Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 251 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5782 Week
» 30616 Month
» 64948 Year
» 1730324 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

108


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To
23/05/1958 To Service 50600   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
23/05/1958 To Service 50601   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
30/05/1958 To Service 50602   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
27/06/1958 To Service 50605   NEW 51A Darlington
27/06/1958 To Service 50607   NEW 51A Darlington
04/07/1958 To Service 50606   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
04/07/1958 To Service 50608   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
11/07/1958 To Service 50599   NEW 51A Darlington
11/07/1958 To Service 50603   NEW 51A Darlington
11/07/1958 To Service 50604   NEW 51A Darlington
28/07/1958 To Service 50614   NEW 51A Darlington
06/08/1958 To Service 50610   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
07/08/1958 To Service 50611   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
07/08/1958 To Service 50613   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
14/08/1958 To Service 50609   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
14/08/1958 To Service 50612   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
14/08/1958 To Service 50618   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
19/08/1958 To Service 50617   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
19/08/1958 To Service 50619   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
04/09/1958 To Service 50615   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
04/09/1958 To Service 50616   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
01/10/1958 To Service 50632   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
01/10/1958 To Service 50633   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
01/10/1958 To Service 50634   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
01/10/1958 To Service 50635   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
28/10/1958 To Service 50620   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
28/10/1958 To Service 50621   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
28/10/1958 To Service 50642   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
28/10/1958 To Service 50643   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
11/11/1958 To Service 50622   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
11/11/1958 To Service 50644   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
13/11/1958 To Service 50625   NEW 5D Stoke
13/11/1958 To Service 50627   NEW 5D Stoke
13/11/1958 To Service 50628   NEW 5D Stoke
14/11/1958 To Service 50623   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
14/11/1958 To Service 50645   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
28/11/1958 To Service 50624   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
28/11/1958 To Service 50646   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
27/12/1958 To Service 50626   NEW 18A Toton
27/12/1958 To Service 50939   NEW 6G Llandudno Junction
27/12/1958 To Service 50940   NEW 6G Llandudno Junction
03/01/1959 To Service 50938   NEW 6G Llandudno Junction
10/01/1959 To Service 50941   NEW 6G Llandudno Junction
17/01/1959 To Service 50942   NEW 2D Coventry
24/01/1959 To Service 50943   NEW 2D Coventry
24/01/1959 To Service 50944   NEW 2D Coventry
31/01/1959 To Service 50945   NEW 6K Rhyl
31/01/1959 To Service 50946   NEW 6K Rhyl
28/02/1959 To Service 50954   NEW 5B Crewe South
14/03/1959 To Service 50955   NEW 5B Crewe South
14/03/1959 To Service 50956   NEW 5B Crewe South
28/03/1959 To Service 50957   NEW 6K Rhyl
04/04/1959 To Service 50958   NEW 6K Rhyl
04/04/1959 To Service 50959   NEW 6K Rhyl
09/05/1959 To Service 50964   NEW 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
23/05/1959 To Service 50965   NEW 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
23/05/1959 To Service 50966   NEW 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
30/05/1959 To Service 50968   NEW 24F Fleetwood
21/11/1959 To Service 50927   NEW 6G Llandudno Junction
28/11/1959 To Service 50928   NEW 6G Llandudno Junction
28/11/1959 To Service 50929   NEW 6G Llandudno Junction
19/12/1959 To Service 50930   NEW 6G Llandudno Junction
19/12/1959 To Service 50931   NEW 6G Llandudno Junction
09/01/1960 To Service 50933   NEW 6D Chester Northgate
09/01/1960 To Service 50934   NEW 6D Chester Northgate
23/01/1960 To Service 50935   NEW 6D Chester Northgate
20/02/1960 To Service 51416   NEW 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
20/02/1960 To Service 51417   NEW 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
20/02/1960 To Service 51418   NEW 3E Monument Lane
27/02/1960 To Service 51419   NEW 3E Monument Lane
27/02/1960 To Service 51420   NEW 14A Cricklewood East
12/03/1960 To Service 51423   NEW 26A Newton Heath
26/03/1960 To Service 51421   NEW 14A Cricklewood East
26/03/1960 To Service 51422   NEW 14A Cricklewood East
