Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 103 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1172 Week
» 1172 Month
» 68034 Year
» 1733410 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

108


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
50599 11/07/1958 51A
BR
Darlington (New)
Bristol Bath Road
11/07/1958
04/10/1987
50600 23/05/1958 53C
W
Hull Springhead (New)
Withdrawn
23/05/1958
10/08/1970
10/08/1970
50601 23/05/1958 53C
NL
Hull Springhead (New)
Neville Hill
23/05/1958
04/10/1987
50602 30/05/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 30/05/1958
50603 11/07/1958 51A Darlington (New) 11/07/1958
50604 11/07/1958 51A Darlington (New) 11/07/1958
50605 27/06/1958 51A Darlington (New) 27/06/1958
50606 04/07/1958 53C
NH
Hull Springhead (New)
Newton Heath
04/07/1958
15/05/1988
50607 27/06/1958 51A
NL
Darlington (New)
Neville Hill
27/06/1958
04/10/1987
50608 04/07/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 04/07/1958
50609 14/08/1958 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 14/08/1958
50610 06/08/1958 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 06/08/1958
50611 07/08/1958 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 07/08/1958
50612 14/08/1958 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 14/08/1958
50613 07/08/1958 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 07/08/1958
50614 28/07/1958 51A Darlington (New) 28/07/1958
50615 04/09/1958 56G
W
Bradford Hammerton Street (New)
Withdrawn
04/09/1958
03/09/1968
03/09/1968
50616 04/09/1958 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 04/09/1958
50617 19/08/1958 56G
BR
Bradford Hammerton Street (New)
Bristol Bath Road
19/08/1958
04/10/1987
50618 14/08/1958 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 14/08/1958
50619 19/08/1958 56G
BR
Bradford Hammerton Street (New)
Bristol Bath Road
19/08/1958
04/10/1987
50620 28/10/1958 53C
BR
Hull Springhead (New)
Bristol Bath Road
28/10/1958
04/10/1987
50621 28/10/1958 53C
BR
Hull Springhead (New)
Bristol Bath Road
28/10/1958
04/10/1987
50622 11/11/1958 53C
BR
Hull Springhead (New)
Bristol Bath Road
11/11/1958
04/10/1987
50623 14/11/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 14/11/1958
50624 28/11/1958 53B
BR
Hull Botanic Gardens (New)
Bristol Bath Road
28/11/1958
04/10/1987
50625 13/11/1958 5D
LE
Stoke (New)
Landore
13/11/1958
04/10/1987
50626 27/12/1958 18A Toton (New) 27/12/1958
50627 13/11/1958 5D Stoke (New) 13/11/1958
50628 13/11/1958 5D Stoke (New) 13/11/1958
50629 21/02/1959   (New) 21/02/1959
50630 02/10/1958 NL (New)
Neville Hill
02/10/1958
04/10/1987
50631 02/10/1958 NL (New)
Neville Hill
02/10/1958
04/10/1987
50632 01/10/1958 53C
NL
Hull Springhead (New)
Neville Hill
01/10/1958
04/10/1987
50633 01/10/1958 53C
NL
CH
Hull Springhead (New)
Neville Hill
Chester West
01/10/1958
04/10/1987
15/05/1988
50634 01/10/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 01/10/1958
50635 01/10/1958 53C
