/03/1965 Condemned 80003 64A St Margarets   COND  
07/03/1965 Reallocation 80037 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 83D Exmouth Junction  
07/03/1965 Reallocation 80039 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 83D Exmouth Junction  
07/03/1965 Condemned 80149 75B Redhill   COND  
07/03/1965 Condemned 80153 75B Redhill   COND  
15/03/1965 Reallocation 80138 75B Redhill 70F Bournemouth  
15/03/1965 Reallocation 80139 75B Redhill 70D Eastleigh  
27/03/1965 Reallocation 80005 67C Ayr 66F Beattock  
27/03/1965 Reallocation 80045 67A Corkerhill 66F Beattock  
27/03/1965 Condemned 80090 62B Dundee Tay Bridge   COND  
11/04/1965 Condemned 80018 70D Eastleigh   COND  
21/04/1965 Condemned 80035 83E Yeovil Town   COND  
24/04/1965 Reallocation 80123 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 66A Polmadie  
01/05/1965 Reallocation 80070 89A Shrewsbury 70D Eastleigh  
01/05/1965 Reallocation 80096 6C Croes Newydd 70F Bournemouth  
01/05/1965 Reallocation 80102 6D Shrewsbury 70D Eastleigh  
01/05/1965 Reallocation 80132 6H Bangor 70D Eastleigh  
02/05/1965 Condemned 80014 70D Eastleigh   COND  
08/05/1965 Condemned 80099 89C Machynlleth   COND  
08/05/1965 Condemned 80108 66A Polmadie   COND  
08/05/1965 Condemned 80110 66A Polmadie   COND  
08/05/1965 Condemned 80131 6H Bangor   COND  
16/05/1965 Reallocation 80039 83D Exmouth Junction 83E Yeovil Town  
29/05/1965 Condemned 80119 67E Dumfries   COND  
03/06/1965 Condemned 80067 83G Templecombe (S&D)   COND  
08/06/1965 Reallocation 80011 75B Redhill 70D Eastleigh  
08/06/1965 Reallocation 80019 75B Redhill 70F Bournemouth  
08/06/1965 Reallocation 80032 75B Redhill 70F Bournemouth  
08/06/1965 Reallocation 80033 75B Redhill 70B Feltham  
08/06/1965 Reallocation 80034 75B Redhill 70B Feltham  
08/06/1965 Reallocation 80068 75B Redhill 70B Feltham  
08/06/1965 Condemned 80081 71B Bournemouth   COND  
08/06/1965 Reallocation 80085 75B Redhill 70B Feltham  
08/06/1965 Reallocation 80089 75B Redhill 70B Feltham  
08/06/1965 Reallocation 80094 75B Redhill 70B Feltham  
08/06/1965 Reallocation 80140 75B Redhill 70B Feltham  
08/06/1965 Reallocation 80141 75B Redhill 70B Feltham  
08/06/1965 Reallocation 80142 75B Redhill 70E Salisbury  
08/06/1965 Reallocation 80144 75B Redhill 70E Salisbury  
08/06/1965 Reallocation 80145 75B Redhill 70E Salisbury  
08/06/1965 Reallocation 80151 75B Redhill 70E Salisbury  
08/06/1965 Reallocation 80152 75B Redhill 70E Salisbury  
13/06/1965 Reallocation 80037 83D Exmouth Junction 83G Templecombe (S&D)  
13/06/1965 Reallocation 80041 72A Exmouth Junction 83G Templecombe (S&D)  
13/06/1965 Reallocation 80059 83G Templecombe (S&D) 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
13/06/1965 Reallocation 80064 72A Exmouth Junction 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
13/06/1965 Condemned 80066 71A Eastleigh   COND  
13/06/1965 Condemned 80084 75B Redhill   COND  
13/06/1965 Condemned 80088 75B Redhill   COND  
13/06/1965 Condemned 80147 71B Bournemouth   COND  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 80072 2L Leamington 6D Shrewsbury  
20/06/1965 Condemned 80070 70D Eastleigh   COND  
26/06/1965 Condemned 80020 67A Corkerhill   COND  
26/06/1965 Condemned 80022 64A St Margarets   COND  
11/07/1965 Reallocation 80039 83E Yeovil Town 83G Templecombe (S&D)  
11/07/1965 Reallocation 80059 82E Bristol Barrow Road 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)  
