45 1Co-Co1
BR (Pre Tops) | BR (45/1) | BR (45/0) | BR (Dept) | Date To Service | Bld | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D11 | 45122 | 01/10/1960 | DE | Camden | 27/04/1987 | 26.5 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 11/02/1994 | 33.39 | ||||
D12 | 45011 | 15/10/1960 | DE | Camden | 31/05/1981 | 20.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Derby) | 09/1981 | 20.93 | ||||
D13 | 45001 | 05/11/1960 | DE | Derby | 20/01/1986 | 25.17 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 24/11/1988 | 28.07 | ||||
D14 | 45015 | 24/11/1960 | DE | Derby | 03/03/1986 | 25.33 | Prs | Preserved | 62.30 | |||||
D15 | 45018 | 09/12/1960 | DE | Derby | 14/12/1980 | 20 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/1982 | 21.86 | ||||
D16 | 45016 | 15/12/1960 | DE | Derby | 18/11/1985 | 24.92 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 12/1986 | 26.02 | ||||
D17 | 45024 | 23/12/1960 | DE | Derby | 14/12/1980 | 20 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/1983 | 22.66 | ||||
D18 | 45121 | 31/12/1960 | DE | Derby | 19/11/1987 | 26.92 | Cut | Thomas Hill Ltd (Derby Litchurch Lane Works) | 13/09/1993 | 32.72 | ||||
D19 | 45025 | 31/12/1960 | DE | Derby | 10/05/1981 | 20.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Derby) | 11/1981 | 20.89 | ||||
D20 | 45013 | 24/02/1961 | DE | Derby | 27/04/1987 | 26.17 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 09/02/1994 | 32.98 | ||||
D21 | 45026 | 03/03/1961 | DE | Derby | 07/04/1986 | 25.08 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 14/02/1989 | 27.97 | ||||
D22 | 45132 | 30/03/1961 | DE | Derby | 11/05/1987 | 26.17 | Prs | Preserved | 61.95 | |||||
D23 | 45017 | 08/04/1961 | DE | Derby | 01/08/1985 | 24.33 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 11/1991 | 30.62 | ||||
D24 | 45027 | 15/04/1961 | DE | Derby | 31/05/1981 | 20.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 19/09/1983 | 22.44 | ||||
D25 | 45021 | 15/04/1961 | DE | Derby | 14/12/1980 | 19.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 04/1983 | 22.01 | ||||
D26 | 45020 | 22/04/1961 | DE | Derby | 08/12/1985 | 24.67 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 08/1988 | 27.33 | ||||
D27 | 45028 | 29/04/1961 | DE | Derby | 14/12/1980 | 19.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 16/04/1983 | 21.98 | ||||
D28 | 45124 | 04/05/1961 | DE | Derby | 22/01/1988 | 26.67 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 14/02/1992 | 30.80 | ||||
D29 | 45002 | 13/05/1961 | DE | Derby | 16/09/1984 | 23.33 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 17/11/1988 | 27.53 | ||||
D30 | 45029 | 97410 | 20/05/1961 | DE | Derby | 14/12/1980 | 19.58 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 10/1991 | 30.42 | |||
D31 | 45030 | 03/06/1961 | DE | Derby | 30/11/1980 | 19.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Derby) | 03/1981 | 19.79 | ||||
D32 | 45126 | 12/06/1961 | DE | Derby | 27/04/1987 | 25.83 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 18/06/1992 | 31.04 | ||||
D33 | 45019 | 19/06/1961 | DE | Derby | 04/09/1985 | 24.25 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 12/1986 | 25.51 | ||||
D34 | 45119 | 29/06/1961 | DE | Derby | 07/05/1987 | 25.92 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 12/04/1994 | 32.81 | ||||
D35 | 45117 | 30/06/1961 | DE | Derby | 12/05/1986 | 24.92 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 03/1987 | 25.72 | ||||
