Beyer-Peacock 35 B-B
BR (Pre Tops) | Date To Service | Bld | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D7000 | 16/05/1961 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 30/07/1973 | 12.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 06/10/1975 | 14.40 | ||
D7001 | 03/07/1961 | BP | St Philips Marsh | 16/03/1974 | 12.67 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 07/1975 | 14.04 | ||
D7002 | 19/07/1961 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 03/10/1971 | 10.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 23/06/1972 | 10.94 | ||
D7003 | 03/08/1961 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 01/01/1972 | 10.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 04/08/1972 | 11.01 | ||
D7004 | 15/08/1961 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 16/06/1972 | 10.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 25/08/1972 | 11.04 | ||
D7005 | 25/09/1961 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 02/07/1972 | 10.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1972 | 11.06 | ||
D7006 | 06/10/1961 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 11/09/1971 | 9.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 09/1972 | 10.95 | ||
D7007 | 18/10/1961 | BP | Westbury | 19/04/1972 | 10.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 06/1972 | 10.67 | ||
D7008 | 24/10/1961 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 01/01/1972 | 10.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 09/1972 | 10.90 | ||
D7009 | 07/11/1961 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 06/05/1973 | 11.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1974 | 12.95 | ||
D7010 | 20/11/1961 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 01/01/1972 | 10.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 11/1972 | 10.99 | ||
D7011 | 04/12/1961 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 02/03/1975 | 13.25 | Cut | Marples and Gillot (Sheffield) | 01/1977 | 15.13 | ||
D7012 | 01/12/1961 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 01/01/1972 | 10.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 06/1972 | 10.55 | ||
D7013 | 14/12/1961 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 01/01/1972 | 10.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1972 | 10.84 | ||
D7014 | 18/12/1961 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 01/01/1972 | 10.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1972 | 10.67 | ||
D7015 | 22/12/1961 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 07/06/1972 | 10.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 09/1972 | 10.74 | ||
D7016 | 03/01/1962 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 05/07/1974 | 12.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 06/1975 | 13.45 | ||
D7017 | 08/01/1962 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 13/03/1975 | 13.17 | Prs | Preserved | 61.19 | |||
D7018 | 18/01/1962 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 16/03/1975 | 13.17 | Prs | Preserved | 61.16 | |||
D7019 | 14/02/1962 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 15/09/1972 | 10.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1972 | 10.67 | ||
D7020 | 08/02/1962 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 01/01/1972 | 9.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 09/1972 | 10.61 | ||
D7021 | 14/02/1962 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 01/01/1972 | 9.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 06/1972 | 10.34 | ||
D7022 | 26/02/1962 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 02/03/1975 | 13.08 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 01/1977 | 14.90 | ||
D7023 | 21/02/1962 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 09/06/1973 | 11.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/1975 | 13.24 | ||
D7024 | 16/03/1962 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 01/01/1972 | 9.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 11/1972 | 10.68 | ||
D7025 | 15/03/1962 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 01/01/1972 | 9.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 06/1972 | 10.26 | ||
D7026 | 26/03/1962 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 06/10/1974 | 12.58 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 02/1977 | 14.90 | ||
D7027 | 07/04/1962 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 29/11/1971 | 9.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1972 | 10.36 | ||
D7028 | 05/04/1962 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 01/01/1975 | 12.75 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 02/1977 | 14.88 | ||
D7029 | 17/04/1962 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 28/02/1975 | 12.83 | Prs | Preserved | 60.92 | |||
D7030 | 19/04/1962 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 06/05/1973 | 11.08 | Cut | Birds (Long Marston) | 02/1974 | 11.84 | ||
D7031 | 25/04/1962 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 11/05/1973 | 11.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 09/1975 | 13.40 | ||
D7032 | 05/05/1962 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 06/05/1973 | 11 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 07/1975 | 13.20 | ||
D7033 | 24/05/1962 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 01/01/1972 | 9.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 11/1972 | 10.49 | ||
D7034 | 23/05/1962 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 01/01/1972 | 9.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 09/1972 | 10.32 | ||
D7035 | 04/06/1962 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 01/01/1972 | 9.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1972 | 10.21 | ||
D7036 | 05/06/1962 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 09/06/1972 | 10 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1972 | 10.37 | ||
D7037 | 18/06/1962 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 15/09/1972 | 10.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 11/1972 | 10.42 | ||
D7038 | 18/06/1962 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 02/07/1972 | 10.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 06/1973 | 11.00 | ||
D7039 | 22/06/1962 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 03/06/1972 | 10 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1972 | 10.16 | ||
D7040 | 13/07/1962 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 01/01/1972 | 9.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1972 | 10.10 | ||
D7041 | 13/07/1962 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 01/01/1972 | 9.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 09/1972 | 10.18 | ||
D7042 | 23/07/1962 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 01/01/1972 | 9.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 07/1972 | 9.99 | ||
D7043 | 24/07/1962 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 01/01/1972 | 9.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1972 | 10.07 | ||
D7044 | 18/08/1962 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 06/05/1973 | 10.75 | Cut | Birds (Long Marston) | 02/1974 | 11.50 | ||
D7045 | 10/08/1962 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 11/11/1972 | 10.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1973 | 11.02 | ||
D7046 | 15/08/1962 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 01/01/1972 | 9.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 07/1972 | 9.92 | ||
D7047 | 15/08/1962 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 01/01/1972 | 9.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1972 | 10.01 | ||
D7048 | 26/09/1962 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 01/01/1972 | 9.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1972 | 9.89 | ||
D7049 | 05/10/1962 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 01/01/1972 | 9.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 07/1972 | 9.78 | ||
