10 0-6-0
BR (1955 Num) | BR (Pre Tops) | Date To Service | Bld | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
13137 | D3137 | 02/03/1955 | DA | Hull Springhead | 02/07/1970 | 15.33 | Prs | Preserved | 15.72 | |||
13138 | D3138 | 05/03/1955 | DA | Hull Springhead | 23/04/1972 | March | 17.08 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 08/1973 | 18.46 | |
13139 | D3139 | 12/03/1955 | DA | Hull Springhead | 10/06/1968 | 13.25 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 03/1969 | 14.02 | ||
13140 | D3140 | 29/04/1955 | DA | Hull Springhead | 10/06/1968 | 13.17 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 03/1969 | 13.89 | ||
13141 | D3141 | 04/05/1955 | DA | Hull Springhead | 05/07/1971 | 16.17 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 05/1972 | 17.04 | ||
13142 | D3142 | 08/06/1955 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 26/06/1968 | 13 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 03/1969 | 13.78 | ||
13143 | D3143 | 08/06/1955 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 08/1969 | 14.17 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 03/1970 | 14.78 | ||
13144 | D3144 | 21/06/1955 | DA | Newport (Teeside) | 07/1969 | 14.08 | Cut | Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) | 10/1969 | 14.33 | ||
13145 | D3145 | 22/06/1955 | DA | Newport (Teeside) | 23/04/1972 | Thornaby | 16.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 12/1972 | 17.50 | |
13146 | D3146 | 07/07/1955 | DA | Newport (Teeside) | 12/02/1968 | 12.58 | Cut | Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) | 05/1968 | 12.87 | ||
13147 | D3147 | 12/07/1955 | DA | Newport (Teeside) | 06/05/1968 | 12.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 02/1969 | 13.61 | ||
13148 | D3148 | 15/07/1955 | DA | Newport (Teeside) | 05/03/1968 | 12.67 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 03/1969 | 13.68 | ||
13149 | D3149 | 21/07/1955 | DA | Newport (Teeside) | 02/07/1970 | 15 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 11/1970 | 15.33 | ||
13150 | D3150 | 28/07/1955 | DA | Newport (Teeside) | 10/06/1968 | 12.92 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/1969 | 13.73 | ||
13151 | D3151 | 08/08/1955 | DA | Newport (Teeside) | 04/12/1967 | 12.33 | Cut | Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) | 04/1968 | 12.70 | ||
D3439 | 24/09/1957 | DA | Kings Cross | 01/09/1968 | 11 | Cut | Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) | 01/1969 | 11.32 | |||
D3440 | 27/09/1957 | DA | Kings Cross | 28/12/1968 | 11.25 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 05/1969 | 11.64 | |||
D3441 | 01/10/1957 | DA | Kings Cross | 01/09/1968 | 10.92 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 01/1969 | 11.30 | |||
D3442 | 08/10/1957 | DA | Kings Cross | 29/09/1968 | 10.92 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/1969 | 11.28 | |||
D3443 | 10/10/1957 | DA | Kings Cross | 08/12/1968 | 11.17 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 06/1969 | 11.69 | |||
D3444 | 17/10/1957 | DA | Kings Cross | 29/12/1968 | 11.17 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 08/1969 | 11.84 | |||
D3445 | 22/10/1957 | DA | New England | 07/11/1968 | 11.08 | Cut | Cox and Danks (Park Royal) | 04/1969 | 11.49 | |||
D3446 | 25/10/1957 | DA | New England | 01/06/1968 | 10.67 | Cut | Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) | 08/1969 | 11.81 | |||
D3447 | 31/10/1957 | DA | New England | 23/03/1968 | 10.42 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/1969 | 11.22 | |||
D3448 | 06/11/1957 | DA | New England | 08/06/1968 | 10.58 | Cut | Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) | 08/1969 | 11.78 | |||
D3449 | 08/11/1957 | DA | New England | 30/12/1967 | 10.08 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 08/1968 | 10.78 | |||
D3450 | 13/11/1957 | DA | New England | 29/06/1968 | 10.58 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/1969 | 11.18 | |||
D3451 | 18/11/1957 | DA | New England | 14/07/1968 | 10.67 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/1969 | 11.17 | |||
D3452 | 22/11/1957 | DA | New England | 22/06/1968 | 10.58 | Prs | Preserved | 66.95 | ||||
