GWR Hawksworth "1600" Class 0-6-0PT
GWR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1600 | 07/10/1949 | 16/03/1959 | 9.42 | 13.28 | |||||
1601 | 12/10/1949 | 29/08/1960 | 10.83 | 11.43 | |||||
1602 | 18/10/1949 | Duffryn Yard | 23/09/1960 | Shrewsbury | 10.92 | 11.41 | |||
1603 | 21/10/1949 | 08/06/1959 | 9.67 | 11.66 | |||||
1604 | 25/10/1949 | 11/07/1960 | 10.75 | 11.98 | |||||
1605 | 01/11/1949 | 27/02/1962 | 12.25 | 12.54 | |||||
1606 | 03/11/1949 | Danygraig | 27/09/1961 | 11.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 03/1962 | 12.37 | |
1607 | 11/11/1949 | Llanelli | 25/08/1965 | 15.75 | 19.28 | ||||
1608 | 17/11/1949 | Newton Abbot | 30/09/1963 | 13.83 | 14.00 | ||||
1609 | 18/11/1949 | Landore | 13/07/1962 | 12.67 | 12.92 | ||||
1610 | 24/11/1949 | Cardiff East Dock | 25/12/1959 | 10.08 | 11.31 | ||||
1611 | 28/11/1949 | Whitland | 01/10/1965 | 15.92 | 16.14 | ||||
1612 | 30/11/1949 | Lydney | 21/07/1965 | 15.67 | 15.88 | ||||
1613 | 02/12/1949 | Carmarthen | 19/03/1965 | 15.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 07/1965 | 15.63 | |
1614 | 05/12/1949 | Llanelli | 26/02/1964 | 14.17 | 14.37 | ||||
1615 | 12/12/1949 | Barry | 22/06/1961 | 11.5 | 12.19 | ||||
1616 | 13/12/1949 | Lydney | 19/10/1959 | 9.83 | 11.26 | ||||
1617 | 14/12/1949 | Oxford | 13/11/1963 | 13.92 | 14.26 | ||||
1618 | 19/12/1949 | Llanelli | 21/05/1962 | 12.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 02/1963 | 13.17 | |
1619 | 23/12/1949 | Wellington | 02/05/1963 | 13.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1964 | 14.16 | |
1620 | 14/06/1950 | Cardiff East Dock | 08/06/1960 | 10 | 10.76 | ||||
1621 | 21/06/1950 | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 14/01/1963 | 12.58 | 13.41 | ||||
1622 | 27/06/1950 | Duffryn Yard | 15/06/1964 | 14 | 14.06 | ||||
1623 | 29/06/1950 | 16/06/1965 | 15 | 15.31 | |||||
1624 | 30/06/1950 | 27/02/1962 | 11.67 | 11.88 | |||||
1625 | 02/08/1950 | Gloucester Horton Road | 30/06/1960 | 9.83 | 10.62 | ||||
1626 | 10/08/1950 | St Blazey | 24/08/1962 | 12 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 08/1963 | 13.02 | |
1627 | 16/08/1950 | Gloucester Horton Road | 15/06/1964 | 13.83 | 14.01 | ||||
1628 | 24/08/1950 | Neyland | 18/09/1966 | 16.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1967 | 16.41 | |
1629 | 01/09/1950 | Cardiff Cathays | 30/06/1960 | 9.75 | 10.54 | ||||
1630 | 13/01/1951 | Gloucester Horton Road | 15/06/1964 | 13.42 | 13.60 | ||||
1631 | 19/01/1951 | Gloucester Horton Road | 06/11/1964 | 13.83 | 14.08 | ||||
1632 | 23/01/1951 | Gloucester Horton Road | 17/04/1965 | 14.25 | 14.57 | ||||
1633 | 31/01/1951 | 30/10/1962 | 11.75 | 12.71 | |||||
1634 | 05/02/1951 | 13/06/1961 | 10.33 | 10.62 | |||||
1635 | 13/02/1951 | 19/10/1959 | 8.67 | 10.09 | |||||
