Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3316 Today
» 4968 Yesterday
» 13610 Week
» 149015 Month
» 608956 Year
» 5048393 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
GWR Armstrong "1901" Class 0-6-0PT
GWR |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Mileage |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
1901
|
08/1881 |
|
09/1929 |
|
48.08 |
|
|
|
|
|
1902
|
09/1881 |
|
22/10/1943 |
|
62.08 |
|
|
|
|
|
1903
|
09/1881 |
|
06/06/1952 |
|
70.75 |
|
|
|
|
|
1904
|
10/1881 |
|
12/1934 |
|
53.17 |
|
|
|
|
|
1905
|
10/1881 |
|
10/1936 |
|
55 |
|
|
|
|
|
1906
|
11/1881 |
|
07/1932 |
|
50.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
1907
|
11/1881 |
|
11/01/1950 |
|
68.17 |
|
|
|
|
|
1908
|
12/1881 |
|
11/1936 |
|
54.92 |
|
|
|
|
|
1909
|
01/1882 |
|
11/11/1949 |
|
67.83 |
|
|
|
|
|
1910
|
04/1882 |
|
08/07/1944 |
|
62.25 |
|
|
|
|
|
1911
|
04/1882 |
|
05/1936 |
|
54.08 |
|
|
|
|
|
1912
|
04/1882 |
|
30/12/1949 |
|
67.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
1913
|
06/1882 |
|
11/1929 |
|
47.42 |
|
|
|
|
|
1914
|
07/1882 |
|
06/1931 |
|
48.92 |
|
|
|
|
|
1915
|
07/1882 |
|
08/1935 |
|
53.08 |
|
|
|
|
|
1916
|
07/1882 |
|
07/1928 |
|
46 |
|
|
|
|
|
1917
|
08/1882 |
|
19/03/1951 |
|
68.58 |
|
|
|
|
|
1918
|
08/1882 |
|
06/1929 |
|
46.83 |
|
|
|
|
|
1919
|
09/1882 |
|
21/11/1949 |
|
67.17 |
|
|
|
|
|
1920
|
10/1882 |
|
30/09/1933 |
|
50.92 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Caerphilly) |
21/10/1933 |
51.05 |
1921
|
10/1882 |
|
05/1935 |
|
52.58 |
|
|
|
|
|
1922
|
11/1882 |
|
04/1936 |
|
53.42 |
|
|
|
|
|
1923
|
11/1882 |
|
07/1939 |
|
56.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
1924
|
12/1882 |
|
08/1938 |
|
55.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
1925
|
12/1883 |
|
20/04/1951 |
|
67.33 |
|
|
|
|
|
1926
|
01/1884 |
|
11/1928 |
|
44.83 |
|
|
|
|
|
1927
|
02/1884 |
|
10/1929 |
|
45.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
1928
|
03/1884 |
|
12/1934 |
|
50.75 |
|
|
|
|
|
1929
|
04/1884 |
|
07/1935 |
|
51.25 |
|
|
|
|
|
1930
|
05/1884 |
|
15/08/1949 |
|
65.25 |
|
|
|
|
|
1931
|
06/1884 |
|
12/1938 |
|
54.5 |
|
|
|
|
|
1932
|
07/1884 |
|
04/1930 |
|
45.75 |
|
|
|
|
|
1933
|
07/1884 |
|
03/1928 |
|
43.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
1934
|
08/1884 |
|
04/1928 |
|
43.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
1935
|
08/1884 |
|
05/11/1953 |
|
69.25 |
|
|
|
|
|
1936
|
09/1884 |
|
02/1935 |
|
50.42 |
|
|
|
|
|
1937
|