D3453 | 28/11/1957 | DA | New England | 14/07/1968 | 10.67 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 05/1969 | 11.47 | |||
D3473 | 10/12/1957 | DA | New England | 27/07/1968 | 10.58 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/1969 | 11.11 | |||
D3474 | 11/12/1957 | DA | New England | 30/06/1968 | 10.5 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/1969 | 11.10 | |||
D3475 | 18/12/1957 | DA | New England | 13/07/1968 | 10.58 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/1969 | 11.08 | |||
D3476 | 24/12/1957 | DA | Kings Cross | 01/06/1968 | 10.5 | Prs | Preserved | 51.26 | ||||
D3477 | 31/12/1957 | DA | Kings Cross | 14/07/1968 | 10.58 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 01/1969 | 11.05 | |||
D3478 | 16/01/1958 | DA | Hatfield | 30/06/1968 | 10.42 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 07/1969 | 11.50 | |||
D3479 | 22/01/1958 | DA | Doncaster | 19/04/1969 | 11.25 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 07/1969 | 11.48 | |||
D3480 | 28/01/1958 | DA | Doncaster | 18/08/1968 | 10.58 | Cut | Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) | 01/1969 | 10.97 | |||
D3481 | 24/02/1958 | DA | Doncaster | 01/12/1968 | 10.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 05/1969 | 11.23 | |||
D3482 | 28/02/1958 | DA | Doncaster | 22/06/1968 | 10.33 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/1969 | 10.89 | |||
D3483 | 05/03/1958 | DA | Doncaster | 15/03/1969 | 11 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 10/1969 | 11.62 | |||
D3484 | 07/03/1958 | DA | Doncaster | 18/08/1968 | 10.42 | Cut | Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) | 01/1969 | 10.87 | |||
D3485 | 11/03/1958 | DA | New England | 15/12/1968 | 10.75 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 06/1969 | 11.27 | |||
D3486 | 19/03/1958 | DA | New England | 14/11/1970 | 12.67 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/1971 | 13.08 | |||
D3487 | 21/03/1958 | DA | New England | 14/07/1968 | 10.33 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 05/1969 | 11.16 | |||
D3488 | 27/03/1958 | DA | New England | 08/12/1968 | 10.75 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 06/1969 | 11.23 | |||
D3489 | 03/04/1958 | DA | New England | 06/04/1968 | 10 | Prs | Preserved | 10.71 | ||||
D3490 | 14/04/1958 | DA | Kings Cross | 22/06/1968 | 10.17 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/1969 | 10.76 | |||
D3491 | 16/04/1958 | DA | March | 17/12/1968 | 10.67 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 06/1969 | 11.17 | |||
D3492 | 24/04/1958 | DA | March | 28/06/1969 | 11.17 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 10/1969 | 11.48 | |||
D3493 | 30/04/1958 | DA | March | 22/06/1968 | 10.17 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/1969 | 10.72 | |||
D3494 | 01/05/1958 | DA | March | 26/05/1968 | 10 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 01/1969 | 10.72 | |||
D3495 | 15/05/1958 | DA | Stratford | 22/06/1968 | 10.08 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/1969 | 10.68 | |||
D3496 | 05/06/1958 | DA | Stratford | 26/11/1967 | 9.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 09/1968 | 10.29 | |||
D3497 | 14/12/1957 | DO | Stratford | 13/04/1968 | 10.33 | Cut | ECC Ports Ltd (Fowey) | 03/1989 | 31.27 | |||
D3498 | 21/12/1957 | DO | Stratford | 01/06/1968 | 10.5 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/1969 | 11.08 | |||
D3499 | 28/12/1957 | DO | Stratford | 20/01/1968 | 10.08 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 09/1968 | 10.72 | |||
D3500 | 01/01/1958 | DO | Stratford | 20/01/1968 | 10 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 07/1968 | 10.54 | |||
D3501 | 11/01/1958 | DO | Stratford | 29/06/1968 | 10.42 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/1969 | 11.02 | |||
D3502 | 15/01/1958 | DO | Stratford | 03/02/1968 | 10.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 07/1968 | 10.50 | |||
D3612 | 27/06/1958 | DA | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 15/03/1969 | 10.75 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 06/1969 | 10.98 | |||
