Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 125 Today
» 1042 Yesterday
» 6642 Week
» 6642 Month
» 73504 Year
» 1738880 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

RR/GWR Hurry Riches "RRP" Class 0-6-2T


GWR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Mileage Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
76 07/1909 01/11/1950 41.33
77 04/1917 23/11/1953 36.58
82 07/1909 17/05/1954 44.83 1,037,523 44.96
83 08/1909 09/05/1955 45.75 615,716 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 18/06/1955 45.87