BR
Hull Springhead (New)
Bristol Bath Road
01/10/1958
04/10/1987
50636 02/10/1958   (New) 02/10/1958
50637 02/10/1958 LA (New)
Laira
02/10/1958
04/10/1987
50638 08/10/1958 LA (New)
Laira
08/10/1958
04/10/1987
50639 08/10/1958 LA (New)
Laira
08/10/1958
04/10/1987
50640 16/10/1958   (New) 16/10/1958
50641 16/10/1958 NL (New)
Neville Hill
16/10/1958
04/10/1987
50642 28/10/1958 53C
NL
Hull Springhead (New)
Neville Hill
28/10/1958
04/10/1987
50643 28/10/1958 53C
NL
Hull Springhead (New)
Neville Hill
28/10/1958
04/10/1987
50644 11/11/1958 53C
NL
Hull Springhead (New)
Neville Hill
11/11/1958
04/10/1987
50645 14/11/1958 53C
HA
Hull Springhead (New)
Haymarket
14/11/1958
04/10/1987
50646 28/11/1958 53B
LA
Hull Botanic Gardens (New)
Laira
28/11/1958
04/10/1987
50924 24/10/1959   (New) 24/10/1959
50925 26/12/1959   (New) 26/12/1959
50926 14/11/1959   (New) 14/11/1959
50927 21/11/1959 6G Llandudno Junction (New) 21/11/1959
50928 28/11/1959 6G
NH
Llandudno Junction (New)
Newton Heath
28/11/1959
04/10/1987
50929 28/11/1959 6G Llandudno Junction (New) 28/11/1959
50930 19/12/1959 6G Llandudno Junction (New) 19/12/1959
50931 19/12/1959 6G Llandudno Junction (New) 19/12/1959
50932 26/12/1959   (New) 26/12/1959
50933 09/01/1960 6D Chester Northgate (New) 09/01/1960
50934 09/01/1960 6D
NH
Chester Northgate (New)
Newton Heath
09/01/1960
04/10/1987
50935 23/01/1960 6D
NH
Chester Northgate (New)
Newton Heath
23/01/1960
04/10/1987
50938 03/01/1959 6G Llandudno Junction (New) 03/01/1959
50939 27/12/1958 6G
LE
Llandudno Junction (New)
Landore
27/12/1958
20/09/1987
50940 27/12/1958 6G Llandudno Junction (New) 27/12/1958
50941 10/01/1959 6G
BR
Llandudno Junction (New)
Bristol Bath Road
10/01/1959
20/09/1987
50942 17/01/1959 2D
LE
Coventry (New)
Landore
17/01/1959
20/09/1987
50943 24/01/1959 2D Coventry (New) 24/01/1959
50944 24/01/1959 2D Coventry (New) 24/01/1959
50945 31/01/1959 6K Rhyl (New) 31/01/1959
50946 31/01/1959 6K Rhyl (New) 31/01/1959
50947 21/02/1959 CH (New)
Chester West
21/02/1959
15/05/1988
50948 21/02/1959   (New) 21/02/1959
50949 28/02/1959   (New) 28/02/1959
50950 28/02/1959   (New)
28/02/1959
15/05/1988
50951 21/02/1959   (New)
21/02/1959
15/05/1988
50952 21/02/1959   (New)
21/02/1959
15/05/1988
50953 28/02/1959   (New)
28/02/1959
15/05/1988
50954 28/02/1959 5B
Crewe South (New)
28/02/1959
15/05/1988
50955 14/03/1959 5B
Crewe South (New)
14/03/1959
15/05/1988
50956 14/03/1959 5B
Crewe South (New)
14/03/1959
15/05/1988
50957 28/03/1959 6K
Rhyl (New)
28/03/1959
15/05/1988
50958 04/04/1959 6K
Rhyl (New)
04/04/1959
15/05/1988
50959 04/04/1959 6K Rhyl (New) 04/04/1959
50960 18/04/1959   (New)
18/04/1959
15/05/1988
50961 18/04/1959   (New)
18/04/1959
15/05/1988
06/01/1974
50962 25/04/1959   (New)
25/04/1959
15/05/1988
50963     15/05/1988
50964 09/05/1959 9E
CH
Trafford Park (LMS) (New)
Chester West
09/05/1959
15/05/1988
50965 23/05/1959 9E
CH
Trafford Park (LMS) (New)
Chester West
23/05/1959
15/05/1988