D3613 | 27/06/1958 | DA | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 15/03/1969 | 10.75 | Cut | National Coal Board (Moor Green) | 04/1985 | 26.82 | |||
D3614 | 09/07/1958 | DA | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 15/03/1969 | 10.67 | Cut | Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) | 08/1969 | 11.11 | |||
D3615 | 30/07/1958 | DA | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 28/12/1968 | 10.42 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 06/1969 | 10.88 | |||
D3616 | 02/08/1958 | DA | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 07/1969 | 10.92 | Cut | Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) | 10/1969 | 11.21 | |||
D3617 | 06/08/1958 | DA | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 07/1969 | 10.92 | Cut | Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) | 11/1969 | 11.28 | |||
D3618 | 21/08/1958 | DA | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 19/04/1969 | 10.67 | Cut | National Coal Board (Moor Green) | 04/1985 | 26.67 | |||
D3619 | 26/08/1958 | DA | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 15/03/1969 | 10.58 | Cut | National Coal Board (Moor Green) | 04/1985 | 26.65 | |||
D3620 | 28/08/1958 | DA | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 19/02/1967 | 8.5 | Cut | Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) | 08/1967 | 8.97 | |||
D3621 | 03/09/1958 | DA | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 07/1969 | 10.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 11/1969 | 11.21 | |||
D3622 | 09/09/1958 | DA | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 15/03/1969 | 10.5 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 07/1969 | 10.85 | |||
D3623 | 11/09/1958 | DA | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 15/03/1969 | 10.5 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 07/1969 | 10.85 | |||
D3624 | 19/09/1958 | DA | Colwick | 03/11/1968 | 10.17 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 07/1969 | 10.83 | |||
D3625 | 02/10/1958 | DA | Colwick | 27/07/1968 | 9.75 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/1969 | 10.30 | |||
D3626 | 06/10/1958 | DA | Colwick | 27/07/1968 | 9.75 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/1969 | 10.28 | |||
D3627 | 07/10/1958 | DA | Colwick | 27/07/1968 | 9.75 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/1969 | 10.28 | |||
D3628 | 16/10/1958 | DA | Colwick | 30/12/1967 | 9.17 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 09/1968 | 9.92 | |||
D3629 | 20/10/1958 | DA | Colwick | 31/05/1969 | 10.58 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 09/1969 | 10.91 | |||
D3630 | 21/10/1958 | DA | Colwick | 19/12/1968 | 10.17 | Cut | Cox and Danks (Park Royal) | 06/1969 | 10.66 | |||
D3631 | 23/10/1958 | DA | Stratford | 25/06/1967 | 8.67 | Cut | British Rail (at Stratford MPD) | 31/10/1967 | 9.03 | |||
D3632 | 28/10/1958 | DA | Stratford | 27/07/1968 | 9.75 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/1969 | 10.22 | |||
D3633 | 31/10/1958 | DA | Stratford | 28/12/1968 | 10.17 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 06/1969 | 10.63 | |||
D3634 | 03/11/1958 | DA | Stratford | 19/11/1971 | Doncaster | 13 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/1972 | 13.46 | ||
D3635 | 05/11/1958 | DA | Stratford | 28/12/1968 | 10.08 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 05/1969 | 10.53 | |||
D3636 | 13/11/1958 | DA | Stratford | 07/04/1968 | Stratford | 9.42 | Cut | British Rail (at Stratford MPD) | 05/1969 | 10.51 | ||
D3637 | 13/11/1958 | DA | Immingham | 12/11/1968 | 10 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 04/1969 | 10.43 | |||
D3638 | 24/11/1958 | DA | Frodingham | 07/11/1970 | 12 | Cut | National Coal Board (Ashington) | 10/1975 | 16.90 | |||
D3639 | 25/11/1958 | DA | Frodingham | 07/1969 | 10.67 | 11.31 | ||||||
D3640 | 28/11/1958 | DA | Frodingham | 03/12/1968 | 10.08 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 05/1969 | 10.47 | |||
D3641 | 05/12/1958 | DA | Frodingham | 05/12/1971 | Frodingham | 13 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 12/1972 | 14.04 | ||
