Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3771 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17177 Week
» 70193 Month
» 189720 Year
» 3216573 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
08 0-6-0
Old Number |
Company |
Old Num Type |
New Number |
Company |
Subtype |
New Num Type |
|
Date |
Notes |
13017 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3017 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
|
05/1957 |
|
13134 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3134 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
25/05/1957 |
|
13218 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3218 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
28/05/1957 |
|
13019 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3019 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
|
06/1957 |
|
13170 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3170 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
|
06/1957 |
|
13070 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3070 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
15/06/1957 |
|
13132 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3132 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
18/06/1957 |
|
13042 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3042 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
29/06/1957 |
|
13006 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3006 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
06/07/1957 |
|
13009 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3009 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
13/07/1957 |
|
13073 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3073 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
|
13241 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3241 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
|
13098 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3098 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
25/07/1957 |
|
13071 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3071 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
|
13226 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3226 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
24/08/1957 |
|
13133 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3133 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
31/08/1957 |
|
13074 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3074 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
|
13079 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3079 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
|
13128 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3128 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
|
13217 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3217 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
07/09/1957 |
|
13081 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3081 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
05/10/1957 |
|
13301 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3301 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
05/10/1957 |
|
13094 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3094 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
26/10/1957 |
|
13058 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3058 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
|
11/1957 |
|
13023 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3023 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
02/11/1957 |
|
13048 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3048 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
02/11/1957 |
|
13075 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3075 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
02/11/1957 |
|
13078 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3078 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
02/11/1957 |
|
13004 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3004 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
07/11/1957 |
|
13046 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3046 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
16/11/1957 |
|
13036 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3036 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
20/11/1957 |
|
13049 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3049 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
30/11/1957 |
|
13129 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3129 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
|
13130 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3130 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
|
13136 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3136 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
30/11/1957 |
|
13016 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3016 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
|
12/1957 |
|
13041 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3041 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
21/12/1957 |
|
13029 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3029 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
24/12/1957 |
|
13050 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3050 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
28/12/1957 |
|
13131 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3131 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
|
13135 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3135 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
31/12/1957 |
|
13032 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3032 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
01/01/1958 |
|
13047 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3047 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
11/01/1958 |
|
13054 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3054 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
18/01/1958 |
|
13092 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3092 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
18/01/1958 |
|
13072 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3072 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
|
13240 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3240 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
|
13287 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3287 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
02/1958 |
|
13020 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3020 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
01/02/1958 |
|
13021 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3021 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
08/02/1958 |
|
13055 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3055 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
08/02/1958 |
|
13096 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3096 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
08/02/1958 |
|
13181 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3181 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
08/02/1958 |
|
13076 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3076 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
22/02/1958 |
|
13314 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3314 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
22/02/1958 |
|
13190 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3190 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
28/02/1958 |
|
13207 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3207 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
28/02/1958 |
|
13257 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3257 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
28/02/1958 |
|
13044 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3044 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
01/03/1958 |
|
13082 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3082 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
15/03/1958 |
|
13224 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3224 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
15/03/1958 |
|
13027 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3027 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
22/03/1958 |
|
13077 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3077 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
|
13080 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3080 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
19/04/1958 |
|
13222 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3222 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
26/04/1958 |
|
13052 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3052 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
10/05/1958 |
|
13066 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3066 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
10/05/1958 |
|
13011 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3011 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
17/05/1958 |
|
13069 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3069 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
17/05/1958 |
|
13059 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3059 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
30/05/1958 |
|
13033 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3033 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
31/05/1958 |
|
13010 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3010 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
07/06/1958 |
|
13013 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3013 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
21/06/1958 |
|
13008 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3008 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
30/06/1958 |
|
13018 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3018 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
12/07/1958 |
|
13063 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3063 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
14/07/1958 |
|
13208 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3208 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
31/07/1958 |
|
13043 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3043 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
23/08/1958 |
|
13177 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3177 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
23/08/1958 |
|
13206 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3206 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
31/08/1958 |
|
13097 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3097 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
13/09/1958 |
|
13045 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3045 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
25/09/1958 |
|
13005 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3005 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
30/09/1958 |
|
13299 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3299 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
|
13303 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3303 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
|
13318 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3318 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
5w/e |
04/10/1958 |
|
13319 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3319 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
5w/e |
04/10/1958 |
|
13220 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3220 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
11/10/1958 |
|
13056 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3056 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
18/10/1958 |
|
13308 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3308 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
22/10/1958 |
|
13030 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3030 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
31/10/1958 |
|
13031 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3031 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
31/10/1958 |
|
13109 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3109 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
31/10/1958 |
|
13275 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3275 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
31/10/1958 |
|
13221 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3221 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
08/11/1958 |
|
13067 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3067 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
22/11/1958 |
|
13309 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3309 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
28/11/1958 |
|
13093 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3093 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
30/11/1958 |
|
13057 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3057 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
06/12/1958 |
|
13103 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3103 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
11/12/1958 |
|
13101 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3101 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
12/12/1958 |
|
13300 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3300 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
27/12/1958 |
|
13203 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3203 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
31/12/1958 |
|
13089 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3089 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
|
01/1959 |
|
13039 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3039 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
02/01/1959 |
At Derby Works |
13026 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3026 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
08/01/1959 |
At Derby Works |
13321 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3321 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
24/01/1959 |
|
13334 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3334 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
24/01/1959 |
|
13104 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3104 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
26/01/1959 |
At Swindon Works |
13037 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3037 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
27/01/1959 |
At Derby Works |
13090 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3090 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
02/1959 |
|
13199 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3199 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
02/1959 |
|
13335 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3335 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
02/1959 |
|
13219 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3219 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
14/02/1959 |
|
13169 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3169 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
21/02/1959 |
|
13302 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3302 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
21/02/1959 |
|
13083 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3083 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
28/02/1959 |
|
13100 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3100 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
28/02/1959 |
|
13279 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3279 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
28/02/1959 |
|
13110 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3110 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
02/03/1959 |
At Swindon Works |
13087 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3087 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
14/03/1959 |
|
13095 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3095 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
21/03/1959 |
|
13102 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3102 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
23/03/1959 |
At Swindon Works |
13028 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3028 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
25/03/1959 |
At Derby Works |
13278 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3278 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
31/03/1959 |
|
13311 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3311 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
18/04/1959 |
|
13035 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3035 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
02/05/1959 |
At Crewe Works |
13085 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3085 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
16/05/1959 |
|
13106 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3106 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
21/05/1959 |
At Swindon Works |
13313 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3313 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
08/06/1959 |
|
13062 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3062 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
09/06/1959 |
|
13310 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3310 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
12/06/1959 |
|
13189 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3189 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
23/06/1959 |
At Swindon Works |
13211 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3211 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
30/06/1959 |
|
13342 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3342 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
08/1959 |
|
13108 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3108 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
07/08/1959 |
At Swindon Works |
13233 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3233 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
21/08/1959 |
|
13084 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3084 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
22/08/1959 |
|
13099 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3099 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
22/08/1959 |
|
13183 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3183 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
27/08/1959 |
At Swindon Works |
13034 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3034 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
01/09/1959 |
At Horwich Works |
13107 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3107 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
04/09/1959 |
|
13172 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3172 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
|
13223 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3223 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
12/09/1959 |
|
13060 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3060 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
25/09/1959 |
|
13274 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3274 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
25/09/1959 |
At Swindon Works |
13254 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3254 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
29/09/1959 |
|
13188 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3188 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
