Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 228 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5759 Week
» 30593 Month
» 64925 Year
» 1730301 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

108


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
50599 11/07/1958 Darlington 62.68
50600 23/05/1958 Hull Springhead 10/08/1970 Neville Hill 12.25 62.81
50601 23/05/1958 Hull Springhead 62.81
50602 30/05/1958 Hull Springhead 62.79
50603 11/07/1958 Darlington 62.68
50604 11/07/1958 Darlington 62.68
50605 27/06/1958 Darlington 62.72
50606 04/07/1958 Hull Springhead 62.70
50607 27/06/1958 Darlington 62.72
50608 04/07/1958 Hull Springhead 62.70
50609 14/08/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 62.58
50610 06/08/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 62.61
50611 07/08/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 62.60
50612 14/08/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 62.58
50613 07/08/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 62.60
50614 28/07/1958 Darlington 62.63
50615 04/09/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 03/09/1968 10 62.53
50616 04/09/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 62.53
50617 19/08/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 62.57
50618 14/08/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 62.58
50619 19/08/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 62.57
50620 28/10/1958 Hull Springhead 62.38
50621 28/10/1958 Hull Springhead 62.38
50622 11/11/1958 Hull Springhead 62.34
50623 14/11/1958 Hull Springhead 62.33
50624 28/11/1958 Hull Botanic Gardens 62.29
50625 13/11/1958 Stoke 62.33
50626 27/12/1958 Toton 62.21
50627 13/11/1958 Stoke 62.33
50628 13/11/1958 Stoke 62.33
50629 21/02/1959 62.06
50924 24/10/1959 61.39
50925 26/12/1959 61.22
50926 14/11/1959 61.33
50927 21/11/1959 Llandudno Junction 61.31
50928 28/11/1959 Llandudno Junction 61.29
50929 28/11/1959 Llandudno Junction 61.29
50930 19/12/1959 Llandudno Junction 61.24
50931 19/12/1959 Llandudno Junction 61.24
50932 26/12/1959 61.22
50933 09/01/1960 Chester Northgate 61.18
50934 09/01/1960 Chester Northgate 61.18
50935 23/01/1960 Chester Northgate 61.14
50938 03/01/1959 Llandudno Junction 62.19
50939 27/12/1958 Llandudno Junction 62.21
50940 27/12/1958 Llandudno Junction 62.21
50941 10/01/1959 Llandudno Junction 62.18
50942 17/01/1959 Coventry 62.16
50943 24/01/1959 Coventry 62.14
50944 24/01/1959 Coventry 62.14
50945 31/01/1959 Rhyl 62.12
50946 31/01/1959 Rhyl 62.12
50947 21/02/1959 62.06
50948 21/02/1959 62.06
50949 28/02/1959 62.04
50950 28/02/1959 62.04
50951 21/02/1959 62.06
50952 21/02/1959 62.06
50953 28/02/1959 62.04
50954 28/02/1959 Crewe South 62.04
50955 14/03/1959 Crewe South 62.00
50956 14/03/1959 Crewe South 62.00
50957 28/03/1959 Rhyl 61.96
50958 04/04/1959 Rhyl 61.95
50959 04/04/1959 Rhyl 61.95
50960 18/04/1959 61.91
50961 18/04/1959 06/01/1974 Carlisle Kingmoor 14.75 61.91
50962 25/04/1959 61.89
50963
50964 09/05/1959 Trafford Park (LMS) 61.85
50965 23/05/1959 Trafford Park (LMS) 61.81
50966 23/05/1959 Trafford Park (LMS) 61.81
50967
50968 30/05/1959 Fleetwood 61.79
50969
50970
50971
50972
50973
50974
50975
50976
50977
50978
50979
50980
50981
50982
50983
50984 02/11/1969 Accrington
50985
50986
50987
51416 20/02/1960 Ryecroft (Walsall) 61.06
51417 20/02/1960 Ryecroft (Walsall) 61.06
51418 20/02/1960 Monument Lane 61.06
51419 27/02/1960 Monument Lane 61.04
51420 27/02/1960 Cricklewood East 61.04
51421 26/03/1960 Cricklewood East 60.97
51422 26/03/1960 Cricklewood East 60.97
51423 12/03/1960 Newton Heath 61.01
51424
51901 26/03/1960 60.97
51902 26/03/1960 60.97
51903 26/03/1960 60.97
51904 26/03/1960 60.97
51905
51906
51907
51908
51909
51910
51911
51912
51913
51914
51915 29/11/1969 Allerton
51916
51917
51918 31/03/1985 Newton Heath
51919
51920
51921 10/10/1970 Chester (MR)
51922
51923
51924
51925
51926
51927
51928
51929 09/12/1984 Longsight
51930
51931
51932
51933
51934
51935 05/11/1960 Newton Heath 60.35
51936 05/11/1960 Newton Heath 60.35
51937
51938
51939 05/11/1960 Newton Heath 60.35
51940 26/11/1960 Newton Heath 60.30
51941 26/11/1960 Newton Heath 60.30
51942 21/01/1961 Newton Heath 60.14
51943 10/12/1960 Newton Heath 60.26
51944 17/12/1960 Trafford Park (LMS) 14/11/1964 3.92 60.24
51945 21/01/1961 Newton Heath 60.14
51946 28/01/1961 Newton Heath 27/01/1974 Newton Heath 13 60.12
51947 04/02/1961 Newton Heath 60.10
51948
51949
51950