09/1886 |
|
12/1934 |
|
48.25 |
|
|
|
|
|
1938
|
10/1886 |
|
07/1936 |
|
49.75 |
|
|
|
|
|
1939
|
10/1886 |
|
11/1929 |
|
43.08 |
|
|
|
|
|
1940
|
11/1886 |
|
11/04/1933 |
|
46.42 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
06/05/1933 |
46.50 |
1941
|
11/1886 |
|
16/02/1951 |
|
64.25 |
|
|
|
|
|
1942
|
12/1886 |
|
12/1934 |
|
48 |
|
|
|
|
|
1943
|
01/1887 |
|
20/03/1951 |
|
64.17 |
|
|
|
|
|
1944
|
01/1887 |
|
26/10/1934 |
|
47.75 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
17/11/1934 |
47.87 |
1945
|
02/1887 |
|
22/11/1949 |
|
62.75 |
|
|
|
|
|
1946
|
03/1887 |
|
01/1935 |
|
47.83 |
|
|
|
|
|
1947
|
03/1887 |
|
11/1938 |
|
51.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
1948
|
03/1887 |
|
18/08/1934 |
|
47.42 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
22/09/1934 |
47.55 |
1949
|
02/1888 |
|
03/04/1950 |
|
62.17 |
|
|
|
|
|
1950
|
02/1888 |
|
11/06/1934 |
|
46.33 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
30/06/1934 |
46.40 |
1951
|
03/1888 |
|
10/1937 |
|
49.58 |
|
|
|
|
|
1952
|
03/1888 |
|
11/1928 |
|
40.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
1953
|
04/1888 |
|
04/1929 |
|
41 |
|
|
|
|
|
1954
|
05/1888 |
|
07/09/1944 |
|
56.33 |
|
|
|
|
|
1955
|
05/1888 |
|
08/1939 |
|
51.25 |
|
|
|
|
|
1956
|
06/1888 |
|
12/1938 |
|
50.5 |
|
|
|
|
|
1957
|
06/1888 |
|
09/04/1951 |
|
62.83 |
|
|
|
|
|
1958
|
07/1888 |
|
09/1936 |
|
48.17 |
|
|
|
|
|
1959
|
08/1888 |
|
11/1935 |
|
47.25 |
|
|
|
|
|
1960
|
09/1888 |
|
04/1935 |
|
46.58 |
|
|
|
|
|
1961
|
10/1889 |
|
09/1936 |
|
46.92 |
|
|
|
|
|
1962
|
10/1889 |
|
02/1929 |
|
39.33 |
|
|
|
|
|
1963
|
11/1889 |
|
18/01/1943 |
|
53.17 |
|
|
|
|
|
1964
|
11/1889 |
|
29/02/1952 |
|
62.25 |
|
|
|
|
|
1965
|
12/1889 |
|
25/01/1950 |
|
60.08 |
|
|
|
|
|
1966
|
12/1889 |
|
07/1939 |
|
49.58 |
|
|
|
|
|
1967
|
01/1890 |
|
15/06/1951 |
|
61.42 |
|
|
|
|
|
1968
|
02/1890 |
|
17/09/1951 |
|
61.58 |
|
|
|
|
|
1969
|
02/1890 |
|
15/08/1949 |
|
59.5 |
|
|
|
|
|
1970
|
03/1890 |
|
07/1938 |
|
48.33 |
|
|
|
|
|
1971
|
03/1890 |
|
12/1938 |
|
48.75 |
|
|
|
|
|
1972
|
06/1890 |
|
10/1929 |
|
39.33 |
|
|
|
|
|
1973
|
07/1890 |
|
02/12/1949 |
|
59.42 |
|
|
|
|
|
1974
|
07/1890 |
|
08/1935 |
|
45.08 |
|
|
|
|
|
1975
|
09/1890 |
|
09/1935 |
|
45 |
|
|
|
|
|
1976
|
09/1890 |
|
11/1936 |
|
46.17 |
|
|
|
|
|
1977
|
10/1890 |
|
02/1931 |
|
40.33 |
|
|
|
|
|
1978
|
10/1890 |
|
02/1936 |
Farnley Junction |
45.33 |
|
|
|
|
|
1979
|
11/1890 |
|
21/08/1950 |
|
59.75 |
|
|
|
|
|
1980