D36 | 45031 | 06/07/1961 | DE | Derby | 31/05/1981 | 19.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Derby) | 10/1981 | 20.29 | ||||
D37 | 45009 | 10/07/1961 | DE | Derby | 13/09/1986 | 25.17 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 08/1988 | 27.12 | ||||
D38 | 45032 | 13/07/1961 | DE | Derby | 14/12/1980 | 19.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 17/09/1983 | 22.19 | ||||
D39 | 45033 | 20/07/1961 | DE | Derby | 04/02/1988 | 26.58 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 10/02/1992 | 30.58 | ||||
D40 | 45133 | 26/07/1961 | DE | Derby | 10/05/1987 | 25.83 | Prs | Preserved | 29.25 | |||||
D41 | 45147 | 29/07/1961 | DE | Derby | 04/01/1985 | 23.5 | Cut | Vic Berry (at Patricroft) | 03/1985 | 23.64 | ||||
D42 | 45034 | 97411 | 19/08/1961 | DE | Derby | 07/1988 | 26.92 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 05/1992 | 30.76 | |||
D43 | 45107 | 28/08/1961 | DE | Cricklewood East | 27/07/1988 | 26.92 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 21/03/1990 | 28.58 | ||||
D44 | 45035 | 02/09/1961 | DE | Cricklewood East | 31/05/1981 | 19.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Derby) | 11/1981 | 20.22 | ||||
D45 | 45036 | 08/09/1961 | DE | Cricklewood East | 11/05/1986 | 24.67 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 08/1988 | 26.95 | ||||
D46 | 45037 | 02/10/1961 | DE | Cricklewood East | 27/07/1988 | 26.75 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 13/11/1992 | 31.14 | ||||
D47 | 45116 | 30/09/1961 | DE | Cricklewood East | 22/12/1986 | 25.25 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 09/1988 | 26.98 | ||||
D48 | 45038 | 02/10/1961 | DE | Cricklewood East | 05/06/1985 | 23.67 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 12/1986 | 25.22 | ||||
D49 | 45039 | 07/10/1961 | DE | Cricklewood East | 14/12/1980 | 19.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 14/05/1983 | 21.61 | THE MANCHESTER REGIMENT | |||
D50 | 45040 | 97412 | 22/05/1962 | CW | Derby | 08/1988 | 26.25 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 10/1991 | 29.42 | KING'S SHROPSHIRE LIGHT INFANTRY | ||
D51 | 45102 | 05/06/1962 | CW | Derby | 09/09/1986 | 24.25 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 10/1988 | 26.38 | ||||
D52 | 45123 | 07/06/1962 | CW | Derby | 22/07/1987 | 25.08 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 09/08/1988 | 26.19 | ||||
D53 | 45041 | 25/06/1962 | CW | Derby | 08/06/1988 | 26 | Prs | Preserved | 60.72 | ROYAL TANK REGIMENT | ||||
D54 | 45023 | 08/08/1962 | CW | Derby | 12/09/1984 | 22.08 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 12/1986 | 24.37 | ||||
D55 | 45144 | 10/09/1962 | CW | Derby | 21/12/1987 | 25.25 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 07/1988 | 25.86 | ROYAL SIGNALS | |||
D56 | 45137 | 23/11/1962 | CW | Cricklewood East | 15/06/1987 | 24.58 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 03/1994 | 31.33 | ||||
D57 | 45042 | 29/06/1963 | CW | Derby | 29/04/1985 | 21.83 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 01/1987 | 23.56 | ||||
D58 | 45043 | 30/01/1962 | CW | Derby | 12/09/1984 | 22.67 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 01/1987 | 24.98 | THE KING'S OWN ROYAL BORDER REGIMENT | |||
D59 | 45104 | 06/02/1962 | CW | Derby | 13/04/1988 | 26.17 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 17/02/1992 | 30.05 | ||||
D60 | 45022 | 97409 | 15/02/1962 | CW | Derby | 07/1988 | 26.42 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 10/1991 | 29.68 | LYTHAM ST. ANNES | ||