05/10/1959 |
At Swindon Works |
13194 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3194 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
09/10/1959 |
At Derby Wprks |
13266 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3266 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
09/10/1959 |
At Swindon Works |
13091 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3091 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
10/10/1959 |
|
13230 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3230 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
17/10/1959 |
|
13105 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3105 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
28/10/1959 |
At Swindon Works |
13038 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3038 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
30/10/1959 |
At Derby Works |
13232 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3232 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
31/10/1959 |
|
13040 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3040 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
11/1959 |
|
13195 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3195 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
06/11/1959 |
At Swindon Works |
13225 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3225 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
07/11/1959 |
|
13236 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3236 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
|
13298 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3298 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
|
13196 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3196 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
18/12/1959 |
At Swindon Works |
13270 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3270 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
23/12/1959 |
At Swindon Works |
13053 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3053 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
26/12/1959 |
|
13322 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3322 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
26/12/1959 |
|
13180 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3180 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
31/12/1959 |
|
13200 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3200 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
31/12/1959 |
|
13209 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3209 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
31/12/1959 |
|
13282 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3282 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
31/12/1959 |
|
13086 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3086 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
05/01/1960 |
|
13229 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3229 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
08/01/1960 |
|
13255 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3255 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
26/01/1960 |
|
13235 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3235 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
29/01/1960 |
|
13210 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3210 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
30/01/1960 |
|
13252 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3252 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
02/1960 |
|
13281 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3281 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
02/1960 |
|
13338 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3338 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
02/1960 |
|
13350 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3350 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
02/1960 |
|
13173 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3173 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
13/02/1960 |
|
13002 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3002 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
19/02/1960 |
At Swindon Works |
13320 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3320 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
20/02/1960 |
|
13185 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3185 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
25/02/1960 |
At Swindon Works |
13012 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3012 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
27/02/1960 |
|
13234 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3234 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
27/02/1960 |
|
13197 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3197 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
29/02/1960 |
|
13205 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3205 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
29/02/1960 |
|
13216 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3216 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
03/1960 |
|
13328 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3328 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
03/1960 |
|
13212 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3212 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
05/03/1960 |
|
13231 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3231 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
05/03/1960 |
|
13324 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3324 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
17/03/1960 |
|
13201 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3201 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
31/03/1960 |
|
13192 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3192 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
13/04/1960 |
At Swindon Works |
13204 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3204 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
30/04/1960 |
|
13213 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3213 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
30/04/1960 |
|
13025 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3025 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
02/05/1960 |
At Swindon Works |
13001 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3001 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
06/05/1960 |
At Swindon Works |
13061 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3061 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
09/05/1960 |
|
13258 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3258 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
13/05/1960 |
At Swindon Works |
13307 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3307 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
21/05/1960 |
|
13337 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3337 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
|
06/1960 |
|
13312 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3312 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
17/06/1960 |
|
13202 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3202 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
15/07/1960 |
|
13003 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3003 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
26/07/1960 |
At Swindon Works |
13114 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3114 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
16/08/1960 |
At Swindon Works |
13323 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3323 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
02/09/1960 |
|
13286 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3286 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
03/09/1960 |
|
13116 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3116 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
08/09/1960 |
At Swindon Works |
13015 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3015 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
|
09/09/1960 |
|
13198 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3198 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
16/09/1960 |
|
13261 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3261 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
20/09/1960 |
At Swindon Works |
13339 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3339 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
15/10/1960 |
|
13276 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3276 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
27/10/1960 |
|
13243 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3243 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
4w/e |
29/10/1960 |
|
13024 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3024 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
05/11/1960 |
|
13179 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3179 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
05/11/1960 |
|
13111 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3111 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
11/11/1960 |
At Swindon Works |
13065 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3065 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
14/11/1960 |
|
13007 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3007 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
|
26/11/1960 |
|
13269 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3269 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
|
12/1960 |
|
13214 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3214 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
10/12/1960 |
|
13246 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3246 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
10/12/1960 |
|
13268 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3268 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
23/12/1960 |
At Swindon Works |
13014 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3014 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
24/12/1960 |
|
13285 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3285 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
29/12/1960 |
|
13064 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3064 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
5w/e |
31/12/1960 |
|
13112 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3112 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
04/01/1961 |
At Swindon Works |
13329 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3329 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
06/01/1961 |
|
13191 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3191 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
27/01/1961 |
At Swindon Works |
13327 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3327 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
02/1961 |
|
13193 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3193 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
02/02/1961 |
At Swindon Works |
13277 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3277 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
03/02/1961 |
|
13022 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3022 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
04/02/1961 |
|
13171 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3171 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
04/02/1961 |
|
13283 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3283 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
11/02/1961 |
|
13215 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3215 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
25/02/1961 |
|
13175 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3175 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
28/02/1961 |
|
13260 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3260 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
03/03/1961 |
|
13249 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3249 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
|
04/03/1961 |
|
13247 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3247 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
11/03/1961 |
|
13244 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3244 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
17/03/1961 |
|
13239 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3239 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
20/04/1961 |
|
13088 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3088 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
|
05/1961 |
|
13305 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3305 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
05/1961 |
|
13340 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3340 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
05/1961 |
|
13182 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3182 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
03/05/1961 |
At Swindon Factory |
13242 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3242 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
10/05/1961 |
|
13263 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3263 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
11/05/1961 |
At Swindon Factory |
13000 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3000 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
18/05/1961 |
At Swindon Factory |
13332 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3332 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
18/05/1961 |
|
13245 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3245 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
20/05/1961 |
|
13326 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3326 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
27/05/1961 |
|
13273 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3273 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
03/06/1961 |
|
13267 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3267 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
15/06/1961 |
At Swindon Factory |
13187 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3187 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
23/06/1961 |
At Swindon Factory |
13262 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3262 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
30/06/1961 |
At Swindon Factory |
13341 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3341 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
07/1961 |
|
13347 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3347 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
31/07/1961 |
|
13253 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3253 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
03/08/1961 |
|
13256 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3256 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
10/08/1961 |
At Swindon Factory |
13272 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3272 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
19/08/1961 |
|
13264 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3264 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
08/09/1961 |
At Swindon Factory |
13250 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3250 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
16/09/1961 |
|
13176 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3176 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
30/09/1961 |
|
13186 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3186 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
06/10/1961 |
At Swindon Factory |
13248 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3248 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
|
13251 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3251 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
11/10/1961 |
|
13333 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3333 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
24/10/1961 |
|
13297 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3297 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
25/10/1961 |
|
13184 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3184 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
27/10/1961 |
At Swindon Factory |
13265 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3265 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
06/11/1961 |
At Swindon Factory |
13115 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3115 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
17/11/1961 |
At Swindon Factory |
13349 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3349 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
17/11/1961 |
|
13259 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3259 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
24/11/1961 |
At Swindon Factory |
13228 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3228 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
25/11/1961 |
|
13280 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3280 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
25/11/1961 |
|
13355 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3355 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
01/12/1961 |
At Swindon Factory |
13362 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3362 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
08/12/1961 |
At Swindon Factory |
13343 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3343 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
23/12/1961 |
|
13317 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3317 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
29/12/1961 |
|
13051 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3051 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
|
1962 |
|
13284 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3284 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
|
1962 |
|
13357 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3357 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
|
1962 |
|
13353 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3353 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
02/01/1962 |
At Swindon Factory |
13363 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3363 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
25/01/1962 |
At Swindon Factory |
13316 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3316 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
27/01/1962 |
|
13174 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3174 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
03/02/1962 |
|
13289 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3289 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
5w/e |
03/02/1962 |
|
13325 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3325 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
5w/e |
03/02/1962 |
|
13364 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3364 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
07/02/1962 |
At Swindon Factory |
13351 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3351 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
09/02/1962 |
|
13336 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3336 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
10/02/1962 |
|
13344 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3344 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
16/02/1962 |
|
13292 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3292 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
17/02/1962 |
|
