Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 586 Today
» 1160 Yesterday
» 3911 Week
» 3911 Month
» 70773 Year
» 1736149 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

RR/GWR Hurry Riches "RRA1" Class 0-6-2T


GWR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Mileage Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
63 06/1914 08/09/1952 38.25
64 07/1914 22/05/1950 35.83
65 08/1914 01/02/1954 39.5 580,696 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 27/02/1954 39.56
66 03/1916 12/07/1955 39.33 636,336 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/10/1955 39.59
67 07/1916 18/09/1952 36.17
68 09/1918 29/06/1954 35.75 552,550 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 11/09/1954 36.01
69 09/1918 21/07/1955 36.83 512,988 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 13/08/1955 36.93
70 09/1918 28/07/1955 36.83 530,295 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 10/09/1955 37.01