GWR Hawksworth "9400" Class 0-6-0PT
GWR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
3400 | 31/12/1955 | Cardiff East Dock | 06/11/1964 | 8.92 | 9.13 | ||||
3401 | 31/01/1956 | Cardiff East Dock | 06/11/1964 | 8.83 | 9.05 | ||||
3402 | 29/02/1956 | Cardiff East Dock | 06/11/1964 | 8.75 | 8.97 | ||||
3403 | 29/02/1956 | Cardiff East Dock | 07/09/1964 | 8.58 | 8.97 | ||||
3404 | 27/03/1956 | Cardiff East Dock | 13/07/1962 | 6.33 | 6.56 | ||||
3405 | 30/04/1956 | Cardiff East Dock | 06/11/1964 | 8.58 | 9.47 | ||||
3406 | 31/05/1956 | Cardiff East Dock | 06/11/1964 | 8.5 | 8.72 | ||||
3407 | 01/08/1956 | Cardiff East Dock | 05/10/1962 | 6.17 | 6.29 | ||||
3408 | 13/08/1956 | Cardiff East Dock | 12/09/1962 | 6.08 | 6.26 | ||||
3409 | 31/10/1956 | Cardiff East Dock | 23/10/1964 | 8 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 02/1965 | 8.30 | |
8400 | 31/08/1949 | 07/09/1964 | 15.08 | 15.30 | |||||
8401 | 31/08/1949 | 07/09/1964 | 15.08 | 15.39 | |||||
8402 | 30/09/1949 | Newport Pill | 06/11/1964 | 15.17 | 15.47 | ||||
8403 | 30/09/1949 | 16/06/1965 | 15.75 | 16.05 | |||||
8404 | 30/09/1949 | 14/11/1961 | 12.17 | 12.46 | |||||
8405 | 31/12/1949 | Tyseley | 07/09/1964 | 14.75 | 15.80 | ||||
8406 | 21/12/1949 | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 12/01/1961 | 11.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1961 | 11.32 | |
8407 | 30/12/1949 | Tyseley | 05/10/1962 | 12.83 | 13.97 | ||||
8408 | 02/01/1950 | 07/09/1959 | 9.67 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 08/1964 | 14.63 | ||
8409 | 04/01/1950 | 10/08/1964 | 14.58 | 15.20 | |||||
8410 | 13/01/1950 | 11/01/1960 | 10 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 10/1960 | 10.76 | ||
8411 | 12/01/1950 | 30/06/1960 | 10.42 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 12/1960 | 10.93 | ||
8412 | 27/01/1950 | 21/07/1959 | 9.5 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 12/1960 | 10.89 | ||
8413 | 23/01/1950 | 12/01/1961 | 11 | 11.07 | |||||
8414 | 24/01/1950 | 20/04/1964 | 14.25 | 14.57 | |||||
8415 | 31/03/1950 | 16/06/1965 | 15.25 | 15.55 | |||||
8416 | 17/03/1950 | 05/10/1962 | 12.58 | 14.01 | |||||
8417 | 30/03/1950 | 09/03/1959 | 9 | 15.05 | |||||
8418 | 31/03/1950 | 10/08/1964 | 14.42 | 14.81 | |||||
8419 | 05/04/1950 | 11/01/1960 | 9.75 | 14.95 | |||||
8420 | 31/07/1950 | 03/06/1965 | 14.92 | 15.22 | |||||
8421 | 24/07/1950 | 21/12/1959 | 9.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1960 | 10.40 | ||
8422 | 06/10/1950 | Newton Abbot | 24/07/1962 | 11.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 10/1962 | 12.03 | |
8423 | 06/10/1950 | Chester West | 24/12/1959 | 9.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1960 | 10.20 | |
8424 | 05/12/1950 | 17/01/1961 | 10.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 06/1961 | 10.53 | ||
8425 | 09/02/1951 | 12/11/1963 | 12.75 | 13.02 | |||||
8426 | 09/01/1951 | St Blazey | 22/11/1963 | 12.83 | 13.02 | ||||
8427 | 06/02/1951 | 21/09/1960 | 9.58 | 10.53 | |||||
8428 | 16/02/1951 | 05/10/1962 | 11.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 11/1963 | 12.75 | ||
8429 | 16/03/1951 | Cardiff East Dock | 25/01/1960 | 8.83 | 10.59 | ||||
8430 | 08/01/1953 | Reading (W.R.) | 02/05/1963 | 10.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 01/1964 | 11.02 | |