50966 23/05/1959 9E
CH
Trafford Park (LMS) (New)
Chester West
23/05/1959
15/05/1988
50967 CH Chester West 15/05/1988
50968 30/05/1959 24F
CH
Fleetwood (New)
Chester West
30/05/1959
15/05/1988
50969 CH Chester West 15/05/1988
50970
50971
50972
50973     15/05/1988
50974
50975
50976
50977
50978
50979
50980
50981
50982
50983
50984 02/11/1969
50985
50986 CH Chester West 15/05/1988
50987 CH Chester West 15/05/1988
51416 20/02/1960 3C
BR
Ryecroft (Walsall) (New)
Bristol Bath Road
20/02/1960
20/09/1987
51417 20/02/1960 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) (New) 20/02/1960
51418 20/02/1960 3E Monument Lane (New) 20/02/1960
51419 27/02/1960 3E Monument Lane (New) 27/02/1960
51420 27/02/1960 14A
NH
Cricklewood East (New)
Newton Heath
27/02/1960
04/10/1987
51421 26/03/1960 14A Cricklewood East (New) 26/03/1960
51422 26/03/1960 14A Cricklewood East (New) 26/03/1960
51423 12/03/1960 26A Newton Heath (New) 12/03/1960
51424
51901 26/03/1960   (New) 26/03/1960
51902 26/03/1960   (New) 26/03/1960
51903 26/03/1960   (New) 26/03/1960
51904 26/03/1960   (New) 26/03/1960
51905
51906
51907
51908
51909
51910 LE Landore 20/09/1987
51911
51912
51913
51914
51915 W Withdrawn 29/11/1969 29/11/1969
51916
51917
51918 W Withdrawn 31/03/1985 31/03/1985
51919 CH Chester West 15/05/1988
51920
51921 W Withdrawn 10/10/1970 10/10/1970
51922 LE Landore 04/10/1987
51923
51924
51925
51926
51927
51928
51929 W Withdrawn 09/12/1984 09/12/1984
51930
51931
51932 LA Laira 04/10/1987
51933 LA Laira 04/10/1987
51934
51935 05/11/1960 26A Newton Heath (New) 05/11/1960
51936 05/11/1960 26A Newton Heath (New) 05/11/1960
51937
51938
51939 05/11/1960 26A
LA
Newton Heath (New)
Laira
05/11/1960
04/10/1987
51940 26/11/1960 26A
LA
Newton Heath (New)
Laira
26/11/1960
04/10/1987
51941 26/11/1960 26A Newton Heath (New) 26/11/1960
51942 21/01/1961 26A Newton Heath (New) 21/01/1961
51943 10/12/1960 26A Newton Heath (New) 10/12/1960
51944 17/12/1960 9E Trafford Park (LMS) (New) 17/12/1960 14/11/1964
51945 21/01/1961 26A Newton Heath (New) 21/01/1961
51946 28/01/1961 26A Newton Heath (New) 28/01/1961 27/01/1974
51947 04/02/1961 26A Newton Heath (New) 04/02/1961
51948
51949
51950
52037
52038
52039
52040
52041
52042
52043
52044
52045 LE Landore 04/10/1987
52046 LE Landore 20/09/1987
52047 LA Laira 04/10/1987
52048 CH Chester West 15/05/1988
52049
52050 05/11/1960 26A Newton Heath (New) 05/11/1960
52051 05/11/1960 26A Newton Heath (New) 05/11/1960
52052
52053
52054 05/11/1960 26A
LA
Newton Heath (New)
Laira
05/11/1960
04/10/1987
52055 26/11/1960 26A Newton Heath (New) 26/11/1960
52056 26/11/1960 26A Newton Heath (New) 26/11/1960
52057 21/01/1961 26A
LA
Newton Heath (New)
Laira
21/01/1961
04/10/1987
52058 10/12/1960 26A Newton Heath (New) 10/12/1960
52059 17/12/1960 9E Trafford Park (LMS) (New) 17/12/1960
52060 21/01/1961 26A Newton Heath (New) 21/01/1961
52061 28/01/1961 26A Newton Heath (New) 28/01/1961
52062
52063 LA Laira 04/10/1987
52064      
52065