11 0-6-0
LMS | BR (1955 Num) | Date To Service | Bld | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
7120 | 12033 | 14/05/1945 | DE | Toton | 25/01/1969 | 23.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1970 | 25.02 | ||
7121 | 12034 | 05/06/1945 | DE | Toton | 19/10/1968 | 23.33 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 09/1969 | 24.30 | ||
7122 | 12035 | 19/06/1945 | DE | Crewe South | 19/10/1968 | 23.33 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 09/1969 | 24.26 | ||
7123 | 12036 | 09/08/1945 | DE | Crewe South | 19/10/1968 | 23.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1970 | 24.61 | ||
7124 | 12037 | 30/10/1945 | DE | Crewe South | 19/10/1968 | 23 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1970 | 24.56 | ||
7125 | 12038 | 05/12/1945 | DE | Crewe South | 25/01/1969 | 23.08 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 05/1971 | 25.46 | ||
7126 | 12039 | 15/08/1947 | DE | Saltley | 19/10/1968 | 21.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1970 | 22.44 | ||
7127 | 12040 | 12/09/1947 | DE | Saltley | 19/10/1968 | 21.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1970 | 22.36 | ||
7128 | 12041 | 09/10/1947 | DE | Saltley | 19/10/1968 | 21 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 06/1969 | 21.70 | ||
7129 | 12042 | 13/11/1947 | DE | Saltley | 19/10/1968 | 20.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 11/1969 | 22.02 | ||
7130 | 12043 | 04/02/1948 | DE | Saltley | 19/10/1968 | 20.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 11/1969 | 21.79 | ||
7131 | 12044 | 11/03/1948 | DE | Saltley | 19/10/1968 | 20.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 11/1969 | 21.70 | ||
12045 | 28/04/1948 | DE | Toton | 25/01/1969 | 20.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 11/1969 | 21.56 | |||
12046 | 04/06/1948 | DE | Toton | 25/01/1969 | 20.58 | Cut | Cohens (at Bletchley MPD) | 12/1969 | 21.55 | |||
12047 | 18/08/1948 | DE | Toton | 25/01/1969 | 20.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1970 | 21.42 | |||
12048 | 14/12/1948 | DE | Toton | 25/01/1969 | 20.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1970 | 21.26 | |||
12049 | 31/12/1949 | DE | Crewe South | 03/10/1971 | 21.83 | Prs | Preserved | 74.85 | ||||
12050 | 17/02/1949 | DE | Crewe South | 11/07/1970 | 21.42 | Cut | National Coal Board (Philadelphia) | 11/1971 | 22.76 | |||
12051 | 10/03/1949 | DE | Crewe South | 09/10/1971 | 22.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1973 | 23.95 | |||
12052 | 12/04/1949 | DE | Crewe South | 13/06/1971 | 22.17 | Prs | Preserved | 75.57 | ||||
12053 | 13/05/1949 | DE | Crewe South | 18/04/1971 | 21.92 | Cut | Birds (Long Marston) | 11/1971 | 22.52 | |||
12054 | 30/05/1949 | DE | Crewe South | 25/07/1970 | 21.17 | Cut | A R Adams (Newport, Gwent) | 04/1984 | 34.90 | |||
12055 | 08/07/1949 | DE | Crewe South | 17/07/1971 | 22 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 05/1972 | 22.87 | |||
12056 | 09/08/1949 | DE | Toton | 09/10/1971 | 22.17 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 05/1973 | 23.78 | |||
12057 | 16/09/1949 | DE | Toton | 25/01/1969 | 19.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1970 | 20.35 | |||
12058 | 20/10/1949 | DE | Toton | 28/04/1971 | 21.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 02/1973 | 23.34 | |||
12059 | 04/11/1949 | DE | Saltley | 25/01/1969 | 19.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 11/1969 | 20.04 | |||
12060 | 11/11/1949 | DE | Saltley | 07/02/1971 | Longsight | 21.25 | Cut | National Coal Board (Philadelphia) | 11/1985 | 36.04 | ||
12061 | 21/11/1949 | DE | Saltley | 09/10/1971 | 21.92 | Prs | Preserved | 74.96 | ||||
12062 | 06/12/1949 | DE | Saltley | 19/04/1970 | 20.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Derby) | 29/12/1971 | 22.08 | |||
12063 | 12/12/1949 | DE | Cricklewood East | 01/01/1972 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 22.08 | Cut | National Coal Board (Nantgarw Coking Plant) | 11/1987 | 37.95 | ||
12064 | 20/12/1949 | DE | Cricklewood East | 19/04/1969 | 19.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 11/1969 | 19.92 | |||
12065 | 30/12/1949 | DE | Cricklewood East | 10/05/1971 | 21.42 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 08/1972 | 22.64 | |||
12066 | 30/12/1949 | DE | Cricklewood East | 19/04/1969 | 19.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1970 | 20.06 | |||
12067 | 24/02/1950 | DE | Cricklewood East | 25/01/1969 | 18.92 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 12/1969 | 19.82 | |||