17/07/1965 Condemned 80048 6D Shrewsbury   COND  
17/07/1965 Condemned 80101 89C Machynlleth   COND  
24/07/1965 Condemned 80072 6D Shrewsbury   COND  
24/07/1965 Condemned 80078 89B Croes Newydd   COND  
24/07/1965 Condemned 80079 89B Croes Newydd   COND  
24/07/1965 Condemned 80080 89B Croes Newydd   COND  
24/07/1965 Condemned 80097 6F Machynlleth   COND  
24/07/1965 Condemned 80098 89C Machynlleth   COND  
24/07/1965 Condemned 80100 89A Shrewsbury   COND  
24/07/1965 Condemned 80104 89C Machynlleth   COND  
24/07/1965 Condemned 80105 89C Machynlleth   COND  
24/07/1965 Condemned 80135 6D Shrewsbury   COND  
24/07/1965 Condemned 80136 6D Shrewsbury   COND  
31/07/1965 Reallocation 80061 67E Dumfries 66A Polmadie  
25/08/1965 Condemned 80064 82E Bristol Barrow Road   COND  
02/10/1965 Condemned 80023 67E Dumfries   COND  
10/10/1965 Reallocation 80011 70D Eastleigh 70F Bournemouth  
17/10/1965 Condemned 80150 71A Eastleigh   COND  
25/10/1965 Reallocation 80012 70D Eastleigh 70A Nine Elms  
25/10/1965 Reallocation 80015 71A Eastleigh 70A Nine Elms  
31/10/1965 Condemned 80137 70A Nine Elms   COND  
13/11/1965 Condemned 80109 66A Polmadie   COND  
18/11/1965 Condemned 80059 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)   COND  
21/11/1965 Reallocation 80045 66F Beattock 66A Polmadie  
21/11/1965 Reallocation 80054 64A St Margarets 66D Greenock Ladyburn  
04/12/1965 Reallocation 80005 66F Beattock 66A Polmadie  
04/12/1965 Reallocation 80007 64A St Margarets 66A Polmadie  
04/12/1965 Reallocation 80117 67E Dumfries 66F Beattock  
04/12/1965 Reallocation 80117 66F Beattock 66A Polmadie  
04/12/1965 Reallocation 80122 64A St Margarets 66D Greenock Ladyburn  
05/12/1965 Condemned 80102 70D Eastleigh   COND  
13/12/1965 Reallocation 80060 66D Greenock Ladyburn 66A Polmadie  
16/12/1965 Condemned 80029 67B Hurlford   COND  
20/12/1965 Reallocation 80089 70B Feltham 70A Nine Elms  
20/12/1965 Reallocation 80141 70B Feltham 70A Nine Elms  
20/12/1965 Reallocation 80144 70E Salisbury 70D Eastleigh  
26/12/1965 Condemned 80096 70F Bournemouth   COND  
02/01/1966 Condemned 80034 70B Feltham   COND  
09/01/1966 Condemned 80132 70D Eastleigh   COND  
09/01/1966 Condemned 80141 70A Nine Elms   COND  
10/01/1966 Reallocation 80011 70F Bournemouth 70C Guildford  
21/01/1966 Condemned 80039 83G Templecombe (S&D)   COND  
23/01/1966 Condemned 80069 70A Nine Elms   COND  
29/01/1966 Reallocation 80113 64G Hawick 64A St Margarets  
29/01/1966 Reallocation 80124 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 64A St Margarets  
07/02/1966 Reallocation 80011 70C Guildford 70F Bournemouth  
07/02/1966 Condemned 80060 66A Polmadie   COND  
07/02/1966 Reallocation 80142 70E Salisbury 70D Eastleigh  
07/02/1966 Reallocation 80144 70D Eastleigh 70A Nine Elms  
07/02/1966 Reallocation 80145 70E Salisbury 70A Nine Elms  
03/03/1966 Condemned 80117 66A Polmadie   COND  
03/03/1966 Condemned 80142 70D Eastleigh   COND  
07/03/1966 Condemned 80037 83G Templecombe (S&D)   COND  
07/03/1966 Condemned 80041 83G Templecombe (S&D)   COND  
07/03/1966 Condemned 80043 83G Templecombe (S&D)   COND  
30/04/1966 Reallocation 80091 67B Hurlford 66F Beattock  
30/04/1966 Reallocation 80111 67B Hurlford 66F Beattock  
15/05/1966 Condemned 80144 70A Nine Elms   COND  
02/06/1966 Condemned 80121 66A Polmadie   COND  
29/06/1966 Condemned 80054 66D Greenock Ladyburn   COND  
17/07/1966 Condemned 80001 66A Polmadie   COND  