1636 | 16/02/1951 | 15/06/1964 | 13.33 | 13.50 | |||||
1637 | 23/02/1951 | 30/06/1960 | 9.33 | 10.06 | |||||
1638 | 02/03/1951 | Llanelli | 06/08/1966 | 15.42 | |||||
1639 | 05/03/1951 | Gloucester Horton Road | 06/11/1964 | 13.67 | 14.12 | ||||
1640 | 20/03/1951 | Swansea East Dock | 18/07/1961 | 10.33 | 10.67 | ||||
1641 | 28/03/1951 | 06/11/1964 | 13.67 | 13.98 | |||||
1642 | 02/04/1951 | Gloucester Horton Road | 03/01/1962 | 10.75 | 11.21 | ||||
1643 | 10/04/1951 | Danygraig | 01/10/1965 | 14.5 | 14.78 | ||||
1644 | 17/04/1951 | Neath (Court Sart) | 12/10/1959 | 8.5 | 9.84 | ||||
1645 | 24/04/1951 | Neath (Court Sart) | 30/10/1962 | 11.5 | 12.65 | ||||
1646 | 01/05/1951 | Swansea East Dock | 29/12/1962 | 11.58 | 12.47 | ||||
1647 | 09/05/1951 | Swindon | 27/04/1961 | 9.92 | 10.28 | ||||
1648 | 18/05/1951 | Swindon | 17/05/1963 | 12 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 09/1963 | 12.34 | |
1649 | 24/05/1951 | St Philips Marsh | 29/12/1962 | 11.58 | 12.40 | ||||
1650 | 22/11/1954 | Laira | 26/02/1964 | 9.25 | 9.48 | ||||
1651 | 01/12/1954 | Llanelli | 01/10/1965 | 10.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 02/1966 | 11.22 | |
1652 | 07/12/1954 | Swansea East Dock | 11/01/1960 | 5.08 | 6.61 | ||||
1653 | 21/12/1954 | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 05/12/1962 | 8 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 06/1963 | 8.49 | |
1654 | 22/12/1954 | Llanelli | 15/06/1964 | 9.5 | 9.65 | ||||
1655 | 06/01/1955 | Llanelli | 21/07/1965 | 10.5 | 10.78 | ||||
1656 | 18/01/1955 | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 15/06/1964 | 9.42 | 9.75 | ||||
1657 | 28/01/1955 | Hereford | 06/11/1964 | 9.83 | 10.06 | ||||
1658 | 28/02/1955 | Swindon | 06/11/1964 | 9.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1965 | 10.13 | |
1659 | 10/02/1955 | Carmarthen | 24/10/1960 | 5.67 | 6.35 | ||||
1660 | 28/02/1955 | Croes Newydd | 26/02/1966 | 11 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 06/1966 | 11.30 | |
1661 | 09/03/1955 | Kidderminster | 13/07/1964 | 9.33 | 9.78 | ||||
1662 | 10/03/1955 | Worcester | 28/12/1963 | 8.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 04/1964 | 9.11 | |
1663 | 31/03/1955 | Wellington | 23/01/1965 | 9.83 | 10.22 | ||||
1664 | 29/03/1955 | St Blazey | 06/11/1964 | 9.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 05/1965 | 10.14 | |
1665 | 04/04/1955 | Llanelli | 24/07/1964 | 9.25 | 9.54 | ||||
1666 | 20/04/1955 | Llanelli | 26/02/1964 | 8.83 | 9.16 | ||||
1667 | 03/05/1955 | Hereford | 06/11/1964 | 9.5 | 9.80 | ||||
1668 | 31/05/1955 | Taunton | 23/01/1965 | 9.67 | 10.05 | ||||
1669 | 26/05/1955 | St Philips Marsh | 01/10/1965 | 10.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 02/1966 | 10.73 |