12068 | 24/03/1950 | DE | Cricklewood East | 23/12/1967 | 17.75 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 05/1968 | 18.16 | |||
12069 | 04/07/1950 | DE | Toton | 14/03/1971 | 20.67 | Cut | Birds (Long Marston) | 03/1972 | 21.71 | |||
12070 | 11/08/1950 | DE | Toton | 30/09/1969 | 19.08 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 08/1970 | 20.02 | |||
12071 | 31/08/1950 | DE | Toton | 09/10/1971 | 21.17 | Cut | Coopers Metals (at South Yorkshire Railway, Meadowhall) | 06/1995 | 44.82 | |||
12072 | 31/08/1950 | DE | Toton | 21/12/1968 | 18.33 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 12/1969 | 19.30 | |||
12073 | 30/09/1950 | DE | Toton | 06/11/1971 | 21.17 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 06/1972 | 21.72 | |||
12074 | 30/09/1950 | DE | Saltley | 01/01/1972 | Chester (MR) | 21.33 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) | 02/07/2002 | 51.79 | ||
12075 | 30/09/1950 | DE | Saltley | 13/11/1971 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 21.17 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 05/1973 | 22.64 | ||
12076 | 31/10/1950 | DE | Saltley | 12/12/1971 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 21.17 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 05/1973 | 22.55 | ||
12077 | 31/10/1950 | DE | Saltley | 09/10/1971 | 21 | Prs | Preserved | 74.01 | ||||
12078 | 31/10/1950 | DE | Crewe South | 17/01/1971 | 20.25 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 10/1971 | 20.97 | |||
12079 | 30/11/1950 | DE | Carlisle Kingmoor | 11/09/1971 | 20.83 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 06/1972 | 21.56 | |||
12080 | 30/11/1950 | DE | Carlisle Kingmoor | 24/04/1971 | 20.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 03/1972 | 21.30 | |||
12081 | 30/11/1950 | DE | Carlisle Kingmoor | 20/06/1970 | 19.58 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 05/1972 | 21.47 | |||
12082 | 30/11/1950 | DE | Carlisle Kingmoor | 03/10/1971 | 20.92 | Prs | Preserved | 73.93 | ||||
12083 | 30/11/1950 | DE | Carlisle Kingmoor | 09/10/1971 | 20.92 | Prs | Preserved | 73.93 | ||||
12084 | 09/12/1950 | DE | Carlisle Canal | 16/05/1971 | 20.42 | Cut | National Coal Board (Philadelphia) | 11/1985 | 34.96 | |||
12085 | 31/12/1950 | DE | Carlisle Canal | 22/05/1971 | 20.42 | Cut | T W Ward (Barrow) | 04/1973 | 22.30 | |||
12086 | 31/12/1950 | DE | Carlisle Canal | 31/07/1969 | 18.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1970 | 19.05 | |||
12087 | 31/12/1950 | DE | Carlisle Canal | 17/07/1971 | 20.58 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 04/1973 | 22.30 | |||
12088 | 16/06/1951 | DE | Aston | 11/05/1971 | 19.92 | Prs | Preserved | 73.39 | ||||
12089 | 16/06/1951 | DE | Aston | 12/09/1970 | 19.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Derby) | 30/12/1971 | 20.55 | |||
12090 | 17/07/1951 | DE | Bushbury | 17/07/1971 | 20 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 06/1972 | 20.93 | |||
12091 | 17/07/1951 | DE | Bescot | 20/06/1970 | 18.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Derby) | 30/12/1971 | 20.47 | |||
12092 | 11/08/1951 | DE | Bescot | 16/04/1969 | 17.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1969 | 18.36 | |||
12093 | 08/09/1951 | DE | Bushbury | 16/05/1971 | 19.67 | Prs | Preserved | 73.16 | ||||
12094 | 06/10/1951 | DE | Bushbury | 09/10/1971 | 20 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 08/1972 | 20.87 | |||
12095 | 29/12/1951 | DE | Aston | 16/04/1969 | 17.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1970 | 18.39 | |||
12096 | 29/12/1951 | DE | Nottingham | 25/01/1969 | 17.08 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 12/1969 | 17.98 | |||
12097 | 29/12/1951 | DE | Nottingham | 28/03/1971 | 19.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 03/1972 | 20.22 | |||
12098 | 23/02/1952 | DE | Nottingham | 27/02/1970 | Longsight | 18 | Cut | Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) | 06/2006 | 54.35 | ||
12099 | 22/03/1952 | DE | Nottingham | 17/07/1971 | 19.33 | Prs | Preserved | 72.62 | ||||
12100 | 19/04/1952 | DE | Nottingham | 31/03/1969 | 16.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1969 | 17.67 | |||
12101 | 15/05/1952 | DE | Nottingham | 15/08/1970 | 18.25 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 07/1971 | 19.18 | |||
12102 | 14/06/1952 | DE | Nottingham | 17/01/1971 | 18.58 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 10/1971 | 19.35 | |||
12103 | 22/03/1952 | DA | Stratford | 18/06/1972 | Stratford | 20.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 03/1973 | 20.99 | ||
12104 | 19/04/1952 | DA | Stratford | 07/05/1967 | 15.08 | Cut | Cohens (at Stratford MPD) | 31/10/1967 | 15.54 | |||
