Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 271 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5186 Week
» 16423 Month
» 249343 Year
» 1914719 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BR Standard Riddles "Std 4MT Tank" Class 2-6-4T


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Sat 11/02/1961 80116,
80117,
80119
55H,
55H,
55H
  Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Stripping shop.
Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
   
Sat 18/02/1961 80010,
80065,
80066,
80139,
80141,
80151
75E,
73F,
73F,
75F,
75F,
75A
  Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
   
Sat 25/02/1961 80010,
80064,
80141,
80151
75E,
73F,
75F,
75A
  Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Behind erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.
   
Sat 11/11/1961 80069 33B   Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. SLS 1/1962  
Sun 26/11/1961 80154 75A   Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. SLS 1/1962  
Sun 25/03/1962 80116 55H   Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Darlington shed. SLS 5/1962  
Tue 26/03/1963 80026 64A   Around the shed. - In steam. Keith Long  
Sun 23/10/1966 80152 70D   Salisbury depot: On shed RO 12/1966  
Fri 23/08/1968 80002 Wdn   Eastfield depot: On the triangle (dump) - Moved from carriage heating duties to the east side of the shed RO 10/1968  
Thu 12/09/1968 80002 Wdn   Eastfield depot - Back on carriage heating duties RO 11/1968