Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2765 Today
» 5326 Yesterday
» 8091 Week
» 143496 Month
» 603437 Year
» 5042874 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
D16/2 1Co-Co1
Class |
BR (Pre 1955) |
Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Modification |
Modification Date |
D16/2a |
10201
|
30/12/1950 |
07/12/1963 |
Alterations to Housing Roof |
31/12/1956 |
D16/2a |
10202
|
15/09/1951 |
07/12/1963 |
Alterations to Housing Roof |
02/12/1956 |
D16/2b |
10203
|
07/1954 |
07/12/1963 |
Alterations to Housing Roof |
08/09/1957 |