D61 | 45112 | 08/03/1962 | CW | Derby | 07/05/1987 | 25.17 | Prs | Preserved | 61.01 | ROYAL ARMY ORDNANCE CORPS | ||||
D62 | 45143 | 15/03/1962 | CW | Derby | 07/05/1987 | 25.17 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 13/03/1994 | 32.02 | 5TH ROYAL INNISKILLING DRAGOON GUARDS | |||
D63 | 45044 | 29/03/1962 | CW | Derby | 15/06/1987 | 25.25 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 14/02/1989 | 26.90 | ROYAL INNISKILLING FUSILIER | |||
D64 | 45045 | 09/04/1962 | CW | Derby | 08/05/1983 | 21.08 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 10/1986 | 24.53 | COLDSTREAM GUARDSMAN | |||
D65 | 45111 | 13/04/1962 | CW | Derby | 07/05/1987 | 25.08 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 08/07/1992 | 30.26 | ||||
D66 | 45146 | 17/04/1962 | CW | Derby | 07/04/1987 | 25 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 05/05/1992 | 30.07 | ||||
D67 | 45118 | 03/05/1962 | CW | Derby | 08/05/1987 | 25 | Prs | Preserved | 60.86 | ROYAL ARTILLERYMAN | ||||
D68 | 45046 | 05/10/1960 | CW | Crewe North | 02/08/1988 | 27.83 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 12/02/1992 | 31.38 | ROYAL FUSILIER | |||
D69 | 45047 | 18/10/1960 | CW | Crewe North | 03/08/1980 | 19.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Derby) | 02/1981 | 20.34 | ||||
D70 | 45048 | 12/11/1960 | CW | Crewe North | 24/06/1985 | 24.58 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 12/01/1989 | 28.19 | THE ROYAL MARINES | |||
D71 | 45049 | 25/11/1960 | CW | Crewe North | 27/10/1987 | 26.92 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 19/04/1989 | 28.42 | THE STAFFORDSHIRE REGIMENT (THE PRINCE OF WALES'S) | |||
D72 | 45050 | 19/11/1960 | CW | Crewe North | 12/09/1984 | 23.83 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 03/1987 | 26.33 | ||||
D73 | 45110 | 25/11/1960 | CW | Crewe North | 27/07/1988 | 27.67 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 13/06/1990 | 29.57 | ||||
D74 | 45051 | 05/12/1960 | CW | Crewe North | 09/04/1987 | 26.33 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 13/01/1989 | 28.13 | ||||
D75 | 45052 | 02/12/1960 | CW | Crewe North | 08/06/1988 | 27.5 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 25/09/1991 | 30.83 | ||||
D76 | 45053 | 30/11/1960 | CW | Crewe North | 27/11/1983 | 23 | Cut | A Hampton (at Crewe Works) | 10/1988 | 27.89 | ||||
D77 | 45004 | 10/12/1960 | CW | Crewe North | 08/12/1985 | 25 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 21/12/1988 | 28.05 | ROYAL IRISH FUSILIER | |||
D78 | 45150 | 45054 | 12/12/1960 | CW | Derby | 04/02/1988 | 27.17 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 16/12/1991 | 31.03 | |||
D79 | 45005 | 15/12/1960 | CW | Derby | 17/03/1986 | 25.25 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 09/08/1988 | 27.67 | ||||
D80 | 45113 | 17/12/1960 | CW | Derby | 02/08/1988 | 27.67 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 28/03/1990 | 29.30 | ||||
D81 | 45115 | 21/12/1960 | CW | Derby | 13/06/1988 | 27.5 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 16/06/1990 | 29.50 | ||||
D82 | 45141 | 31/12/1960 | CW | Derby | 04/08/1988 | 27.67 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 03/1992 | 31.22 | ||||
D83 | 45142 | 31/12/1960 | CW | Derby | 18/06/1987 | 26.5 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 06/03/1994 | 33.20 | ||||
D84 | 45055 | 31/12/1960 | CW | Derby | 11/04/1985 | 24.33 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 30/11/1986 | 25.93 | ROYAL CORPS OF TRANSPORT | |||