05/11/1960 To Service 51935   NEW 26A Newton Heath
05/11/1960 To Service 51936   NEW 26A Newton Heath
05/11/1960 To Service 51939   NEW 26A Newton Heath
05/11/1960 To Service 52050   NEW 26A Newton Heath
05/11/1960 To Service 52051   NEW 26A Newton Heath
05/11/1960 To Service 52054   NEW 26A Newton Heath
26/11/1960 To Service 51940   NEW 26A Newton Heath
26/11/1960 To Service 51941   NEW 26A Newton Heath
26/11/1960 To Service 52055   NEW 26A Newton Heath
26/11/1960 To Service 52056   NEW 26A Newton Heath
10/12/1960 To Service 51943   NEW 26A Newton Heath
10/12/1960 To Service 52058   NEW 26A Newton Heath
17/12/1960 To Service 51944   NEW 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
17/12/1960 To Service 52059   NEW 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
21/01/1961 To Service 51942   NEW 26A Newton Heath
21/01/1961 To Service 51945   NEW 26A Newton Heath
21/01/1961 To Service 52057   NEW 26A Newton Heath
21/01/1961 To Service 52060   NEW 26A Newton Heath
28/01/1961 To Service 51946   NEW 26A Newton Heath
28/01/1961 To Service 52061   NEW 26A Newton Heath
04/02/1961 To Service 51947   NEW 26A Newton Heath
14/11/1964 Condemned 51944 9E Trafford Park (LMS)   COND
03/09/1968 Condemned 50615 56G Bradford Hammerton Street   COND
02/11/1969 Condemned 50984       COND
29/11/1969 Condemned 51915       COND
10/08/1970 Condemned 50600 53C Hull Springhead   COND
10/10/1970 Condemned 51921       COND
06/01/1974 Condemned 50961 NYA     COND
27/01/1974 Condemned 51946 26A Newton Heath   COND
09/12/1984 Condemned 51929       COND
31/03/1985 Condemned 51918       COND
20/09/1987 Reallocation 50939 6G Llandudno Junction LE Landore
20/09/1987 Reallocation 50941 6G Llandudno Junction BR Bristol Bath Road
20/09/1987 Reallocation 50942 2D Coventry LE Landore
20/09/1987 Reallocation 51416 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) BR Bristol Bath Road
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50599 51A Darlington BR Bristol Bath Road
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50601 53C Hull Springhead NL Neville Hill
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50607 51A Darlington NL Neville Hill
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50617 56G Bradford Hammerton Street BR Bristol Bath Road
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50619 56G Bradford Hammerton Street BR Bristol Bath Road
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50620 53C Hull Springhead BR Bristol Bath Road
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50621 53C Hull Springhead BR Bristol Bath Road
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50622 53C Hull Springhead BR Bristol Bath Road
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50624 53B Hull Botanic Gardens BR Bristol Bath Road
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50625 5D Stoke LE Landore
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50630 SGosfo   NL Neville Hill
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50631 SGosfo   NL Neville Hill
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50632 53C Hull Springhead NL Neville Hill
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50633 53C Hull Springhead NL Neville Hill
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50635 53C Hull Springhead BR Bristol Bath Road
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50637 SGosfo   LA Laira
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50638 SGosfo   LA Laira
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50639 SGosfo   LA Laira
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50641 SGosfo   NL Neville Hill
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50642 53C Hull Springhead NL Neville Hill
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50643 53C Hull Springhead NL Neville Hill
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50644 53C Hull Springhead NL Neville Hill
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50645 53C Hull Springhead HA Haymarket
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50646 53B Hull Botanic Gardens LA Laira
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50928 6G Llandudno Junction NH Newton Heath
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50934 6D Chester Northgate NH Newton Heath
04/10/1987 Reallocation 50935 6D Chester Northgate NH Newton Heath
04/10/1987 Reallocation 51420 14A Cricklewood East NH Newton Heath
04/10/1987 Reallocation 51939 26A Newton Heath LA Laira
04/10/1987 Reallocation 51940 26A Newton Heath LA Laira
04/10/1987 Reallocation 52054 26A Newton Heath LA Laira
04/10/1987 Reallocation 52057 26A Newton Heath LA Laira
15/05/1988 Reallocation 50606 53C Hull Springhead NH Newton Heath
15/05/1988 Reallocation 50633 NL Neville Hill CH Chester West
15/05/1988 Reallocation 50947 NYA   CH Chester West
15/05/1988 Reallocation 50964 9E Trafford Park (LMS) CH Chester West
15/05/1988 Reallocation 50965 9E Trafford Park (LMS) CH Chester West
15/05/1988 Reallocation 50966 9E Trafford Park (LMS) CH Chester West
15/05/1988 Reallocation 50968 24F Fleetwood CH Chester West