|
11/1890 |
|
17/11/1934 |
|
44 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
15/12/1934 |
44.11 |
1981
|
12/1890 |
|
07/1928 |
|
37.58 |
|
|
|
|
|
1982
|
01/1891 |
|
01/1936 |
|
45 |
|
|
|
|
|
1983
|
01/1891 |
|
12/1935 |
|
44.92 |
|
|
|
|
|
1984
|
02/1891 |
|
06/1928 |
|
37.33 |
|
|
|
|
|
1985
|
02/1891 |
|
16/07/1934 |
|
43.42 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
25/08/1934 |
43.55 |
1986
|
03/1891 |
|
10/1929 |
|
38.58 |
|
|
|
|
|
1987
|
03/1891 |
|
01/1929 |
|
37.83 |
|
|
|
|
|
1988
|
05/1891 |
|
08/01/1947 |
|
55.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
1989
|
06/1891 |
|
25/09/1950 |
|
59.25 |
|
|
|
|
|
1990
|
06/1891 |
|
02/11/1949 |
|
58.42 |
|
|
|
|
|
1991
|
07/1891 |
|
26/01/1953 |
|
61.5 |
|
|
|
|
|
1992
|
07/1891 |
|
03/1935 |
|
43.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
1993
|
08/1891 |
|
19/04/1951 |
|
59.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
1994
|
08/1891 |
|
10/1938 |
|
47.17 |
|
|
|
|
|
1995
|
09/1891 |
|
08/1930 |
|
38.92 |
|
|
|
|
|
1996
|
10/1891 |
|
05/01/1953 |
|
61.25 |
|
|
|
|
|
1997
|
10/1891 |
|
05/1929 |
|
37.58 |
|
|
|
|
|
1998
|
11/1891 |
|
17/11/1934 |
|
43 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
15/12/1934 |
43.11 |
1999
|
11/1891 |
|
20/06/1946 |
|
54.58 |
|
|
|
|
|
2000
|
12/1891 |
|
29/12/1949 |
|
58 |
|
|
|
|
|
2001
|
12/1891 |
|
13/08/1952 |
|
60.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
2002
|
01/1892 |
|
26/02/1952 |
|
60.08 |
|
|
|
|
|
2003
|
01/1892 |
|
05/1929 |
|
37.33 |
|
|
|
|
|
2004
|
09/1892 |
|
30/01/1952 |
|
59.33 |
|
|
|
|
|
2005
|
09/1892 |
|
22/12/1944 |
|
52.25 |
|
|
|
|
|
2006
|
10/1892 |
|
02/12/1949 |
|
57.17 |
|
|
|
|
|
2007
|
10/1892 |
|
01/12/1949 |
|
57.17 |
|
|
|
|
|
2008
|
11/1892 |
|
03/03/1958 |
|
65.33 |
|
|
|
|
|
2009
|
04/1894 |
|
10/01/1951 |
|
56.75 |
|
|
|
|
|
2010
|
05/1894 |
|
23/03/1953 |
|
58.83 |
|
|
|
|
|
2011
|
11/1894 |
|
18/08/1956 |
|
61.75 |
1,049,317 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
06/10/1956 |
61.93 |
2012
|
11/1894 |
|
06/1958 |
|
63.58 |
|
|
|
|
|
2013
|
12/1894 |
|
30/05/1950 |
|
55.42 |
|
|
|
|
|
2014
|
12/1894 |
|
02/11/1951 |
|
56.92 |
|
|
|
|
|
2015
|
01/1895 |
|
03/11/1945 |
|
50.83 |
|
|
|
|
|
2016
|
02/1895 |
|
14/01/1952 |
|
56.92 |
|
|
|
|
|
2017
|
02/1895 |
|
08/03/1951 |
|
56.08 |
|
|
|
|
|
2018
|
03/1895 |
|
16/12/1949 |
|
54.75 |
|
|
|
|
|
2019
|
03/1895 |
|
07/12/1949 |
|
54.75 |
|
|
|
|
|
2020
|
05/1895 |
|
12/1938 |
|
43.58 |
|
|
|
|
|