Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 166 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 1257 Week
» 8869 Month
» 75731 Year
» 1741107 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BaR/GWR "B1" Class 0-6-2T


GWR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
238 06/1890 25/06/1948 58
240 07/1890 27/03/1951 60.67
246 03/1892 03/01/1949 56.83
248 03/1892 10/07/1948 56.33
258 12/1894 24/11/1949 Barry 54.92
259 12/1894 30/08/1948 53.67
261 05/1900 16/08/1948 48.25
262 05/1900 20/03/1950 49.83
263 06/1900 09/03/1951 50.75
265 06/1900 29/11/1949 Barry 49.42
267 06/1900 27/03/1951 50.75
268 06/1900 24/04/1948 47.83
269 06/1900 10/10/1949 49.33
270 06/1900 06/04/1951 50.83
271 06/1900 06/04/1951 50.83
272 06/1900 20/03/1950 49.75
274 03/1900 17/04/1951 51.08
275 04/1900 24/04/1948 48
276 04/1900 15/04/1951 51
277 04/1900 06/05/1949 49.08