Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 258 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5789 Week
» 30623 Month
» 64955 Year
» 1730331 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

108


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
50630 02/10/1958 62.45
50631 02/10/1958 62.45
50632 01/10/1958 Hull Springhead 62.45
50633 01/10/1958 Hull Springhead 62.45
50634 01/10/1958 Hull Springhead 62.45
50635 01/10/1958 Hull Springhead 62.45
50636 02/10/1958 62.45
50637 02/10/1958 62.45
50638 08/10/1958 62.43
50639 08/10/1958 62.43
50640 16/10/1958 62.41
50641 16/10/1958 62.41
50642 28/10/1958 Hull Springhead 62.38
50643 28/10/1958 Hull Springhead 62.38
50644 11/11/1958 Hull Springhead 62.34
50645 14/11/1958 Hull Springhead 62.33
50646 28/11/1958 Hull Botanic Gardens 62.29
52037
52038
52039
52040
52041
52042
52043
52044
52045
52046
52047
52048
52049
52050 05/11/1960 Newton Heath 60.35
52051 05/11/1960 Newton Heath 60.35
52052
52053
52054 05/11/1960 Newton Heath 60.35
52055 26/11/1960 Newton Heath 60.30
52056 26/11/1960 Newton Heath 60.30
52057 21/01/1961 Newton Heath 60.14
52058 10/12/1960 Newton Heath 60.26
52059 17/12/1960 Trafford Park (LMS) 60.24
52060 21/01/1961 Newton Heath 60.14
52061 28/01/1961 Newton Heath 60.12
52062
52063
52064
52065