BR Standard Riddles "Std 5MT" Class 4-6-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/04/1951 | To Service | 73000 | NEW | 17A | Derby | ||
05/1951 | To Service | 73003 | NEW | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
09/05/1951 | To Service | 73001 | NEW | 17A | Derby | ||
18/05/1951 | To Service | 73002 | NEW | 17A | Derby | ||
26/05/1951 | Reallocation | 73000 | 17A | Derby | 17A | Derby | |
08/06/1951 | To Service | 73004 | NEW | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
20/06/1951 | To Service | 73005 | NEW | 63A | Perth South | ||
28/06/1951 | To Service | 73006 | NEW | 63A | Perth South | ||
09/07/1951 | To Service | 73007 | NEW | 63A | Perth South | ||
13/07/1951 | To Service | 73008 | NEW | 63A | Perth South | ||
19/07/1951 | To Service | 73009 | NEW | 63A | Perth South | ||
11/08/1951 | Reallocation | 73008 | 63A | Perth South | Rugby Testing Station | ||
14/08/1951 | To Service | 73010 | NEW | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
17/08/1951 | To Service | 73011 | NEW | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
24/08/1951 | To Service | 73012 | NEW | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
31/08/1951 | To Service | 73013 | NEW | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
06/09/1951 | To Service | 73014 | NEW | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 73008 | Rugby Testing Station | ||||
12/09/1951 | To Service | 73015 | NEW | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
21/09/1951 | To Service | 73016 | NEW | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
28/09/1951 | To Service | 73017 | NEW | 16A | Nottingham | ||
04/10/1951 | To Service | 73018 | NEW | 16A | Nottingham | ||
05/11/1951 | To Service | 73023 | NEW | 10C | Patricroft | ||
18/12/1951 | To Service | 73027 | NEW | 28A | Blackpool Central | ||
28/12/1951 | To Service | 73028 | NEW | 28A | Blackpool Central | ||
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 73004 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 17A | Derby | |
17/01/1952 | To Service | 73029 | NEW | 28A | Blackpool Central | ||
26/01/1952 | Reallocation | 73002 | 17A | Derby | 17A | Derby | |
26/01/1952 | Reallocation | 73004 | 17A | Derby | 15C | Leicester Midland | |
23/02/1952 | Reallocation | 73016 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 73000 | 17A | Derby | 17A | Derby | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 73008 | 63A | Perth South | |||
06/09/1952 | Reallocation | 73020 | 1A | Willesden | |||
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 73020 | 1A | Willesden | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
24/01/1953 | Reallocation | 73000 | 17A | Derby | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | |
24/01/1953 | Reallocation | 73016 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | 17A | Derby | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 73000 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | 17A | Derby | |
21/03/1953 | Reallocation | 73016 | 17A | Derby | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | |
06/1953 | Reallocation | 73029 | 28A | Blackpool Central | |||
07/1953 | Reallocation | 73030 | Rugby Testing Station | ||||
03/07/1953 | To Service | 73031 | NEW | 17A | Derby | ||
10/07/1953 | To Service | 73032 | NEW | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
07/08/1953 | To Service | 73033 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
14/08/1953 | To Service | 73034 | NEW | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
24/08/1953 | To Service | 73035 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
01/09/1953 | To Service | 73036 | NEW | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73000 | 17A | Derby | 16A | Nottingham | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73002 | 17A | Derby | 16A | Nottingham | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73011 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73012 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73013 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73014 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73015 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73017 | 16A | Nottingham | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73018 | 16A | Nottingham | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73019 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |||
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73020 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 84K | Chester West | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73021 | 84K | Chester West | |||
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73022 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |||
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73023 | 10C | Patricroft | 84K | Chester West | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73024 | 84K | Chester West | |||
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73025 | 84G | Shrewsbury | |||
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73026 | 84G | Shrewsbury | |||
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73027 | 28A | Blackpool Central | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73028 | 28A | Blackpool Central | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73029 | 28A | Blackpool Central | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73032 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73033 | 66A | Polmadie | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73034 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73035 | 66A | Polmadie | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73036 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73037 | 84G | Shrewsbury | |||
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73038 | 84K | Chester West | |||
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 73039 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |||
05/10/1953 | To Service | 73040 | NEW | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
14/10/1953 | To Service | 73041 | NEW | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
27/10/1953 | To Service | 73042 | NEW | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
30/10/1953 | To Service | 73043 | NEW | 10C | Patricroft | ||
09/11/1953 | To Service | 73044 | NEW | 10C | Patricroft | ||
18/11/1953 | To Service | 73045 | NEW | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
25/11/1953 | To Service | 73046 | NEW | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
28/11/1953 | Reallocation | 73030 | 17A | Derby | |||
08/12/1953 | To Service | 73047 | NEW | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
17/12/1953 | To Service | 73048 | NEW | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
26/12/1953 | Reallocation | 73022 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 87E | Landore | |
26/12/1953 | Reallocation | 73029 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 87G | Carmarthen | |
30/12/1953 | To Service | 73049 | NEW | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
30/01/1954 | Reallocation | 73022 | 87E | Landore | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
30/01/1954 | Reallocation | 73029 | 87G | Carmarthen | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
14/04/1954 | To Service | 73050 | NEW | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
10/05/1954 | To Service | 73051 | NEW | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
20/05/1954 | To Service | 73052 | NEW | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
06/1954 | To Service | 73054 | NEW | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
04/06/1954 | To Service | 73053 | NEW | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
17/07/1954 | Reallocation | 73022 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82C | Swindon | |
17/07/1954 | Reallocation | 73025 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
17/07/1954 | Reallocation | 73026 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
17/07/1954 | Reallocation | 73027 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82C | Swindon | |
07/08/1954 | Reallocation | 73055 | 66A | Polmadie | |||
07/08/1954 | Reallocation | 73056 | 66A | Polmadie | |||
07/08/1954 | Reallocation | 73057 | 66A | Polmadie | |||
07/08/1954 | Reallocation | 73058 | 66A | Polmadie | |||
26/08/1954 | To Service | 73060 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
31/08/1954 | Reallocation | 73059 | 66A | Polmadie | |||
02/09/1954 | To Service | 73061 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
15/09/1954 | To Service | 73062 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
29/09/1954 | To Service | 73063 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
10/1954 | Reallocation | 73062 | 66A | Polmadie | |||
10/1954 | Reallocation | 73063 | 66A | Polmadie | |||
10/1954 | To Service | 73067 | NEW | 16A | Nottingham | ||
10/1954 | To Service | 73068 | NEW | 17A | Derby | ||
01/10/1954 | To Service | 73064 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 73020 | 84K | Chester West | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 73024 | 84K | Chester West | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
13/10/1954 | To Service | 73065 | NEW | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
15/10/1954 | To Service | 73066 | NEW | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
06/11/1954 | To Service | 73069 | NEW | 17A | Derby | ||
13/11/1954 | To Service | 73070 | NEW | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
20/11/1954 | To Service | 73071 | NEW | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
11/12/1954 | To Service | 73072 | NEW | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
18/12/1954 | To Service | 73073 | NEW | 10C | Patricroft | ||
25/12/1954 | To Service | 73074 | NEW | 10C | Patricroft | ||
20/04/1955 | Reallocation | 73073 | 10C | Patricroft | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
20/04/1955 | Reallocation | 73074 | 10C | Patricroft | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
22/04/1955 | To Service | 73075 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
29/04/1955 | To Service | 73076 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
13/05/1955 | To Service | 73077 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
21/05/1955 | To Service | 73078 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
31/05/1955 | To Service | 73079 | NEW | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
06/1955 | To Service | 73080 | NEW | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
17/06/1955 | To Service | 73081 | NEW | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
24/06/1955 | To Service | 73082 | NEW | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
07/1955 | Reallocation | 73082 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | |||
07/1955 | To Service | 73083 | NEW | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
16/07/1955 | Reallocation | 73013 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 84K | Chester West | |
29/07/1955 | To Service | 73084 | NEW | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
05/08/1955 | To Service | 73085 | NEW | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
12/08/1955 | Reallocation | 73047 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
