Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 409 Today
» 2338 Yesterday
» 5312 Week
» 81414 Month
» 566633 Year
» 2967097 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
GWR Collett "1400" Class 0-4-2T
GWR (1st) |
GWR (2nd) |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Mileage |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
4800
|
1400
|
08/1932 |
|
03/06/1957 |
|
24.83 |
689,552 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
15/06/1957 |
24.85 |
4801
|
1401
|
08/1932 |
|
06/10/1958 |
Gloucester Horton Road |
26.17 |
658,770 |
Cut |
T W Ward (Briton Ferry) |
|
|
4802
|
1402
|
08/1932 |
|
22/10/1956 |
|
24.17 |
792,802 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
01/12/1956 |
24.31 |
4803
|
1403
|
09/1932 |
|
05/11/1957 |
|
25.17 |
716,813 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
28/12/1957 |
25.30 |
4804
|
1404
|
09/1932 |
|
27/02/1956 |
|
23.42 |
720,087 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
19/05/1956 |
23.69 |
4805
|
1405
|
09/1932 |
|
22/09/1958 |
|
26 |
882,563 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
29/11/1958 |
26.22 |
4806
|
1406
|
09/1932 |
|
24/03/1958 |
|
25.5 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
17/05/1958 |
25.68 |
4807
|
1407
|
09/1932 |
|
30/06/1960 |
|
27.75 |
|
|
|
|
28.10 |
4808
|
1408
|
09/1932 |
|
28/03/1958 |
|
25.5 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
17/05/1958 |
25.68 |
4809
|
1409
|
10/1932 |
|
14/10/1963 |
|
31 |
812,378 |
|
|
|
31.44 |
4810
|
1410
|
17/03/1933 |
|
05/06/1961 |
|
28.25 |
|
|
|
|
28.60 |
4811
|
1411
|
21/03/1933 |
|
01/10/1956 |
|
23.58 |
601,727 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
03/11/1956 |
23.64 |
4812
|
1412
|
24/01/1933 |
|
30/06/1960 |
|
27.42 |
|
|
|
|
27.49 |
4813
|
1413
|
07/04/1933 |
|
14/03/1956 |
|
22.92 |
778,357 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
21/04/1956 |
23.05 |
4814
|
1414
|
07/04/1933 |
|
08/04/1957 |
|
24 |
468,795 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
18/05/1957 |
24.13 |
4815
|
1415
|
11/04/1933 |
|
11/02/1957 |
|
23.83 |
665,326 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
20/04/1957 |
24.04 |
4816
|
1416
|
20/04/1933 |
|
22/10/1956 |
|
23.5 |
640,485 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
01/12/1956 |
23.63 |
4817
|
1417
|
21/04/1933 |
|
16/02/1959 |
|
25.83 |
|
|
|
|
26.00 |
4818
|
1418
|
26/04/1933 |
|
10/1958 |
|
25.5 |
|
|
|
|
25.99 |
4819
|
1419
|
26/04/1933 |
|
27/04/1961 |
|
28 |
|
|
|
|
28.32 |
4820
|
1420
|
02/11/1933 |
|
06/11/1964 |
|
31 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
4821
|
1421
|
07/11/1933 |
|
28/12/1963 |
|
30.08 |
662,322 |
|
|
|
30.54 |
4822
|
1422
|
07/11/1933 |
|
13/06/1957 |
|
23.58 |
|
Cut |
Birds (Morriston) |
12/1964 |
31.13 |
4823
|
1423
|
08/11/1933 |
|
19/01/1959 |
|
25.17 |
|
|
|
|
26.04 |
4824
|
1424
|
10/11/1933 |
|
02/12/1963 |
|
30.08 |
950,721 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
06/1964 |
30.62 |
4825
|
1425
|
15/11/1933 |
|
27/02/1956 |
|
22.25 |
568,728 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
23/03/1956 |
22.37 |
4826
|
1426
|
17/11/1933 |
|
03/04/1962 |
|
28.42 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
07/1962 |
28.68 |
4827
|
1427
|
17/11/1933 |
|
30/06/1960 |
|
26.58 |
|
|
|
|
26.93 |
4828
|
1428
|
20/11/1933 |
|
01/06/1959 |
|
25.58 |
|
|
|
|
27.01 |
4829
|
1429
|
24/11/1933 |
|
16/03/1959 |
|
25.33 |
|
|
|
|
27.58 |
4830
|
1430
|
10/07/1934 |
|
19/09/1958 |
|
24.17 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
24/01/1959 |
24.56 |
4831
|
1431
|
13/07/1934 |
|
27/04/1961 |
|
26.75 |
|
|
|
|
26.94 |
4832
|
1432
|
26/07/1934 |
|
23/07/1963 |
|
29 |
|
|
|
|
29.41 |
4833
|
1433
|
26/07/1934 |
|
17/01/1961 |
|
26.5 |
|
|
|
|
27.33 |
4834
|
1434
|
27/07/1934 |
|
04/07/1962 |
|
28 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