D85 | 45109 | 06/02/1961 | CW | Derby | 27/01/1986 | 24.92 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 30/11/1986 | 25.83 | ||||
D86 | 45105 | 09/03/1961 | CW | Derby | 10/05/1987 | 26.17 | Prs | Preserved | 62.01 | |||||
D87 | 45127 | 24/02/1961 | CW | Derby | 07/05/1987 | 26.25 | Cut | J&S Metals (at Crewe Works) | 29/04/1994 | 33.20 | ||||
D88 | 45136 | 02/03/1961 | CW | Derby | 07/05/1987 | 26.17 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 08/04/1992 | 31.12 | ||||
D89 | 45006 | 22/03/1961 | CW | Derby | 14/09/1986 | 25.5 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 10/1988 | 27.59 | HONOURABLE ARTILLERY COMPANY | |||
D90 | 45008 | 11/03/1961 | CW | Derby | 14/12/1980 | 19.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 09/1983 | 22.53 | ||||
D91 | 45056 | 17/03/1961 | CW | Derby | 29/11/1985 | 24.67 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 01/1987 | 25.85 | ||||
D92 | 45138 | 25/03/1961 | CW | Derby | 22/12/1986 | 25.75 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 14/04/1994 | 33.08 | ||||
D93 | 45057 | 28/03/1961 | CW | Derby | 21/01/1985 | 23.83 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 28/02/1987 | 25.94 | ||||
D94 | 45114 | 06/04/1961 | CW | Derby | 17/02/1987 | 25.83 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 07/02/1994 | 32.86 | ||||
D95 | 45054 | 15/04/1961 | CW | Derby | 21/01/1985 | 23.75 | Cut | Vic Berry (at Toton MPD) | 30/11/1985 | 24.64 | ||||
D96 | 45101 | 18/04/1961 | CW | Derby | 13/11/1986 | 25.58 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 30/09/1988 | 27.47 | ||||
D97 | 45058 | 22/04/1961 | CW | Derby | 03/09/1987 | 26.42 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 15/03/1994 | 32.92 | ||||
D98 | 45059 | 26/04/1961 | CW | Derby | 03/03/1986 | 24.92 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 09/08/1988 | 27.31 | ROYAL ENGINEER | |||
D99 | 45135 | 03/05/1961 | CW | Derby | 09/03/1987 | 25.83 | Prs | Preserved | 61.86 | 3RD CARABINIER | ||||
D100 | 45060 | 08/05/1961 | CW | Derby | 08/12/1985 | 24.58 | Prs | Preserved | 61.85 | SHERWOOD FORESTER | ||||
D101 | 45061 | 20/05/1961 | CW | Derby | 16/08/1981 | Toton | 20.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 04/1982 | 20.92 | |||
D102 | 45140 | 18/05/1961 | CW | Derby | 29/03/1988 | 26.83 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 22/11/1991 | 30.53 | ||||
D103 | 45062 | 30/05/1961 | CW | Derby | 02/07/1987 | 26.17 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 04/03/1994 | 32.78 | ||||
D104 | 45063 | 01/06/1961 | CW | Derby | 02/05/1986 | 24.92 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 09/08/1988 | 27.21 | ||||
D105 | 45064 | 09/06/1961 | CW | Derby | 21/01/1985 | 23.58 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 09/08/1988 | 27.19 | ||||
D106 | 45106 | 15/06/1961 | CW | Derby | 20/02/1989 | 27.67 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 30/04/1992 | 30.90 | ||||
D107 | 45120 | 20/07/1961 | CW | Derby | 24/03/1987 | 25.67 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 19/05/1993 | 31.85 | ||||
D108 | 45012 | 28/07/1961 | CW | Derby | 27/07/1988 | 27 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 16/11/1992 | 31.33 | ||||
D109 | 45139 | 30/06/1961 | CW | Derby | 27/04/1987 | 25.83 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 03/03/1994 | 32.70 | ||||
D110 | 45065 | 25/07/1961 | CW | Derby | 05/03/1985 | 23.67 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 09/08/1988 | 27.06 | ||||