17/07/1966 Condemned 80007 66A Polmadie   COND  
17/07/1966 Condemned 80058 66A Polmadie   COND  
31/07/1966 Condemned 80094 70B Feltham   COND  
07/08/1966 Condemned 80083 71A Eastleigh   COND  
09/08/1966 Condemned 80005 66A Polmadie   COND  
17/08/1966 Condemned 80051 67A Corkerhill   COND  
17/08/1966 Condemned 80123 66A Polmadie   COND  
17/08/1966 Condemned 80130 66A Polmadie   COND  
24/08/1966 Condemned 80024 67A Corkerhill   COND  
24/08/1966 Condemned 80025 67A Corkerhill   COND  
24/08/1966 Condemned 80047 67A Corkerhill   COND  
24/08/1966 Condemned 80063 67A Corkerhill   COND  
24/08/1966 Condemned 80112 67A Corkerhill   COND  
02/09/1966 Condemned 80006 64A St Margarets   COND  
02/09/1966 Condemned 80026 64A St Margarets   COND  
02/09/1966 Condemned 80055 64A St Margarets   COND  
02/09/1966 Condemned 80113 64A St Margarets   COND  
04/09/1966 Condemned 80065 71A Eastleigh   COND  
04/09/1966 Condemned 80082 71A Eastleigh   COND  
19/09/1966 Condemned 80013 70F Bournemouth   COND  
26/09/1966 Condemned 80028 63A Perth South   COND  
26/09/1966 Condemned 80092 63A Perth South   COND  
26/09/1966 Condemned 80093 63A Perth South   COND  
02/10/1966 Condemned 80033 70B Feltham   COND  
02/10/1966 Condemned 80068 70B Feltham   COND  
02/10/1966 Condemned 80089 70A Nine Elms   COND  
02/10/1966 Condemned 80095 70A Nine Elms   COND  
02/10/1966 Condemned 80138 70F Bournemouth   COND  
17/10/1966 Reallocation 80085 70B Feltham 70A Nine Elms  
17/10/1966 Reallocation 80140 70B Feltham 70A Nine Elms  
17/10/1966 Reallocation 80151 70E Salisbury 70D Eastleigh  
17/10/1966 Reallocation 80152 70E Salisbury 70D Eastleigh  
19/11/1966 Condemned 80126 63A Perth South   COND  
29/11/1966 Condemned 80027 66A Polmadie   COND  
29/11/1966 Condemned 80091 66F Beattock   COND  
29/11/1966 Condemned 80111 66F Beattock   COND  
29/11/1966 Condemned 80118 66A Polmadie   COND  
09/12/1966 Condemned 80124 64A St Margarets   COND  
31/12/1966 Condemned 80000 67A Corkerhill   COND  
31/12/1966 Condemned 80057 66A Polmadie   COND  
31/12/1966 Condemned 80061 66A Polmadie   COND  
31/12/1966 Condemned 80114 64A St Margarets   COND  
31/12/1966 Condemned 80122 66D Greenock Ladyburn   COND  
29/01/1967 Condemned 80032 70F Bournemouth   COND  
01/03/1967 Condemned 80002 66A Polmadie   COND  
19/03/1967 Condemned 80012 70A Nine Elms   COND  
19/03/1967 Condemned 80019 70F Bournemouth   COND  
02/04/1967 Condemned 80154 70A Nine Elms   COND  
04/04/1967 Condemned 80128 67A Corkerhill   COND  
01/05/1967 Condemned 80004 67A Corkerhill   COND  
01/05/1967 Condemned 80045 66A Polmadie   COND  
01/05/1967 Condemned 80046 67A Corkerhill   COND  
01/05/1967 Condemned 80086 66A Polmadie   COND  
01/05/1967 Condemned 80116 66A Polmadie   COND  
01/05/1967 Condemned 80120 66A Polmadie   COND  
07/05/1967 Condemned 80151 70D Eastleigh   COND  
25/06/1967 Condemned 80145 70A Nine Elms   COND  
09/07/1967 Condemned 80011 70F Bournemouth   COND  
09/07/1967 Condemned 80015 70A Nine Elms   COND  
09/07/1967 Condemned 80016 70D Eastleigh   COND  
09/07/1967 Condemned 80085 70A Nine Elms   COND  
09/07/1967 Condemned 80133 70A Nine Elms   COND  
09/07/1967 Condemned 80134 70F Bournemouth   COND  
09/07/1967 Condemned 80139 70D Eastleigh   COND  
09/07/1967 Condemned 80140 70A Nine Elms   COND  
09/07/1967 Condemned 80143 70A Nine Elms   COND  
09/07/1967 Condemned 80146 70F Bournemouth   COND  
09/07/1967 Condemned 80152 70D Eastleigh   COND