BR Standard Riddles "Std 5MT" Class 4-6-0
Date | Number (at time) | Depot (at time) | Code | Details | Ref | Link |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sat 14/08/1954 | 73059 | ?? | Derby Works Construction shops.: Around the works. - Under construction - complete. | RO 9/1954 | ||
Sat 18/02/1961 | 73084, 73119 |
70A, 70A |
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|||
Sat 25/02/1961 | 73120 | 63A | Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings. | |||
Sat 25/02/1961 | 73084, 73119 |
70A, 70A |
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|||
Sun 26/02/1961 | 73016, 73036 |
41C, 89A |
Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside stripping shop. Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|||
Sun 12/11/1961 | 73027 | 82C | Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. | SLS 1/1962 | ||
Sun 26/11/1961 | 73018, 73020, 73113 |
71G, 71G, 70A |
Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
SLS 1/1962 | ||
Sat 02/12/1961 | 73000, 73003, 73024, 73035, 73054 |
41D, 82E, 89A, 89A, 82F |
Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Stripping road. Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Crimpsall. Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Paint shop. |
SLS 1/1962 | ||
Fri 15/12/1961 | 73044, 73133, 73142, 73156 |
26F, 26F, 17C, 14D |
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Ex-Works on shed. |
SLS 1/1962 | ||
Fri 06/04/1962 | 73140 | 17C | Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. | SLS 5/1962 | ||
Fri 08/06/1962 | 73053, 73144 |
14D, 17C |
Derby Works visit: Around the works - ex Works on shed. Derby Works visit: Around the works - ex Works on shed. |
SLS 7/1962 | ||
Sun 29/11/1964 | 73012 | Wdn | Swindon Works visit: Outside the stock shed | RO 1/1965 | ||
Sat 07/05/1966 | 73168 | Wdn | Birds Scrapyard, Bridgend: Dumped | RO 8/1966 | ||
Sat 29/04/1967 | 73053 | 9H | Lineside at Ince: Passing | John Thickitt |