Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 566 Today
» 1160 Yesterday
» 3891 Week
» 3891 Month
» 70753 Year
» 1736129 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

TVR/GWR Hurry Riches "O4" Class 0-6-2T


TVR GWR (1922) GWR (1946) Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Mileage Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
105 236 06/1908 12/01/1953 44.58 745,262 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 18/04/1953 44.87
1 278 07/1910 28/05/1951 40.83 656,178 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/09/1951 41.18
2 279 07/1910 31/05/1954 43.83 693,176 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 26/03/1955 44.73
6 280 07/1908 09/05/1949 40.83 361,204 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 16/07/1949 41.03
8 281 08/1910 25/08/1950 40 672,749 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 24/02/1951 40.56
9 282 07/1908 14/06/1954 45.92 713,654 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 14/08/1954 46.11
17 283 08/1910 14/03/1949 38.58 353,784 Cut Locomotive Works (Caerphilly) 21/05/1949 38.79
35 284 08/1910 03/11/1952 42.25 689,171 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 21/03/1953 42.63
38 285 04/1907 24/08/1953 46.33 703,792 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 22/03/1958 50.97
39 286 06/1908 02/10/1950 42.33 669,201 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/12/1950 42.57
43 287 04/1907 07/12/1949 Abercynon 42.67 692,338 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 20/05/1950 43.13
46 288 09/1910 10/03/1950 39.5 661,530 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 20/05/1950 39.70
48 289 07/1908 15/08/1949 41.08 654,250 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/10/1949 41.26
49 290 10/1910 26/07/1955 44.75 829,727 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 10/09/1955 44.93
56 291 07/1908 16/01/1950 41.5 302,370 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 17/06/1950 41.95
58 292 07/1908 10/04/1952 43.75 660,238 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 12/07/1952 44.02
59 293 06/1907 27/07/1951 44.08 689,952 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/09/1951 44.26
67 294 07/1907 17/07/1950 43 587,001 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 24/02/1951 43.64
68 295 07/1907 23/06/1951 43.92 753,891 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/09/1951 44.18
94 296 09/1907 19/09/1949 42 265,286 Cut Locomotive Works (Barry, South Glamorgan) 25/02/1950 42.48
95 297 07/1908 12/12/1949 Cardiff East Dock 41.42 625,224 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 09/09/1950 42.18
97 298 07/1908 10/07/1948 40 649,852 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 03/12/1949 41.41
98 299 07/1908 18/06/1951 42.92 740,519 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 11/08/1951 43.10
101 300 200 07/1908 10/07/1948 40 624,630 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 02/10/1948 40.24
102 301 06/1908 06/12/1948 40.5 664,012 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 29/01/1949 40.65
104 302 07/1908 10/04/1948 39.75 577,173 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 12/06/1948 39.94
108 310 203 09/1910 07/01/1952 41.33 654,691 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 24/01/1953 42.39
109 311 204 09/1910 26/07/1955 44.83 659,613 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 10/09/1955 45.02
110 313 205 09/1910 12/07/1954 43.83 703,603 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 20/04/1957 46.63
111 314 08/1908 08/12/1949 Aberdare 41.33 665,234 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 22/04/1950 41.71
112 315 207 10/1910 18/11/1952 42.08 649,929 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/10/1953 43.07
113 317 208 10/1910 22/07/1955 44.75 735,416 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/10/1955 45.01
114 318 209 10/1910 27/08/1952 41.83 704,687 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 27/12/1952 42.23
115 319 210 10/1910 04/03/1955 44.42 718,902 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 21/05/1955 44.63
116 320 211 10/1910 03/05/1955 44.58 753,715 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 19/05/1956 45.62
118 321 215 10/1910 23/07/1955 44.75 739,825 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 05/11/1955 45.09
119 324 216 10/1910 24/01/1955 44.25 741,351 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon)
121 333 217 10/1910 08/09/1952 41.92 685,266 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/11/1952 42.08
13 409 218 10/1910 04/12/1952 42.17 680,803 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 24/01/1953 42.31
36 414 219 08/1910 04/06/1951 40.83 715,156 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 26/01/1952 41.48
69 420 220 08/1907 08/04/1951 43.67 406,830 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/09/1951 44.10