13288 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3288 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
23/02/1962 |
|
13271 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3271 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
28/02/1962 |
|
13366 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3366 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
09/03/1962 |
At Swindon Factory |
13113 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3113 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
16/03/1962 |
At Swindon Factory |
13354 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3354 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
22/03/1962 |
At Swindon Factory |
13356 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3356 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
04/04/1962 |
At Swindon Factory |
13168 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3168 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
21/04/1962 |
|
13345 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3345 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
25/04/1962 |
|
13178 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3178 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
|
13227 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3227 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
31/05/1962 |
|
13306 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3306 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
09/06/1962 |
|
13296 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3296 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
30/06/1962 |
|
13346 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3346 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
06/07/1962 |
|
13167 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3167 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
07/07/1962 |
|
13291 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3291 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
|
13331 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3331 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
18/08/1962 |
|
13352 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3352 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
27/08/1962 |
At Swindon Factory |
13237 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3237 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
31/08/1962 |
|
13127 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3127 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
01/09/1962 |
|
13348 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3348 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
03/09/1962 |
|
13290 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3290 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
|
13330 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3330 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
01/11/1962 |
|
13304 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3304 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
w/e |
03/11/1962 |
|
13293 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3293 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
06/11/1962 |
|
13295 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3295 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
|
19/12/1962 |
|
13294 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3294 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
|
16/03/1963 |
|
13365 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3365 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
19/04/1963 |
At Swindon Factory |
13315 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3315 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
20/06/1963 |
|
13238 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3238 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
on |
30/08/1963 |
|
13068 |
BR |
Post Nationalisation |
D3068 |
BR |
Pre Tops |
Pre TOPS |
|
09/1963 |
|
D3698 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
D4500 |
BR |
Class 13 |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
06/1965 |
|
D4188 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
D4500 |
BR |
Class 13 |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
06/1965 |
|
D4189 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
D4501 |
BR |
Class 13 |
Pre TOPS |
on |
26/06/1965 |
|
D4190 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
D4501 |
BR |
Class 13 |
Pre TOPS |
on |
26/06/1965 |
|
D3697 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
D4502 |
BR |
Class 13 |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
08/1965 |
|
D4187 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
D4502 |
BR |
Class 13 |
Pre TOPS |
m/e |
08/1965 |
|
D4500 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
13003 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
1973 |
|
D4500 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
13003 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
1973 |
|
D4501 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
13001 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
y/e |
1973 |
|
D4501 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
13001 |
BR |
TOPS |
Pre TOPS |
y/e |
1973 |
|
D4502 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
13002 |
BR |
TOPS |
TOPS |
y/e |
1973 |
|
D4502 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
13002 |
BR |
TOPS |
TOPS |
y/e |
1973 |
|
D3784 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08617 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
08/09/1973 |
|
D3211 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08143 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
10/1973 |
|
D3219 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08151 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
10/1973 |
|
D3921 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08753 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
10/1973 |
|
D4096 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08882 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
10/1973 |
|
D3581 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08466 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
02/10/1973 |
|
D4006 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08838 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
11/10/1973 |
|
D3201 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08133 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
12/10/1973 |
|
D4029 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08861 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
24/10/1973 |
|
D3934 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08766 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
25/10/1973 |
|
D3300 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08230 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
30/10/1973 |
|
D4001 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08833 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
11/1973 |
|
D3927 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08759 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
02/11/1973 |
|
D3303 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08233 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
07/11/1973 |
|
D3712 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08548 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
10/11/1973 |
|
D3532 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08417 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
20/11/1973 |
|
D4030 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08862 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
24/11/1973 |
|
D3855 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08688 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
27/11/1973 |
|
D3729 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08562 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
29/11/1973 |
|
D3218 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08150 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
12/1973 |
|
D3220 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08152 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
12/1973 |
|
D3222 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08154 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
12/1973 |
|
D3226 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08158 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
12/1973 |
|
D3270 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08200 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
12/1973 |
|
D3271 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08201 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
12/1973 |
|
D3465 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08380 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
12/1973 |
|
D3760 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08593 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
12/1973 |
|
D3817 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08650 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
12/1973 |
|
D3822 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08655 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
12/1973 |
|
D3924 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08756 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
12/1973 |
|
D3998 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08830 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
12/1973 |
|
D4013 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08845 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
12/1973 |
|
D4015 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08847 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
12/1973 |
|
D4122 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08892 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
12/1973 |
|
D4159 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08929 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
12/1973 |
|
D3732 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08565 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
3w/e |
01/12/1973 |
|
D3789 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08622 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
01/12/1973 |
|
D3894 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08726 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
3w/e |
01/12/1973 |
|
D3347 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08277 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
04/12/1973 |
|
D3794 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08627 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
05/12/1973 |
|
D3874 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08707 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
07/12/1973 |
|
D3277 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08207 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
15/12/1973 |
|
D3861 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08694 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
15/12/1973 |
|
D4031 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08863 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
15/12/1973 |
|
D3767 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08600 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
29/12/1973 |
|
D3042 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08030 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
01/1974 |
|
D3223 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08155 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
01/1974 |
|
D3224 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08156 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
01/1974 |
|
D3225 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08157 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
01/1974 |
|
D3272 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08202 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
01/1974 |
|
D3295 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08225 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
01/1974 |
|
D3461 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08376 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
01/1974 |
|
D3464 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08379 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
01/1974 |
|
D3466 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08381 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
01/1974 |
|
D3468 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08383 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
01/1974 |
|
D3469 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08384 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
01/1974 |
|
D3598 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08483 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
01/1974 |
|
D3654 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08499 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
01/1974 |
|
D3687 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08525 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
01/1974 |
|
D3690 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08528 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
01/1974 |
|
D3797 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08630 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
01/1974 |
|
D3809 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08642 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
01/1974 |
|
D3860 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08693 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
01/1974 |
|
D3928 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08760 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
01/1974 |
|
D3930 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08762 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
01/1974 |
|
D3947 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08779 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
01/1974 |
|
D3963 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08795 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
01/1974 |
|
D4161 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08931 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
01/1974 |
|
D4177 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08947 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
01/1974 |
|
D3418 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08348 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
5w/e |
05/01/1974 |
|
D3711 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08547 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
05/01/1974 |
|
D3715 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08551 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
05/01/1974 |
|
D3887 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08719 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
5w/e |
05/01/1974 |
|
D3931 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08763 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
5w/e |
05/01/1974 |
|
D3950 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08782 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
05/01/1974 |
|
D3802 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08635 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
16/01/1974 |
|
D3857 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08690 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
22/01/1974 |
|
D3217 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08149 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
23/01/1974 |
|
D3567 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08452 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
24/01/1974 |
|
D3841 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08674 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
24/01/1974 |
|
D3022 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08015 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
26/01/1974 |
|
D3081 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08066 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
26/01/1974 |
|
D3332 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08262 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
26/01/1974 |
|
D3691 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08529 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
26/01/1974 |
|
D3708 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08544 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
26/01/1974 |
|
D3722 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08555 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
26/01/1974 |
|
D3460 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08375 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
8w/e |
28/01/1974 |
|
D3463 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08378 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
8w/e |
28/01/1974 |
|
D3815 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08648 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
8w/e |
28/01/1974 |
|
D3004 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08001 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3007 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08003 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3008 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08004 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3023 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08016 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3030 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08022 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3043 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08031 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3056 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08043 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3060 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08047 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3061 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08048 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3062 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08049 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3063 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08050 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3064 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08051 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3065 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08052 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3068 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08055 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3070 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08056 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3072 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08058 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3073 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08059 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3076 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08062 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3080 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08065 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3090 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08075 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
02/1974 |
|