D7050 | 05/10/1962 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 01/11/1972 | 10.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 06/1973 | 10.70 | ||
D7051 | 06/10/1962 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 01/01/1972 | 9.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 06/1972 | 9.70 | ||
D7052 | 24/10/1962 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 30/11/1972 | 10.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/1973 | 10.56 | ||
D7053 | 24/10/1962 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 01/01/1972 | 9.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1972 | 9.82 | ||
D7054 | 16/11/1962 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 30/12/1972 | 10.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 04/1975 | 12.42 | ||
D7055 | 02/11/1962 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 09/06/1973 | 10.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 11/1975 | 13.04 | ||
D7056 | 13/11/1962 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 01/01/1972 | 9.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 07/1972 | 9.68 | ||
D7057 | 22/11/1962 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 01/01/1972 | 9.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1972 | 9.90 | ||
D7058 | 28/11/1962 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 03/10/1971 | 8.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 06/1972 | 9.55 | ||
D7059 | 28/11/1962 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 03/10/1971 | 8.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 07/1972 | 9.64 | ||
D7060 | 19/12/1962 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 03/10/1971 | 8.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1972 | 9.83 | ||
D7061 | 29/12/1962 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 01/01/1972 | 9.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1972 | 9.64 | ||
D7062 | 31/01/1963 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 03/10/1971 | 8.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1972 | 9.55 | ||
D7063 | 28/12/1962 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 03/10/1971 | 8.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 11/1972 | 9.89 | ||
D7064 | 29/01/1963 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 03/10/1971 | 8.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 09/1972 | 9.64 | ||
D7065 | 28/01/1963 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 01/01/1972 | 9 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 09/1972 | 9.64 | ||
D7066 | 31/01/1963 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 29/11/1971 | 8.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1972 | 9.55 | ||
D7067 | 06/02/1963 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 03/10/1971 | 8.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1972 | 9.53 | ||
D7068 | 13/02/1963 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 30/12/1972 | 9.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 04/1975 | 12.18 | ||
D7069 | 22/02/1963 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 03/10/1971 | 8.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1972 | 9.48 | ||
D7070 | 08/03/1963 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 08/09/1972 | 9.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1972 | 9.61 | ||
D7071 | 11/03/1963 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 01/01/1972 | 8.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 09/1972 | 9.52 | ||
D7072 | 22/03/1963 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 03/10/1971 | 8.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 09/1972 | 9.49 | ||
D7073 | 11/03/1963 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 10/12/1971 | 8.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1972 | 9.61 | ||
D7074 | 26/03/1963 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 30/12/1972 | 9.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1975 | 12.40 | ||
D7075 | 29/03/1963 | BP | Newton Abbot | 06/05/1973 | 10.17 | Cut | Birds (Long Marston) | 01/1974 | 10.81 | ||
D7076 | 03/05/1963 | BP | Old Oak Common | 06/05/1973 | 10 | Prs | Preserved | 59.87 | |||
D7077 | 13/12/1963 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 02/07/1972 | 8.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1972 | 8.85 | ||
D7078 | 03/05/1963 | BP | Old Oak Common | 03/10/1971 | 8.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/1972 | 9.04 | ||
D7079 | 16/12/1963 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 03/10/1971 | 7.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1972 | 8.67 | ||
D7080 | 14/12/1963 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 07/11/1972 | 8.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/1973 | 9.42 | ||
D7081 | 12/12/1963 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 11/09/1971 | 7.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1972 | 8.68 | ||
D7082 | 05/06/1963 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 19/04/1972 | 8.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1972 | 9.37 | ||
D7083 | 05/06/1963 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 03/10/1971 | 8.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 09/1972 | 9.29 | ||
D7084 | 26/06/1963 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 11/10/1972 | 9.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 11/1972 | 9.40 | ||
D7085 | 24/06/1963 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 11/10/1972 | 9.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 11/1972 | 9.40 | ||
D7086 | 20/07/1963 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 01/01/1972 | 8.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 09/1972 | 9.16 | ||
D7087 | 20/07/1963 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 07/10/1972 | 9.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 09/1973 | 10.16 | ||
D7088 | 29/10/1963 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 01/01/1972 | 8.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1972 | 8.97 | ||
D7089 | 23/07/1963 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 06/05/1973 | 9.83 | Cut | T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) | 02/1976 | 12.58 | ||
D7090 | 24/09/1963 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 12/06/1972 | 8.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 09/1972 | 8.98 | ||
D7091 | 24/09/1963 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 10/08/1972 | 8.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1972 | 9.07 | ||
D7092 | 16/12/1963 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 20/06/1972 | 8.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 09/1972 | 8.76 | ||
D7093 | 14/12/1963 | BP | Bristol Bath Road | 26/11/1974 | 10.92 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 02/1977 | 13.18 | ||
D7094 | 14/12/1963 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 01/11/1972 | 8.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 07/1973 | 9.59 | ||
D7095 | 24/12/1963 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 16/10/1972 | 8.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 11/1972 | 8.90 | ||
D7096 | 16/12/1963 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 30/12/1972 | 9 | Cut | Marples and Gillot (Sheffield) | 02/1986 | 22.18 | ||
D7097 | 16/12/1963 | BP | Cardiff Canton | 30/12/1972 | 9 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1975 | 11.25 | ||
D7098 | 01/01/1964 | BP | Newton Abbot | 30/12/1972 | 8.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1975 | 11.21 | ||
D7099 | 22/01/1964 | BP | Newton Abbot | 15/10/1972 | 8.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1972 | 8.74 | ||
D7100 | 05/02/1964 | BP | Newton Abbot | 01/11/1972 | 8.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 12/1974 | 10.87 |