MR/LMS Johnson "3F" Class 0-6-0
Class | LMS | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
3F | 3174 | 43174 | 10/1887 | 15D 41B W |
Bedford Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/03/1958 20/02/1960 |
20/02/1960 |
3F | 3178 | 43178 | 1887 | 22A 16A 20E 20F 55F W |
Bristol Barrow Road Nottingham Manningham Skipton Manningham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/03/1949 19/03/1949 30/01/1954 15/06/1957 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |
3F | 3180 | 43180 | 1887 | 19C 19C W |
Canklow Canklow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/01/1948 17/01/1959 |
17/01/1959 |
3F | 3181 | 43181 | 1887 | 19C 19C 19A W |
Canklow Canklow Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/01/1948 03/12/1955 13/04/1957 |
13/04/1957 |
3F | 3183 | 43183 | 1887 | 15C 20D W |
Leicester Midland Normanton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/01/1953 27/06/1959 |
27/06/1959 |
3F | 3185 | 43185 | 1887 | 15D 15D 17D 17A 10D 9D W |
Bedford Bedford Rowsley Derby Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 10/04/1948 17/04/1948 25/01/1958 08/10/1960 19/08/1961 |
19/08/1961 |
3F | 3186 | 43186 | 1887 | 20G 18A 21C 21C 21B W |
Hellifield Toton Bromsgrove Bromsgrove Bournville Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/06/1950 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 13/12/1958 03/01/1959 |
03/01/1959 |
3F | 3187 | 43187 | 1887 | 20H 5B 9B 3E 3D 5B 9G W |
Lancaster Green Ayre Crewe South Stockport Edgeley Monument Lane Aston Crewe South Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/02/1952 27/02/1954 29/01/1955 25/01/1958 22/03/1958 10/01/1959 20/08/1960 |
20/08/1960 |
3F | 3188 | 43188 | 1887 | 17B W |
Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/04/1960 |
23/04/1960 |
3F | 3189 | 43189 | 1887 | 11A 8B 5B 5B 9A 9G 3A 8B W |
Carnforth Warrington Dallam Crewe South Crewe South Longsight Gorton Bescot Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/03/1948 31/12/1949 14/01/1950 16/06/1957 20/12/1958 28/02/1959 18/06/1960 03/12/1960 |
03/12/1960 |
3F | 3137 | 43750 | 1885 | 20G 17A 17D W |
Hellifield Derby Rowsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/01/1949 04/12/1954 24/10/1959 |
24/10/1959 |