GWR Dean "2021" Class 0-6-0PT
GWR | GWR (Prototype) | GWR (2181) | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Rebuilt To | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Mileage | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2021 | 02/1897 | 01/06/1951 | 54.33 | ||||||||||
2022 | 03/1897 | 06/12/1949 | Cardiff East Dock | 52.75 | |||||||||
2023 | 04/1897 | 24/01/1952 | 54.75 | ||||||||||
2024 | 04/1897 | 03/1939 | 41.92 | ||||||||||
2025 | 05/1897 | 29/05/1952 | 55 | ||||||||||
2026 | 05/1897 | 26/04/1951 | 53.92 | ||||||||||
2027 | 06/1897 | 04/02/1957 | 59.67 | 1,058,606 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 23/02/1957 | 59.73 | |||||
2028 | 06/1897 | 09/1938 | 41.25 | ||||||||||
2029 | 07/1897 | 25/11/1949 | Llanelli | 52.33 | |||||||||
2030 | 08/1897 | 18/02/1952 | 54.5 | ||||||||||
2031 | 09/1897 | 16/01/1953 | 55.33 | ||||||||||
2032 | 10/1897 | 19/06/1951 | 53.67 | ||||||||||
2033 | 11/1897 | 22/03/1951 | 53.33 | ||||||||||
2034 | 11/1897 | 12/09/1955 | 57.83 | 1,185,506 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
2035 | 01/1898 | 18/03/1955 | 57.17 | 1,112,528 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 18/06/1955 | 57.46 | |||||
2036 | 01/1898 | 02/1939 | 41.08 | ||||||||||
2037 | 01/1898 | 20/07/1950 | 52.5 | ||||||||||
2038 | 02/1898 | 20/04/1953 | 55.17 | ||||||||||
2039 | 02/1898 | 10/04/1950 | 52.17 | ||||||||||
2040 | 03/1898 | 08/10/1956 | 58.58 | 979,294 | |||||||||
2041 | 04/1898 | 31/03/1947 | 48.92 | ||||||||||
2042 | 04/1898 | 20/04/1953 | 55 | ||||||||||
2043 | 05/1898 | 10/01/1955 | 56.67 | 972,637 | |||||||||
2044 | 06/1898 | 30/07/1951 | 53.08 | ||||||||||
2045 | 06/1898 | 30/12/1949 | Lydney | 51.5 | |||||||||
2046 | 06/1898 | 16/06/1947 | 49 | ||||||||||
2047 | 07/1898 | 16/12/1949 | Carmarthen | 51.42 | |||||||||
2048 | 08/1898 | 17/05/1952 | 53.75 | ||||||||||
2049 | 09/1898 | 08/11/1944 | 46.17 | ||||||||||
2050 | 09/1898 | 10/10/1951 | 53.08 | ||||||||||
2051 | 10/1898 | 30/07/1951 | 52.75 | ||||||||||
2052 | 10/1898 | 31/05/1950 | 51.58 | ||||||||||
2053 | 11/1898 | 13/04/1954 | 55.42 | 1,043,030 | |||||||||
2054 | 12/1898 | 15/03/1951 | 52.25 | ||||||||||
2055 | 01/1899 | 20/01/1951 | 52 | ||||||||||
2056 | 01/1899 | 27/03/1951 | 52.17 | ||||||||||
2057 | 02/1899 | 09/1907 | 8.58 | ||||||||||
2058 | 03/1899 | 17/09/1945 | 46.5 | ||||||||||
2059 | 03/1899 | 07/11/1949 | Llanelli | 50.67 | |||||||||
2060 | 04/1899 | 29/12/1954 | 55.67 | 1,002,497 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 26/02/1955 | 55.90 | |||||
2061 | 04/1899 | 12/04/1955 | 56 | 768,864 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 21/05/1955 | 56.13 | |||||
2062 | 5400 | 05/1899 | 08/1930 | 08/1930 to 5400 |
31.25 | 33.11 | |||||||
2063 | 06/1899 | 07/05/1951 | 51.92 | ||||||||||
2064 | 06/1899 | 23/11/1949 | St Philips Marsh | 50.42 | |||||||||
2065 | 06/1899 | 29/11/1949 | Tyseley | 50.42 | |||||||||
2066 | 07/1899 | 17/09/1951 | 52.17 | ||||||||||
2067 | 08/1899 | 13/11/1952 | 53.25 | ||||||||||