D111 | 45129 | 04/08/1961 | CW | Derby | 15/06/1987 | 25.83 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 12/1988 | 27.38 | ||||
D112 | 45010 | 08/08/1961 | CW | Derby | 28/03/1985 | 23.58 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 26/01/1989 | 27.49 | ||||
D113 | 45128 | 14/09/1961 | CW | Derby | 22/04/1989 | 27.58 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 03/1992 | 30.52 | ||||
D114 | 45066 | 97413 | 19/09/1961 | CW | Derby | 26/07/1988 | 26.83 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 10/1991 | 30.09 | |||
D115 | 45067 | 28/08/1961 | CW | Derby | 31/07/1977 | 15.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Derby) | 06/1980 | 18.81 | ||||
D116 | 45103 | 01/09/1961 | CW | Derby | 02/08/1988 | 26.92 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 24/08/1990 | 29.00 | ||||
D117 | 45130 | 09/09/1961 | CW | Derby | 10/05/1987 | 25.67 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 03/06/1993 | 31.75 | ||||
D118 | 45068 | 16/09/1961 | CW | Derby | 28/01/1986 | 24.33 | Cut | Vic Berry (at Allerton MPD) | 04/1986 | 24.59 | ||||
D119 | 45007 | 23/09/1961 | CW | Derby | 27/07/1988 | 26.83 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 06/11/1992 | 31.14 | ||||
D120 | 45108 | 30/09/1961 | CW | Derby | 04/08/1987 | 25.92 | Prs | Preserved | 61.45 | |||||
D121 | 45069 | 06/10/1961 | CW | Derby | 08/07/1986 | 24.75 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 09/08/1988 | 26.86 | ||||
D122 | 45070 | 11/10/1961 | CW | Derby | 29/01/1987 | 25.25 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 27/05/1989 | 27.64 | ||||
D123 | 45125 | 28/10/1961 | CW | Derby | 07/05/1987 | 25.58 | Prs | Preserved | 61.37 | |||||
D124 | 45131 | 21/10/1961 | CW | Derby | 03/09/1986 | 24.92 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 09/08/1988 | 26.82 | ||||
D125 | 45071 | 31/10/1961 | CW | Derby | 12/07/1981 | Toton | 19.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 07/1983 | 21.72 | |||
D126 | 45134 | 09/11/1961 | CW | Derby | 17/09/1987 | 25.83 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 05/1994 | 32.53 | ||||
D127 | 45072 | 15/11/1961 | CW | Derby | 26/04/1985 | 23.42 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 12/1986 | 25.10 | ||||
D128 | 45145 | 18/11/1961 | CW | Derby | 23/02/1988 | 26.25 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 09/02/1992 | 30.25 | ||||
D129 | 45073 | 25/11/1961 | CW | Derby | 18/10/1981 | Toton | 19.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Derby) | 11/1982 | 20.99 | |||
D130 | 45148 | 04/12/1961 | CW | Derby | 11/02/1987 | 25.17 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 23/06/1992 | 30.57 | ||||
D131 | 45074 | 09/12/1961 | CW | Derby | 04/09/1985 | 23.75 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 10/1988 | 26.87 | ||||
D132 | 45075 | 16/12/1961 | CW | Derby | 24/01/1985 | 23.08 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 03/1987 | 25.26 | ||||
D133 | 45003 | 21/12/1961 | CW | Derby | 08/12/1985 | 24 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 28/02/1987 | 25.21 | ||||
D134 | 45076 | 30/12/1961 | CW | Derby | 12/11/1986 | 24.92 | Cut | MC Metals (Springburn) | 11/03/1994 | 32.22 | ||||
D135 | 45149 | 30/12/1961 | CW | Derby | 14/09/1987 | 25.75 | Prs | Preserved | 61.20 | |||||
D136 | 45077 | 30/12/1961 | CW | Derby | 11/05/1986 | 24.42 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 30/09/1988 | 26.77 | ||||
D137 | 45014 | 30/12/1961 | CW | Derby | 10/03/1986 | 24.25 | Cut | Vic Berry (at Ashbury) | 30/09/1986 | 24.77 | THE CHESHIRE REGIMENT |