12/08/1955 | Reallocation | 73049 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
13/08/1955 | Reallocation | 73014 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
13/08/1955 | Reallocation | 73054 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 17A | Derby | |
13/08/1955 | Reallocation | 73069 | 17A | Derby | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | |
13/08/1955 | Reallocation | 73073 | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 15C | Leicester Midland | |
13/08/1955 | Reallocation | 73074 | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | |
16/08/1955 | To Service | 73086 | NEW | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
26/08/1955 | To Service | 73087 | NEW | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
26/08/1955 | To Service | 73100 | NEW | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
01/09/1955 | To Service | 73088 | NEW | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
01/09/1955 | To Service | 73101 | NEW | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
09/09/1955 | To Service | 73089 | NEW | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
14/09/1955 | To Service | 73102 | NEW | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
21/09/1955 | To Service | 73103 | NEW | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
24/09/1955 | To Service | 73110 | NEW | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
27/09/1955 | To Service | 73104 | NEW | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
08/10/1955 | To Service | 73090 | NEW | 10C | Patricroft | ||
14/10/1955 | To Service | 73091 | NEW | 10C | Patricroft | ||
15/10/1955 | To Service | 73111 | NEW | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
22/10/1955 | To Service | 73112 | NEW | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
29/10/1955 | Reallocation | 73060 | 66A | Polmadie | 66B | Motherwell | |
29/10/1955 | Reallocation | 73061 | 66A | Polmadie | 66B | Motherwell | |
29/10/1955 | Reallocation | 73062 | 66A | Polmadie | 66B | Motherwell | |
11/1955 | To Service | 73095 | NEW | 10C | Patricroft | ||
10/11/1955 | To Service | 73094 | NEW | 10C | Patricroft | ||
15/11/1955 | To Service | 73115 | NEW | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
15/11/1955 | To Service | 73116 | NEW | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
25/11/1955 | To Service | 73096 | NEW | 10C | Patricroft | ||
25/11/1955 | To Service | 73117 | NEW | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
12/1955 | To Service | 73106 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
12/1955 | To Service | 73108 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
06/12/1955 | To Service | 73097 | NEW | 10C | Patricroft | ||
09/12/1955 | To Service | 73105 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
09/12/1955 | To Service | 73119 | NEW | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
15/12/1955 | To Service | 73098 | NEW | 10C | Patricroft | ||
23/12/1955 | To Service | 73107 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
30/12/1955 | To Service | 73099 | NEW | 10C | Patricroft | ||
01/1956 | To Service | 73109 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
10/01/1956 | To Service | 73120 | NEW | 63A | Perth South | ||
19/01/1956 | To Service | 73121 | NEW | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
30/01/1956 | To Service | 73122 | NEW | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
10/02/1956 | To Service | 73123 | NEW | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
18/02/1956 | Reallocation | 73071 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 34A | Kings Cross | |
24/02/1956 | To Service | 73124 | NEW | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
25/02/1956 | Reallocation | 73074 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | |
24/03/1956 | Reallocation | 73001 | 17A | Derby | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
24/03/1956 | Reallocation | 73015 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 17A | Derby | |
24/03/1956 | Reallocation | 73074 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 73017 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
06/07/1956 | To Service | 73125 | NEW | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
13/07/1956 | To Service | 73126 | NEW | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
14/07/1956 | Reallocation | 73017 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
14/07/1956 | Reallocation | 73024 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
09/08/1956 | To Service | 73127 | NEW | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
27/08/1956 | Reallocation | 73087 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
27/08/1956 | Reallocation | 73116 | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |||
28/08/1956 | To Service | 73128 | NEW | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
31/08/1956 | To Service | 73129 | NEW | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
12/09/1956 | To Service | 73130 | NEW | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
24/09/1956 | To Service | 73131 | NEW | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
10/1956 | Reallocation | 73110 | 70A | Nine Elms | |||
10/1956 | Reallocation | 73111 | 70A | Nine Elms | |||
10/1956 | Reallocation | 73112 | 70A | Nine Elms | |||
10/1956 | To Service | 73113 | NEW | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
04/10/1956 | To Service | 73132 | NEW | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
11/10/1956 | To Service | 73133 | NEW | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
18/10/1956 | To Service | 73134 | NEW | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
27/10/1956 | Reallocation | 73087 | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 71A | Eastleigh | |
27/10/1956 | Reallocation | 73116 | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 71A | Eastleigh | |
27/10/1956 | To Service | 73135 | NEW | 6J | Holyhead | ||
11/1956 | To Service | 73114 | NEW | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
11/1956 | Reallocation | 73115 | 70A | Nine Elms | |||
11/1956 | Reallocation | 73116 | 71A | Eastleigh | 70A | Nine Elms | |
11/1956 | Reallocation | 73117 | 70A | Nine Elms | |||
03/11/1956 | Reallocation | 73033 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 84B | Oxley | |
03/11/1956 | Reallocation | 73034 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 84B | Oxley | |
03/11/1956 | Reallocation | 73035 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 84B | Oxley | |
03/11/1956 | Reallocation | 73036 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 84E | Tyseley | |
03/11/1956 | Reallocation | 73037 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 84E | Tyseley | |
03/11/1956 | To Service | 73136 | NEW | 6J | Holyhead | ||
09/11/1956 | To Service | 73137 | NEW | 6J | Holyhead | ||
15/11/1956 | To Service | 73138 | NEW | 6J | Holyhead | ||
22/11/1956 | To Service | 73139 | NEW | 6J | Holyhead | ||
29/11/1956 | To Service | 73140 | NEW | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
12/1956 | To Service | 73118 | NEW | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
12/1956 | Reallocation | 73119 | 70A | Nine Elms | |||
01/12/1956 | Reallocation | 73001 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 82C | Swindon | |
01/12/1956 | Reallocation | 73012 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 82C | Swindon | |
01/12/1956 | Reallocation | 73017 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 82C | Swindon | |
01/12/1956 | Reallocation | 73018 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 82C | Swindon | |
01/12/1956 | Reallocation | 73020 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 82C | Swindon | |
06/12/1956 | To Service | 73141 | NEW | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
13/12/1956 | To Service | 73142 | NEW | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
19/12/1956 | To Service | 73155 | NEW | 34E | Neasden | ||
19/12/1956 | To Service | 73156 | NEW | 34E | Neasden | ||
20/12/1956 | To Service | 73143 | NEW | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
28/12/1956 | To Service | 73144 | NEW | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
28/12/1956 | To Service | 73157 | NEW | 34E | Neasden | ||
28/12/1956 | To Service | 73158 | NEW | 34E | Neasden | ||
11/01/1957 | To Service | 73159 | NEW | 34E | Neasden | ||
23/01/1957 | To Service | 73160 | NEW | 52A | Gateshead | ||
24/01/1957 | To Service | 73145 | NEW | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
26/01/1957 | Reallocation | 73004 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 17E | Heaton Mersey | |
26/01/1957 | Reallocation | 73138 | 6J | Holyhead | 15C | Leicester Midland | |
26/01/1957 | Reallocation | 73140 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 6J | Holyhead | |
27/01/1957 | To Service | 73161 | NEW | 52A | Gateshead | ||
02/1957 | Reallocation | 73161 | 52A | Gateshead | |||
02/1957 | To Service | 73163 | NEW | 50A | York (North) | ||
12/02/1957 | To Service | 73146 | NEW | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
13/02/1957 | To Service | 73147 | NEW | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
15/02/1957 | To Service | 73162 | NEW | 50A | York (North) | ||
03/1957 | To Service | 73165 | NEW | 50A | York (North) | ||
05/03/1957 | To Service | 73164 | NEW | 50A | York (North) | ||
07/03/1957 | To Service | 73148 | NEW | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
20/03/1957 | To Service | 73149 | NEW | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
23/03/1957 | Reallocation | 73004 | 17E | Heaton Mersey | 15C | Leicester Midland | |
29/03/1957 | To Service | 73166 | NEW | 50A | York (North) | ||
04/04/1957 | To Service | 73150 | NEW | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
13/04/1957 | To Service | 73167 | NEW | 50A | York (North) | ||
18/04/1957 | To Service | 73151 | NEW | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
18/04/1957 | To Service | 73168 | NEW | 50A | York (North) | ||
26/04/1957 | To Service | 73169 | NEW | 50A | York (North) | ||
09/05/1957 | To Service | 73152 | NEW | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
17/05/1957 | To Service | 73170 | NEW | 50A | York (North) | ||
18/05/1957 | Reallocation | 73015 | 17A | Derby | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | |
18/05/1957 | Reallocation | 73054 | 17A | Derby | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | |
18/05/1957 | Reallocation | 73068 | 17A | Derby | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | |
18/05/1957 | Reallocation | 73071 | 34A | Kings Cross | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
24/05/1957 | To Service | 73153 | NEW | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
24/05/1957 | To Service | 73171 | NEW | 50A | York (North) | ||
14/06/1957 | To Service | 73154 | NEW | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
16/06/1957 | Reallocation | 73031 | 17A | Derby | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | |
06/07/1957 | Reallocation | 73061 | 66B | Motherwell | 66A | Polmadie | |
06/07/1957 | Reallocation | 73062 | 66B | Motherwell | 66A | Polmadie | |
06/07/1957 | Reallocation | 73106 | 65A | Eastfield | 60A | Inverness | |
06/07/1957 | Reallocation | 73107 | 65A | Eastfield | 60A | Inverness | |