2068 | 08/1899 | 19/01/1953 | 53.42 | ||||||||||
2069 | 09/1899 | 13/04/1959 | 59.58 | 60.70 | |||||||||
2070 | 10/1899 | 31/08/1955 | 55.83 | 917,667 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/10/1955 | 56.02 | |||||
2071 | 10/1899 | 05/06/1950 | 50.67 | ||||||||||
2072 | 11/1899 | 30/07/1956 | 56.67 | 1,077,242 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/09/1956 | 56.85 | |||||
2073 | 11/1899 | 18/06/1951 | 51.58 | ||||||||||
2074 | 2183 | 12/1899 | 21/05/1955 | 55.42 | 1,077,735 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 16/07/1955 | 55.62 | ||||
2075 | 01/1900 | 15/03/1951 | 51.17 | ||||||||||
2076 | 02/1900 | 02/10/1951 | 51.67 | ||||||||||
2077 | 02/1900 | 28/02/1947 | 47 | ||||||||||
2078 | 03/1900 | 02/12/1944 | 44.75 | ||||||||||
2079 | 06/1900 | 20/11/1952 | 52.42 | ||||||||||
2080 | 09/1900 | 18/03/1952 | 51.5 | ||||||||||
2081 | 10/1900 | 18/10/1954 | 54 | 1,011,568 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 04/12/1954 | 54.17 | |||||
2082 | 10/1900 | 13/06/1955 | 54.67 | 1,076,744 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
2083 | 11/1900 | 09/11/1951 | 51 | ||||||||||
2084 | 11/1900 | 16/02/1946 | 45.25 | ||||||||||
2085 | 11/1900 | 24/08/1953 | 52.75 | ||||||||||
2086 | 01/1901 | 27/05/1952 | 51.33 | ||||||||||
2087 | 2188 | 01/1901 | 02/02/1952 | 51.08 | |||||||||
2088 | 03/1901 | 31/08/1955 | 54.42 | 938,707 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 28/01/1956 | 54.91 | |||||
2089 | 03/1901 | 03/09/1951 | 50.5 | ||||||||||
2090 | 03/1901 | 30/03/1955 | 54 | 845,067 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 21/05/1955 | 54.22 | |||||
2091 | 04/1901 | 24/04/1950 | 49 | ||||||||||
2092 | 04/1901 | 24/08/1955 | 54.33 | 949,218 | |||||||||
2093 | 05/1901 | 26/01/1952 | 50.67 | ||||||||||
2094 | 05/1901 | 23/05/1952 | 51 | ||||||||||
2095 | 06/1901 | 26/04/1951 | 49.83 | ||||||||||
2096 | 07/1901 | 08/05/1950 | 48.83 | ||||||||||
2097 | 07/1901 | 30/03/1955 | 53.67 | 976,673 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 23/04/1955 | 53.81 | |||||
2098 | 08/1901 | 07/05/1951 | 49.75 | ||||||||||
2099 | 09/1901 | 01/06/1954 | 52.75 | 908,370 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 17/07/1954 | 52.87 | |||||
2100 | 11/1901 | 11/06/1952 | 50.58 | ||||||||||
2101 | 01/1902 | 12/03/1956 | 54.17 | 1,055,659 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 21/04/1956 | 54.30 | |||||
2102 | 01/1902 | 28/11/1949 | Hereford | 47.83 | |||||||||
2103 | 02/1902 | 26/03/1946 | 44.08 | ||||||||||
2104 | 03/1902 | 11/05/1951 | 49.17 | ||||||||||
2105 | 2189 | 04/1902 | 03/10/1950 | 48.5 | |||||||||
2106 | 04/1902 | 26/08/1952 | 50.33 | ||||||||||
2107 | 05/1902 | 05/06/1956 | 54.08 | 940,014 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 14/07/1956 | 54.20 | |||||
2108 | 05/1902 | 29/12/1954 | 52.58 | 847,432 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 29/01/1955 | 52.75 | |||||
2109 | 06/1902 | 26/02/1952 | 49.67 | ||||||||||
2110 | 07/1902 | 21/07/1950 | 48 | ||||||||||
