07 0-6-0
BR (Pre Tops) | BR (Tops) | Date To Service | Bld | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D2985 | 07001 | 27/06/1962 | RH | Southampton Docks | 02/07/1977 | 15.08 | Prs | Preserved | 62.35 | |||
D2986 | 07002 | 16/06/1962 | RH | Southampton Docks | 02/07/1977 | 15.08 | Cut | P D Fuels (Kidwelly) | 11/1986 | 24.43 | ||
D2987 | 07003 | 16/06/1962 | RH | Southampton Docks | 04/10/1976 | 14.33 | Cut | British Industrial Sand (Oakmoor) | 06/1985 | 23.01 | ||
D2988 | 16/06/1962 | RH | Southampton Docks | 06/05/1973 | Eastleigh | 10.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Eastleigh) | 11/1973 | 11.42 | ||
D2989 | 07005 | 27/06/1962 | RH | Southampton Docks | 02/07/1977 | 15.08 | Prs | Preserved | 62.35 | |||
D2990 | 07006 | 13/07/1962 | RH | Southampton Docks | 02/07/1977 | 15 | Cut | P D Fuels (Kidwelly) | 10/1984 | 22.27 | ||
D2991 | 07007 | 21/07/1962 | RH | Southampton Docks | 06/05/1973 | Eastleigh | 10.83 | Prs | Preserved | 62.28 | ||
D2992 | 07008 | 28/07/1962 | RH | Southampton Docks | 06/05/1973 | Eastleigh | 10.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Eastleigh) | 08/1976 | 14.06 | |
D2993 | 07009 | 21/08/1962 | RH | Southampton Docks | 04/10/1976 | 14.17 | Cut | Unknown (Trieste, Italy) | 1997 | |||
D2994 | 07010 | 05/09/1962 | RH | Southampton Docks | 04/10/1976 | 14.08 | Prs | Preserved | 62.16 | |||
D2995 | 07011 | 22/09/1962 | RH | Southampton Docks | 02/07/1977 | 14.83 | Prs | Preserved | 62.11 | |||
D2996 | 07012 | 06/10/1962 | RH | Southampton Docks | 02/07/1977 | 14.75 | Prs | Preserved | 62.07 | |||
D2997 | 07013 | 20/10/1962 | RH | Southampton Docks | 02/07/1977 | 14.75 | Prs | Preserved | 62.04 | |||
D2998 | 10/11/1962 | RH | Southampton Docks | 06/05/1973 | Eastleigh | 10.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Eastleigh) | 08/1976 | 13.77 |