19/07/1957 | Reallocation | 73087 | 71A | Eastleigh | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
19/07/1957 | Reallocation | 73116 | 70A | Nine Elms | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
10/08/1957 | Reallocation | 73041 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 6J | Holyhead | |
10/08/1957 | Reallocation | 73042 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 6J | Holyhead | |
31/08/1957 | Reallocation | 73060 | 66B | Motherwell | 66A | Polmadie | |
21/09/1957 | Reallocation | 73160 | 52A | Gateshead | 55E | Normanton | |
21/09/1957 | Reallocation | 73161 | 52A | Gateshead | 55E | Normanton | |
21/09/1957 | Reallocation | 73171 | 50A | York (North) | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
05/10/1957 | Reallocation | 73029 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82C | Swindon | |
08/10/1957 | Reallocation | 73087 | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 73A | Stewarts Lane | |
08/10/1957 | Reallocation | 73116 | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 70A | Nine Elms | |
26/10/1957 | Reallocation | 73106 | 60A | Inverness | 63A | Perth South | |
26/10/1957 | Reallocation | 73107 | 60A | Inverness | 63A | Perth South | |
09/11/1957 | Reallocation | 73157 | 34E | Neasden | 34A | Kings Cross | |
09/11/1957 | Reallocation | 73158 | 34E | Neasden | 34A | Kings Cross | |
09/11/1957 | Reallocation | 73159 | 34E | Neasden | 34A | Kings Cross | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 73003 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 73030 | 17A | Derby | 15C | Leicester Midland | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 73031 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | Rugby Testing Station | ||
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 73036 | 84E | Tyseley | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 73037 | 84E | Tyseley | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
22/02/1958 | Reallocation | 73067 | 16A | Nottingham | 15C | Leicester Midland | |
14/04/1958 | Reallocation | 73143 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 15C | Nottingham | |
19/04/1958 | Reallocation | 73144 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 16A | Nottingham | |
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 73000 | 16A | Nottingham | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | |
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 73002 | 16A | Nottingham | 41D | Canklow | |
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 73004 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | |
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 73043 | 10C | Patricroft | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | |
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 73046 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | |
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 73067 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | |
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 73073 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | |
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 73155 | 34E | Neasden | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | |
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 73156 | 34E | Neasden | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | |
17/05/1958 | Reallocation | 73030 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 10C | Patricroft | |
17/05/1958 | Reallocation | 73087 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
17/05/1958 | Reallocation | 73088 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
17/05/1958 | Reallocation | 73135 | 6J | Holyhead | 15C | Leicester Midland | |
17/05/1958 | Reallocation | 73136 | 6J | Holyhead | 15C | Leicester Midland | |
17/05/1958 | Reallocation | 73137 | 6J | Holyhead | 15C | Leicester Midland | |
17/05/1958 | Reallocation | 73139 | 6J | Holyhead | 15C | Leicester Midland | |
17/05/1958 | Reallocation | 73140 | 6J | Holyhead | 15C | Leicester Midland | |
06/06/1958 | Reallocation | 73089 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 70A | Nine Elms | |
12/06/1958 | Reallocation | 73087 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
12/06/1958 | Reallocation | 73116 | 70A | Nine Elms | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 73019 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 73028 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 73032 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 73033 | 84B | Oxley | 6E | Chester West | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 73034 | 84B | Oxley | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 73035 | 84B | Oxley | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 73039 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 73137 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 16A | Nottingham | |
12/07/1958 | Reallocation | 73137 | 16A | Nottingham | 15C | Leicester Midland | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 73014 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 6E | Chester West | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 73024 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 6E | Chester West | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 73025 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 6E | Chester West | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 73026 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 6E | Chester West | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 73090 | 10C | Patricroft | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 73091 | 10C | Patricroft | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 73092 | 84G | Shrewsbury | |||
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 73093 | 84G | Shrewsbury | |||
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 73094 | 10C | Patricroft | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 73095 | 10C | Patricroft | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 73096 | 10C | Patricroft | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 73097 | 10C | Patricroft | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 73125 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 26F | Patricroft | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 73126 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 26F | Patricroft | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 73127 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 26F | Patricroft | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 73128 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 26F | Patricroft | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 73129 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 26F | Patricroft | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 73130 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 26F | Patricroft | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 73131 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 26F | Patricroft | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 73132 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 26F | Patricroft | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 73133 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 26F | Patricroft | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 73134 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 26F | Patricroft | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 73014 | 6E | Chester West | 6E | Chester West | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 73024 | 6E | Chester West | 6E | Chester West | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 73025 | 6E | Chester West | 6E | Chester West | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 73098 | 10C | Patricroft | 6E | Chester West | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 73099 | 10C | Patricroft | 6E | Chester West | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 73140 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
11/10/1958 | Reallocation | 73140 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 15C | Leicester Midland | |
13/10/1958 | Reallocation | 73017 | 82C | Swindon | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
13/10/1958 | Reallocation | 73018 | 82C | Swindon | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
13/10/1958 | Reallocation | 73020 | 82C | Swindon | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
13/10/1958 | Reallocation | 73022 | 82C | Swindon | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
13/10/1958 | Reallocation | 73029 | 82C | Swindon | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
13/10/1958 | Reallocation | 73087 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 70A | Nine Elms | |
13/10/1958 | Reallocation | 73088 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 70A | Nine Elms | |
15/11/1958 | Reallocation | 73157 | 34A | Kings Cross | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
15/11/1958 | Reallocation | 73158 | 34A | Kings Cross | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
15/11/1958 | Reallocation | 73159 | 34A | Kings Cross | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
15/11/1958 | Reallocation | 73162 | 50A | York (North) | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | |
15/11/1958 | Reallocation | 73163 | 50A | York (North) | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | |
15/11/1958 | Reallocation | 73164 | 50A | York (North) | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | |
15/11/1958 | Reallocation | 73165 | 50A | York (North) | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | |
15/11/1958 | Reallocation | 73166 | 50A | York (North) | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | |
22/11/1958 | Reallocation | 73072 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 66A | Polmadie | |
22/11/1958 | Reallocation | 73098 | 6E | Chester West | 66A | Polmadie | |
22/11/1958 | Reallocation | 73099 | 6E | Chester West | 66A | Polmadie | |
27/12/1958 | Reallocation | 73157 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 14D | Neasden | |
27/12/1958 | Reallocation | 73159 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 14D | Neasden | |
03/01/1959 | Reallocation | 73158 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 14D | Neasden | |
05/01/1959 | Reallocation | 73143 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 17A | Derby | |
05/01/1959 | Reallocation | 73143 | 17A | Derby | 17A | Nottingham | |
10/01/1959 | Reallocation | 73074 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | |
10/01/1959 | Reallocation | 73135 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 17A | Derby | |
10/01/1959 | Reallocation | 73136 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 17A | Derby | |
10/01/1959 | Reallocation | 73137 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 17A | Derby | |
10/01/1959 | Reallocation | 73138 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 17A | Derby | |
10/01/1959 | Reallocation | 73139 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 17A | Derby | |
10/01/1959 | Reallocation | 73140 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 17A | Derby | |
10/01/1959 | Reallocation | 73141 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 17A | Derby | |