2111 | 07/1902 | 16/03/1953 | 50.67 | ||||||||||
2112 | 08/1902 | 13/09/1954 | 52.08 | 1,014,525 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 09/10/1954 | 52.19 | |||||
2113 | 09/1902 | 20/03/1950 | 47.5 | ||||||||||
2114 | 09/1902 | 23/12/1949 | Lydney | 47.25 | |||||||||
2115 | 10/1902 | 23/06/1952 | 49.67 | ||||||||||
2116 | 10/1902 | 06/02/1946 | 43.33 | ||||||||||
2117 | 11/1902 | 25/06/1951 | 48.58 | ||||||||||
2118 | 2186 | 11/1902 | 04/04/1955 | 52.42 | 1,009,287 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 21/05/1955 | 52.55 | ||||
2119 | 12/1902 | 15/08/1946 | 43.67 | ||||||||||
2120 | 01/1903 | 02/09/1946 | 43.67 | ||||||||||
2121 | 02/1903 | 02/06/1952 | 49.33 | ||||||||||
2122 | 03/1903 | 19/11/1952 | 49.67 | ||||||||||
2123 | 03/1903 | 06/10/1952 | 49.58 | ||||||||||
2124 | 05/1903 | 03/07/1950 | 47.17 | ||||||||||
2125 | 2182 | 05/1903 | 31/08/1955 | 52.25 | 924,290 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/10/1955 | 52.44 | ||||
2126 | 05/1903 | 0000 | |||||||||||
2127 | 05/1903 | 19/09/1952 | 49.33 | ||||||||||
2128 | 06/1903 | 01/1911 | 7.58 | 39.86 | |||||||||
2129 | 07/1903 | 23/03/1953 | 49.67 | ||||||||||
2130 | 07/1903 | 31/05/1950 | 46.83 | ||||||||||
2131 | 08/1903 | 15/11/1951 | 48.25 | ||||||||||
2132 | 09/1903 | 11/08/1950 | 46.92 | ||||||||||
2133 | 2181 | 09/1903 | 11/02/1952 | 48.42 | |||||||||
2134 | 10/1903 | 08/05/1957 | 53.58 | 993,420 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 13/07/1957 | 53.78 | |||||
2135 | 10/1903 | 09/01/1953 | 49.25 | ||||||||||
2136 | 11/1903 | 23/04/1955 | 51.42 | 1,001,393 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 28/05/1955 | 51.57 | |||||
2137 | 11/1903 | 12/12/1949 | Llanelli | 46.08 | |||||||||
2138 | 12/1903 | 12/05/1956 | 52.42 | 947,778 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 16/06/1956 | 52.54 | |||||
2139 | 01/1904 | 24/02/1945 | 41.08 | ||||||||||
2140 | 01/1904 | 17/05/1952 | 48.33 | ||||||||||
2141 | 03/1904 | 16/10/1950 | 46.58 | ||||||||||
2142 | 03/1904 | 14/02/1947 | 42.92 | ||||||||||
2143 | 2187 | 04/1904 | 26/02/1952 | 47.83 | |||||||||
2144 | 05/1904 | 26/05/1955 | 51 | 787,330 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 13/08/1955 | 51.28 | |||||
2145 | 2184 | 05/1904 | 30/10/1950 | 46.42 | |||||||||
2146 | 06/1904 | 25/03/1953 | 48.75 | ||||||||||
2147 | 06/1904 | 07/03/1953 | 48.75 | ||||||||||
2148 | 07/1904 | 04/02/1952 | 47.58 | ||||||||||
2149 | 2185 | 08/1904 | 23/12/1952 | 48.33 | |||||||||
2150 | 09/1904 | 03/01/1952 | 47.33 | ||||||||||
2151 | 09/1904 | 19/05/1952 | 47.67 | ||||||||||
2152 | 10/1904 | 22/11/1951 | 47.08 | ||||||||||
2153 | 10/1904 | 11/12/1950 | 46.17 | ||||||||||
2154 | 11/1904 | 05/02/1952 | 47.25 | ||||||||||
2155 | 11/1904 | 01/11/1950 | 46 | ||||||||||
2156 | 12/1904 | 09/02/1953 | 48.17 | ||||||||||
2157 | 2190 | 01/1905 | 13/04/1951 | 46.25 | |||||||||
2158 | 02/1905 | 10/11/1945 | 40.75 | ||||||||||
2159 | 02/1905 | 07/08/1951 | 46.5 | ||||||||||
2160 | 03/1905 | 04/03/1957 | 52 | 1,051,525 | 52.13 |