Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3312 Today
» 4968 Yesterday
» 13606 Week
» 149011 Month
» 608952 Year
» 5048389 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
GWR Collett "1366" Class 0-6-0PT
GWR |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
1366
|
15/02/1934 |
|
26/01/1961 |
|
26.92 |
|
|
|
27.77 |
1367
|
14/02/1934 |
|
09/10/1964 |
|
30.67 |
|
|
|
31.10 |
1368
|
16/02/1934 |
|
09/10/1964 |
|
30.67 |
|
|
|
31.10 |
1369
|
16/02/1934 |
|
06/11/1964 |
|
30.75 |
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
1370
|
19/02/1934 |
|
18/01/1960 |
|
25.92 |
|
|
|
26.25 |
1371
|
21/02/1934 |
|
21/11/1960 |
|
26.75 |
|
|
|
27.25 |