D3642 | 05/12/1958 | DA | Frodingham | 28/06/1969 | 10.5 | Cut | British Steel Corporation (at Appleby-Frodingham) | 10/1978 | 19.87 | |||
D3643 | 12/12/1958 | DA | Frodingham | 06/10/1968 | 9.83 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 07/1969 | 10.60 | |||
D3644 | 12/12/1958 | DA | Frodingham | 15/06/1970 | 11.5 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 05/1971 | 12.43 | |||
D3645 | 16/12/1958 | DA | Frodingham | 15/03/1969 | 10.25 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 07/1969 | 10.59 | |||
D3646 | 19/12/1958 | DA | Frodingham | 09/05/1971 | 12.42 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 12/1971 | 13.00 | |||
D3647 | 23/12/1958 | DA | Frodingham | 15/03/1970 | 11.25 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 09/1970 | 11.74 | |||
D3648 | 07/01/1959 | DA | Frodingham | 24/01/1971 | 12 | Cut | L Marley & Co. (at Bates Colliery) | 03/1977 | 18.20 | |||
D3649 | 09/01/1959 | DA | Frodingham | 07/1969 | 10.5 | 11.19 | ||||||
D3650 | 27/01/1959 | DA | Doncaster | 05/12/1971 | Doncaster | 12.92 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/1972 | 13.22 | ||
D3651 | 25/02/1959 | DA | Doncaster | 12/12/1971 | Doncaster | 12.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/1972 | 13.15 | ||
D4049 | 11/01/1961 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 03/01/1972 | Doncaster | 11 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 08/1972 | 11.60 | ||
D4050 | 18/01/1961 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 31/12/1971 | Immingham | 10.92 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 08/1972 | 11.58 | ||
D4051 | 18/01/1961 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 04/07/1971 | 10.5 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 05/1972 | 11.33 | |||
D4052 | 25/01/1961 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 12/10/1970 | 9.75 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 02/1971 | 10.06 | |||
D4053 | 28/01/1961 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 31/12/1971 | Immingham | 10.92 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 08/1972 | 11.55 | ||
D4054 | 02/02/1961 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 11/06/1972 | Thornaby | 11.33 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 03/1973 | 12.12 | ||
D4055 | 08/02/1961 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 31/12/1971 | Doncaster | 10.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/1972 | 11.19 | ||
D4056 | 11/02/1961 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 11/06/1972 | Immingham | 11.33 | Cut | National Coal Board (Shilbottle) | 03/1983 | 22.10 | ||
D4057 | 18/02/1961 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 21/01/1972 | Shirebrook | 10.92 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 09/1972 | 11.58 | ||
D4058 | 22/02/1961 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 03/01/1972 | Doncaster | 10.92 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 08/1972 | 11.48 | ||
D4059 | 03/03/1961 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 12/12/1971 | Immingham | 10.75 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 08/1972 | 11.46 | ||
D4060 | 09/03/1961 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 31/12/1971 | Doncaster | 10.75 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/1972 | 11.11 | ||
D4061 | 15/03/1961 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 03/01/1972 | Stratford | 10.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 09/1972 | 11.51 | ||
D4062 | 24/03/1961 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 11/01/1972 | Immingham | 10.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 09/1972 | 11.49 | ||
D4063 | 07/04/1961 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 11/06/1972 | Lincoln | 11.17 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 03/1973 | 11.95 | ||
D4064 | 07/04/1961 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 27/07/1968 | 7.25 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/1969 | 7.78 | |||
D4065 | 15/04/1961 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 07/11/1971 | Lincoln | 10.58 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 05/1972 | 11.09 | ||