D3102 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08077 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3114 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08089 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3129 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08094 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3131 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08096 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3132 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08097 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3133 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08098 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3134 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08099 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3174 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08108 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3175 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08109 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
02/1974 |
|
D3181 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08115 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3184 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08117 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3186 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08119 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3187 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08120 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3192 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08125 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3195 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08127 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3196 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08128 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3209 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08141 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3216 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08148 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3227 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08159 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3229 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08161 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3235 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08167 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3237 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08169 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3238 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08170 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3239 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08171 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3244 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08176 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3245 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08177 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3250 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08182 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3251 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08183 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3253 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08185 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3265 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08195 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3267 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08197 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3276 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08206 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3278 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08208 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3279 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08209 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3284 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08214 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3285 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08215 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3289 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08219 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3293 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08223 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3294 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08224 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3296 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08226 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3308 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08238 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3311 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08241 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3312 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08242 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3314 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08244 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3315 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08245 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3319 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08249 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3321 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08251 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3322 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08252 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3324 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08254 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3327 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08257 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3328 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08258 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3329 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08259 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3333 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08263 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3336 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08266 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3337 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08267 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3351 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08281 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3352 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08282 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3353 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08283 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3354 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08284 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3355 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08285 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3357 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08287 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3359 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08289 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3360 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08290 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3361 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08291 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3365 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08295 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3366 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08296 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3369 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08299 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3370 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08300 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3371 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08301 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3373 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08303 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3375 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08305 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3376 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08306 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3379 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08309 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3380 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08310 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3398 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08328 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3399 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08329 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3401 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08331 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3410 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08340 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3424 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08354 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3427 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08357 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3428 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08358 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3454 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08369 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3457 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08372 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3459 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08374 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3462 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08377 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3470 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08385 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3471 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08386 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3503 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08388 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3504 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08389 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3508 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08393 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3513 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08398 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3528 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08413 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3544 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08429 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3546 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08431 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3547 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08432 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3549 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08434 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3554 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08439 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3569 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08454 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3571 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08456 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3578 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08463 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3579 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08464 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3580 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08465 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3582 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08467 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3587 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08472 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3599 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08484 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3608 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08493 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3652 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08497 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3655 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08500 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3656 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08501 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3657 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08502 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3658 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08503 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3659 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08504 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3661 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08506 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3662 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08507 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3664 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08509 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3672 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08510 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3673 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08511 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3674 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08512 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3678 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08516 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3679 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08517 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3685 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08523 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3694 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08532 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3696 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08534 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3700 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08536 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3701 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08537 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3704 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08540 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3706 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08542 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3707 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08543 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3709 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08545 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3710 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08546 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3714 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08550 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3717 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08553 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3725 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08558 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3726 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08559 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3727 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08560 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3736 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08569 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3741 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08574 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3751 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08584 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3771 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08604 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3776 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08609 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3777 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08610 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3778 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08611 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3779 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08612 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3782 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08615 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3783 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08616 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3790 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08623 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3792 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08625 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3795 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08628 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3799 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08632 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3800 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08633 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3807 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08640 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3810 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08643 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3820 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08653 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3826 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08659 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3831 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08664 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3835 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08668 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3836 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08669 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3837 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08670 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3845 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08678 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3852 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08685 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3853 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08686 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3854 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08687 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3856 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08689 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3858 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08691 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3873 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08706 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3875 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08708 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3879 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08712 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3880 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08713 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3916 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08748 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3917 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08749 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3938 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08770 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3939 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08771 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3940 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08772 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3941 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08773 