10/01/1959 | Reallocation | 73142 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 17A | Derby | |
10/01/1959 | Reallocation | 73143 | 17A | Derby | 16A | Nottingham | |
10/01/1959 | Reallocation | 73144 | 16A | Nottingham | 16A | Nottingham | |
10/01/1959 | Reallocation | 73156 | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | |
14/01/1959 | Reallocation | 73143 | 16A | Nottingham | 17A | Derby | |
31/01/1959 | Reallocation | 73167 | 50A | York (North) | 50E | Scarborough | |
31/01/1959 | Reallocation | 73168 | 50A | York (North) | 50E | Scarborough | |
31/01/1959 | Reallocation | 73169 | 50A | York (North) | 50E | Scarborough | |
31/01/1959 | Reallocation | 73170 | 50A | York (North) | 50E | Scarborough | |
07/02/1959 | Reallocation | 73144 | 16A | Nottingham | 17A | Derby | |
21/02/1959 | Reallocation | 73157 | 14D | Neasden | 17A | Derby | |
21/02/1959 | Reallocation | 73158 | 14D | Neasden | 17A | Derby | |
21/02/1959 | Reallocation | 73159 | 14D | Neasden | 17A | Derby | |
11/04/1959 | Reallocation | 73021 | 84K | Chester West | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
11/04/1959 | Reallocation | 73023 | 84K | Chester West | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
11/04/1959 | Reallocation | 73024 | 6E | Chester West | 86C | Cardiff Canton | |
11/04/1959 | Reallocation | 73025 | 6E | Chester West | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
11/04/1959 | Reallocation | 73026 | 6E | Chester West | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
25/04/1959 | Reallocation | 73166 | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
13/06/1959 | Reallocation | 73087 | 70A | Nine Elms | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
13/06/1959 | Reallocation | 73116 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 73041 | 6J | Holyhead | 70A | Nine Elms | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 73042 | 6J | Holyhead | 70A | Nine Elms | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 73080 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 70A | Nine Elms | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 73081 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 70A | Nine Elms | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 73082 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 70A | Nine Elms | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 73083 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 70A | Nine Elms | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 73084 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 70A | Nine Elms | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 73085 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 70A | Nine Elms | |
14/06/1959 | Reallocation | 73086 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 70A | Nine Elms | |
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 73167 | 50E | Scarborough | 55E | Normanton | |
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 73168 | 50E | Scarborough | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 73169 | 50E | Scarborough | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 73170 | 50E | Scarborough | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
12/09/1959 | Reallocation | 73010 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | |
12/09/1959 | Reallocation | 73045 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | |
12/09/1959 | Reallocation | 73053 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | |
12/09/1959 | Reallocation | 73066 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | |
12/09/1959 | Reallocation | 73069 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | |
26/09/1959 | Reallocation | 73013 | 84K | Chester West | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
26/09/1959 | Reallocation | 73033 | 6E | Chester West | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
21/11/1959 | Reallocation | 73135 | 17A | Derby | 17C | Rowsley | |
21/11/1959 | Reallocation | 73136 | 17A | Derby | 17C | Rowsley | |
21/11/1959 | Reallocation | 73137 | 17A | Derby | 17C | Rowsley | |
21/11/1959 | Reallocation | 73138 | 17A | Derby | 17C | Rowsley | |
21/11/1959 | Reallocation | 73139 | 17A | Derby | 17C | Rowsley | |
21/11/1959 | Reallocation | 73140 | 17A | Derby | 17C | Rowsley | |
21/11/1959 | Reallocation | 73141 | 17A | Derby | 17C | Rowsley | |
21/11/1959 | Reallocation | 73142 | 17A | Derby | 17C | Rowsley | |
21/11/1959 | Reallocation | 73143 | 17A | Derby | 17C | Rowsley | |
21/11/1959 | Reallocation | 73144 | 17A | Derby | 17C | Rowsley | |
26/11/1959 | Reallocation | 73041 | 70A | Nine Elms | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
26/11/1959 | Reallocation | 73042 | 70A | Nine Elms | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
26/11/1959 | Reallocation | 73080 | 70A | Nine Elms | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
09/01/1960 | Reallocation | 73002 | 41D | Canklow | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | |
06/02/1960 | Reallocation | 73004 | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
06/02/1960 | Reallocation | 73011 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | 6J | Holyhead | |
06/02/1960 | Reallocation | 73048 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
06/02/1960 | Reallocation | 73067 | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | 6J | Holyhead | |
06/02/1960 | Reallocation | 73073 | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | 6J | Holyhead | |
05/04/1960 | Reallocation | 73087 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 70A | Nine Elms | |
05/04/1960 | Reallocation | 73116 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 70A | Nine Elms | |
09/04/1960 | Reallocation | 73014 | 6E | Chester West | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
09/04/1960 | Reallocation | 73038 | 84K | Chester West | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
23/04/1960 | Reallocation | 73021 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
23/04/1960 | Reallocation | 73024 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
23/04/1960 | Reallocation | 73049 | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
14/05/1960 | Reallocation | 73004 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 1A | Willesden | |
14/05/1960 | Reallocation | 73013 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 1A | Willesden | |
14/05/1960 | Reallocation | 73014 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 1A | Willesden | |
14/05/1960 | Reallocation | 73033 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 1A | Willesden | |
21/05/1960 | Reallocation | 73021 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 87F | Llanelli | |
21/05/1960 | Reallocation | 73023 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 87F | Llanelli | |
21/05/1960 | Reallocation | 73032 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 1A | Willesden | |
21/05/1960 | Reallocation | 73039 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 1A | Willesden | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 73010 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | 14D | Neasden | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 73045 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | 14D | Neasden | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 73053 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | 14D | Neasden | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 73066 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | 14D | Neasden | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 73069 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | 14D | Neasden | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 73087 | 70A | Nine Elms | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 73157 | 17A | Derby | 14D | Neasden | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 73158 | 17A | Derby | 14D | Neasden | |
18/06/1960 | Reallocation | 73159 | 17A | Derby | 14D | Neasden | |
16/07/1960 | Reallocation | 73019 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
16/07/1960 | Reallocation | 73028 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
30/07/1960 | Reallocation | 73099 | 66A | Polmadie | 66C | Hamilton (West) | |
17/09/1960 | Reallocation | 73156 | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 17A | Derby | |
17/09/1960 | Reallocation | 73166 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | |
24/09/1960 | Reallocation | 73156 | 17A | Derby | 14D | Neasden | |
08/10/1960 | Reallocation | 73019 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
08/10/1960 | Reallocation | 73028 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
08/10/1960 | Reallocation | 73032 | 1A | Willesden | 14D | Neasden | |
07/01/1961 | Reallocation | 73000 | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 41D | Canklow | |
18/03/1961 | Reallocation | 73041 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 71A | Eastleigh | |
18/03/1961 | Reallocation | 73042 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 71A | Eastleigh | |
18/03/1961 | Reallocation | 73080 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 71A | Eastleigh | |
15/04/1961 | Reallocation | 73043 | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 41D | Canklow | |
15/04/1961 | Reallocation | 73074 | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 41D | Canklow | |
22/04/1961 | Reallocation | 73054 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
29/04/1961 | Reallocation | 73002 | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | 41D | Canklow | |
29/04/1961 | Reallocation | 73046 | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | 41D | Canklow | |
03/05/1961 | Reallocation | 73041 | 71A | Eastleigh | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
03/05/1961 | Reallocation | 73042 | 71A | Eastleigh | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
03/05/1961 | Reallocation | 73080 | 71A | Eastleigh | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
20/05/1961 | Reallocation | 73028 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 73087 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 73162 | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 55H | Neville Hill | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 73169 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 55H | Neville Hill | |
23/08/1961 | Reallocation | 73087 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 70A | Nine Elms | |
30/09/1961 | Reallocation | 73140 | 17C | Rowsley | 17A | Derby | |
30/09/1961 | Reallocation | 73144 | 17C | Rowsley | 17A | Derby | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 73091 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 73092 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 73093 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 73094 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
07/10/1961 | Reallocation | 73168 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 55H | Neville Hill | |
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 73099 | 66C | Hamilton (West) | 66A | Polmadie | |
02/12/1961 | Reallocation | 73031 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |||
02/12/1961 | Reallocation | 73094 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | |
