Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 544 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 6019 Week
» 6019 Month
» 72881 Year
» 1738257 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

RR/GWR Hurry Riches "RRR" Class 0-6-2T


GWR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
30 12/1907 09/05/1949 41.42
31 12/1907 09/03/1951 43.25
32 12/1907 20/02/1950 42.17
34 09/1909 24/11/1949 Radyr 40.17
46 10/1909 10/07/1950 40.75