26 Bo-Bo
BR (Pre Tops) | BR (Tops) | Date To Service | Bld | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D5300 | 26007 | 30/07/1958 | BC | Hornsey | 04/10/1993 | 35.25 | Prs | Preserved | 64.64 | |||
D5301 | 26001 | 12/09/1958 | BC | Hornsey | 04/10/1993 | 35.08 | Prs | Preserved | 64.52 | |||
D5302 | 26002 | 02/10/1958 | BC | Hornsey | 09/10/1992 | 34 | Prs | Preserved | 36.16 | |||
D5303 | 26003 | 17/10/1958 | BC | Hornsey | 04/10/1993 | 35 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 25/01/1995 | 36.30 | ||
D5304 | 26004 | 31/10/1958 | BC | Hornsey | 24/11/1992 | 34.08 | Prs | Preserved | 36.09 | |||
D5305 | 26005 | 14/11/1958 | BC | Hornsey | 04/10/1993 | 34.92 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 13/02/1995 | 36.27 | ||
D5306 | 26006 | 28/11/1958 | BC | Hornsey | 06/09/1993 | 34.83 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 08/06/1995 | 36.55 | ||
D5307 | 26020 | 05/12/1958 | BC | Hornsey | 04/02/1977 | 18.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 03/1978 | 19.29 | ||
D5308 | 26008 | 12/12/1958 | BC | Hornsey | 12/03/1993 | 34.25 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 13/07/1994 | 35.61 | ||
D5309 | 26009 | 19/12/1958 | BC | Hornsey | 27/01/1977 | 18.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 30/04/1978 | 19.38 | ||
D5310 | 26010 | 06/01/1959 | BC | Hornsey | 04/12/1992 | 33.92 | Prs | Preserved | 64.20 | |||
D5311 | 26011 | 09/01/1959 | BC | Hornsey | 24/11/1992 | 33.83 | Prs | Preserved | 35.90 | |||
D5312 | 26012 | 16/01/1959 | BC | Hornsey | 31/01/1982 | 23 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 08/1982 | 23.59 | ||
D5313 | 26013 | 23/01/1959 | BC | Hornsey | 18/03/1985 | 26.17 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 30/06/1987 | 28.45 | ||
D5314 | 26014 | 30/01/1959 | BC | Hornsey | 09/10/1992 | 33.75 | Prs | Preserved | 35.85 | |||
D5315 | 26015 | 13/03/1959 | BC | Hornsey | 23/06/1991 | 32.25 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 02/09/1994 | 35.50 | ||
D5316 | 26016 | 20/03/1959 | BC | Hornsey | 05/10/1975 | 16.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 09/1976 | 17.50 | ||
D5317 | 26017 | 27/02/1959 | BC | Hornsey | 29/08/1977 | 18.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 02/1978 | 18.98 | ||
D5318 | 26018 | 06/03/1959 | BC | Hornsey | 31/01/1982 | 22.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 04/1982 | 23.13 | ||
D5319 | 26019 | 13/03/1959 | BC | Hornsey | 18/03/1985 | 26 | Cut | Vic Berry (at Thornton Yard) | 05/1987 | 28.19 | ||
D5320 | 26028 | 10/04/1959 | BC | 02/10/1991 | 32.5 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 05/11/1992 | 33.60 | |||
D5321 | 26021 | 17/04/1959 | BC | Haymarket | 01/10/1991 | 32.5 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 08/1994 | 35.35 | ||
D5322 | 26022 | 24/04/1959 | BC | Haymarket | 01/02/1981 | 21.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 06/1981 | 22.16 | ||
D5323 | 26023 | 01/05/1959 | BC | Haymarket | 21/09/1990 | 31.33 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 29/01/1991 | 31.77 | ||
D5324 | 26024 | 08/05/1959 | BC | Haymarket | 09/10/1992 | 33.42 | Prs | Preserved | 35.59 | |||
D5325 | 26025 | 14/05/1959 | BC | Haymarket | 04/10/1993 | 34.42 | Prs | Preserved | 63.85 | |||
D5326 | 26026 | 22/05/1959 | BC | Haymarket | 24/11/1992 | 33.5 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 22/06/1995 | 36.11 | ||
D5327 | 26027 | 06/06/1959 | BC | Haymarket | 26/07/1991 | 32.08 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 29/01/1995 | 35.67 | ||
D5328 | 12/06/1959 | BC | Haymarket | 18/07/1972 | 13.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 12/1972 | 13.52 | |||
D5329 | 26029 | 12/06/1959 | BC | Haymarket | 13/10/1988 | 29.33 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 30/11/1989 | 30.49 | ||
D5330 | 26030 | 19/06/1959 | BC | Haymarket | 18/03/1985 | 25.75 | Cut | Vic Berry (at Thornton Yard) | 03/1987 | 27.76 | ||
D5331 | 26031 | 26/06/1959 | BC | Haymarket | 04/10/1989 | 30.33 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 06/09/1990 | 31.22 | ||
D5332 | 26032 | 02/07/1959 | BC | Haymarket | 04/10/1993 | 34.25 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 16/02/1995 | 35.65 | ||
D5333 | 26033 | 10/07/1959 | BC | Haymarket | 18/03/1985 | 25.67 | Cut | Vic Berry (at Thornton Yard) | 03/1987 | 27.70 | ||
D5334 | 26034 | 17/07/1959 | BC | Haymarket | 08/09/1989 | 30.17 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 03/09/1990 | 31.15 | ||
D5335 | 26035 | 24/07/1959 | BC | Haymarket | 10/12/1992 | 33.42 | Prs | Preserved | 63.65 | |||
D5336 | 26036 | 14/08/1959 | BC | Haymarket | 04/10/1993 | 34.17 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 19/02/1995 | 35.54 | ||
D5337 | 26037 | 20/08/1959 | BC | Haymarket | 04/10/1993 | 34.17 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 02/02/1995 | 35.48 | ||
D5338 | 26038 | 28/08/1959 | BC | Haymarket | 19/10/1992 | 33.17 | Prs | Preserved | 63.56 | |||
D5339 | 26039 | 04/09/1959 | BC | Haymarket | 18/10/1990 | 31.08 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 20/10/1993 | 34.15 | ||
D5340 | 26040 | 11/09/1959 | BC | Haymarket | 04/12/1992 | 33.25 | Prs | Preserved | 35.30 | |||
D5341 | 26041 | 18/09/1959 | BC | Haymarket | 24/11/1992 | 33.17 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 16/03/1995 | 35.52 | ||
D5342 | 26042 | 25/09/1959 | BC | Haymarket | 09/10/1992 | 33.08 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 13/06/1995 | 35.74 | ||
D5343 | 26043 | 02/10/1959 | BC | Haymarket | 19/01/1993 | 33.25 | Prs | Preserved | 35.22 | |||
D5344 | 26044 | 09/10/1959 | BC | Haymarket | 17/01/1984 | 24.25 | Cut | Vic Berry (at Thornton Yard) | 28/02/1987 | 27.41 | ||
D5345 | 26045 | 23/10/1959 | BC | Haymarket | 04/07/1983 | 23.75 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 08/1987 | 27.83 | ||
D5346 | 26046 | 30/10/1959 | BC | Haymarket | 19/04/1991 | 31.5 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 10/1993 | 33.98 |