Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 370 Today
» 2338 Yesterday
» 5273 Week
» 81375 Month
» 566594 Year
» 2967058 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
RR/GWR Hurry Riches "RRS" Class 0-6-0T
RR (Rhymney) |
GWR (1st) |
GWR (2nd) |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Mileage |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
111
|
608
|
93
|
06/1908 |
|
04/05/1954 |
|
45.92 |
847,687 |
|
|
|
46.12 |
112
|
609
|
94
|
07/1908 |
|
17/05/1954 |
|
45.83 |
814,914 |
|
|
|
46.27 |
113
|
610
|
95
|
07/1908 |
|
28/09/1953 |
|
45.17 |
|
|
|
|
|
114
|
611
|
96
|
08/1908 |
|
30/04/1954 |
|
45.67 |
816,675 |
|
|
|
45.87 |