GWR Collett "6400" Class 0-6-0PT
GWR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
6400 | 02/1932 | 20/04/1964 | 32.17 | 32.52 | |||||
6401 | 02/1932 | 30/06/1960 | 28.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 10/1960 | 28.68 | ||
6402 | 02/1932 | 15/06/1959 | 27.33 | 28.05 | |||||
6403 | 03/1932 | 07/10/1963 | 31.58 | Cut | Arnott Young (Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston) | 02/1964 | 31.94 | ||
6404 | 03/1932 | 23/06/1959 | 27.25 | 27.98 | |||||
6405 | 03/1932 | 15/06/1959 | 27.25 | 27.98 | |||||
6406 | 04/1932 | 30/06/1960 | 28.17 | 29.19 | |||||
6407 | 04/1932 | 13/08/1958 | 26.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 04/10/1958 | 26.49 | ||
6408 | 04/1932 | 02/02/1962 | 29.83 | 30.27 | |||||
6409 | 04/1932 | 19/03/1959 | 26.92 | 27.44 | |||||
6410 | 05/11/1934 | 13/11/1962 | 28 | 30.13 | |||||
6411 | 09/11/1934 | 02/03/1961 | 26.33 | 26.62 | |||||
6412 | 12/11/1934 | 06/11/1964 | 30 | Prs | Preserved | ||||
6413 | 13/11/1934 | 14/11/1961 | 27 | 27.11 | |||||
6414 | 14/11/1934 | 29/06/1959 | 24.58 | 25.31 | |||||
6415 | 20/11/1934 | 02/11/1961 | 27 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 03/1962 | 27.33 | ||
6416 | 23/11/1934 | 23/09/1963 | 28.83 | 29.00 | |||||
6417 | 06/12/1934 | 22/06/1959 | 24.5 | 25.25 | |||||
6418 | 07/12/1934 | 26/11/1962 | 27.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1963 | 28.29 | ||
6419 | 11/12/1934 | 26/12/1964 | 30 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1965 | 30.36 | ||
6420 | 24/08/1935 | 27/11/1959 | 24.25 | 24.33 | |||||
6421 | 29/08/1935 | 07/01/1963 | 27.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 10/1963 | 28.15 | ||
6422 | 31/08/1935 | 27/09/1962 | 27.08 | 27.89 | |||||
6423 | 05/09/1935 | 11/08/1958 | 22.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 04/10/1958 | 23.10 | ||
6424 | 09/09/1935 | 05/09/1964 | 29 | Cut | Arnott Young (Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston) | 11/1964 | 29.21 | ||
6425 | 09/11/1935 | 17/01/1961 | 25.17 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 06/1961 | 25.62 | ||
6426 | 11/11/1935 | 22/03/1961 | 25.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 06/1961 | 25.61 | ||
6427 | 13/11/1935 | 12/08/1958 | 22.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 04/10/1958 | 22.91 | ||
6428 | 15/11/1935 | 19/03/1959 | 23.33 | 23.76 | |||||
6429 | 18/11/1935 | 15/03/1962 | 26.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 07/1962 | 26.67 | ||
6430 | 02/03/1937 | 09/10/1964 | 27.58 | Prs | Preserved | ||||
6431 | 03/03/1937 | 07/01/1963 | 25.83 | 26.72 | |||||
6432 | 05/03/1937 | 19/03/1959 | 22 | 22.71 | |||||
6433 | 15/03/1937 | 14/01/1963 | 25.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 06/1963 | 26.27 | ||
6434 | 12/03/1937 | 05/09/1964 | 27.5 | Cut | Arnott Young (Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston) | 11/1964 | 27.70 | ||
6435 | 03/04/1937 | 09/10/1964 | 27.5 | Prs | Preserved | ||||
6436 | 07/04/1937 | 27/09/1962 | 25.42 | 25.62 | |||||
6437 | 19/04/1937 | 02/07/1963 | 26.25 | 26.42 | |||||
6438 | 22/04/1937 | 13/11/1962 | 25.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 08/1964 | 27.33 | ||
6439 | 26/04/1937 | 10/05/1960 | 23.08 | 23.41 |