Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 5014 Today
» 4610 Yesterday
» 5014 Week
» 83949 Month
» 563175 Year
» 3590028 Total
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)

BPGVR/GWR "BPGV1" Class 0-6-0T


GWR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Mileage Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
2162 05/1914 15/03/1955 40.83 432,519 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 21/05/1955 41.04
2165 05/1913 16/03/1955 41.83 446,864 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 21/05/1955 42.04
2166 10/1916 10/05/1955 38.58 509,393 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 16/07/1955 38.78
2167 08/1919 09/02/1953 33.5
2168 28/02/1916 28/05/1956 40.25 479,839 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 14/07/1956 40.40