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3943 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08775 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3948 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08780 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3951 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08783 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3953 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08785 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3954 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08786 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3955 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08787 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3956 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08788 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3959 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08791 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3961 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08793 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3962 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08794 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3965 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08797 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3966 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08798 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3967 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08799 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3969 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08801 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3971 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08803 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3981 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08813 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3986 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08818 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3988 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08820 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3999 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08831 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4003 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08835 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4005 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08837 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4007 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08839 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4008 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08840 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4017 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08849 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4018 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08850 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4022 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08854 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4028 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08860 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4033 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08865 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4034 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08866 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4035 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08867 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4036 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08868 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4037 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08869 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4038 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08870 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4040 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08872 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4042 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08874 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4043 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08875 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4046 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08878 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4048 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08880 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4098 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08884 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4115 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08885 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4117 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08887 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4118 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08888 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4125 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08895 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4129 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08899 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4130 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08900 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4136 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08906 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4143 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08913 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4144 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08914 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4145 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08915 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4146 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08916 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4147 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08917 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4148 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08918 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4149 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08919 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4153 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08923 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4154 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08924 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4155 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08925 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4158 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08928 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4163 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08933 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4166 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08936 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4171 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08941 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4176 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08946 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4179 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08949 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4180 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08950 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4181 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08951 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D4184 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08954 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
02/1974 |
|
D3570 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08455 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
01/02/1974 |
|
D3130 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08095 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
02/02/1974 |
|
D3325 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08255 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
02/02/1974 |
|
D3385 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08315 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
02/02/1974 |
|
D3394 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08324 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
02/02/1974 |
|
D3455 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08370 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
02/02/1974 |
|
D3506 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08391 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
02/02/1974 |
|
D3520 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08405 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
02/02/1974 |
|
D3527 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08412 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
02/02/1974 |
|
D3723 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08556 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
02/02/1974 |
|
D3919 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08751 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
02/02/1974 |
|
D3926 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08758 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
02/02/1974 |
|
D3935 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08767 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
02/02/1974 |
|
D3946 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08778 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
02/02/1974 |
|
D4039 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08871 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
02/02/1974 |
|
D4041 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08873 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
02/02/1974 |
|
D3005 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08002 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3009 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08005 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
03/1974 |
|
D3010 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08006 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3015 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08008 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3071 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08057 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3075 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08061 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3077 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08063 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3079 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08064 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3082 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08067 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3083 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08068 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3086 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08071 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3091 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08076 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3113 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08088 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3115 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08090 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3127 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08092 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3128 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08093 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3135 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08100 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3171 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08106 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3177 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08111 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
03/1974 |
|
D3180 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08114 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3182 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08116 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3185 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08118 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3194 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08126 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3198 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08130 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3199 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08131 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3203 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08135 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3204 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08136 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3206 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08138 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3207 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08139 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3214 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08146 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3215 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08147 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3230 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08162 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3231 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08163 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3232 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08164 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3234 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08166 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3240 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08172 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3242 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08174 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3252 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08184 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3257 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08188 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3258 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08189 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3259 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08190 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3266 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08196 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3268 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08198 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3273 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08203 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3280 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08210 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3281 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08211 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3283 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08213 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3288 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08218 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3291 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08221 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3292 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08222 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3298 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08228 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3299 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08229 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3302 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08232 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3309 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08239 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3310 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08240 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3313 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08243 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3318 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08248 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3323 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08253 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3330 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08260 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3334 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08264 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3335 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08265 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3338 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08268 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3343 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08273 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3345 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08275 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3356 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08286 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3358 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08288 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3367 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08297 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3372 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08302 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3374 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08304 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3377 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08307 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3397 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08327 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3406 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08336 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3407 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08337 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3412 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08342 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3419 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08349 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3420 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08350 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3422 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08352 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3423 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08353 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3425 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08355 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3429 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08359 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3431 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08361 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3432 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08362 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3434 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08364 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3435 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08365 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3436 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08366 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3456 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08371 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3458 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08373 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3467 