06/01/1962 | Reallocation | 73000 | 41D | Canklow | 17A | Derby | |
06/01/1962 | Reallocation | 73016 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | 41D | Canklow | |
06/01/1962 | Reallocation | 73065 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | 41D | Canklow | |
06/01/1962 | Reallocation | 73155 | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | 41D | Canklow | |
10/02/1962 | Reallocation | 73144 | 17A | Derby | 17C | Rowsley | |
03/03/1962 | Reallocation | 73140 | 17A | Derby | 17C | Rowsley | |
07/04/1962 | Reallocation | 73135 | 17C | Rowsley | 17C | Rowsley | |
07/04/1962 | Reallocation | 73136 | 17C | Rowsley | 17C | Rowsley | |
07/04/1962 | Reallocation | 73137 | 17C | Rowsley | 17C | Rowsley | |
07/04/1962 | Reallocation | 73138 | 17C | Rowsley | 17C | Rowsley | |
14/04/1962 | Reallocation | 73166 | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
21/04/1962 | Reallocation | 73019 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | |
21/04/1962 | Reallocation | 73031 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | |
21/04/1962 | Reallocation | 73037 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 87F | Llanelli | |
26/05/1962 | Reallocation | 73137 | 17C | Rowsley | 15C | Leicester Midland | |
09/06/1962 | Reallocation | 73033 | 1A | Willesden | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
16/06/1962 | Reallocation | 73033 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 1A | Willesden | |
16/06/1962 | Reallocation | 73049 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
23/06/1962 | Reallocation | 73137 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 17C | Rowsley | |
23/06/1962 | Reallocation | 73161 | 55E | Normanton | 55H | Neville Hill | |
30/06/1962 | Reallocation | 73010 | 14D | Neasden | 2F | Woodford Halse | |
30/06/1962 | Reallocation | 73032 | 14D | Neasden | 2F | Woodford Halse | |
30/06/1962 | Reallocation | 73045 | 14D | Neasden | 2F | Woodford Halse | |
30/06/1962 | Reallocation | 73053 | 14D | Neasden | 2F | Woodford Halse | |
30/06/1962 | Reallocation | 73066 | 14D | Neasden | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | |
30/06/1962 | Reallocation | 73069 | 14D | Neasden | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | |
30/06/1962 | Reallocation | 73156 | 14D | Neasden | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | |
30/06/1962 | Reallocation | 73157 | 14D | Neasden | 14A | Cricklewood East | |
30/06/1962 | Reallocation | 73158 | 14D | Neasden | 14A | Cricklewood East | |
30/06/1962 | Reallocation | 73159 | 14D | Neasden | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | |
14/07/1962 | Reallocation | 73021 | 87F | Llanelli | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
14/07/1962 | Reallocation | 73024 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
14/07/1962 | Reallocation | 73049 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
14/07/1962 | Reallocation | 73096 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | |
28/07/1962 | Reallocation | 73033 | 1A | Willesden | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
11/08/1962 | Reallocation | 73024 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
11/08/1962 | Reallocation | 73033 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 1A | Willesden | |
11/08/1962 | Reallocation | 73050 | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | |
15/09/1962 | Reallocation | 73166 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 55D | Royston | |
15/09/1962 | Reallocation | 73170 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 55D | Royston | |
15/09/1962 | Reallocation | 73171 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 55D | Royston | |
22/09/1962 | Reallocation | 73000 | 17A | Derby | 2F | Woodford Halse | |
06/10/1962 | Reallocation | 73021 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | |
06/10/1962 | Reallocation | 73024 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | |
06/10/1962 | Reallocation | 73068 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | |
17/11/1962 | Reallocation | 73038 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
17/11/1962 | Reallocation | 73050 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
08/12/1962 | Reallocation | 73002 | 41D | Canklow | 71A | Eastleigh | |
08/12/1962 | Reallocation | 73016 | 41D | Canklow | 71A | Eastleigh | |
08/12/1962 | Reallocation | 73043 | 41D | Canklow | 71A | Eastleigh | |
08/12/1962 | Reallocation | 73046 | 41D | Canklow | 70A | Nine Elms | |
08/12/1962 | Reallocation | 73065 | 41D | Canklow | 71A | Eastleigh | |
08/12/1962 | Reallocation | 73074 | 41D | Canklow | 70A | Nine Elms | |
08/12/1962 | Reallocation | 73155 | 41D | Canklow | 71A | Eastleigh | |
12/01/1963 | Reallocation | 73066 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | 2F | Woodford Halse | |
12/01/1963 | Reallocation | 73159 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | 2F | Woodford Halse | |
19/01/1963 | Reallocation | 73005 | 63A | Perth South | 67A | Corkerhill | |
19/01/1963 | Reallocation | 73006 | 63A | Perth South | 67A | Corkerhill | |
19/01/1963 | Reallocation | 73009 | 63A | Perth South | 67A | Corkerhill | |
19/01/1963 | Reallocation | 73077 | 65A | Eastfield | 67A | Corkerhill | |
19/01/1963 | Reallocation | 73120 | 63A | Perth South | 67A | Corkerhill | |
09/02/1963 | Reallocation | 73011 | 6J | Holyhead | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
09/02/1963 | Reallocation | 73067 | 6J | Holyhead | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
09/02/1963 | Reallocation | 73073 | 6J | Holyhead | 6G | Llandudno Junction | |
16/02/1963 | Reallocation | 73069 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | 2F | Woodford Halse | |
02/03/1963 | Reallocation | 73156 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | 2F | Woodford Halse | |
18/03/1963 | Reallocation | 73024 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 89A | Shrewsbury | |
30/03/1963 | Reallocation | 73003 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | 89A | Shrewsbury | |
18/05/1963 | Reallocation | 73053 | 2F | Woodford Halse | 14A | Cricklewood East | |
18/05/1963 | Reallocation | 73066 | 2F | Woodford Halse | 14A | Cricklewood East | |
18/05/1963 | Reallocation | 73069 | 2F | Woodford Halse | 14A | Cricklewood East | |
18/05/1963 | Reallocation | 73156 | 2F | Woodford Halse | 14A | Cricklewood East | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 73071 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 14A | Cricklewood East | |
25/05/1963 | Reallocation | 73157 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 6A | Chester (MR) | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 73161 | 55H | Neville Hill | 56A | Wakefield | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 73162 | 55H | Neville Hill | 56A | Wakefield | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 73166 | 55D | Royston | 26F | Patricroft | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 73167 | 55E | Normanton | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 73168 | 55H | Neville Hill | 56A | Wakefield | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 73169 | 55H | Neville Hill | 56A | Wakefield | |
06/07/1963 | Reallocation | 73053 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 14E | Bedford | |
06/07/1963 | Reallocation | 73071 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 14E | Bedford | |
06/07/1963 | Reallocation | 73158 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 14E | Bedford | |
03/08/1963 | Reallocation | 73053 | 14E | Bedford | 2F | Woodford Halse | |
03/08/1963 | Reallocation | 73071 | 14E | Bedford | 2F | Woodford Halse | |
03/08/1963 | Reallocation | 73158 | 14E | Bedford | 14A | Cricklewood East | |
08/09/1963 | Reallocation | 73003 | 89A | Shrewsbury | 83E | Yeovil Town | |
08/09/1963 | Reallocation | 73161 | 56A | Wakefield | 83D | Laira | |
08/09/1963 | Reallocation | 73162 | 56A | Wakefield | 83D | Laira | |
09/09/1963 | Reallocation | 73024 | 89A | Shrewsbury | 83E | Yeovil Town | |
14/09/1963 | Reallocation | 73167 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 70B | Feltham | |
14/09/1963 | Reallocation | 73168 | 56A | Wakefield | 70B | Feltham | |
14/09/1963 | Reallocation | 73169 | 56A | Wakefield | 70B | Feltham | |
14/09/1963 | Reallocation | 73170 | 55D | Royston | 70B | Feltham | |
14/09/1963 | Reallocation | 73171 | 55D | Royston | 70B | Feltham | |
16/09/1963 | Reallocation | 73002 | 71A | Eastleigh | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
28/09/1963 | Reallocation | 73003 | 83E | Yeovil Town | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
28/09/1963 | Reallocation | 73024 | 83E | Yeovil Town | 87F | Llanelli | |
28/09/1963 | Reallocation | 73164 | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
06/10/1963 | Reallocation | 73030 | 10C | Patricroft | 83D | Exmouth Junction | |
06/10/1963 | Reallocation | 73044 | 10C | Patricroft | 83D | Exmouth Junction | |
06/10/1963 | Reallocation | 73166 | 26F | Patricroft | 83D | Exmouth Junction | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 73011 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 1G | Woodford Halse | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 73038 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 1A | Willesden | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 73040 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 1A | Willesden | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 73048 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 1A | Willesden | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 73067 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 1A | Willesden | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 73070 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 1A | Willesden | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 73073 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 1G | Woodford Halse | |
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 73157 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 1G | Woodford Halse | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 73028 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 82C | Swindon | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 73164 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
06/01/1964 | Reallocation | 73016 | 71A | Eastleigh | 70B | Feltham | |
06/01/1964 | Reallocation | 73043 | 71A | Eastleigh | 70B | Feltham | |
06/01/1964 | Reallocation | 73065 | 71A | Eastleigh | 70B | Feltham | |
06/01/1964 | Reallocation | 73155 | 71A | Eastleigh | 70B | Feltham | |
25/01/1964 | Reallocation | 73001 | 82C | Swindon | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
25/01/1964 | Reallocation | 73012 | 82C | Swindon | 87F | Llanelli | |
25/01/1964 | Reallocation | 73028 | 82C | Swindon | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | |
07/02/1964 | Condemned | 73027 | 82C | Swindon | COND | ||
08/02/1964 | Reallocation | 73128 | 26F | Patricroft | 16J | Rowsley | |
08/02/1964 | Reallocation | 73143 | 17C | Rowsley | 9H | Patricroft | |
07/03/1964 | Reallocation | 73004 | 1A | Willesden | 1E | Bletchley | |
07/03/1964 | Reallocation | 73013 | 1A | Willesden | 1E | Bletchley | |
07/03/1964 | Reallocation | 73014 | 1A | Willesden | 1E | Bletchley | |
07/03/1964 | Reallocation | 73033 | 1A | Willesden | 1E | Bletchley | |
