Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 738 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14144 Week
» 67160 Month
» 186687 Year
» 3213540 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
RR/GWR Hurry Riches "RRA" Class 0-6-2T
GWR |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Mileage |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
52
|
05/1910 |
|
29/11/1949 |
Cardiff East Dock |
39.5 |
|
|
|
|
|
53
|
05/1910 |
|
13/06/1949 |
Cardiff East Dock |
39.08 |
|
|
|
|
|
54
|
05/1910 |
|
24/04/1948 |
|
37.92 |
|
|
|
|
|
55
|
05/1910 |
|
04/02/1953 |
|
42.75 |
|
|
|
|
|
56
|
05/1910 |
|
28/09/1953 |
|
43.33 |
|
|
|
|
|
57
|
04/1911 |
|
29/04/1952 |
|
41 |
|
|
|
|
|
58
|
05/1911 |
|
08/09/1954 |
|
43.33 |
676,178 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
23/04/1955 |
43.97 |
59
|
06/1911 |
|
29/07/1955 |
|
44.08 |
722,856 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
10/09/1955 |
44.27 |
60
|
07/1911 |
|
13/03/1951 |
|
39.67 |
|
|
|
|
|
61
|
08/1911 |
|
20/02/1950 |
|
38.5 |
|
|
|
|
|
62
|
09/1911 |
|
06/12/1948 |
|
37.25 |
|
|
|
|
|
71
|
06/1910 |
|
06/12/1948 |
|
38.5 |
|
|
|
|
|
72
|
07/1910 |
|
26/02/1952 |
|
41.58 |
|
|
|
|
|
73
|
07/1910 |
|
11/07/1952 |
|
42 |
|
|
|
|
|
74
|
07/1910 |
|
20/01/1951 |
|
40.5 |
|
|
|
|
|
75
|
07/1910 |
|
26/10/1953 |
|
43.25 |
|
|
|
|
|