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08382 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3507 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08392 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3509 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08394 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3510 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08395 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3512 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08397 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3515 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08400 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3516 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08401 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3519 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08404 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3521 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08406 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3524 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08409 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3525 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08410 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3531 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08416 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3535 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08420 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3536 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08421 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3537 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08422 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3538 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08423 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3550 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08435 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3551 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08436 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3555 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08440 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3559 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08444 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3565 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08450 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3575 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08460 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3577 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08462 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3583 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08468 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3585 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08470 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3589 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08474 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3590 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08475 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3593 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08478 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3594 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08479 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3595 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08480 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3596 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08481 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3597 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08482 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3601 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08486 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3602 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08487 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3603 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08488 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3604 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08489 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3606 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08491 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3607 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08492 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3610 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08495 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3611 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08496 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3663 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08508 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3682 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08520 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3683 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08521 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3684 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08522 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3688 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08526 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3689 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08527 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3702 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08538 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3713 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08549 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3718 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08554 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3724 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08557 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3734 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08567 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3740 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08573 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3744 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08577 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3750 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08583 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3752 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08585 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3754 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08587 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3756 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08589 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3762 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08595 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3769 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08602 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3772 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08605 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3774 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08607 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3775 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08608 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3788 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08621 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3791 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08624 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3793 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08626 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3801 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08634 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3806 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08639 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3812 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08645 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3814 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08647 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3819 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08652 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3821 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08654 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3824 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08657 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3827 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08660 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3829 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08662 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3830 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08663 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3833 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08666 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3840 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08673 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3842 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08675 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3843 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08676 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3844 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08677 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3864 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08697 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3868 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08701 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3872 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08705 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3876 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08709 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3883 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08716 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3897 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08729 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3907 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08739 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3911 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08743 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3912 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08744 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3913 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08745 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3915 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08747 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3920 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08752 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3923 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08755 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3936 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08768 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3937 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08769 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3944 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08776 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3945 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08777 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3960 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08792 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3964 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08796 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3970 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08802 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3973 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08805 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3977 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08809 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3979 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08811 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3984 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08816 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3987 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08819 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3990 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08822 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3993 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08825 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3994 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08826 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3995 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08827 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D4000 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08832 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D4009 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08841 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D4010 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08842 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D4011 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08843 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D4012 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08844 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D4014 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08846 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D4016 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08848 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D4021 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08853 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D4024 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08856 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D4025 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08857 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D4026 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08858 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D4027 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08859 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D4032 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08864 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D4044 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08876 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D4047 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08879 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D4124 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08894 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D4150 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08920 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D4160 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08930 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D4167 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08937 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D4174 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08944 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D4178 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08948 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D4185 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08955 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D4191 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08957 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D4192 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08958 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
03/1974 |
|
D3029 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08021 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3036 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08026 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3050 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08037 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3055 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08042 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3057 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08044 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3067 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08054 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3107 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08082 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3109 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08084 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3116 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08091 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3167 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08102 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3168 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08103 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3179 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08113 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3189 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08122 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3190 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08123 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3191 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08124 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3197 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08129 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3200 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08132 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3208 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08140 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3210 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08142 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3233 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08165 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3241 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08173 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3248 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08180 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3256 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08187 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3260 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08191 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3264 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08194 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3269 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08199 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3275 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08205 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3297 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08227 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3304 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08234 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3307 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08237 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3317 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08247 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3320 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08250 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3339 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08269 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3342 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08272 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3368 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08298 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3378 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08308 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3381 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08311 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3391 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08321 