Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 66 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4558 Week
» 29392 Month
» 63724 Year
» 1729100 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

189


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
59391 30/03/1959 67C Ayr (New) 30/03/1959
59392 06/04/1959 67C Ayr (New) 06/04/1959
59393
59394
59395
59396     05/06/1981
59397
59398
59399
59400
59402 18/04/1959 67C Ayr (New) 18/04/1959
59403 20/04/1959 67C Ayr (New) 20/04/1959
59404 04/05/1959 67C Ayr (New) 04/05/1959
59405 04/05/1959 67C
Ayr (New)
04/05/1959
05/06/1981
59406      
59407      
59408      
59409      
59410      
59411      
59412