Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 30 Online
» 2070 Today
» 3922 Yesterday
» 29592 Week
» 62058 Month
» 264722 Year
» 3291575 Total
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)

GWR Dean "1854" Class 0-6-0PT


GWR NaBR (Sold) RSBR (Sold) GWR (Amalg) Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
905 05/1895 15/11/1947 52.5
906 05/1895 24/04/1948 52.92
907 05/1895 13/03/1951 55.83
1701 02/1891 07/1928 37.42
1702 03/1891 09/1938 47.5
1703 03/1891 28/07/1945 54.33
1704 03/1891 01/1935 43.83
1705 03/1891 03/11/1950 59.67
1706 03/1891 28/06/1948 57.25
1707 04/1891 30/07/1947 56.25
1708 04/1891 01/1935 43.75
1709 04/1891 07/11/1950 59.58
1710 36 1710 04/1891 02/1937 45.83
1711 04/1891 06/1928 37.17
1712 05/1891 12/01/1946 54.67
1713 05/1891 07/06/1948 57.08
1714 05/1891 15/07/1946 55.17
1715 16 1715 05/1891 04/10/1949 58.42
1716 05/1891 31/05/1947 56
1717 06/1891 12/1936 45.5
1718 06/1891 10/1936 45.33
1719 06/1891 14/11/1945 54.42
1720 06/1891 12/12/1949 58.5
1721 05/1892 26/07/1946 54.17
1722 05/1892 07/11/1946 54.5
1723 05/1892 01/1935 42.67
1724 05/1892 11/1929 37.5
1725 06/1892 03/10/1946 54.33
1726 06/1892 24/04/1948 55.83
1727 06/1892 05/1935 42.92
1728 06/1892 02/1932 39.67
1729 07/1892 09/1942 50.17
1730 07/1892 02/08/1948 56.08
1731 07/1892 14/06/1949 56.92
1732 07/1892 15/07/1946 54
1733 08/1892 06/1936 43.83
1734 08/1892 23/02/1946 53.5
1735 08/1892 15/07/1946 53.92
1736 08/1892 27/04/1945 52.67
1737 08/1892 03/11/1945 53.25
1738 09/1892 02/1939 46.42
1739 09/1892 03/1931 38.5
1740 09/1892 08/11/1944 52.17
1751 10/1892 03/11/1945 53.08
1752 10/1892 17/03/1950 57.42
1753 10/1892 10/04/1948 55.5
1754 10/1892 08/12/1949 57.17
1755 11/1892 04/1936 43.42
1756 35 35 11/1892 31/07/1946 53.67
1757 11/1892 03/1931 38.33
1758 11/1892 28/03/1949 56.33
1759 11/1892 03/11/1945 53
1760 12/1892 27/07/1950 57.58
1761 12/1892 06/12/1946 54
1762 12/1892 24/04/1948 55.33
1763 12/1892 04/11/1946 53.92
1764 12/1892 04/10/1949 56.83
1765 01/1893 11/1938 45.83
1766 01/1893 06/1938 45.42
1767 01/1893 11/12/1947 54.92
1768 01/1893 11/12/1947 54.92
1769 02/1893 24/04/1948 55.17
1770 02/1893 05/1936 43.25
1791 05/1895 01/1935 39.67
1792 05/1895 03/11/1945 50.5
1793 05/1895 14/11/1945 50.5
1794 06/1895 04/12/1946 51.5
1795 06/1895 26/06/1947 52
1796 06/1895 11/02/1947 51.67
1797 06/1895 31/07/1946 51.08
1798 06/1895 15/07/1946 51.08
1799 06/1895 20/12/1949 54.5
1800 07/1895 11/12/1947 52.42
1854 01/1890 09/12/1944 54.92
1855 02/1890 20/12/1950 60.83
1856 02/1890 14/11/1945 55.75
1857 02/1890 01/1931 40.92
1858 03/1890 23/10/1950 60.58
1859 03/1890 15/07/1946 56.33
1860 03/1890 12/1934 44.75
1861 03/1890 06/11/1951 61.67
1862 03/1890 04/12/1950 60.75
1863 03/1890 28/09/1949 59.5
1864 04/1890 08/1935 45.33
1865 04/1890 21/11/1933 43.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Caerphilly) 16/12/1933 43.70
1866 04/1890 27/11/1946 56.58
1867 04/1890 08/11/1948 58.58
1868 04/1890 02/1939 48.83
1869 04/1890 12/1934 44.67
1870 05/1890 20/10/1950 60.42
1871 05/1890 09/1928 38.33
1872 05/1890 04/1935 44.92
1873 05/1890 03/11/1945 55.5
1874 10/1890 11/1931 41.08
1875 11/1890 03/11/1945 55
1876 11/1890 02/1936 45.25
1877 11/1890 11/1935 45
1878 11/1890 29/11/1949 59
1879 11/1890 09/1928 37.83
1880 11/1890 04/1935 44.42
1881 12/1890 12/1936 46
1882 13 1882 12/1890 04/12/1946 56
1883 12/1890 11/12/1947 57
1884 12/1890 13/08/1949 58.67
1885 12/1890 11/1928 37.92
1886 12/1890 08/06/1945 54.5
1887 12/1890 28/07/1945 54.58
1888 01/1891 23/12/1949 58.92
1889 01/1891 24/12/1948 Cardiff Canton 57.92
1890 01/1891 12/06/1947 56.42
1891 02/1891 20/12/1949 58.83
1892 02/1891 04/1936 45.17
1893 02/1891 30/11/1945 54.75
1894 07/1895 15/02/1949 53.58
1895 07/1895 22/05/1947 51.83
1896 07/1895 15/12/1949 54.42
1897 07/1895 03/01/1949 53.5
1898 07/1895 27/04/1945 49.75
1899 08/1895 20/01/1945 49.42
1900 08/1895 24/04/1948 52.67