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3392 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08322 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3395 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08325 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3405 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08335 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3409 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08339 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3416 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08346 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3421 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08351 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3426 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08356 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3430 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08360 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3433 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08363 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3437 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08367 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3438 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08368 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3472 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08387 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3517 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08402 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3522 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08407 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3526 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08411 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3542 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08427 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3548 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08433 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3553 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08438 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3573 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08458 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3574 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08459 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3576 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08461 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3588 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08473 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3592 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08477 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3600 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08485 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3653 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08498 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3675 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08513 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3676 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08514 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3686 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08524 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3728 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08561 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3738 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08571 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3743 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08576 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3746 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08579 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3747 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08580 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3749 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08582 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3755 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08588 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3757 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08590 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3759 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08592 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3764 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08597 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3765 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08598 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3770 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08603 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3773 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08606 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3781 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08614 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3785 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08618 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3798 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08631 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3808 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08641 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3813 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08646 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3818 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08651 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3823 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08656 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3825 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08658 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3838 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08671 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3839 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08672 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3848 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08681 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3851 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08684 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3865 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08698 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3869 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08702 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3881 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08714 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3888 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08720 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3889 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08721 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3890 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08722 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3899 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08731 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3900 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08732 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3901 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08733 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3902 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08734 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3908 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08740 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3910 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08742 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3922 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08754 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3925 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08757 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3942 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08774 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3952 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08784 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3957 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08789 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3958 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08790 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3968 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08800 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3972 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08804 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3974 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08806 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3975 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08807 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3976 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08808 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3978 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08810 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3980 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08812 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3982 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08814 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3983 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08815 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3991 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08823 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D4019 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08851 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D4023 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08855 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D4127 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08897 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D4131 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08901 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D4133 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08903 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D4137 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08907 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D4138 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08908 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D4162 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08932 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D4165 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08935 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D4170 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08940 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D4182 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08952 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1974 |
|
D3016 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08009 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3017 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08010 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3021 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08014 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3025 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08018 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3032 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08024 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3033 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08025 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3039 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08027 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3041 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08029 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3044 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08032 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3046 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08033 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3048 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08035 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3054 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08041 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3074 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08060 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3103 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08078 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3104 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08079 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3106 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08081 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3108 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08083 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3112 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08087 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3136 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08101 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3170 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08105 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3176 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08110 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
05/1974 |
|
D3202 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08134 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3205 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08137 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3228 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08160 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3236 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08168 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3246 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08178 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3254 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08186 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3262 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08192 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3263 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08193 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3274 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08204 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3286 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08216 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3301 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08231 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3305 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08235 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3306 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08236 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3326 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08256 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3331 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08261 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3362 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08292 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3387 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08317 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3403 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08333 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3518 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08403 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3523 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08408 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3530 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08415 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3533 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08418 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3572 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08457 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3584 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08469 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3586 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08471 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3605 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08490 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3609 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08494 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3680 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08518 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3681 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08519 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3703 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08539 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3705 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08541 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3745 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08578 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3748 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08581 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3753 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08586 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3758 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08591 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3761 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08594 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3763 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08596 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3766 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08599 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
05/1974 |
|
D3768 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08601 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3805 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08638 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3828 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08661 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3832 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08665 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3846 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08679 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3849 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08682 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3850 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08683 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3862 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08695 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3871 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08704 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3893 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08725 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3905 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08737 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3906 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08738 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3918 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08750 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3933 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08765 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3949 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08781 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D4020 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08852 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D4045 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08877 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D4097 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08883 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D4116 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08886 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D4119 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08889 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D4128 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08898 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D4132 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08902 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D4135 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08905 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D4140 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08910 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D4151 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08921 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D4152 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08922 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D4156 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08926 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D4157 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08927 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D4164 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08934 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D4175 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08945 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D4186 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08956 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