8431 | 07/01/1953 | Swansea East Dock | 10/08/1964 | 11.58 | 11.78 | ||||
8432 | 23/02/1953 | Old Oak Common | 28/07/1959 | 6.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1960 | 7.81 | |
8433 | 31/03/1953 | Old Oak Common | 03/06/1965 | 12.25 | 12.55 | ||||
8434 | 26/02/1953 | Old Oak Common | 15/06/1959 | 6.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1960 | 7.81 | |
8435 | 21/04/1953 | Didcot | 09/02/1962 | 8.83 | 9.07 | ||||
8436 | 31/05/1953 | Aberbeeg | 16/06/1965 | 12.08 | 12.38 | ||||
8437 | 31/05/1953 | Stourbridge Junction | 06/11/1964 | 11.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 02/1965 | 11.72 | |
8438 | 05/06/1953 | Stourbridge Junction | 05/10/1962 | 9.33 | 9.37 | ||||
8439 | 03/06/1953 | Cardiff Canton | 05/10/1962 | 9.33 | 10.46 | ||||
8440 | 04/03/1954 | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 13/07/1962 | 8.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 09/1962 | 8.54 | |
8441 | 08/04/1954 | Cardiff East Dock | 05/12/1961 | 7.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1962 | 8.02 | |
8442 | 26/03/1954 | Neath (Court Sart) | 15/06/1959 | 5.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1960 | 6.73 | |
8443 | 25/03/1954 | 22/06/1959 | 5.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1960 | 6.73 | ||
8444 | 30/04/1954 | 23/07/1963 | 9.25 | 9.47 | |||||
8445 | 11/06/1954 | Tondu | 27/09/1962 | 8.25 | 8.52 | ||||
8446 | 06/1954 | Tondu | 07/09/1964 | 10.25 | 10.43 | ||||
8447 | 21/07/1954 | Cardiff Canton | 15/06/1959 | 4.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1960 | 6.41 | |
8448 | 30/06/1954 | Tondu | 17/08/1959 | 5.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1960 | 6.47 | |
8449 | 30/06/1954 | Oxley | 05/09/1962 | 8.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1964 | 9.64 | |
8450 | 30/08/1949 | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 22/06/1959 | 9.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1960 | 11.30 | |
8451 | 19/09/1949 | 10/11/1961 | 12.17 | 12.58 | |||||
8452 | 28/10/1949 | Tyseley | 20/04/1964 | 14.5 | 14.81 | ||||
8453 | 18/11/1949 | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 05/10/1962 | 12.92 | 12.92 | ||||
8454 | 16/12/1949 | Leamington | 12/01/1961 | 11.08 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 06/1961 | 11.50 | |
8455 | 06/01/1950 | 11/01/1960 | 10 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1960 | 10.95 | ||
8456 | 03/02/1950 | 21/10/1963 | 13.67 | 14.79 | |||||
8457 | 24/03/1950 | 12/01/1961 | 10.83 | 11.32 | |||||
8458 | 03/04/1950 | 29/08/1963 | 13.33 | 13.54 | |||||
8459 | 31/05/1950 | 03/06/1965 | 15.08 | 15.64 | |||||
8460 | 05/06/1950 | 12/01/1961 | 10.58 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 04/1961 | 10.87 | ||
8461 | 22/06/1950 | 29/11/1963 | 13.42 | 13.58 | |||||
8462 | 27/07/1950 | 17/08/1959 | 9.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1960 | 10.39 | ||
8463 | 22/09/1950 | 11/01/1960 | 9.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1960 | 10.24 | ||
8464 | 13/10/1950 | 28/12/1963 | 13.17 | 13.35 | |||||
8465 | 02/11/1950 | Neath (Court Sart) | 22/11/1963 | 13 | 13.04 | ||||
8466 | 03/11/1950 | Neath (Court Sart) | 06/07/1964 | 13.67 | 17.79 | ||||
8467 | 06/02/1951 | 13/02/1962 | 11 | 11.44 | |||||
8468 | 15/02/1951 | 09/05/1960 | 9.25 | 9.25 | |||||