07/03/1964 | Reallocation | 73038 | 1A | Willesden | 1E | Bletchley | |
07/03/1964 | Reallocation | 73039 | 1A | Willesden | 1E | Bletchley | |
07/03/1964 | Reallocation | 73040 | 1A | Willesden | 1E | Bletchley | |
07/03/1964 | Reallocation | 73048 | 1A | Willesden | 1E | Bletchley | |
07/03/1964 | Reallocation | 73067 | 1A | Willesden | 1E | Bletchley | |
07/03/1964 | Reallocation | 73070 | 1A | Willesden | 1E | Bletchley | |
28/03/1964 | Reallocation | 73158 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 9H | Patricroft | |
13/04/1964 | Reallocation | 73050 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 87F | Llanelli | |
25/04/1964 | Reallocation | 73050 | 87F | Llanelli | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
25/04/1964 | Reallocation | 73160 | 55E | Normanton | 1E | Bletchley | |
02/05/1964 | Reallocation | 73128 | 16J | Rowsley | 9H | Patricroft | |
02/05/1964 | Reallocation | 73135 | 17C | Rowsley | 16C | Derby | |
02/05/1964 | Reallocation | 73136 | 17C | Rowsley | 16C | Derby | |
02/05/1964 | Reallocation | 73137 | 17C | Rowsley | 16C | Derby | |
02/05/1964 | Reallocation | 73138 | 17C | Rowsley | 16C | Derby | |
02/05/1964 | Reallocation | 73139 | 17C | Rowsley | 16C | Derby | |
02/05/1964 | Reallocation | 73140 | 17C | Rowsley | 16C | Derby | |
02/05/1964 | Reallocation | 73141 | 17C | Rowsley | 16C | Derby | |
02/05/1964 | Reallocation | 73142 | 17C | Rowsley | 16C | Derby | |
02/05/1964 | Reallocation | 73144 | 17C | Rowsley | 16C | Derby | |
04/05/1964 | Reallocation | 73019 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
04/05/1964 | Reallocation | 73021 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
04/05/1964 | Reallocation | 73028 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
04/05/1964 | Reallocation | 73031 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
04/05/1964 | Reallocation | 73068 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
04/05/1964 | Reallocation | 73091 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
04/05/1964 | Reallocation | 73092 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
04/05/1964 | Reallocation | 73093 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
04/05/1964 | Reallocation | 73096 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
23/05/1964 | Reallocation | 73094 | 98W | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
06/06/1964 | Reallocation | 73136 | 16C | Derby | 9H | Patricroft | |
06/06/1964 | Reallocation | 73138 | 16C | Derby | 9H | Patricroft | |
06/06/1964 | Reallocation | 73140 | 16C | Derby | 9H | Patricroft | |
06/06/1964 | Reallocation | 73141 | 16C | Derby | 9H | Patricroft | |
06/06/1964 | Reallocation | 73142 | 16C | Derby | 9H | Patricroft | |
06/06/1964 | Reallocation | 73144 | 16C | Derby | 9H | Patricroft | |
13/06/1964 | Reallocation | 73137 | 16C | Derby | 9H | Patricroft | |
13/06/1964 | Reallocation | 73139 | 16C | Derby | 9H | Patricroft | |
20/06/1964 | Reallocation | 73045 | 2F | Woodford Halse | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
20/06/1964 | Reallocation | 73070 | 1E | Bletchley | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
22/06/1964 | Reallocation | 73012 | 87F | Llanelli | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
22/06/1964 | Reallocation | 73023 | 87F | Llanelli | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
22/06/1964 | Reallocation | 73024 | 87F | Llanelli | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
22/06/1964 | Reallocation | 73037 | 87F | Llanelli | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
27/06/1964 | Reallocation | 73057 | 66A | Polmadie | 67A | Corkerhill | |
12/07/1964 | Reallocation | 73047 | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
13/07/1964 | Condemned | 73076 | 66A | Polmadie | COND | ||
18/07/1964 | Reallocation | 73006 | 67A | Corkerhill | 9H | Patricroft | |
18/07/1964 | Reallocation | 73032 | 2F | Woodford Halse | 5E | Nuneaton | |
18/07/1964 | Reallocation | 73053 | 2F | Woodford Halse | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
18/07/1964 | Reallocation | 73073 | 1G | Woodford Halse | 5E | Nuneaton | |
20/07/1964 | Reallocation | 73092 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
25/07/1964 | Reallocation | 73007 | 63A | Perth South | 65F | Grangemouth | |
25/07/1964 | Reallocation | 73106 | 63A | Perth South | 67A | Corkerhill | |
25/07/1964 | Reallocation | 73107 | 63A | Perth South | 66B | Motherwell | |
15/08/1964 | Reallocation | 73167 | 70B | Feltham | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
22/08/1964 | Reallocation | 73008 | 63A | Perth South | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
22/08/1964 | Reallocation | 73056 | 66A | Polmadie | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
22/08/1964 | Reallocation | 73058 | 66A | Polmadie | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
06/09/1964 | Condemned | 73046 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
06/09/1964 | Condemned | 73074 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
12/09/1964 | Reallocation | 73135 | 16C | Derby | 9H | Patricroft | |
12/09/1964 | Reallocation | 73163 | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 56A | Wakefield | |
12/09/1964 | Reallocation | 73165 | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 56A | Wakefield | |
14/09/1964 | Reallocation | 73029 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 70D | Eastleigh | |
14/09/1964 | Reallocation | 73041 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 70D | Eastleigh | |
14/09/1964 | Reallocation | 73043 | 70B | Feltham | 70D | Eastleigh | |
14/09/1964 | Reallocation | 73083 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70B | Feltham | |
14/09/1964 | Reallocation | 73087 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70B | Feltham | |
14/09/1964 | Reallocation | 73089 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70D | Eastleigh | |
14/09/1964 | Reallocation | 73110 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70D | Eastleigh | |
14/09/1964 | Reallocation | 73111 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70D | Eastleigh | |
14/09/1964 | Reallocation | 73112 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70D | Eastleigh | |
14/09/1964 | Reallocation | 73113 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70D | Eastleigh | |
14/09/1964 | Reallocation | 73114 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70D | Eastleigh | |
14/09/1964 | Reallocation | 73115 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70D | Eastleigh | |
14/09/1964 | Reallocation | 73116 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70D | Eastleigh | |
14/09/1964 | Reallocation | 73117 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70D | Eastleigh | |
14/09/1964 | Reallocation | 73118 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70D | Eastleigh | |
14/09/1964 | Reallocation | 73119 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70D | Eastleigh | |
19/09/1964 | Reallocation | 73045 | 6D | Shrewsbury | 5E | Nuneaton | |
19/09/1964 | Reallocation | 73159 | 2F | Woodford Halse | 5E | Nuneaton | |
04/10/1964 | Condemned | 73017 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | COND | ||
10/10/1964 | Reallocation | 73066 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 2L | Leamington | |
10/10/1964 | Reallocation | 73069 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 2L | Leamington | |
10/10/1964 | Reallocation | 73156 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 2L | Leamington | |
12/10/1964 | Reallocation | 73022 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 70D | Eastleigh | |
12/10/1964 | Reallocation | 73023 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 81F | Oxford | |
12/10/1964 | Reallocation | 73024 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 81F | Oxford | |
12/10/1964 | Reallocation | 73030 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
12/10/1964 | Reallocation | 73037 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 81F | Oxford | |
12/10/1964 | Reallocation | 73049 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 81F | Oxford | |
12/10/1964 | Reallocation | 73087 | 70B | Feltham | 70D | Eastleigh | |
12/10/1964 | Reallocation | 73112 | 70D | Eastleigh | 70A | Nine Elms | |
12/10/1964 | Reallocation | 73164 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 81F | Oxford | |
12/10/1964 | Reallocation | 73166 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | 83E | Yeovil Town | |
24/10/1964 | Reallocation | 73026 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 2L | Leamington | |
29/10/1964 | Condemned | 73109 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
01/11/1964 | Reallocation | 73019 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 2B | Oxley | |
01/11/1964 | Reallocation | 73028 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 2B | Oxley | |
01/11/1964 | Reallocation | 73096 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 2B | Oxley | |
01/11/1964 | Reallocation | 73163 | 56A | Wakefield | 2B | Oxley | |
01/11/1964 | Reallocation | 73165 | 56A | Wakefield | 2B | Oxley | |
05/11/1964 | Condemned | 73058 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | COND | ||
06/11/1964 | Condemned | 73012 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | COND | ||
06/11/1964 | Condemned | 73024 | 81F | Oxford | COND | ||
20/11/1964 | Reallocation | 73016 | 70B | Feltham | 70A | Nine Elms | |
20/11/1964 | Reallocation | 73065 | 70B | Feltham | 70A | Nine Elms | |
20/11/1964 | Reallocation | 73083 | 70B | Feltham | 70G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
20/11/1964 | Reallocation | 73155 | 70B | Feltham | 70D | Eastleigh | |
20/11/1964 | Reallocation | 73168 | 70B | Feltham | 70D | Eastleigh | |
20/11/1964 | Reallocation | 73169 | 70B | Feltham | 70D | Eastleigh | |
20/11/1964 | Reallocation | 73170 | 70B | Feltham | 70D | Eastleigh | |
20/11/1964 | Reallocation | 73171 | 70B | Feltham | 70D | Eastleigh | |
29/11/1964 | Condemned | 73116 | 70D | Eastleigh | COND | ||
05/12/1964 | Condemned | 73047 | 6D | Shrewsbury | COND | ||
26/12/1964 | Condemned | 73052 | 98W | COND | |||
26/12/1964 | Condemned | 73061 | 66A | Polmadie | COND | ||
26/12/1964 | Reallocation | 73105 | 65A | Eastfield | 65F | Grangemouth | |
26/12/1964 | Condemned | 73161 | 98W | COND | |||
26/12/1964 | Condemned | 73164 | 98W | COND | |||
02/01/1965 | Condemned | 73077 | 67A | Corkerhill | COND | ||
09/01/1965 | Reallocation | 73004 | 1E | Bletchley | 5E | Nuneaton | |
09/01/1965 | Reallocation | 73039 | 1E | Bletchley | 5E | Nuneaton | |
09/01/1965 | Reallocation | 73040 | 1E | Bletchley | 5E | Nuneaton | |
09/01/1965 | Reallocation | 73048 | 1E | Bletchley | 5E | Nuneaton | |
10/01/1965 | Reallocation | 73044 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | 81F | Oxford | |
10/01/1965 | Reallocation | 73068 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
10/01/1965 | Reallocation | 73162 | 83D | Laira | 81F | Oxford | |
16/01/1965 | Reallocation | 73000 | 2F | Woodford Halse | 2B | Oxley | |
16/01/1965 | Reallocation | 73010 | 2F | Woodford Halse | 2B | Oxley | |
16/01/1965 | Reallocation | 73011 | 1G | Woodford Halse | 2B | Oxley | |
16/01/1965 | Reallocation | 73013 | 1E | Bletchley | 2B | Oxley | |
