Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 218 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2383 Week
» 2383 Month
» 69245 Year
» 1734621 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

189


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
59391 30/03/1959 Ayr 61.97
59392 06/04/1959 Ayr 61.95
59393
59394
59395
59396
59397
59398
59399
59400
59402 18/04/1959 Ayr 61.92
59403 20/04/1959 Ayr 61.91
59404 04/05/1959 Ayr 61.87
59405 04/05/1959 Ayr 61.87
59406
59407
59408
59409
59410
59411
59412