8469 | 31/03/1951 | Cardiff East Dock | 06/11/1964 | 13.67 | 13.89 | ||||
8470 | 03/05/1951 | Barry | 08/01/1962 | 10.67 | 11.04 | ||||
8471 | 31/05/1951 | Merthyr Tydfil | 16/06/1965 | 14.08 | 14.39 | ||||
8472 | 27/07/1951 | Swindon | 08/03/1963 | 11.67 | 11.98 | ||||
8473 | 27/08/1951 | 12/01/1961 | 9.42 | 9.98 | |||||
8474 | 31/10/1951 | 07/05/1965 | 13.58 | 13.80 | |||||
8475 | 30/11/1951 | 07/09/1964 | 12.83 | 13.14 | |||||
8476 | 06/03/1952 | Danygraig | 12/01/1961 | 8.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1961 | 9.12 | |
8477 | 14/03/1952 | Llanelli | 13/07/1962 | 10.33 | 10.59 | ||||
8478 | 27/05/1952 | Barry | 29/01/1963 | 10.67 | 10.73 | ||||
8479 | 30/06/1952 | Westbury | 09/10/1964 | 12.33 | 12.72 | ||||
8480 | 26/03/1952 | Worcester | 06/07/1964 | 12.33 | 12.56 | ||||
8481 | 31/03/1952 | Cardiff Cathays | 03/06/1965 | 13.25 | 13.55 | ||||
8482 | 15/04/1952 | Cardiff Cathays | 12/09/1962 | 10.42 | 12.26 | ||||
8483 | 23/05/1952 | Danygraig | 13/02/1962 | 9.75 | 9.98 | ||||
8484 | 31/05/1952 | Cardiff East Dock | 03/06/1965 | 13.08 | 13.38 | ||||
8485 | 13/06/1952 | Truro | 22/06/1959 | 7 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1960 | 8.51 | |
8486 | 30/06/1952 | Truro | 16/06/1965 | 13 | 13.30 | ||||
8487 | 02/07/1952 | 22/11/1963 | 11.33 | 11.38 | |||||
8488 | 31/07/1952 | 07/05/1965 | 12.83 | 13.05 | |||||
8489 | 25/07/1952 | Cardiff East Dock | 09/02/1962 | 9.58 | 9.73 | ||||
8490 | 29/07/1952 | Duffryn Yard | 05/10/1962 | 10.25 | 11.30 | ||||
8491 | 20/08/1952 | St Philips Marsh | 23/07/1963 | 10.92 | 11.41 | ||||
8492 | 21/08/1952 | St Philips Marsh | 15/06/1959 | 6.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1960 | 8.32 | |
8493 | 30/09/1952 | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 06/11/1964 | 12.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 02/1965 | 12.39 | |
8494 | 05/09/1952 | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 23/01/1962 | 9.33 | 9.86 | ||||
8495 | 31/10/1952 | Barry | 06/11/1964 | 12.08 | 12.30 | ||||
8496 | 03/10/1952 | Worcester | 23/07/1963 | 10.75 | 10.96 | ||||
8497 | 07/11/1952 | Swindon | 06/07/1964 | 11.67 | 15.61 | ||||
8498 | 30/11/1952 | Swindon | 03/06/1965 | 12.58 | 12.88 | ||||
8499 | 10/11/1952 | Swindon | 21/06/1962 | 9.58 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 09/1962 | 9.85 | |
9400 | 03/02/1947 | 14/12/1959 | 12.83 | Prs | Preserved | ||||
9401 | 15/02/1947 | 23/07/1963 | 16.42 | 16.93 | |||||
9402 | 12/04/1947 | 01/09/1959 | 12.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1960 | 13.69 | ||
9403 | 29/03/1947 | 08/06/1959 | 12.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1960 | 13.73 | ||
9404 | 11/04/1947 | 03/06/1965 | 18.17 | 18.53 | |||||
9405 | 07/05/1947 | 16/06/1965 | 18.08 | 18.45 | |||||
9406 | 10/05/1947 | 28/09/1964 | 17.33 | 17.61 | |||||
9407 | 15/05/1947 | 13/07/1962 | 15.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1962 | 15.60 | ||
9408 | 22/05/1947 | 02/05/1963 | 16 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 10/1963 | 16.41 | ||
9409 | 28/05/1947 | 21/05/1962 | 15 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 09/1962 | 15.31 | ||
9410 | 03/02/1950 | 13/07/1962 | 12.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1962 | 12.87 | ||
9411 | 28/02/1950 | 03/06/1965 | 15.33 | 15.64 | |||||