05/1974 |
|
D3018 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08011 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3027 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08019 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3049 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08036 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3084 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08069 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3105 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08080 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3110 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08085 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3169 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08104 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3173 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08107 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3363 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08293 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3364 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08294 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3408 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08338 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3414 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08344 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3505 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08390 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3514 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08399 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3564 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08449 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3566 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08451 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3591 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08476 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3693 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08531 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3699 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08535 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3796 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08629 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3804 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08637 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3834 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08667 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3863 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08696 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3867 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08700 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3870 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08703 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3892 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08724 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3903 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08735 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3914 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08746 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3992 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08824 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D4002 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08834 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D4004 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08836 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D4121 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08891 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D4126 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08896 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D4141 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08911 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D4142 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08912 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D4173 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08943 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
06/1974 |
|
D3058 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08045 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
07/1974 |
|
D3059 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08046 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
07/1974 |
|
D3383 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08313 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
07/1974 |
|
D3400 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08330 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
07/1974 |
|
D3402 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08332 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
07/1974 |
|
D3511 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08396 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
07/1974 |
|
D3534 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08419 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
07/1974 |
|
D3660 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08505 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
07/1974 |
|
D3692 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08530 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
07/1974 |
|
D3716 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08552 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
07/1974 |
|
D3735 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08568 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
07/1974 |
|
D3786 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08619 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
07/1974 |
|
D3787 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08620 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
07/1974 |
|
D3847 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08680 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
07/1974 |
|
D3866 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08699 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
07/1974 |
|
D3882 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08715 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
07/1974 |
|
D3996 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08828 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
07/1974 |
|
D3997 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08829 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
07/1974 |
|
D4169 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08939 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
07/1974 |
|
D4172 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08942 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
07/1974 |
|
D3089 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08074 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
08/1974 |
|
D3247 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08179 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
08/1974 |
|
D3290 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08220 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
08/1974 |
|
D3695 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08533 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
08/1974 |
|
D3909 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08741 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
08/1974 |
|
D4134 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08904 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
08/1974 |
|
D3031 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08023 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3040 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08028 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3085 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08070 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3111 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08086 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3178 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08112 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3212 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08144 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3213 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08145 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3221 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08153 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3249 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08181 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3282 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08212 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3287 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08217 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3316 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08246 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3340 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08270 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3349 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08279 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3350 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08280 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3382 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08312 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3384 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08314 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3386 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08316 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3389 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08319 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3390 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08320 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3393 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08323 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3396 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08326 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3413 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08343 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3415 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08345 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3417 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08347 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3545 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08430 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3561 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08446 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3562 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08447 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3563 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08448 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3568 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08453 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3730 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08563 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3731 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08564 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3733 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08566 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3739 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08572 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3742 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08575 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3780 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08613 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3803 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08636 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3811 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08644 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3816 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08649 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3877 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08710 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3878 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08711 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3884 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08717 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3891 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08723 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3895 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08727 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3896 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08728 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3898 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08730 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3904 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08736 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D4095 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08881 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D4123 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08893 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D4139 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08909 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D4183 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08953 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/1974 |
|
D3066 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08053 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
6w/e |
07/09/1974 |
|
D3989 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08821 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
6w/e |
07/09/1974 |
|
D4168 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08938 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
6w/e |
07/09/1974 |
|
D3188 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08121 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
10/1974 |
|
D3348 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08278 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
10/1974 |
|
D3388 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08318 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
10/1974 |
|
D3552 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08437 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
10/1974 |
|
D4120 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08890 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
10/1974 |
|
D3404 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08334 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
11/1974 |
|
D3677 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08515 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
11/1974 |
|
D3932 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08764 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
11/1974 |
|
D3985 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08817 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
11/1974 |
|
D3243 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08175 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
12/1974 |
|
D3346 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08276 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
12/1974 |
|
D3529 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08414 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
12/1974 |
|
D3539 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08424 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
12/1974 |
|
D3541 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08426 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
12/1974 |
|
D3543 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08428 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
12/1974 |
|
D3556 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08441 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
12/1974 |
|
D3557 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08442 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
12/1974 |
|
D3558 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08443 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
12/1974 |
|
D3929 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08761 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
12/1974 |
|
D3859 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08692 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
01/1975 |
|
D3341 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08271 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1975 |
|
D3344 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08274 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1975 |
|
D3411 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08341 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1975 |
|
D3540 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08425 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1975 |
|
D3560 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08445 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1975 |
|
D3737 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08570 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
04/1975 |
|
D3886 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
08718 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
07/1975 |
|
08203 |
BR |
TOPS |
08991 |
BR |
08/9 |
TOPS |
m/e |
04/1985 |
08-ODV to 08-OHV |
08259 |
BR |
TOPS |
08992 |
BR |
08/9 |
TOPS |
m/e |
04/1985 |
08-ODC to 08-OHV |
08592 |
BR |
TOPS |
08993 |
BR |
08/9 |
TOPS |
m/e |
04/1985 |
|
08833 |
BR |
TOPS |
09101 |
BR |
09/1 |
TOPS |
on |
17/08/1992 |
|
08832 |
BR |
TOPS |
09102 |
BR |
09/1 |
TOPS |
on |
22/09/1992 |
|
08421 |
BR |
TOPS |
09201 |
BR |
09/2 |
TOPS |
on |
22/09/1992 |
|
08781 |
BR |
TOPS |
09203 |
BR |
09/2 |
TOPS |
on |
02/10/1992 |
|
08717 |
BR |
TOPS |
09204 |
BR |
09/2 |
TOPS |
on |
23/10/1992 |
|
08732 |
BR |
TOPS |
09202 |
BR |
09/2 |
TOPS |
on |
24/11/1992 |
|
08620 |
BR |
TOPS |
09205 |
BR |
09/2 |
TOPS |
on |
10/12/1992 |
|
08766 |
BR |
TOPS |
09103 |
BR |
09/1 |
TOPS |
on |
05/01/1993 |
|
08749 |
BR |
TOPS |
09104 |
BR |
09/1 |
TOPS |
on |
05/01/1993 |
|
08835 |
BR |
TOPS |
09105 |
BR |
09/1 |
TOPS |
on |
15/03/1993 |
|
08759 |
BR |
TOPS |
09106 |
BR |
09/1 |
TOPS |
on |
09/06/1993 |
|
08845 |
BR |
TOPS |
09107 |
BR |
09/1 |
TOPS |
on |
23/07/1993 |
|