16/01/1965 | Reallocation | 73014 | 1E | Bletchley | 2B | Oxley | |
16/01/1965 | Reallocation | 73033 | 1E | Bletchley | 2B | Oxley | |
16/01/1965 | Reallocation | 73038 | 1E | Bletchley | 2B | Oxley | |
16/01/1965 | Reallocation | 73067 | 1E | Bletchley | 2B | Oxley | |
16/01/1965 | Reallocation | 73071 | 2F | Woodford Halse | 2B | Oxley | |
16/01/1965 | Reallocation | 73157 | 1G | Woodford Halse | 2B | Oxley | |
16/01/1965 | Reallocation | 73160 | 1E | Bletchley | 2B | Oxley | |
23/01/1965 | Reallocation | 73025 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 2B | Oxley | |
23/01/1965 | Reallocation | 73090 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 2B | Oxley | |
07/02/1965 | Reallocation | 73001 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | |
21/02/1965 | Reallocation | 73030 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
06/03/1965 | Reallocation | 73025 | 2B | Oxley | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
06/03/1965 | Reallocation | 73033 | 2B | Oxley | 5E | Nuneaton | |
06/03/1965 | Reallocation | 73038 | 2B | Oxley | 5E | Nuneaton | |
06/03/1965 | Reallocation | 73090 | 2B | Oxley | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
06/03/1965 | Reallocation | 73096 | 2B | Oxley | 5E | Nuneaton | |
07/03/1965 | Reallocation | 73001 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
07/03/1965 | Reallocation | 73030 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
07/03/1965 | Reallocation | 73093 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
19/03/1965 | Condemned | 73044 | 98W | COND | |||
19/03/1965 | Condemned | 73049 | 98W | COND | |||
28/03/1965 | Reallocation | 73037 | 81F | Oxford | 70D | Eastleigh | |
28/03/1965 | Reallocation | 73092 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 70D | Eastleigh | |
28/03/1965 | Reallocation | 73093 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 70D | Eastleigh | |
03/04/1965 | Reallocation | 73000 | 2B | Oxley | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
03/04/1965 | Reallocation | 73010 | 2B | Oxley | 9H | Patricroft | |
03/04/1965 | Reallocation | 73011 | 2B | Oxley | 9H | Patricroft | |
03/04/1965 | Reallocation | 73067 | 2B | Oxley | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
03/04/1965 | Reallocation | 73071 | 2B | Oxley | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
03/04/1965 | Reallocation | 73157 | 2B | Oxley | 9H | Patricroft | |
03/04/1965 | Reallocation | 73160 | 2B | Oxley | 9H | Patricroft | |
03/04/1965 | Reallocation | 73163 | 2B | Oxley | 9H | Patricroft | |
03/04/1965 | Reallocation | 73165 | 2B | Oxley | 9H | Patricroft | |
11/04/1965 | Reallocation | 73032 | 5E | Nuneaton | 70D | Eastleigh | |
11/04/1965 | Reallocation | 73033 | 5E | Nuneaton | 70D | Eastleigh | |
11/04/1965 | Reallocation | 73068 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
08/05/1965 | Condemned | 73123 | 67A | Corkerhill | COND | ||
21/05/1965 | Condemned | 73091 | 98W | COND | |||
21/05/1965 | Condemned | 73162 | 98W | COND | |||
22/05/1965 | Reallocation | 73032 | 70D | Eastleigh | 6C | Croes Newydd | |
22/05/1965 | Reallocation | 73045 | 5E | Nuneaton | 6C | Croes Newydd | |
08/06/1965 | Reallocation | 73022 | 70D | Eastleigh | 70C | Guildford | |
08/06/1965 | Reallocation | 73029 | 70D | Eastleigh | 70C | Guildford | |
08/06/1965 | Reallocation | 73037 | 70D | Eastleigh | 70C | Guildford | |
08/06/1965 | Reallocation | 73041 | 70D | Eastleigh | 70C | Guildford | |
08/06/1965 | Reallocation | 73043 | 70D | Eastleigh | 70C | Guildford | |
08/06/1965 | Reallocation | 73065 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70C | Guildford | |
08/06/1965 | Reallocation | 73081 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70C | Guildford | |
08/06/1965 | Reallocation | 73082 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70C | Guildford | |
08/06/1965 | Reallocation | 73087 | 70D | Eastleigh | 70C | Guildford | |
19/06/1965 | Reallocation | 73004 | 5E | Nuneaton | 6C | Croes Newydd | |
19/06/1965 | Reallocation | 73013 | 2B | Oxley | 2D | Banbury | |
19/06/1965 | Reallocation | 73014 | 2B | Oxley | 2D | Banbury | |
19/06/1965 | Reallocation | 73026 | 2L | Leamington | 2A | Tyseley | |
19/06/1965 | Reallocation | 73048 | 5E | Nuneaton | 2D | Banbury | |
19/06/1965 | Reallocation | 73066 | 2L | Leamington | 2A | Tyseley | |
19/06/1965 | Reallocation | 73069 | 2L | Leamington | 2A | Tyseley | |
19/06/1965 | Reallocation | 73096 | 5E | Nuneaton | 6C | Croes Newydd | |
19/06/1965 | Condemned | 73106 | 67A | Corkerhill | COND | ||
19/06/1965 | Reallocation | 73156 | 2L | Leamington | 2A | Tyseley | |
20/06/1965 | Condemned | 73041 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
20/06/1965 | Condemned | 73112 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
26/06/1965 | Condemned | 73056 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | COND | ||
26/06/1965 | Condemned | 73062 | 66A | Polmadie | COND | ||
11/07/1965 | Reallocation | 73003 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 81F | Oxford | |
11/07/1965 | Reallocation | 73015 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | |
11/07/1965 | Reallocation | 73021 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 81F | Oxford | |
11/07/1965 | Reallocation | 73030 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 81F | Oxford | |
11/07/1965 | Reallocation | 73031 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 81F | Oxford | |
11/07/1965 | Reallocation | 73166 | 83E | Yeovil Town | 81F | Oxford | |
24/07/1965 | Reallocation | 73033 | 70D | Eastleigh | 9H | Patricroft | |
24/07/1965 | Reallocation | 73035 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 9H | Patricroft | |
24/07/1965 | Reallocation | 73038 | 5E | Nuneaton | 6D | Shrewsbury | |
24/07/1965 | Reallocation | 73039 | 5E | Nuneaton | 9H | Patricroft | |
24/07/1965 | Reallocation | 73040 | 5E | Nuneaton | 6C | Croes Newydd | |
24/07/1965 | Reallocation | 73045 | 6C | Croes Newydd | 9H | Patricroft | |
24/07/1965 | Reallocation | 73053 | 6D | Shrewsbury | 9H | Patricroft | |
24/07/1965 | Reallocation | 73071 | 6D | Shrewsbury | 9H | Patricroft | |
24/07/1965 | Reallocation | 73073 | 5E | Nuneaton | 9H | Patricroft | |
24/07/1965 | Reallocation | 73094 | 6D | Shrewsbury | 9H | Patricroft | |
24/07/1965 | Reallocation | 73096 | 6C | Croes Newydd | 9H | Patricroft | |
24/07/1965 | Reallocation | 73097 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 9H | Patricroft | |
24/07/1965 | Reallocation | 73159 | 5E | Nuneaton | 9H | Patricroft | |
07/08/1965 | Condemned | 73032 | 6C | Croes Newydd | COND | ||
07/08/1965 | Condemned | 73167 | 6D | Shrewsbury | COND | ||
08/08/1965 | Condemned | 73042 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | COND | ||
21/08/1965 | Condemned | 73147 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | COND | ||
25/08/1965 | Condemned | 73015 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | COND | ||
25/08/1965 | Condemned | 73021 | 81F | Oxford | COND | ||
25/08/1965 | Condemned | 73023 | 81F | Oxford | COND | ||
25/08/1965 | Condemned | 73030 | 81F | Oxford | COND | ||
25/08/1965 | Condemned | 73051 | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | COND | ||
25/08/1965 | Condemned | 73054 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | COND | ||
28/08/1965 | Reallocation | 73095 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 6C | Croes Newydd | |
09/1965 | Condemned | 73038 | 6D | Shrewsbury | COND | ||
09/1965 | Condemned | 73165 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
10/09/1965 | Condemned | 73031 | 98W | COND | |||
10/09/1965 | Condemned | 73122 | 67A | Corkerhill | COND | ||
20/09/1965 | Condemned | 73008 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | COND | ||
20/09/1965 | Condemned | 73148 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | COND | ||
25/09/1965 | Condemned | 73036 | 84G | Shrewsbury | COND | ||
10/1965 | Condemned | 73111 | 70D | Eastleigh | COND | ||
09/10/1965 | Condemned | 73090 | 6D | Shrewsbury | COND | ||
22/10/1965 | Condemned | 73103 | 67A | Corkerhill | COND | ||
22/10/1965 | Condemned | 73104 | 67A | Corkerhill | COND | ||
25/10/1965 | Reallocation | 73016 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70B | Feltham | |
25/10/1965 | Reallocation | 73084 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70B | Feltham | |
25/10/1965 | Reallocation | 73085 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70B | Feltham | |
25/10/1965 | Reallocation | 73088 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70C | Guildford | |
25/10/1965 | Reallocation | 73089 | 70D | Eastleigh | 70C | Guildford | |
25/10/1965 | Reallocation | 73092 | 70D | Eastleigh | 70C | Guildford | |
25/10/1965 | Reallocation | 73093 | 70D | Eastleigh | 70C | Guildford | |
25/10/1965 | Reallocation | 73110 | 70D | Eastleigh | 70C | Guildford | |
25/10/1965 | Reallocation | 73113 | 70D | Eastleigh | 70G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
25/10/1965 | Reallocation | 73114 | 70D | Eastleigh | 70G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
30/10/1965 | Reallocation | 73007 | 65F | Grangemouth | 65J | Stirling | |
30/10/1965 | Reallocation | 73105 | 65F | Grangemouth | 65J | Stirling | |
20/11/1965 | Condemned | 73163 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
22/11/1965 | Reallocation | 73016 | 70B | Feltham | 70G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
22/11/1965 | Reallocation | 73084 | 70B | Feltham | 70D | Eastleigh | |
22/11/1965 | Reallocation | 73085 | 70B | Feltham | 70D | Eastleigh | |
06/12/1965 | Condemned | 73124 | 67A | Corkerhill | COND | ||
06/12/1965 | Condemned | 73152 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | COND | ||
16/12/1965 | Condemned | 73075 | 66A | Polmadie | COND | ||
19/12/1965 | Condemned | 73084 | 70D | Eastleigh | COND | ||
19/12/1965 | Condemned | 73168 | 70D | Eastleigh | COND | ||
25/12/1965 | Reallocation | 73154 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | 65J | Stirling | |
26/12/1965 | Reallocation | 73145 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | 65A | Eastfield | |
31/12/1965 | Condemned | 73001 | 98W | COND | |||
31/12/1965 | Condemned | 73003 | 98W | COND | |||
31/12/1965 | Condemned | 73068 | 98W | COND | |||
31/12/1965 | Condemned | 73166 | 98W | COND | |||
01/1966 | Condemned | 73121 | 67A | Corkerhill | COND | ||
29/01/1966 | Reallocation | 73078 | 65A | Eastfield | 66E | Carstairs | |
29/01/1966 | Reallocation | 73108 | 65A | Eastfield | 66E | Carstairs | |
29/01/1966 | Reallocation | 73146 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | 65A | Eastfield | |
03/03/1966 | Condemned | 73007 | 65J | Stirling | COND | ||
03/03/1966 | Condemned | 73098 | 66A | Polmadie | COND | ||
29/03/1966 | Condemned | 73057 | 67A | Corkerhill | COND | ||
30/04/1966 | Reallocation | 73000 | 6D | Shrewsbury | 9J | Agecroft | |
30/04/1966 | Reallocation | 73004 | 6C | Croes Newydd | 9K | Bolton | |
30/04/1966 | Reallocation | 73013 | 2D | Banbury | 9K | Bolton | |
30/04/1966 | Reallocation | 73014 | 2D | Banbury | 9K | Bolton | |
30/04/1966 | Reallocation | 73019 | 2B | Oxley | 9K | Bolton | |
30/04/1966 | Reallocation | 73025 | 6D | Shrewsbury | 9J | Agecroft | |
30/04/1966 | Reallocation | 73026 | 2A | Tyseley | 9K | Bolton | |
30/04/1966 | Reallocation | 73028 | 2B | Oxley | 9K | Bolton | |