D4066 | 24/04/1961 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 25/06/1972 | Immingham | 11.17 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 02/1973 | 11.82 | ||
D4067 | 02/05/1961 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 13/12/1970 | 9.58 | Prs | Preserved | 63.50 | ||||
D4068 | 10/05/1961 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 11/06/1972 | Immingham | 11.08 | Cut | National Coal Board (Whittle Colliery) | 12/1985 | 24.62 | ||
D4069 | 25/05/1961 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 23/04/1972 | Shirebrook | 10.92 | Cut | National Coal Board (Whittle Colliery) | 12/1985 | 24.58 | ||
D4070 | 05/06/1961 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 23/04/1972 | Shirebrook | 10.83 | Cut | National Coal Board (Whittle Colliery) | 12/1985 | 24.55 | ||
D4071 | 21/06/1961 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 14/07/1968 | 7.08 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 01/1969 | 7.58 | |||
D4072 | 26/07/1961 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 23/04/1972 | March | 10.75 | Cut | National Coal Board (Philadelphia) | 11/1985 | 24.32 | ||
D4073 | 05/08/1961 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 25/06/1972 | Immingham | 10.83 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 02/1973 | 11.54 | ||
D4074 | 24/08/1961 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 23/04/1972 | March | 10.67 | Cut | National Coal Board (Philadelphia) | 08/1978 | 16.99 | ||
D4075 | 30/09/1961 | DA | New England | 11/06/1972 | Lincoln | 10.75 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 03/1973 | 11.46 | ||
D4076 | 14/10/1961 | DA | New England | 14/07/1968 | 6.75 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 05/1969 | 7.59 | |||
D4077 | 31/10/1961 | DA | New England | 14/11/1970 | 9.08 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/1971 | 9.46 | |||
D4078 | 13/11/1961 | DA | Finsbury Park | 11/06/1972 | Doncaster | 10.58 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 03/1973 | 11.34 | ||
D4079 | 30/11/1961 | DA | Doncaster | 25/06/1972 | Immingham | 10.58 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 02/1973 | 11.22 | ||
D4080 | 16/12/1961 | DA | Doncaster | 11/02/1968 | 6.17 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 11/1968 | 6.92 | |||
D4081 | 11/01/1962 | DA | Doncaster | 30/06/1968 | 6.42 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 11/1968 | 6.85 | |||
D4082 | 17/01/1962 | DA | Doncaster | 30/06/1968 | 6.42 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 11/1968 | 6.83 | |||
D4083 | 26/01/1962 | DA | Finsbury Park | 14/07/1968 | 6.5 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 05/1969 | 7.30 | |||
D4084 | 03/02/1962 | DA | Finsbury Park | 14/07/1968 | 6.42 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 05/1969 | 7.28 | |||
D4085 | 08/02/1962 | DA | Finsbury Park | 30/06/1968 | 6.33 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/1969 | 6.94 | |||
D4086 | 15/02/1962 | DA | Boston | 27/07/1968 | 6.42 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 01/1969 | 6.92 | |||
D4087 | 28/02/1962 | DA | Immingham | 01/09/1968 | 6.58 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 01/1969 | 6.88 | |||
D4088 | 02/03/1962 | DA | Immingham | 11/08/1968 | 6.42 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/1969 | 6.88 | |||
D4089 | 08/03/1962 | DA | Annesley | 18/08/1968 | 6.42 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/1969 | 6.86 | |||
D4090 | 14/03/1962 | DA | Gorton | 11/08/1968 | 6.42 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 01/1969 | 6.85 | |||
D4091 | 25/04/1962 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 11/08/1968 | 6.33 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/1969 | 6.73 | |||
D4092 | 02/05/1962 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 01/09/1968 | 6.33 | Prs | Preserved | 62.50 | ||||
D4093 | 19/05/1962 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 11/08/1968 | 6.25 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 01/1969 | 6.67 | |||
D4094 | 05/06/1962 | DA | Sheffield Darnall | 11/08/1968 | 6.17 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 01/1969 | 6.62 |