9412 | 13/03/1950 | 08/03/1963 | 13 | 13.68 | |||||
9413 | 27/03/1950 | 22/11/1963 | 13.67 | 13.65 | |||||
9414 | 11/04/1950 | 29/08/1960 | 10.33 | 11.35 | |||||
9415 | 31/05/1950 | 03/06/1965 | 15.08 | 15.39 | |||||
9416 | 04/05/1950 | 08/01/1962 | 11.67 | 11.87 | |||||
9417 | 10/05/1950 | 08/06/1959 | 9.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1960 | 10.61 | ||
9418 | 31/05/1950 | 03/06/1965 | 15.08 | 15.39 | |||||
9419 | 05/06/1950 | Old Oak Common | 14/03/1963 | 12.75 | 13.45 | ||||
9420 | 26/06/1950 | 10/03/1964 | 13.75 | 14.15 | |||||
9421 | 07/07/1950 | 12/02/1962 | 11.58 | 12.03 | |||||
9422 | 20/07/1950 | 28/12/1963 | 13.42 | 13.58 | |||||
9423 | 27/07/1950 | 01/03/1963 | 12.67 | 13.31 | |||||
9424 | 03/08/1950 | Slough | 29/11/1962 | 12.25 | |||||
9425 | 01/09/1950 | Chester West | 28/11/1963 | 13.17 | 15.13 | ||||
9426 | 30/09/1950 | Banbury | 07/05/1965 | 14.67 | 14.88 | ||||
9427 | 18/09/1950 | 15/06/1959 | 8.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1960 | 10.25 | ||
9428 | 29/09/1950 | 30/06/1960 | 9.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1960 | 10.22 | ||
9429 | 12/10/1950 | 28/12/1963 | 13.17 | 13.52 | |||||
9430 | 31/10/1950 | 16/06/1965 | 14.67 | 14.97 | |||||
9431 | 08/11/1950 | Duffryn Yard | 20/04/1964 | 13.42 | 13.69 | ||||
9432 | 27/11/1950 | Tyseley | 23/11/1959 | 9 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1960 | 10.06 | |
9433 | 08/12/1950 | 13/07/1962 | 11.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 11/1962 | 11.95 | ||
9434 | 12/01/1951 | Truro | 30/06/1960 | 9.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1960 | 9.93 | |
9435 | 31/01/1951 | Stafford Road | 28/09/1964 | 13.67 | 13.97 | ||||
9436 | 18/01/1951 | Neath (Court Sart) | 18/07/1960 | 9.5 | 10.41 | ||||
9437 | 31/01/1951 | Duffryn Yard | 03/06/1965 | 14.42 | 14.72 | ||||
9438 | 07/02/1951 | 15/06/1959 | 8.33 | 10.36 | |||||
9439 | 13/02/1951 | 15/06/1959 | 8.33 | 10.34 | |||||
9440 | 22/02/1951 | 23/07/1963 | 12.42 | 12.74 | |||||
9441 | 09/03/1951 | Gloucester Horton Road | 20/11/1963 | 12.67 | 12.95 | ||||
9442 | 22/03/1951 | Neath (Court Sart) | 06/07/1964 | 13.33 | 13.75 | ||||
9443 | 29/03/1951 | Llanelli | 15/06/1959 | 8.25 | 10.22 | ||||
9444 | 12/04/1951 | Duffryn Yard | 22/03/1963 | 11.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 02/1964 | 12.85 | |
9445 | 27/04/1951 | Gloucester Horton Road | 11/01/1960 | 8.75 | 13.73 | ||||
9446 | 31/05/1951 | Neath (Court Sart) | 07/05/1965 | 14 | 14.22 | ||||
9447 | 21/05/1951 | Duffryn Yard | 12/01/1961 | 9.67 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 04/1961 | 9.91 | |
9448 | 30/05/1951 | Neath (Court Sart) | 13/07/1962 | 11.17 | 11.39 | ||||
9449 | 12/06/1951 | Banbury | 30/06/1960 | 9 | 13.61 | ||||
9450 | 28/06/1951 | Stourbridge Junction | 25/06/1964 | 13 | 13.14 | ||||
9451 | 25/07/1951 | 13/07/1962 | 11 | 11.23 | |||||
9452 | 31/07/1951 | 07/05/1965 | 13.83 | 14.05 | |||||
9453 | 31/07/1951 | 06/11/1964 | 13.33 | 13.63 | |||||
9454 | 05/09/1951 | Duffryn Yard | 08/01/1962 | 10.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1962 | 10.62 | |
9455 | 06/09/1951 | Neath (Court Sart) | 11/04/1963 | 11.58 | 12.12 | ||||
9456 | 21/09/1951 | 08/04/1964 | 12.58 | 13.08 | |||||
9457 | 04/10/1951 | 06/07/1964 | 12.75 | 14.13 | |||||