30/04/1966 | Reallocation | 73034 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 9J | Agecroft | |
30/04/1966 | Reallocation | 73040 | 6C | Croes Newydd | 9K | Bolton | |
30/04/1966 | Reallocation | 73048 | 2D | Banbury | 9K | Bolton | |
30/04/1966 | Reallocation | 73050 | 6D | Shrewsbury | 9J | Agecroft | |
30/04/1966 | Reallocation | 73066 | 2A | Tyseley | 9K | Bolton | |
30/04/1966 | Reallocation | 73067 | 6D | Shrewsbury | 9J | Agecroft | |
30/04/1966 | Reallocation | 73069 | 2A | Tyseley | 9K | Bolton | |
30/04/1966 | Reallocation | 73070 | 6D | Shrewsbury | 9K | Bolton | |
30/04/1966 | Reallocation | 73095 | 6C | Croes Newydd | 9J | Agecroft | |
30/04/1966 | Reallocation | 73156 | 2A | Tyseley | 9K | Bolton | |
07/05/1966 | Condemned | 73013 | 9K | Bolton | COND | ||
25/05/1966 | Condemned | 73055 | 66A | Polmadie | COND | ||
05/06/1966 | Condemned | 73114 | 70G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | COND | ||
19/06/1966 | Condemned | 73082 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
19/06/1966 | Condemned | 73170 | 70D | Eastleigh | COND | ||
23/06/1966 | Condemned | 73063 | 66A | Polmadie | COND | ||
25/06/1966 | Reallocation | 73105 | 65J | Stirling | 67A | Corkerhill | |
25/06/1966 | Reallocation | 73154 | 65J | Stirling | 66B | Motherwell | |
26/06/1966 | Condemned | 73005 | 67A | Corkerhill | COND | ||
27/06/1966 | Reallocation | 73022 | 70C | Guildford | 70A | Nine Elms | |
27/06/1966 | Reallocation | 73029 | 70C | Guildford | 70A | Nine Elms | |
27/06/1966 | Reallocation | 73037 | 70C | Guildford | 70A | Nine Elms | |
27/06/1966 | Reallocation | 73043 | 70C | Guildford | 70A | Nine Elms | |
27/06/1966 | Reallocation | 73065 | 70C | Guildford | 70A | Nine Elms | |
27/06/1966 | Reallocation | 73085 | 70D | Eastleigh | 70A | Nine Elms | |
27/06/1966 | Reallocation | 73115 | 70D | Eastleigh | 70A | Nine Elms | |
27/06/1966 | Reallocation | 73117 | 70D | Eastleigh | 70A | Nine Elms | |
27/06/1966 | Reallocation | 73118 | 70D | Eastleigh | 70A | Nine Elms | |
14/07/1966 | Condemned | 73009 | 67A | Corkerhill | COND | ||
14/07/1966 | Condemned | 73078 | 66E | Carstairs | COND | ||
31/07/1966 | Condemned | 73081 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
22/08/1966 | Condemned | 73151 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | COND | ||
24/08/1966 | Condemned | 73101 | 67A | Corkerhill | COND | ||
27/08/1966 | Condemned | 73095 | 9J | Agecroft | COND | ||
02/09/1966 | Condemned | 73107 | 66B | Motherwell | COND | ||
04/09/1966 | Condemned | 73083 | 70G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | COND | ||
23/09/1966 | Condemned | 73105 | 67A | Corkerhill | COND | ||
24/09/1966 | Reallocation | 73145 | 65A | Eastfield | 67C | Ayr | |
25/09/1966 | Condemned | 73089 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
26/09/1966 | Condemned | 73145 | 67C | Ayr | COND | ||
02/10/1966 | Condemned | 73086 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
02/10/1966 | Condemned | 73087 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
02/10/1966 | Condemned | 73088 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
02/10/1966 | Condemned | 73169 | 70D | Eastleigh | COND | ||
02/10/1966 | Condemned | 73171 | 70D | Eastleigh | COND | ||
17/10/1966 | Reallocation | 73115 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70C | Guildford | |
17/10/1966 | Reallocation | 73117 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70C | Guildford | |
17/10/1966 | Reallocation | 73118 | 70A | Nine Elms | 70C | Guildford | |
19/10/1966 | Condemned | 73099 | 66A | Polmadie | COND | ||
22/10/1966 | Reallocation | 73000 | 9J | Agecroft | 9H | Patricroft | |
22/10/1966 | Reallocation | 73025 | 9J | Agecroft | 9H | Patricroft | |
22/10/1966 | Reallocation | 73034 | 9J | Agecroft | 9H | Patricroft | |
22/10/1966 | Reallocation | 73050 | 9J | Agecroft | 9H | Patricroft | |
22/10/1966 | Reallocation | 73067 | 9J | Agecroft | 9H | Patricroft | |
27/10/1966 | Condemned | 73072 | 66A | Polmadie | COND | ||
26/11/1966 | Reallocation | 73146 | 65A | Eastfield | 66B | Motherwell | |
26/11/1966 | Reallocation | 73149 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | 65J | Stirling | |
26/11/1966 | Reallocation | 73150 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | 65J | Stirling | |
26/11/1966 | Reallocation | 73153 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | 65J | Stirling | |
04/12/1966 | Condemned | 73016 | 70G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | COND | ||
10/12/1966 | Condemned | 73028 | 9K | Bolton | COND | ||
10/12/1966 | Condemned | 73149 | 65J | Stirling | COND | ||
10/12/1966 | Condemned | 73150 | 65J | Stirling | COND | ||
10/12/1966 | Condemned | 73153 | 65J | Stirling | COND | ||
25/12/1966 | Condemned | 73080 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | COND | ||
31/12/1966 | Condemned | 73102 | 67A | Corkerhill | COND | ||
31/12/1966 | Condemned | 73108 | 66E | Carstairs | COND | ||
31/12/1966 | Condemned | 73120 | 67A | Corkerhill | COND | ||
31/12/1966 | Condemned | 73154 | 66B | Motherwell | COND | ||
14/01/1967 | Condemned | 73019 | 9K | Bolton | COND | ||
20/01/1967 | Condemned | 73100 | 67A | Corkerhill | COND | ||
21/01/1967 | Condemned | 73130 | 26F | Patricroft | COND | ||
22/01/1967 | Condemned | 73113 | 70G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | COND | ||
29/01/1967 | Condemned | 73110 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
11/03/1967 | Condemned | 73006 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
19/03/1967 | Condemned | 73002 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | COND | ||
19/03/1967 | Condemned | 73115 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
19/03/1967 | Condemned | 73117 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
19/03/1967 | Condemned | 73119 | 70D | Eastleigh | COND | ||
01/04/1967 | Condemned | 73026 | 9K | Bolton | COND | ||
15/04/1967 | Condemned | 73066 | 9K | Bolton | COND | ||
16/04/1967 | Condemned | 73022 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
17/04/1967 | Reallocation | 73018 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 70C | Guildford | |
17/04/1967 | Reallocation | 73020 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 70C | Guildford | |
17/04/1967 | Reallocation | 73155 | 70D | Eastleigh | 70C | Guildford | |
29/04/1967 | Condemned | 73070 | 9K | Bolton | COND | ||
29/04/1967 | Reallocation | 73079 | 67A | Corkerhill | 66A | Polmadie | |
01/05/1967 | Condemned | 73059 | 66A | Polmadie | COND | ||
01/05/1967 | Condemned | 73060 | 66A | Polmadie | COND | ||
01/05/1967 | Condemned | 73064 | 66A | Polmadie | COND | ||
01/05/1967 | Condemned | 73079 | 66A | Polmadie | COND | ||
01/05/1967 | Condemned | 73146 | 66B | Motherwell | COND | ||
06/05/1967 | Condemned | 73097 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
13/05/1967 | Condemned | 73094 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
13/05/1967 | Condemned | 73139 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
17/06/1967 | Condemned | 73137 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
02/07/1967 | Condemned | 73085 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
09/07/1967 | Condemned | 73018 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
09/07/1967 | Condemned | 73020 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
09/07/1967 | Condemned | 73029 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
09/07/1967 | Condemned | 73037 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
09/07/1967 | Condemned | 73043 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
09/07/1967 | Condemned | 73065 | 70A | Nine Elms | COND | ||
09/07/1967 | Condemned | 73092 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
09/07/1967 | Condemned | 73093 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
09/07/1967 | Condemned | 73118 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
09/07/1967 | Condemned | 73155 | 70C | Guildford | COND | ||
22/07/1967 | Condemned | 73014 | 9K | Bolton | COND | ||
29/07/1967 | Condemned | 73141 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
26/08/1967 | Condemned | 73045 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
26/08/1967 | Condemned | 73144 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
09/09/1967 | Condemned | 73039 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
16/09/1967 | Condemned | 73071 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
14/10/1967 | Condemned | 73025 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
14/10/1967 | Condemned | 73048 | 9K | Bolton | COND | ||
14/10/1967 | Condemned | 73158 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
28/10/1967 | Condemned | 73004 | 9K | Bolton | COND | ||
28/10/1967 | Condemned | 73140 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
28/10/1967 | Condemned | 73159 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
04/11/1967 | Condemned | 73073 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
04/11/1967 | Condemned | 73127 | 26F | Patricroft | COND | ||
11/11/1967 | Condemned | 73011 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
11/11/1967 | Condemned | 73160 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
25/11/1967 | Condemned | 73096 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
25/11/1967 | Condemned | 73156 | 9K | Bolton | COND | ||
02/12/1967 | Condemned | 73129 | 26F | Patricroft | COND | ||
30/01/1968 | Condemned | 73033 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
30/01/1968 | Condemned | 73035 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
30/01/1968 | Condemned | 73131 | 26F | Patricroft | COND | ||
09/03/1968 | Condemned | 73053 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
16/03/1968 | Condemned | 73034 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
16/03/1968 | Condemned | 73136 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
30/03/1968 | Condemned | 73000 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
30/03/1968 | Condemned | 73067 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
30/03/1968 | Condemned | 73132 | 26F | Patricroft | COND | ||
30/03/1968 | Condemned | 73135 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
13/04/1968 | Reallocation | 73040 | 9K | Bolton | 9H | Patricroft | |
13/04/1968 | Reallocation | 73069 | 9K | Bolton | 9H | Patricroft | |
20/04/1968 | Condemned | 73126 | 26F | Patricroft | COND | ||
27/04/1968 | Condemned | 73138 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
27/04/1968 | Condemned | 73142 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
11/05/1968 | Condemned | 73040 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
11/05/1968 | Condemned | 73128 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
11/05/1968 | Condemned | 73157 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
22/06/1968 | Condemned | 73010 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
22/06/1968 | Condemned | 73134 | 26F | Patricroft | COND | ||
29/06/1968 | Condemned | 73050 | 9H | Patricroft | COND | ||
29/06/1968 | Condemned | 73125 | 26F | Patricroft | COND | ||
29/06/1968 | Condemned | 73133 | 26F | Patricroft | COND | ||
29/06/1968 | Condemned | 73143 | 98S | COND | |||
06/07/1968 | Reallocation | 73069 | 9H | Patricroft | 10A | Carnforth | |
10/08/1968 | Condemned | 73069 | 10A | Carnforth | COND |