09/1962 |
28.16 |
4835
|
1435
|
16/08/1934 |
|
05/01/1962 |
|
27.42 |
|
|
|
|
28.76 |
4836
|
1436
|
16/08/1934 |
|
01/10/1958 |
|
24.17 |
|
Cut |
Morkot Ltd (Caerphilly) |
|
|
4837
|
1437
|
16/08/1934 |
|
16/02/1959 |
|
24.5 |
|
|
|
|
25.27 |
4838
|
1438
|
17/08/1934 |
|
09/11/1962 |
|
28.25 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
07/1964 |
29.93 |
4839
|
1439
|
17/08/1934 |
|
19/08/1957 |
|
23 |
674,070 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
05/10/1957 |
23.15 |
4840
|
1440
|
29/03/1935 |
|
28/12/1963 |
|
28.75 |
901,833 |
|
|
|
28.90 |
4841
|
1441
|
03/04/1935 |
|
30/06/1960 |
|
25.17 |
|
|
|
|
25.55 |
4842
|
1442
|
05/04/1935 |
|
07/05/1965 |
|
30.08 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
4843
|
1443
|
08/04/1935 |
|
27/06/1957 |
|
22.17 |
617,073 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
07/09/1957 |
22.43 |
4844
|
1444
|
15/04/1935 |
|
19/10/1964 |
|
29.5 |
|
|
|
|
30.02 |
4845
|
1445
|
16/04/1935 |
|
01/09/1964 |
|
29.42 |
|
|
|
|
30.02 |
4846
|
1446
|
18/04/1935 |
|
08/09/1958 |
|
23.42 |
|
Cut |
Morkot Ltd (Caerphilly) |
|
|
4847
|
1447
|
24/04/1935 |
|
17/03/1964 |
|
28.92 |
|
|
|
|
29.25 |
4848
|
1448
|
25/04/1935 |
|
30/06/1960 |
|
25.17 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1960 |
25.49 |
4849
|
1449
|
26/04/1935 |
|
30/06/1960 |
|
25.17 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1960 |
25.49 |
4850
|
1450
|
04/07/1935 |
|
07/05/1965 |
|
29.83 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
4851
|
1451
|
06/07/1935 |
|
06/07/1964 |
|
29 |
|
|
|
|
29.13 |
4852
|
1452
|
12/07/1935 |
|
30/06/1960 |
|
24.92 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1960 |
25.28 |
4853
|
1453
|
23/07/1935 |
|
06/11/1964 |
|
29.33 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
03/1965 |
29.67 |
4854
|
1454
|
24/07/1935 |
|
23/12/1960 |
|
25.42 |
|
|
|
|
26.08 |
4855
|
1455
|
26/07/1935 |
|
06/05/1964 |
|
28.83 |
|
|
|
|
28.99 |
4856
|
1456
|
27/07/1935 |
|
16/02/1959 |
|
23.58 |
|
|
|
|
24.32 |
4857
|
1457
|
02/08/1935 |
|
16/02/1959 |
|
23.5 |
|
|
|
|
25.31 |
4858
|
1458
|
07/08/1935 |
|
06/11/1964 |
|
29.25 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
02/1965 |
29.55 |
4859
|
1459
|
09/08/1935 |
|
09/1958 |
|
23.08 |
|
|
|
|
23.70 |
4860
|
1460
|
08/02/1936 |
|
27/02/1956 |
|
20 |
552,932 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
23/03/1956 |
20.13 |
4861
|
1461
|
11/02/1936 |
|
12/05/1958 |
|
22.25 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Barry, South Glamorgan) |
21/02/1959 |
23.04 |
4862
|
1462
|
12/02/1936 |
|
01/09/1962 |
|
26.58 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
11/1963 |
27.78 |
4863
|
1463
|
15/02/1936 |
|
27/04/1961 |
|
25.17 |
|
|
|
|
25.35 |
4864
|
1464
|
17/02/1936 |
|
30/06/1960 |
|
24.33 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1960 |
24.68 |
4865
|
1465
|
21/02/1936 |
Bushbury |
09/1958 |
|
22.58 |
|
|
|
|
23.16 |
4866
|
1466
|
21/02/1936 |
|
28/12/1963 |
|
27.83 |
728,230 |
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
4867
|
1467
|
25/02/1936 |
|
07/04/1959 |
|
23.17 |
|
|
|
|
23.48 |
4868
|
1468
|
26/02/1936 |
|
15/03/1962 |
|
26.08 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
03/1965 |
29.07 |
4869
|
1469
|
28/02/1936 |
|
15/09/1958 |
|
22.58 |
|
Cut |
Morkot Ltd (Caerphilly) |
|
|
4870
|
1470
|
16/04/1936 |
Newton Abbot |
01/10/1962 |
|
26.5 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1963 |
27.52 |
4871
|
1471
|
17/04/1936 |
Llantrisant |
15/10/1963 |
|
27.5 |
690,345 |
|
|
|
27.60 |
4872
|
1472
|
20/04/1936 |
Danygraig |
06/11/1964 |
|
28.58 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
02/1965 |
28.84 |
4873
|
1473
|
22/04/1936 |
Chippenham |
10/08/1962 |
|
26.33 |
|
|
|
|
27.42 |
4874
|
1474
|
23/04/1936 |
Brecon |
28/09/1964 |
|
28.42 |
|
|
|
|
28.67 |