12105 | 19/04/1952 | DA | Stratford | 14/01/1971 | Stratford | 18.75 | Cut | British Rail (at Stratford MPD) | 06/1972 | 20.17 | ||
12106 | 17/05/1952 | DA | Stratford | 30/07/1970 | 18.17 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/1971 | 18.68 | |||
12107 | 17/05/1952 | DA | Stratford | 30/12/1967 | 15.58 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 09/1968 | 16.34 | |||
12108 | 17/05/1952 | DA | Stratford | 01/12/1971 | Stratford | 19.58 | Cut | T W Ward (Beighton) | 03/1977 | 24.84 | ||
12109 | 04/06/1952 | DA | Stratford | 19/11/1972 | Stratford | 20.42 | Cut | Marples and Gillot (Sheffield) | 08/1973 | 21.21 | ||
12110 | 04/06/1952 | DA | Stratford | 19/11/1972 | Stratford | 20.42 | Cut | Marples and Gillot (Sheffield) | 08/1973 | 21.21 | ||
12111 | 19/07/1952 | DA | Stratford | 09/05/1971 | 18.83 | Cut | British Rail (at Stratford MPD) | 09/1972 | 20.17 | |||
12112 | 02/07/1952 | DA | Hornsey | 18/10/1969 | 17.25 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 09/1970 | 18.22 | |||
12113 | 19/07/1952 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 14/03/1971 | 18.67 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 08/1971 | 19.08 | |||
12114 | 19/07/1952 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 05/10/1970 | 18.25 | Cut | British Rail (at Stratford MPD) | 09/1972 | 20.17 | |||
12115 | 23/08/1952 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 05/10/1970 | 18.17 | Cut | British Rail (at Stratford MPD) | 07/1972 | 19.91 | |||
12116 | 20/09/1952 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 30/09/1969 | 17 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 12/1969 | 17.25 | |||
12117 | 20/09/1952 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 28/02/1969 | 16.42 | Cut | Arnott Young (Parkgate) | 10/1969 | 17.08 | |||
12118 | 20/09/1952 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 25/04/1971 | 18.58 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 09/1971 | 19.00 | |||
12119 | 20/09/1952 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 18/11/1968 | 16.17 | Cut | National Coal Board (Philadelphia) | 11/1985 | 33.18 | |||
12120 | 20/09/1952 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 28/12/1968 | 16.25 | Cut | National Coal Board (Philadelphia) | 03/1980 | 27.50 | |||
12121 | 18/10/1952 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 04/07/1971 | 18.75 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 04/1972 | 19.50 | |||
12122 | 18/10/1952 | DA | Hull Dairycoates | 04/07/1971 | 18.75 | Cut | British Oak Disposal Point (Crigglestone, Wakefield) | 06/1985 | 32.68 | |||
12123 | 18/10/1952 | DA | Hornsey | 25/06/1967 | 14.67 | Cut | T W Ward (Beighton) | 11/1967 | 15.08 | |||
12124 | 18/10/1952 | DA | Hornsey | 19/11/1968 | 16.08 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 06/1969 | 16.67 | |||
12125 | 18/10/1952 | DA | Kings Cross | 28/06/1969 | 16.67 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 10/1969 | 17.00 | |||
12126 | 15/11/1952 | DA | Kings Cross | 25/11/1968 | 16 | Cut | Arnott Young (Parkgate) | 07/1969 | 16.67 | |||
12127 | 15/11/1952 | DA | March | 22/10/1972 | Stratford | 19.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 04/1975 | 22.43 | ||
12128 | 15/11/1952 | DA | March | 30/07/1970 | 17.67 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 01/1971 | 18.18 | |||
12129 | 15/11/1952 | DA | March | 24/09/1967 | 14.83 | Cut | Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) | 06/1968 | 15.59 | |||
12130 | 15/11/1952 | DA | March | 16/07/1972 | Stratford | 19.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 02/1973 | 20.27 | ||
12131 | 15/11/1952 | DA | March | 16/04/1969 | 16.42 | Prs | Preserved | 71.97 | ||||
12132 | 15/11/1952 | DA | March | 25/06/1972 | Stratford | 19.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 03/1973 | 20.34 | ||
12133 | 13/12/1952 | DA | March | 01/02/1969 | 16.17 | Cut | National Coal Board (Philadelphia) | 11/1985 | 32.95 | |||
12134 | 13/12/1952 | DA | Stratford | 19/11/1972 | Stratford | 19.92 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 03/1973 | 20.27 | ||
12135 | 17/01/1953 | DA | Stratford | 28/06/1969 | 16.42 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 10/1969 | 16.75 | |||
12136 | 17/01/1953 | DA | Stratford | 30/12/1971 | Stratford | 18.92 | Cut | T W Ward (Beighton) | 03/1977 | 24.17 | ||
12137 | 17/01/1953 | DA | March | 18/11/1968 | 15.83 | Cut | J E McMurray of Greenford (at Stratford MPD) | 11/1969 | 16.84 | |||
12138 | 17/01/1953 | DA | March | 18/11/1968 | 15.83 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 09/1969 | 16.67 |