9458 | 22/10/1951 | 12/01/1961 | 9.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1961 | 9.49 | ||
9459 | 01/11/1951 | 28/09/1959 | 7.83 | 9.63 | |||||
9460 | 22/11/1951 | 09/02/1962 | 10.25 | 10.48 | |||||
9461 | 31/12/1951 | 07/05/1965 | 13.42 | 13.63 | |||||
9462 | 14/12/1951 | 09/11/1960 | 8.92 | 13.43 | |||||
9463 | 31/01/1952 | Penzance | 03/06/1965 | 13.42 | 13.72 | ||||
9464 | 31/01/1952 | Gloucester Horton Road | 03/06/1965 | 13.42 | 13.72 | ||||
9465 | 25/01/1952 | Llanelli | 09/02/1962 | 10.08 | 10.48 | ||||
9466 | 06/02/1952 | Worcester | 06/07/1964 | 12.42 | Prs | Preserved | |||
9467 | 21/02/1952 | Laira | 21/05/1962 | 10.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 10/1962 | 10.65 | |
9468 | 28/02/1952 | Llanelli | 29/08/1960 | 8.5 | 13.47 | ||||
9469 | 12/03/1952 | Llanelli | 05/03/1962 | 10 | 10.27 | ||||
9470 | 31/03/1952 | Cardiff Cathays | 28/09/1964 | 12.5 | 12.72 | ||||
9471 | 30/04/1952 | Gloucester Horton Road | 07/09/1964 | 12.42 | 12.64 | ||||
9472 | 30/04/1952 | Llanelli | 07/05/1965 | 13.08 | 13.30 | ||||
9473 | 14/05/1952 | Neath (Court Sart) | 06/07/1964 | 12.17 | 12.60 | ||||
9474 | 29/05/1952 | Llanelli | 21/11/1961 | 9.5 | 9.97 | ||||
9475 | 30/06/1952 | Gloucester Horton Road | 07/05/1965 | 12.92 | 13.13 | ||||
9476 | 19/06/1952 | Swindon | 06/06/1962 | 10 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 08/1962 | 10.16 | |
9477 | 31/07/1952 | Stourbridge Junction | 03/06/1965 | 12.92 | 13.22 | ||||
9478 | 25/07/1952 | Neath (Court Sart) | 30/07/1962 | 10 | 10.23 | ||||
9479 | 24/07/1952 | Llanelli | 23/07/1963 | 11 | 11.15 | ||||
9480 | 31/08/1952 | Worcester | 30/04/1965 | 12.67 | 12.88 | ||||
9481 | 28/08/1952 | St Philips Marsh | 12/01/1961 | 8.42 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 06/1961 | 8.80 | |
9482 | 18/09/1952 | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 20/11/1963 | 11.17 | 11.42 | ||||
9483 | 03/10/1952 | Duffryn Yard | 23/07/1963 | 10.75 | 10.96 | ||||
9484 | 09/10/1952 | Landore | 20/04/1964 | 11.5 | 12.28 | ||||
9485 | 16/10/1952 | Danygraig | 06/07/1964 | 11.75 | 12.17 | ||||
9486 | 06/11/1952 | Llanelli | 13/07/1962 | 9.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 10/1962 | 9.95 | |
9487 | 14/11/1952 | Duffryn Yard | 13/07/1962 | 9.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 11/1962 | 10.01 | |
9488 | 31/12/1952 | St Philips Marsh | 30/04/1965 | 12.33 | 12.55 | ||||
9489 | 16/01/1953 | Swansea East Dock | 20/04/1964 | 11.25 | 11.50 | ||||
9490 | 28/02/1954 | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 26/12/1964 | 10.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1965 | 11.13 | |
9491 | 23/03/1954 | Danygraig | 15/06/1959 | 5.25 | 10.99 | ||||
9492 | 21/05/1954 | Tondu | 15/06/1959 | 5.08 | 7.75 | ||||
9493 | 06/1954 | Cardiff Canton | 07/09/1964 | 10.25 | 10.34 | ||||
9494 | 31/08/1954 | 06/11/1964 | 10.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 02/1965 | 10.47 | ||
9495 | 31/10/1954 | St Philips Marsh | 03/06/1965 | 10.67 | 10.96 | ||||
9496 | 15/10/1954 | 21/12/1959 | 5.17 | 6.67 | |||||
9497 | 09/12/1954 | Exeter | 21/05/1962 | 7.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 10/1962 | 7.85 | |
9498 | 31/03/1955 | Tyseley | 28/09/1964 | 9.5 | 9.72 | ||||
9499 | 01/07/1955 | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 14/09/1959 | 4.17 | 9.71 |